BENCIVENGO et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-vv-00328-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES BENCIVENGO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sam Rosmarin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sam Rosmarin, Esq +1 914 686 4000
No Logo PAULA BENCIVENGO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sam Rosmarin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sam Rosmarin, Esq +1 914 686 4000
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Carr Esposito +1 202 514 9729 +1 202 616 4310 katherine.esposito@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/5/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Description not available
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/14/2008 Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    MOTION TO SUSPEND FILING OF RULE 4(C)REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/4/08.Response due by 8/21/2008. (Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Amended Petition
      AMENDED PETITION re: [1] Petition (filed with CD ROM - Medical Records) filed by JAMES BENCIVENGO, PAULA BENCIVENGO. Service: 7/02/08.(tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Description not available
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners' amended petition is due by 7/18/2008. Respondents Report due by 8/4/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Description not available
          SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial status conference in this case shall be held no later than 6/19/08.Respondents Report due by 8/4/2008, unless otherwise modified by the court. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Carr Esposito for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/29/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 notice of filing
              NOTICE OF FILING Medical on CD by JAMES BENCIVENGO, PAULA BENCIVENGO. (Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Notice Of Assignment
                NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Petition
                  PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 068072) [Vaccination date: 10/9/07], filed by JAMES BENCIVENGO, PAULA BENCIVENGO.Respondents Report due by 8/6/2008.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Remark
                    Remark. One cd containing records submitted with the initial petition. The Clerk contacted Petitioner's counsel with instructions to file the materials complete and in compliance with Court Rules. (tjk, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 142 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?