ZHANG et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00269-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo XIANLI ZHANG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Axelrod +1 503 222 9981 +1 503 796 2900 daxelrod@schwabe.com
Space Connie C. Kong +1 503 796 2973 +1 503 796 2900 ckong@schwabe.com
Space Marc K. Sellers +1 503 796 2917 +1 503 796 2900 msellers@schwabe.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/14/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $34000
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
ANSWER to [4] Amended Complaint (12--Second Amended Complaint), filed by USA.JPSR due by 10/3/2008.(Stoddart, Robert)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Amended Complaint
    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Sellers, Marc)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, filed by all plaintiffs (Sellers, Marc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008
      STIPULATION Defendant's Permission to File a Second Amended Complaint, filed by all plaintiffs. (Axelrod, David)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008
        NOTICE of Appearance by Connie Kong for VORAPUL WILAILUK, XIANLI ZHANG, CHUMHONG CAO, MIN GAO, GUIMIN LU. (Kong, Connie)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
          NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Axelrod for VORAPUL WILAILUK, XIANLI ZHANG, CHUMHONG CAO, MIN GAO, GUIMIN LU. (Axelrod, David)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 8/12/2008. (bre, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008, Terminated: 5/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/12/2008 to File Answer re [4] Amended Complaint, [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008.(Stoddart, Robert)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                ORDER - Granting defendant's unopposed [7] motion for extension of time to August 12, 2008, to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Stoddart for USA. (Stoddart, Robert)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER - Notice of special ECF filing procedures with the court. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT re [1] Complaint, Amended Complaint, filed by all plaintiffs.. (Sellers, Marc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (bre, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (bre, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067972), filed by VORAPUL WILAILUK, USA, XIANLI ZHANG, CHUMHONG CAO, MIN GAO, GUIMIN LU.Answer due by 6/13/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(bre, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 115 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?