RIVARD et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-vv-00371-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID RIVARD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley Paul Kops +1 610 949 9999 +1 610 949 9773 stankops@aol.com
No Logo DIANE RIVARD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley Paul Kops +1 610 949 9999 +1 610 949 9773 stankops@aol.com
No Logo LINDSAY M RIVARD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley Paul Kops +1 610 949 9999 +1 610 949 9773 stankops@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darryl R. Wishard +1 202 616 4357 +1 202 616 4310 darryl.wishard@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/22/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Scheduling Order
SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's request is GRANTED, Expert Report due by 10/3/2008. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 notice of filing
    RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit F-M by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/5/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 Respondent's Report
      Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/5/08. (Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 notice of filing
        NOTICE OF FILING Compact Disc Ex A-E by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/12/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Medical Records
          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #27-46] filed by DAVID RIVARD, LINDSAY M RIVARD, DAVID RIVARD, DIANE RIVARD, LINDSAY M RIVARD. Service: 8/8/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Description not available
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file by no later than 8/15/08, the documents described in para.1-5 of the letter. Petitioner shall file by no later 8/15/08, the documents requested by respondent on p.2 of the letter, in addition to any documents petitioner deems relevant. Once the complete set of records is filed respondent shall file within thirty days respondent's Rule 4 (c) Report.Notice of Compliance due by 8/15/2008. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
              Minute Entry for proceeding held telephonically on 7/2/2008 held before Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz: Initial Status Conference held on 7/2/2008 to discuss the completeness of the record as well as records requested by respondent. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(co)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Description not available
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent will attempt to obtain the above referenced records from the U.S. Attorney's Office and will notifty petitioner and the undersigned's office by 7/30/08 whether this effort is successful. If unsuccessful petitioner shall file by no later than 8/15/08, the complete set of records. Once the complete set of records is filed respondent shall file within thirty days respondent's Rule 4(c) Report.Notice of Compliance due by 8/15/2008. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008
                  Minute Entry for proceeding held telephonically on 7/25/2008 held before Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz: Status Conference held on 7/25/2008 to discuss respondent's status report and the request for additional records it contained. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(co)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/21/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 notice of filing
                      NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS 20-26 by DAVID RIVARD, LINDSAY M RIVARD, DAVID RIVARD, DIANE RIVARD, LINDSAY M RIVARD. Service: 7/3/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Order
                        ORDER re The initial status conference in this case was held on 7/02/08. Petitioner shall file the additional information requested by respondent in respondent's letter dated 6/18/08. Petitioner shall include a STATEMENT OF COMPLETENESS when filing the requested information, or if the information is unavailable petitioner shall include a Statement of Unavailability. Once petitioner has filed the requested information or a statement of unavailabilty; Respondent shall file a Status Report within 10 days. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl R. Wishard for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/9/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Order
                            ORDER re The initial status conference in this case shall be held within 45 days of the Petition's filing date by 7/7/08. Petitioner shall confer with respondent and then contact the court by 6/23/08, to suggest three possible dates and times for the initial conference call. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Notice Of Assignment
                              NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Petition
                                PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 068141) [Filed with one volume, Exhibits #1-19, returned to petitioner's counsel on 5/28/08 for correction of defects], filed by DAVID RIVARD(as Administrator of the Estate of), LINDSAY M RIVARD(deceased and), DAVID RIVARD(and), DIANE RIVARD, LINDSAY M RIVARD(Deceased).Respondents Report due by 8/25/2008.(tjk, )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?