AMERICAN PACIFIC TEXTILE, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00270-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HYUNJIN (SIAPAN) CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc K. Sellers +1 503 796 2917 +1 503 796 2900 msellers@schwabe.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/14/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
ANSWER to [6] Amended Complaint (18--Second Amended Complaint), filed by USA.JPSR due by 10/3/2008.(Stoddart, Robert)
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Amended Complaint
    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Sellers, Marc)
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, filed by all plaintiffs (Sellers, Marc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008
      STIPULATION Defendant's Permission to File a Second Amended Complaint, filed by all plaintiffs. (Sellers, Marc)
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008
        NOTICE of Appearance by Connie Kong for L&S APPAREL CORPORATION, MARIANAS GARMENT MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHIGAN, INC., NEO FASHION, INC., POONG INC. SIAPAN, RIFU APPAREL CORPORATION, TOP FASHION CORPORATION, U.S. CNMI DEVELOPMENT, ALL PLAINTIFFS, AMERICAN PACIFIC TEXTILE, INC., HANDSOME TEXTILES (SIAPAN) CORPORATION, HANSAE SIAPAN, INC., HYUNJIN (SIAPAN) CORPORATION. (Kong, Connie)
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
          NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Axelrod for L&S APPAREL CORPORATION, MARIANAS GARMENT MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHIGAN, INC., NEO FASHION, INC., POONG INC. SIAPAN, RIFU APPAREL CORPORATION, TOP FASHION CORPORATION, U.S. CNMI DEVELOPMENT, ALL PLAINTIFFS, AMERICAN PACIFIC TEXTILE, INC., HANDSOME TEXTILES (SIAPAN) CORPORATION, HANSAE SIAPAN, INC., HYUNJIN (SIAPAN) CORPORATION. (Axelrod, David)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
            CLERKS notice granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to RCFC 77.2(a)Answer due by 8/12/2008. Signed by Acting Clerk of Court. (bre, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 5/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/12/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, [6] Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008.(Stoddart, Robert)
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008
                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Stoddart for USA. (Stoddart, Robert)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Court Filing
                  ADR ORDER: If the parties wish to pursue ADR procedures, they may contact chambers within 14 days of the filing of the government's answer to the complaint to arrange for a telephone conference or a meeting with the court. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy B. Firestone for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Edward J. Damich no longer assigned to the case. (mb2)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
                      Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Sellers, Marc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT re [1] Complaint,, Amended Complaint, filed by all plaintiffs.. (Sellers, Marc)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Court Filing
                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge John P. Wiese for Auto ADR proceedings. (mb2)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Court Filing
                              NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (mb2)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (mb2)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                    COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067971), filed by L&S APPAREL CORPORATION, MARIANAS GARMENT MANUFACTURING, INC., MICHIGAN, INC., NEO FASHION, INC., POONG INC. SIAPAN, RIFU APPAREL CORPORATION, TOP FASHION CORPORATION, U.S. CNMI DEVELOPMENT, AMERICAN PACIFIC TEXTILE, INC., HANDSOME TEXTILES (SIAPAN) CORPORATION, HANSAE SIAPAN, INC., HYUNJIN (SIAPAN) CORPORATION. Answer due by 6/13/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(mb2)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?