HENDRIX v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-vv-00485-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FRANCES A HENDRIX, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis R. Webb +1 208 734 1616 crwebb@mindspring.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debra A. Filteau Begley +1 202 616 4181 +1 202 616 4310 debra.begley@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/3/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/7/2008 Description not available
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on 8/19/08 the following is ORDERED: Petitioner shall file any additional Medical Records and a Statement of Completion due by 9/29/08. Respondent's Rule 4(c) Report's filing date is hereby STAYED. Once Petitioner's Medical Records are affidavits are filed respondent shall file within 60 days, respondent's Rule 4(c) Report. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008
    Minute Entry for proceeding held telephonically on 8/19/2008 held before Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz: Initial Status Conference held on 8/19/2008. Respondent sent petitioner a letter requesting additional dental and other records. Respondent to confer with respondent's doctor/s to narrow down the time period from which records are requested. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(co)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by Debra A. Filteau Begley for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/24/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Description not available
        SCHEDULING ORDER:Notice of Compliance due by 10/1/2008. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Notice Of Assignment
          NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Petition
            PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 068322) [Vaccination date: 11/16/06](Filed with 2 volumes, Exhibits #1-4), filed by FRANCES A HENDRIX.Respondents Report due by 10/6/2008.(tjk, )
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 169 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?