ROLLINS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00433-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROLAND S. ROLLINS, SR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Widener University School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Reed +1 302 477 2070 +1 302 477 2257 tjreed@mail.widener.edu
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Springer Moore +1 202 616 0333 +1 202 514 8640 lauren.moore@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/16/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $138000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
REPLY to Response to Motion re [7] RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1)RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. (Moore, Lauren)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
    APPENDIX to [7] RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , filed by ROLAND S. ROLLINS, SR.(Reed, Thomas) Modified on 8/23/2008 to edit docket text to reflect what filing is.(dls).
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
      RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1),filed by ROLAND S. ROLLINS, SR. Reply by 9/8/2008.(Reed, Thomas) Modified on 8/23/2008 to edit docket text to reflect what filing is and set proper reply due date. (dls).
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 9/12/2008.(Moore, Lauren)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
          NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Springer Moore for USA. (Moore, Lauren)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008
            ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by ROLAND S. ROLLINS, SR. Response due by 7/3/2008.(mb2)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Five copies to Department of Justice), filed by ROLAND S. ROLLINS, SR. Answer due by 8/15/2008.(mb2)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 126 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?