BOWDITCH et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-09436-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHRISTOPHER MILLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo HUBERT C. BOWDITCH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo JEFFERY A. CANTRELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo JOHN T. STEVENS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo JOHN WALLACE WELKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo MARK T. ORLOWSKI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo MICHAEL L. ORWIG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo ROY M. TURVAVILLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 6/12/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Stipulation
County None
Terminated 6/20/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 2 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment is in favor of plaintiffs Hubert C. Bowditch, Jeffery A. Cantrell, Christopher Miller, John T. Stevens, Mark T. Orlowski, Michael L. Orwig, Roy M. Turvaville, and John Wallace Welker, and against the United States in the total amount of $1,591,087.66 to be paid as follows:- $1,242,324.46 of that amount, representing net back pay, to be paid to their attorney, Barry P. Steinberg, for subsequent distribution by their attorney as required by the settlement agreement.- $64,485.52 to be paid to representatives of the United States for subsequent deposit by those representatives into the individual Thrift Savings Plan accounts of the plaintiffs; and- $284,277.68 to be distributed by representatives of the United States as tax payments.Each party shall bear his own costs, attorneys fees and expenses pursuant to the Settlement Agreement. (lld) Modified on 6/30/2008 (lld).
    LREF
    Blank 1 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER severing plaintiffs from No. 98-943C and assigning them a new docket number; and directing the Clerk to enter judgment in accordance with the parties' stipulation for entry of judgment filed on May 15, 2008 in Case No. 98-943C. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dls)
      LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 125 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?