LUNDLEE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00246-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SHEILA MARIE LUNDLEE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/7/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/16/08 to File Response to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SHEILA MARIE LUNDLEE. Service: 9/4/08.(dls)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due by 9/5/2008. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008, Terminated: 8/15/2008 Terminated:
      MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/5/08 to File Response to [8] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SHEILA MARIE LUNDLEE. Service: 8/5/08.(dls)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Statement of Facts
        STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [8] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/08.(dls)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/08. Response due 8/7/08.(dls)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Administrative Record
            [NOTICE OF FILING THE] ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, consisting of one volume, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/08.(dls)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
              ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 7/7/2008.(signed by the Acting Clerk) (dls)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/8/2008, Terminated: 6/4/2008 Terminated:
                MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/7/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 6/3/08.(dls)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by Lauren Springer Moore for USA. Service: 5/1/08.(dls)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by SHEILA MARIE LUNDLEE.(dls)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against USA (AF), filed by SHEILA MARIE LUNDLEE. Answer due by 6/6/2008.(dls)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 123 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?