MITCHELL et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-vv-00469-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAYDEN BRADFORD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by injuredworkerlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Robert Kneisler, Jr. +1 707 542 5132 +1 707 527 0771 jrkesq@injuredworkerlaw.com
No Logo SYRITTA D MITCHELL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by injuredworkerlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Robert Kneisler, Jr. +1 707 542 5132 +1 707 527 0771 jrkesq@injuredworkerlaw.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Traci R. Patton +1 202 353 1589 +1 202 616 4310 traci.patton@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/26/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Respondent's Report
Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/19/08. (Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Appearance by Traci R. Patton for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/14/08.(tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Notice Of Assignment
      NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Petition
        PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 068292), filed by SYRITTA D MITCHELL, JAYDEN BRADFORD.Respondents Report due by 9/29/2008.(tjk, )
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 170 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?