SRI International v. Internet Security, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-01199-SLR
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 1, 2017 at 12:41 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SRI International, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

No Logo Internet Security Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard K. Herrmann +1 302 888 6800 rherrmann@morrisjames.com
v.
No Logo Internet Security Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison Hoch Altersohn +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 aaltersohn@kslaw.com
Space Adam M. Conrad aconrad@kslaw.com
Space Latif Oduola-Owoo loduolaowoo@kslaw.com
Space Charles A. Pannell cpannell@kslaw.com
Space Scott T. Weingaertner +1 212 556 2227 +1 212 556 2222 sweingaertner@kslaw.com

Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Casebeer Madrid & Batchelder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Renee BuBord Brown rbrown@daycasebeer.com
Space Robert M. Galvin +1 408 873 0110 +1 408 873 0220 galvinrm@daycasebeer.com
Space Goffrey M. Godfrey ggodfrey@daycasebeer.com
Space Paul S. Grewal +1 408 342 4543 +1 408 873 0220 pgrewal@daycasebeer.com
Space Katie J.L. Scott kscott@daycasebeer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard K. Herrmann +1 302 888 6800 rherrmann@morrisjames.com
Space Mary Matterer +1 302 888 6800 +1 302 571 1750 mmatterer@morrisjames.com
No Logo SRI International, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

No Logo Daniel Teal, Respondent
No Logo Frederick Avolio, Respondent
No Logo Jeffery Hansen, Respondent
No Logo Stephen G. Kunin, Respondent
No Logo Todd Heberlein, Respondent
No Logo Pnc Bancorp, Inc., Objector
Unknown Role, Blackrock Inc /ny
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Office Wilmington
Filed 8/26/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Jury Verdict
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 11/13/2006
Lead Case
104-cv-01199-SLR None
Related Case
Other Court Case '2007-1065'['For the Federal Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flags PATENT, PaperDocuments
  Entries (807) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
REDACTED VERSION of 699 Answering Brief in Opposition, to SRI's Motion to Limit Testimony of Dr. Bishop and Ms. Rinkle by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by SRI International Inc., Symantec Corporation. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Constance J. Choi as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with law firm. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
        REDACTED VERSION of 708 Declaration, Declaration of Thomas L. Halkowski, Esq. In Support Of SRI's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
          REDACTED VERSION of 707 Reply Brief, SRI's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 718 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 693 MOTION to Preclude SRI International's Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec Corporation From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony At Damages Trial ; granting in part and denying in part 690 MOTION to limit the testimony of Brian W. Napper. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/31/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Mary B. Matterer regarding enclosing demonstratives per Court's request at the pretrial hearing. (Matterer, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                REDACTED VERSION of 702 Declaration, Declaration of Thomas L. Halkowski in Support of SRI's Opposition to Symantec's Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                  REDACTED VERSION of 701 Answering Brief in Opposition, SRI's Opposition to Symantec's Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Official Transcript of pretrial conference held on October 26, 2011 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2012. (vjg) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                      REDACTED VERSION of 706 Declaration of S. Dennis Wang in Support of Symantec Corporation's Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                        REDACTED VERSION of 705 Reply Brief in Support of Symantec Corporation's Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 711 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                          SEALED Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding Flagged Daubert and Evidentiary Dispute Materials (Letter and Exhibits A-1, A-2, A-3, B and C FILED UNDER SEAL). (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Derek Gosma - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                              STATEMENT re Telephone Conference Transcript Redaction Request for October 4, 2011 Teleconference before the Honorable Mary Pat Thynge by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 708 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                SEALED DECLARATION re 707 Reply Brief, Declaration Of Thomas L. Halkowski, Esquire In Support Of SRI's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony (Exhibits A and B) by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 707 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                  SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 693 MOTION to Preclude SRI International's Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec Corporation From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony At Damages Trial SRI's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony filed by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 706 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                    SEALED DECLARATION re 705 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper as executed by S. Dennis Wang by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 705 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                      SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 690 MOTION to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 704 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                        SEALED EXHIBITS 12 and 13 re 703 Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by SRI International Inc. (fms) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                          PROPOSED ORDER PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Undisputed Facts, # 2 Exhibit 2 - SRI Stmt of Facts to Prove, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Symantec Statement of Facts to be Litigated, # 4 Exhibit 4 - SRI Statement of Issues of Law, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Symantec Statement of Issues of Law to be Litigated, # 6 Exhibit 6 - SRI exhibit list with Symantec objections, # 7 Exhibit 7 - SYM Exhibit List with SRI Objections, # 8 Exhibit 8 - SRI Witness List, # 9 Exhibit 8a - SRI Depo Designations, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Symantec Witness List, # 11 Exhibit 10 - SRI Stmt of Intended Proofs, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Symantec Statement of Intended Proofs, # 13 Exhibit 12 - SRI MILs and Responses FILED UNDER SEAL, # 14 Exhibit 13 - ymantec MILs and Responses FILED UNDER SEAL, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Jury questionnaire, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Preliminary jury instructions, # 17 Exhibit 16 - SRI final jury instructions, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Symantec Final Jury Instructions, # 19 Exhibit 18 - SRI verdict form, # 20 Exhibit 19 - Symantec Verdict Form)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2011: # 21 Exhibit 9A) (nmf, ). (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 702 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                            SEALED DECLARATION re 701 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Thomas L. Halkowski, Esq. In Support Of SRI's Opposition To Symantec's Motion To Limit Testimony Of SRI's Expert Under Federal Rule Of Evidence 702 by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 701 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                              SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 690 MOTION SRI's Opposition To Symantec's Motion To Limit Testimony Of SRI's Expert Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by SRI International Inc., SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2011. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 700 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                SEALED DECLARATION re 699 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Ryan R. Smith in Support of Symantec's Responsive Brief in Opposition to Motion to Limit Testimony of Dr. Bishop and Ms. Rinke by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 699 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                  SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 693 MOTION to Preclude SRI International's Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec Corporation From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony At Damages Trial filed by Symantec Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2011. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 695 Declaration, Declaration of Thomas L. Halkowski in Support of SRI's Opening Brief for Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop and Ms. Rinke to Preclude Symantec from Adducing Improper Expert Testimony at Damages Trial by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit D-E, # 3 Exhibit F-J)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/19/2011) (nmf, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/19/2011) (nmf, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/19/2011) (nmf, ). (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 692 Declaration of S. Dennis Wang in Support of Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 691 Opening Brief in Support, Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 695 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                          SEALED DECLARATION re 694 Opening Brief in Support,, Declaration of Thomas L. Halkowski, Esq. In Support Of SRI International's Opening Brief For Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec Corporation From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony At Damages Trial by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A,B,D,E,F, G,H, I, J)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 693 MOTION to Preclude SRI International's Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec Corporation From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony At Damages Trial SRI International's Opening Brief For Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec Corporation From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony At Damages Trial filed by SRI International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/24/2011. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Preclude SRI International's Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec Corporation From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony At Damages Trial - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting SRI International's Combined Daubert Motion Regarding Dr. Bishop And Ms. Rinke To Preclude Symantec Corporation From Adducing Improper Expert Testimony At Damages Trial)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 692 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                SEALED DECLARATION re 690 MOTION Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper Declaration of S. Dennis Wang by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 10/11/2011 (fms). (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 691 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re 690 MOTION Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper filed by Symantec Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/24/2011. (Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 10/11/2011 (fms). (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Brian W. Napper - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 10/11/2011 (fms). (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 682 Letter The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Abramson on October 12, 2011 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying 654 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/4/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/4/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER The transcript of the teleconference of 10/4/2011 regarding the discovery disputes contained in DI 681, 682, 683, and 684 in CA 04-1199 and DI 46 and 47 in CA 11-131 shall serve as the Order of the Court in these matters. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/4/2011. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01199-SLR -MPT, 1:11-cv-00131-SLR -MPT(cak) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding discovery dispute. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding response to SRI's September 29, 2011 letter regarding discovery issues - re (46 in 1:11-cv-00131-SLR -MPT, 682 in 1:04-cv-01199-SLR -MPT) Letter. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 682 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding regarding discovery disputes - re (679 in 1:04-cv-01199-SLR -MPT) Order Setting Teleconference,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding discovery dispute related to document production - re 679 Order Setting Teleconference,. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Extend expert discovery and Daubert motions to September 28, 2011 for expert discovery and October 7, 2011 for Daubert motions - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER Setting Teleconference (Thomas L. Halkowski, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 10/4/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/22/2011. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01199-SLR -MPT, 1:11-cv-00131-SLR -MPT(cak) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian W. Napper on September 28, 2011 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matthew A. Bishop Ph.D. on September 28, 2011 by SRI International Inc..(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sara Rinke on September 21, 2011 by SRI International Inc..(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report and Disclosure of Sara D. Rinkle and Expert Report of Matthew A. Bishop, Ph.D. by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re 654 MOTION to Amend/Correct 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Amend Its Answer and Counterclaims) filed by Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 662 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Tenth Supplemental Response to SRI's Interrogatory No. 17 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 668 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Thomas L. Halkowski, Esq. In Support Of SRI International's Brief In Opposition To Symantec Corporation's Motion To Amend Its Answer And Counterclaims by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-I, # 2 Exhibit J-K)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 668 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of W. Karl Renner, Esq. In Support of SRI International's Brief In Opposition To Symantec Corporation's Motion To Amend Its Answer And Counterclaims by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 654 MOTION to Amend/Correct 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim SRI's Opposition To Symantec's Motion To Amend Its Answer and Counterclaims filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/29/2011. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 8-17-11 before Judge Mary Pat Thygne. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2011. (lad) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER entered 661 joint motion for teleconference to resolve a discovery dispute. The Court having held a teleconference with counsel to address the discovery issues contained in the parties submissions (D.I. 660, 662, 663 and 664), IT IS ORDERED that the transcript of the discussions and rulings during the teleconference of August 17, 2011, shall serve as the Order of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/18/2011. (cak) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER, Re-Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines ( The Final Pretrial Conference is re-set for 10/26/2011 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/17/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding response to SRI's August 15, 2011 letter seeking to compel production - re 662 Letter. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding Symantec's refusal to provide adequate discovery - re 660 Letter. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 662 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SEALED Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding re Symantec Discovery Materials. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Teleconference to resolve SRI's Discovery Dispute - filed by SRI International Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Richard K. Herrmann regarding Discovery Dispute - re 657 Order Setting Teleconference. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Brian W. Napper by SRI International Inc..(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Symantec's Ninth Supplemental Response to SRI's Interrogatory No. 17 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Teleconference (Thomas L. Halkowski, Esquire to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 8/17/2011 at 03:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address a discovery issue. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/10/2011. (cak) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER Judge Thynge's procedures for handling discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/10/2011. (cak) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 654 MOTION to Amend/Correct 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Symantec Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/19/2011. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Answer and Counterclaims, # 2 Red-lined Proposed Amended Answer and Counterclaims)(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery. Discovery due by 9/23/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2011. Answering Brief due 9/16/2011. Reply Brief due 9/23/2011. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/25/2011 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Jury Trial is set for 11/7/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/29/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER Rule 16 Scheduling Order by Internet Security Systems Inc., SRI International Inc., Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Judge Robinson enclosing Proposed Scheduling Order)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Symantec Corporation's Fourth Supplemental Response to SRI International, Inc.'s Interrogatory No. 9; (2) Symantec Corporation's Seventh Supplemental Response to SRI International, Inc.'s Interrogatory No. 17 (with Exhibit H thereto); and (3) Symantec Corporation's Eighth Supplemental Response to SRI International, Inc.'s Interrogatory No. 17 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of John F. Horvath by SRI International Inc. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2011 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Proposed Pretrial Order, Voir Dire, and Jury Instructions due by 10/20/2011. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/9/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sixth Supplemental Responses to Interrogatory No. 17 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS by Symantec Corporation to SRI's Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6). (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stefani E. Shanberg, Attorney Ryan R. Smith, Attorney Robin L. Brewer and Attorney Constance J. Choi - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fifth Supplemental Responses to SRI International Inc.'s Interrogatory No. 17 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: Mediation Conference set for 7/27/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. See order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/18/2011. (cak) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Order Re-Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference re-set for 6/9/2011 03:00 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/17/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 558 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [557] Jury Verdict. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Order Setting Teleconference:a teleconference has been scheduled for Monday, June 6, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. Eastern Time with Judge Thynge to discuss discovery related issues on SKUs. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/16/2011. (cak) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 557 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                        (SEALED)JURY VERDICT. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Order Setting Teleconference: a teleconference has been scheduled for Friday, May 13, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. Eastern Time with Judge Thynge to discuss the mediation date (either June 13 or June 14, 2011), contents of the mediation statements, and exchange of damages information. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/4/2011. (cak) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 556 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                            (SEALED) Jury List. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 5/4/2011 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case in relation to mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/21/2011. (cak) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 555 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                (SEALED)Jury Notes. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 6/1/2011 03:30 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Prior to the conference, Symantec shall produce its documents relating to damages as well as a 30(b)6 witness regarding those documents. All motion practice is stayed pending further order of the court. ORDER, Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Jury Trial set for 11/7/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/13/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 554 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                    (SEALED)Jury Notes. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney S. Dennis Wang - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 553 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                        (SEALED)Jury Notes. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Setting Teleconference: Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/7/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Jury Trial Completed
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial completed on 9/18/2008 (DAY 11). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Katie J.L. Scott as co-counsel.. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 552 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                (SEALED)Jury Notes. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding a request for status conference. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 551 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                    (SEALED) Jury Notes. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation for Geoff M. Godfrey by Symantec Corporation (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 550 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Final Jury Instructions read in open court on 09/16/2008. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation of Robert M. Galvin by Symantec Corporation (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/16/2008 (DAY 10). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA as to 612 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Symantec Corporation, 619 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Internet Security Systems Inc., Internet Security Systems, Inc.. USCA Decision: affirmed. (lid) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 549 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED NOTICE of SRI's Proffer of Evidence In Support of Commercial Success by SRI International Inc. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of requesting Clerk to remove Renee DuBord Brown as co-counsel by Symantec Corporation (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 548 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding Defendants' letter of September 14, 2008 regarding Steven Smaha - re [547] Letter. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Paul S. Grewal as co-counsel.. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/15/2008 (DAY 9). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by SRI International Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Katherine D. Prescott (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 547 Filed: 9/14/2008, Entered: 9/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding the questioning of ISS's expert witness. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C)(Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 624 SEALED MOTION SRI INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION UNDER LOCAL RULE 5.4(b)(4) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DISCOVERY RESPONSE NEEDED FOR APPEALSEALED MOTION SRI INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION UNDER LOCAL RULE 5.4(b)(4) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DISCOVERY RESPONSE NEEDED FOR APPEAL filed by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 546 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT - Submission of Additional Authority in Opposition to SRI's Modification of the Literal Infringement Jury Instruction by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 624 SEALED MOTION SRI INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION UNDER LOCAL RULE 5.4(b)(4) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DISCOVERY RESPONSE NEEDED FOR APPEALSEALED MOTION SRI INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION UNDER LOCAL RULE 5.4(b)(4) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DISCOVERY RESPONSE NEEDED FOR APPEAL by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 545 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Jury Notes. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 544 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental EXHIBIT re [538] MOTION Requesting Jury Instruction Re: Plurality of Network Monitors re [535] Jury Instructions by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 624 SEALED MOTION SRI INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION UNDER LOCAL RULE 5.4(b)(4) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DISCOVERY RESPONSE NEEDED FOR APPEALSEALED MOTION SRI INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION UNDER LOCAL RULE 5.4(b)(4) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DISCOVERY RESPONSE NEEDED FOR APPEAL filed by Symantec Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/10/2010. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 543 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents and Memorandum in Support of Same - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 624 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION SRI INTERNATIONAL INC.'S MOTION UNDER LOCAL RULE 5.4(b)(4) FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DISCOVERY RESPONSE NEEDED FOR APPEAL - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/12/2008 (DAY 8). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 623 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 622 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/16/2009. (lid) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 542 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents and Incorporated Memorandum of Law - filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 622 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) and Proposed Order - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Miscellaneous Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Conference held on 9/11/2008. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 619 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Internet Security Systems Inc., Internet Security Systems, Inc.. USCA Case Number 2010-1010 (lid) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/11/2008 (DAY 7). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Internet Security Systems Inc. Transcript is already on file (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 541 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [538] MOTION Requesting Jury Instruction Re: Plurality of Network Monitors re [535] Jury Instructions filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/22/2008. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 611 Judgment,, 526 Order, 610 Order,, 532 Order, 468 Memorandum and Order, 525 Memorandum Opinion, 609 Memorandum Opinion and D.I. 550. Appeal filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/10/2008 (DAY 6). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 614 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by SRI International Inc.. USCA Case Number 2009-1575 (lid) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 540 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Incorporated Memorandum in Support - filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by SRI International Inc., SRI International Inc. TRANSCRIPT ALREADY ON FILE (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 539 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Smaha on 9/09/08 by SRI International Inc..(Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 612 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Symantec Corporation. USCA Case Number 2009-1562 (lid) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 538 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Requesting Jury Instruction Re: Plurality of Network Monitors re [535] Jury Instructions - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Symantec Corporation before Judge Robinson, (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/8/2008 (DAY 5). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 611 Judgment,, 610 Order,, Plaintiff SRI International, Inc.'s Notice of Appeal. Appeal filed by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 537 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re [536] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement filed by Symantec Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/22/2008. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address for Howrey LLP by Symantec Corporation (Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 9/22/2009 (dzs, ). (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 536 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 611 Judgment,, 526 Order, 610 Order,, 532 Order, 525 Memorandum Opinion, 609 Memorandum Opinion , 550 Claim Constructions and Jury Instructions and as noted. Appeal filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/5/2008 (DAY 4). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 611 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT in favor of SRI International Inc., a California corporation and against defendant Symantec Corporation, a Delaware corporation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of defendants Internet Security Systems, Inc., a Georgia corporation, and Internet Security Systems Inc., a Delaware corporation and against plaintiff SRI International Inc., a California corporation with respect to its counterclaims of noninfringement of the 338, 203, and 615 patents. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/28/2009. (nmf) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/4/2008 (DAY 3). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 610 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER- granting 567 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) with respect to non-infringement by the SGS and Manager Products, denying 564 MOTION for Post-Trial Relief, granting with respect to non-infringement of the '203 and '615 patents and denying in all other respects 565 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial Pursuant to Rule 59(a), denying 566 MOTION for New Trial under Rule 59(a) and/or to Alter or Amend the Judgment under Rule 59(e). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/20/2009. (lid) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/3/2008 (DAY 2). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 609 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/20/2009. (lid) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 535 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Preliminary Jury Instructions- read in open Court by Judge Sue L. Robinson. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard K. Herrmann (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 534 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Voir Dire Questions-read in open Court by Judge Robinson. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard Herrmann and Richard Horwitz regarding status of pending reexaminations - re 497 Letter. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Jury Trial Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Jury Trial held on 9/2/2008 (DAY 1). (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Richard K. Herrmann re 595 Transcript,, 594 Transcript,, 592 Transcript,, 591 Transcript,, 599 Transcript,, 597 Transcript,, 598 Transcript,, 596 Transcript,, 605 Transcript,, 593 Transcript,, 600 Transcript,, (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 533 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from David E. Moore, Esquire regarding updated version of Ex. 1 to the Pretrial Order - re [524] Proposed Pretrial Order,,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1 to the Pretrial Order)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Official Transcript of held on September 12, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 532 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER regarding evidentiary disputes. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/28/2008. (nmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 604 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Transcript pages of Jury Trial held on 9/12/2008 before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (lid) Modified on 12/5/2011 (fms). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 531 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of ISS-GA's Third Supplemental Response and Objections to SRI's Interrogatory No. 9 and Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to SRI's Interrogatories Nos. 12 and 17 by Internet Security Systems Inc..(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 603 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED Transcript pages of Jury Trial held on 9/8/2008 before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (lid) Modified on 12/5/2011 (fms). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 530 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding response to plaintiff's letter regarding the law of case doctrine - re [529] Letter. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 602 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Transcript pages of Jury Trial held on 9/4/2008 before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (lid) Modified on 12/5/2011 (fms). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 529 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding law of the case doctrine. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 601 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Transcript pages of Jury Trial held on 9/3/2008 before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (lid) Modified on 12/5/2011 (fms). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 528 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding Response to Defendants' request that the Court reconsider its decision and allow into evidence the interim office actions. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 18, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 527 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding the admissibility of reexamination. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 16, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 3020-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED, re [524] Proposed Pretrial Order. (nmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 15 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Main Document 598 replaced on 12/5/2011) (fms). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 526 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [297] Renewed Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Motion of Defendants ISS and Symantec for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sections 102 and 103. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/21/2008. (nmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 11, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 525 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/21/2008. (nmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 10, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/21/2008. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 8, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) Modified on 4/13/2009 (lid). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 524 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order Joint by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Appendix Ex 18 - Appendices, # (20) Exhibit 19, # (21) Exhibit 20, # (22) Exhibit 21, # (23) Exhibit 22, # (24) Exhibit 23, # (25) Exhibit 24, # (26) Exhibit 25)(Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 5, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 523 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Counsel from Judge Robinson regarding response to [522] Letter from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding Jury Questionnaire. (nmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 4, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Main Document 593 replaced on 12/5/2011) (fms). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 522 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding Jury Questionnaire. (Attachments: # (1) Jury Questionnaire)(Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 3, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) Modified on 4/13/2009 (lid). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 521 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Symantec Corporation's Disclosures Pursant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Official Transcript of jury trial held on September 2, 2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number 302-573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2009. (vjg) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 520 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Service that copies of ISS's 282 Notice Letter were caused to be served on August 1, 2008 by Internet Security Systems Inc. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in multi media format: CD-rom briefing with plaintiff's post-trial briefs. Original material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Thomas Lee Halkowski on behalf of SRI International Inc., SRI International Inc. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SO ORDERED- re [517] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allison H. Altersohn. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 07/28/2008. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in multi media format: CD-rom briefing with defendants' post-trial opposition and replies. Original material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Richard K. Herrmann on behalf of Symantec Corporation (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 519 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority by SRI International Inc. re [518] Notice (Other) (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 588 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INTERNET SECURITY STSTEMS INC. AND SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S JOINT REPLY BRIEF re 565 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law; re 567 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of Non-Infringement filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 2/18/2009 (lid). Modified on 2/18/2009 (lid). (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 518 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Defendants' Citation of Subsequent Authority by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF re 565 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Internet Security Systems Renewed Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial Pursuant to Rule 59(a)) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Internet Security Systems Renewed Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial Pursuant to Rule 59(a)) (DEFENDANT ISS'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL REGARDING INFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY) filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 517 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008, Terminated: 7/28/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allison H. Altersohn of King & Spalding LLP - filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 586 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 567 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of Non-Infringement filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SO ORDERED- re [516] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John N. Farrell,[515] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven C. Carlson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 07/18/2008. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 584 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or Alternatively, New Trial, Regarding Infringement of the '338 Patent by SRI International Inc., SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 516 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Farrell - filed by SRI International Inc. (Halkowski, Thomas).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 584 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 564 MOTION for Post-Trial Relief for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or Alternatively, New Trial, Regarding Infringement of the'338 Patent filed by SRI International Inc., SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 515 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven C. Carlson - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 581 Declaration,, of Thomas L. Halkowski in Support of Plaintiff SRI's Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Post-Trial Relief Regarding Validity of the '203 and '615 Patents; Symantec's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement; and ISS' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and a New Trial Regarding Infringement and Validity by SRI International Inc., SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Redacted in its Entirety, # 2 Exhibit B)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED- re [513] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katie J. L. Scott. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 06/23/2008. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re Post-Trial Reply Briefs re 562 Stipulation, SO ORDERED by SRI International Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SO ORDERED- re [514] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael M. Rosen. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 06/12/2008. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 581 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DECLARATION re 578 Answering Brief in Opposition, 579 Answering Brief in Opposition, 580 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Thomas L. Halkowski In Support of Plaintiff SRI's Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Post-Trial Relief Regarding Validity of the '203 and '615 Patents; Symantec's Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law Of Non-Infringement; and ISS's Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law and A New Trial Regarding Infringement And Validity by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 514 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 6/12/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael M. Rosen - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition Plaintiff SRI's Opposition to Defendant ISS's Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law and a New Trial Regarding Infringement and Validity filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/29/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 513 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008, Terminated: 6/24/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katie J. L. Scott - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition Plaintiff SRI's Opposition to Symantec's Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law of Non-Infringement filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/29/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 512 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [508] Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson Dated May 13, 2008 by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C, # (2) Exhibit D Part 1 of 4, # (3) Exhibit D Part 2 of 4, # (4) Exhibit D Part 3 of 4, # (5) Exhibit D Part 4 of 4, # (6) Exhibit E)(Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 578 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition Plaintiff SRI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Post-Trial Relief Regarding Validity of the '203 and '615 Patents filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/29/2009. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 511 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [507] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski Regarding Materials Requested at April 29, 2008 Status Conference by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Part 1, # (5) Exhibit 4 - Part 2, # (6) Exhibit 5-A, # (7) Exhibit 5-B)(Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 577 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 564 MOTION for Post-Trial Relief (DEFENDANT ISS'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO SRI'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL REGARDING INFRINGEMENT OF THE '338 PATENT) filed by Internet Security Systems Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/29/2009. (Moore, David) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 510 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of [506] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson (UNDER SEAL) from Richard L. Horwitz regarding information requested at April 29, 2008 status conference (Part 2 of 2); Exhibit U by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit V part 1, # (2) Exhibit V part 2, # (3) Exhibit X, # (4) Exhibit Y, # (5) Exhibit Z, # (6) Exhibit AA, EE, FF, KK, # (7) Exhibit LL, # (8) Exhibit NN, # (9) Exhibit OO)(Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Internet Security Systems Inc. (Moore, David) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 509 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [505] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson (UNDER SEAL) from Richard L. Horwitz regarding information requested at April 29, 2008 status conference (Part 1 of 2) by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4, # (2) Exhibit A-J, # (3) Exhibit M part 1, # (4) Exhibit M part 2, # (5) Exhibit R, # (6) Exhibit S part 1, # (7) Exhibit S part 2, # (8) Exhibit S part 3, # (9) Exhibit S part 4, # (10) Exhibit S part 5, # (11) Exhibit T)(Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in multi media format: Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson enclosing CDs with Defendants' Opening Post-Trial Briefing. Original material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Richard K. Herrmann on behalf of Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk modified D.I. #'s 507 and 508 to indicate that they were SEALED. (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 573 Opening Brief in Support,,, of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motions for Post Trial Relief Regarding Invalidity of the '203 and '615 Patents by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 508 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (SEALED)Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding Materials Requested at April 29, 2008 Status Conference. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D, # (2) Exhibit E)(Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 5/14/2008 (lid).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 573 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 567 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b), 565 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Internet Security Systems Renewed Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial Pursuant to Rule 59(a)) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Internet Security Systems Renewed Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial Pursuant to Rule 59(a)) for Post Trial Relief Regarding Invalidity of the '203 and '615 Patents filed by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2008. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 507 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (SEALED)Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding materials requested at 4/29/08 hearing. (Halkowski, Thomas) Modified on 5/14/2008 (lid).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 567 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) of Non-Infringment filed by Symantec Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2008. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 506 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson (UNDER SEAL) from Richard L. Horwitz regarding information requested at April 29, 2008 status conference (Part 2 of 2) - re [505] Letter. (Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re 570 POST Trial Brief (Declaration of David E. Moore in Support of Defendant ISS's Opening Post-Trial Brief in Support of Its Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law and a New Trial Regarding Non-Infringement and Invalidity) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moore, David) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 505 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson (UNDER SEAL) from Richard L. Horwitz regarding information requested at April 29, 2008 status conference (Part 1 of 2). (Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 570 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    POST TRIAL BRIEF (Defendant ISS's Opening Post-Trial Brief in Support of Its Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law and a New Trial Regarding Non-Infringement and Invalidity) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 504 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 04/29/2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter: V. Gunning. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (lid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 569 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 564 MOTION for Post-Trial Relief Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or in the Alternative, Motion for New Trial Regarding Infringement of the '338 Patent filed by SRI International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2008. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 503 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding ISS' Motions for Summary Judgment - re [501] Letter. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Motion Regarding Transcript Corrections by SRI International Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 502 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas L. Halkowski regarding in response to Symantec's letter regarding its effort to reargue a summary judgment motion seeking a ruling that patents are obvious - re [500] Letter. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 501 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard L. Horwitz regarding outstanding issues. (Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for New Trial under Rule 59(a) and/or to Alter or Amend the Judgment under Rule 59(e) - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Status Conference held on 4/29/2008. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Internet Security Systems Renewed Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial Pursuant to Rule 59(a)) - filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 500 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding April 29 Status Conference. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Post-Trial Relief - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 499 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 4/14/2008 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter: V. Gunning. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (nfn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy Devlin (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 498 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, Setting Deadlines/Hearings ( Status Conference set for 4/29/2008 04:30 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/18/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2008 04:30 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Two week Jury Trial set for 9/2/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/15/2008. (nfn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Regarding Schedule for Post-Trial Submissions and Proposed Order by SRI International Inc., Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 4/14/2008. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nfn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 549 Notice (Other) SRI International Inc.'s Proffer of Evidence in Support of Commercial Success by SRI International Inc.. (Halkowski, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 497 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding Update Court Regarding Reexamination of SRI's Patents-in-Suit. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 560 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT in favor of SRI International Inc. against Internet Security Systems Inc., Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation except for the claim of infringement by ISS under the '338 patent where judgment was entered in favor of defendants (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/29/2008. (nmf) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SO ORDERED, re [496] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott T. Weingaertner, Charles A. Pannell, III, and Adam M. Conrad of King & Spalding LLP filed by Internet Security Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/8/2008. (nfn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/22/2008. (nmf) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/11/08 at 8:30 AM is cancelled and reset for 4/14/2008 08:30 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (fmt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 496 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott T. Weingaertner, Charles A. Pannell, III, and Adam M. Conrad of King & Spalding LLP - filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 495 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bradley A. Slutsky, Theresa Moehlman, Bhavana Joneja, and Ryan Stempneiwicz of King & Spalding LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: attorneys are either no longer at firm or no longer working on the case. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 494 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re SRI International Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Thomas Lee Halkowski. Attorney Timothy Devlin terminated. (Halkowski, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 493 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - defendants' motion for attorney fees and costs (D.I. [474]) is denied. The court shall conduct a telephonic status conference on 4/11/08 8:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/31/08. (fmt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/11/2008 08:30 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (fmt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 492 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT of USCA as to [475] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by SRI International Inc., [490] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by SRI International Inc. USCA Decision: Affirmed-In-Part, Vacated and Remanded-In-Part. (nfn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 491 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION of USCA as to [475] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by SRI International Inc., [490] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by SRI International Inc. (nfn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notification regarding [490] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gunning (els)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re [490] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (els)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 490 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007, Terminated: 3/17/2008 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of [471] Memorandum Opinion, [472] Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Preclude, [473] Judgment, [489] Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Appeal filed by SRI International Inc.. (Compton, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 489 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [486] Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/16/07. (rld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 488 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Chief Judge Sue L. Robinson from Kyle Wagner Compton regarding Motion for Rule 54(b) certification - re [486] Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Certification. (Compton, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Note to Counsel: Chief Judge Robinson has revised the language in paragraph (f)(1) of the patent scheduling order regarding motions to compel and motions for protective order. Please review this information by downloading the pdf for Scheduling Order-Patent on Her Honors website under Forms. (rld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 487 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [484] Reply Brief, [Defendants' Reply In Further Support Of Their Joint Motion For Attorneys' Fees And Expenses] by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 486 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006, Terminated: 1/16/2007 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Certification - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Rule 54(b) Certification)(Compton, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 485 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Chief Judge Sue L. Robinson from John F. Horvath regarding requesting oral argument regarding Defendants' Motion for Fees - re [481] Declaration, [480] Answering Brief in Opposition, [484] Reply Brief, [474] SEALED MOTION for Attorney Fees (Defendants' Joint Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Expenses). (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 484 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [474] SEALED MOTION for Attorney Fees (Defendants' Joint Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) [Defendants' Reply In Further Support Of Their Joint Motion For Attorneys' Fees And Expenses] filed by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 483 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [481] Declaration of John F. Horvath in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B, Part 1# (2) Exhibit B, Part 2# (3) Exhibit C-D# (4) Exhibit E# (5) Exhibit F-K)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 482 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [480] Answering Brief in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 481 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DECLARATION re [480] Answering Brief in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 480 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [474] SEALED MOTION for Attorney Fees (Defendants' Joint Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/15/2006. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 479 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006, Terminated: 3/17/2008 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re [475] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by SRI International Inc. USCA Case Number 2007-1065 (fmt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 478 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by SRI International Inc. before Judge Sue L. Robinson, TRANSCRIPT NOT NEEDED (Transcript is already on file) re Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA, USCA Appeal Fees, Appeal Notification to Reporter Gunning, [475] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) (Horvath, John) Modified on 11/30/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED, re [477] MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion for Fees and Expenses filed by SRI International Inc., Set Briefing Schedule re motion for fees: Answering Brief due 12/5/2006. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/28/06. (rld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 477 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion for Fees and Expenses - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Compton, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notification regarding [475] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gunning (hr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re [475] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (hr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 476 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of [474] SEALED MOTION for Attorney Fees (Defendants' Joint Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-E# (2) Exhibit F-Q)(Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA Appeal Fees received: $ 455, receipt number 145408 re [475] Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by SRI International Inc. (Fed. Circuit TPO issued) (eew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 475 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of [471] Memorandum Opinion, [472] Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Preclude, [473] Judgment. Appeal filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 474 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION for Attorney Fees (Defendants' Joint Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Expenses) - filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation. (Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 473 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT in favor of defts. and against pltf. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/27/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 472 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [270] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, finding as moot [276] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, finding as moot [279] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, finding as moot [282] Motion for Summary Judgment, granting [297] Motion for Summary Judgment, finding as moot [364] Motion to Preclude; Clerk of Court directed to enter jgm. in favor of defts. and agst. pltf. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/17/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 471 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/17/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 470 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [286] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as it relates to non-infringement [291] Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/17/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 469 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/17/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 468 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re disputed claim language in U.S. Patent Nos. 6,484,203; 6,708,212; 6,321,338; and 6,711,615. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/17/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 467 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to Clerk of the Court from Kyle Wagner Compton, Esq. regarding supplemental Amended Exhibits 2, 11 and 17 - re [465] Proposed Pretrial Order,,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Ex. 2# (2) Exhibit Amended Ex 11# (3) Exhibit Amended Ex 17)(Compton, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 466 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Stephen E. Smaha by Internet Security Systems Inc..(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit 26 has been attached to D.I. 465. Exhibit 25 was misnamed as Exhibit 26 when e-filed on 10/6/06. This has been corrected. (fmt, ) Modified on 10/12/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 465 was docketed without Exhibit 7. Exhibit 7 has been added to D.I. 465. (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 465 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (EXHIBITS 2, 11 and 17 HAVE BEEN AMENDED - SEE D.I. 467) Proposed Pretrial Order [Joint] by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 8 - A# (8) Exhibit 8 - B# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit 19# (20) Exhibit 20# (21) Exhibit 21# (22) Exhibit 22# (23) Exhibit 23# (24) Exhibit 24# (25) Exhibit 25# (26) Exhibit 27# (27) Exhibit 28# (28) Exhibit 29)(Compton, Kyle) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2006 (fmt, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2006 (fmt, ). Modified on 10/12/2006 (fmt, ). Modified on 10/16/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 464 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of ISS's Section 282 Notice Letter by Internet Security Systems Inc..(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 463 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Chief Judge Sue L. Robinson from John F. Horvath, Esquire regarding Jury Questionnaire. (Attachments: # (1) Joint Jury Questionnaire)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 462 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Chief Judge Sue L. Robinson from John F. Horvath regarding Symantec's request for licenses from SRI - re [461] Letter. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 461 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding resolution of summary judgment motions - re [460] Letter. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SO ORDERED, re [456] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Farrell filed by SRI International Inc.,, [459] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan Stempniewicz of King & Spalding LLP filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/20/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 460 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding SRI's withdrawal of infringement claim related to the '338 patent - re [455] Letter,. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 459 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006, Terminated: 9/20/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan Stempniewicz of King & Spalding LLP - filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 458 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency Discovery Dispute Resolution between counsel and Chief Judge Robinson dated 9/12/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 457 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding recent development of significance to the case. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 456 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006, Terminated: 9/20/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Farrell - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 455 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Chief Judge Sue L. Robinson from John F. Horvath, Esquire regarding withdrawal of SRI's allegations of infringement of Patent No. 6,321,338 against Symantec's currently accused products - re [287] Opening Brief in Support. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 454 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 8/23/06 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter: V. Gunning. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson : Oral Argument held on 8/23/2006. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 453 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery Dispute Resolution between Chief Judge Robinson and counsel dated August 8-10, 2006. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 452 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Symantec's Disclosure of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses by Symantec Corporation.(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 451 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of SRI International, Inc.'s List of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses by SRI International Inc..(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 450 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of ISS's Disclosure of Rebuttal Fact Witnesses by Internet Security Systems Inc..(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 449 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 8/1/06 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter: V. Gunning. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 448 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Douglas Song on 08/14/06 by SRI International Inc..(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 447 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Enrique Salem on 08/31/06 by SRI International Inc..(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 446 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Noonan on 08/31/06 by SRI International Inc..(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SO ORDERED, re [433] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andy H. Chan filed by Symantec Corporation . Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/1/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 445 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [434] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from John F. Horvath, Esquire regarding PTO consideration of alleged anticipatory prior art by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson : Telephone Conference held on 8/1/2006. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 444 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [441] Declaration, Seventh Declaration of David E. Moore in Support of Defendant ISS's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 443 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [440] Reply Brief, in Support of its Motion to Preclude SRI, Based On SRI's Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/1/2006 11:30 AM before Honorable Sue L. Robinson re discovery dispute. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. Nos. 438 and 439 have been linked as redacted versions of D.I. Nos. 419 and 420. (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 442 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [440] Reply Brief, (Declaration of Ryan J. Stempniewicz in Support of Defendant ISS's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-O)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 441 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DECLARATION re [440] Reply Brief, (Seventh Declaration of David E. Moore in Support of Defendant ISS's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 440 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [364] MOTION to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 439 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of D.I. [420] Declaration of Katherine D. Prescott in Support of SRI's Opposition to ISS' Motion to Preclude SRI, Based on its Conduct inDiscovery, from Disputing the Evidence Establishing that the Live Traffic Paper is A 102(b) Invalidating Reference by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-E# (2) Exhibit F-K Part 1# (3) Exhibit K - Part 2# (4) Exhibit K Part 3# (5) Exhibit K Part 4 - M)(Horvath, John) Modified on 7/25/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 438 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of D.I. [419] SRI International, Inc.'s Opposition to ISS' Motion to Preclude SRI, Based on its Conduct in Discovery, from Disputing the Evidence Establishing that the Live Traffic Paper is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John) Modified on 7/25/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 437 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by SRI International Inc.. Amendment to [314] Redacted Document, Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton in Support of SRI International Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation bty the "Emerald 1997" Publication. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H part 1# (9) Exhibit H part 2# (10) Exhibit H part 3# (11) Exhibit I# (12) Exhibit J# (13) Exhibit K# (14) Exhibit L# (15) Exhibit M)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 436 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Richard K. Herrmann regarding response to SRI's July 20th letter regarding its pending continuation application. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 435 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [371] Motion for Leave to File a CD ROM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/20/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 434 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from John F. Horvath, Esquire regarding PTO consideration of alleged anticipatory prior art. (Horvath, John) Modified on 7/20/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 434 has been marked as a SEALED document (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 433 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006, Terminated: 8/2/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andy H. Chan - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 432 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [385] Reply Brief In Support of Symantec's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 431 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [400] Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sections 102 and 103 by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 430 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [402] Declaration, of Geoffrey M. Godfrey In Support of Defendants' Joint Reply Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 429 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of [403] Declaration of Todd Heberlein by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 378 has been placed under SEAL. D.I. 427 is the redacted version of D.I. 378. (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 427 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [378] Declaration, Declaration of Kyle Compton in Support of SRI's Reply to its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the Emerald 1997 Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 426 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [376] Reply Brief SRI's Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the Emerald 1997 Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 425 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [373] Declaration, Declaration of Kyle Compton in support of SRI's Reply on its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is not a Seciton 102(b) Printed Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D-H)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 424 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [372] Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton in support of SRI's Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Combinations of References by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 423 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [374] Reply Brief SRI's Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of no Anticipation by Combinations of References by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 422 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [377] Reply Brief SRI's Reply in Support of its Motion ofr Partial Summary Judgmnet that the Live Traffic Article is not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 421 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of [370] Reply Brief SRI's Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimomy of Daniel Teal by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 420 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DECLARATION re [419] Answering Brief in Opposition, of Katherine D. Prescott by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 419 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [364] MOTION to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/24/2006. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 418 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [397] Declaration, (Sixth Declaration of David E. Moore in Support of Reply Brief of Defendants ISS and Symantec in Support of Their Joint Motion For Summary Judgment That the Patents-in-Suit Are Invalid For Failure to Disclose the Best Mode) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 417 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [396] Reply Brief, [DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 416 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [399] Declaration, (Fifth Declaration of David E. Moore in Support of Defendant ISS's Reply Brief For Summary Judgment That The Asserted Claims of the SRI Patents-in Suit Are Not Infringed or, In The Alternative, Are Invalid) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 415 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [398] Reply Brief, [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ARE INVALID] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 414 Filed: 7/15/2006, Entered: 7/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [389] Declaration of Paul S. Grewal In Support of Symantec's Non-Infringement Summary Judgment Reply Brief by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 413 Filed: 7/15/2006, Entered: 7/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of [395] Reply Brief In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Dr. George Kesidis, Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 428 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED AMENDED DOCUMENT by SRI International Inc.. Amendment to [373] Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton in Support of SRI International, Inc.'s Reply on its Motion for Partial Sum. Jgm. That the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication. (D.I. 425 is the redacted version of this Declaration)(fmt, ) Modified on 7/18/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 412 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to Clerk of the Court from Kyle Wagner Compton, Esq. regarding Correction - re [373] Declaration,. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTING ENTRY: A 7.1.1 Statement has been attached to D.I. 371 (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 411 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [343] Declaration, of Robert M. Galvin In Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition to SRI International, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 410 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [363] Declaration Redacted Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey In Support of Defendants' Joint Claim Construction Response Brief by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 409 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [362] Claim Construction Answering Brief Redacted Joint Claim Construction Response Brief of Defendants ISS and SYMANTEC by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTING ENTRY: A Proposed Order has been attached to D.I. 371 (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 408 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service of Symantec's [Corrected] Disclosure of Fact Witnesses by Symantec Corporation (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 407 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of [368] Declaration, in Support of Answering Brief to SRI's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment That The Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication (Fourth Declaration of David E. Moore) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C# (2) Exhibit D-M# (3) Exhibit N-W)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 406 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [367] Answering Brief in Opposition, [Answering Brief of Defendants ISS and Symantec to SRI's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 405 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [366] Declaration, in Support of Motion to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference, [365] Opening Brief in Support, (Third Declaration of David E. Moore) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C# (2) Exhibit D-I# (3) Exhibit J-T# (4) Exhibit U# (5) Exhibit V-Y)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 404 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [365] Opening Brief in Support, of Motion to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 394 is now the Notice of Service of the ISS's Witness List; the witness list has been deleted from the docket (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 403 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DECLARATION re [400] Reply Brief Sealed Declaration of L. Todd Heberlein by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - D)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 402 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DECLARATION re [400] Reply Brief Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey In Support of Defendant's Joint Reply Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit QQ-YY)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 401 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [398] Reply Brief, (Second Declaration of Don Hall) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 400 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [297] Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Motion of Defendants ISS and Symantec for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sections 102 and 103 filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 399 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION re [398] Reply Brief, (Fifth Declaration of David E. Moore in Support of Defendant ISS's Reply Brief For Summary Judgment That The Asserted Claims of the SRI Patents-in Suit Are Not Infringed or, In The Alternative, Are Invalid) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 398 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [291] MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 397 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION re [396] Reply Brief, (Sixth Declaration of David E. Moore in Support of Reply Brief of Defendants ISS and Symantec in Support of Their Joint Motion For Summary Judgment That the Patents-in-Suit Are Invalid For Failure to Disclose the Best Mode) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 396 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [282] Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] filed by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 395 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [289] MOTION in Limine Defendants' Joint Motion To Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Dr. George Kesidis, Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by Symantec Corporation. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 394 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Service of Witness List by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2006 (fmt, ). Modified on 7/11/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 393 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Preliminary List of Fact Witnesses by SRI International Inc..(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 392 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of [348] Declaration of Dr. George Kesidis by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F# (2) Exhibit G - Pt 1# (3) Exhibit G - Pt 2# (4) Exhibit H-J)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 391 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [339] Answering Brief in Opposition,, [341] Declaration,, [337] Answering Brief in Opposition, Decl of Phillip A. Porras by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 390 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [338] Declaration, of Kyle Wagner Compton iso Response to Defendants' MSJ that SRI Patents are Invalid for Failure to Disclose Best Mode by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B - Pt 1# (3) Exhibit B - Pt 2# (4) Exhibit B - Pt 3# (5) Exhibit C-H# (6) Errata I-J# (7) Exhibit K-M)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 389 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION re [385] Reply Brief Declaration of Paul S. Grewal in Support of Symantec's Non-Infringement Summary Judgment Reply Brief by Symantec Corporation. Exhibit C is on CD ROM(Matterer, Mary) Modified on 7/20/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 388 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [337] Answering Brief in Opposition, to Defendants' Joint MSJ that SRI Patents Are Invalid for Failure to Disclose Best Mode by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 387 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [340] Declaration, of Kyle Wagner Compton iso Answering Brief in Oppositon to Defendants MSJ of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 USC Secs. 102 and 103 by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-E# (2) Exhibit F# (3) Exhibit G-I)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 386 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [339] Answering Brief in Opposition, to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 USC ?102 and 103 by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 385 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [286] MOTION for Summary Judgment Symantec's Motion for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement filed by Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 384 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of [334] Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton iso Response to Symantec's Summary Judgment Motion of Non-Infringement by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-M# (2) Exhibit N-X)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 383 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [333] Answering Brief in Opposition to Symantec's MSJ of Non-Infringement by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 382 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [345] Declaration, of Kyle Wagner Compton iso SRI Response to Defendants' Motion to Limit Testimony of Expert Dr. George Kesidis Under FRE by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 381 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [336] Declaration, of Kyle Wagner Compton iso Response to ISS's MSJ That the Asserted Claims of the SRI Patents-in-Suit Are Not Infringed or, in the Alternative, Are Invalid by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-M# (2) Exhibit N - Pt 1# (3) Exhibit N - Pt 2# (4) Exhibit N - Pt 3# (5) Exhibit N - Pt 4# (6) Exhibit O-U)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 380 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [335] Answering Brief in Opposition, re Defendant ISS's Motion for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims of the SRI Patents-In-Suit Are Not Infringed or, in the Alternative, are Invalid by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 379 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [347] Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton iso Reply Claim Construction Brief by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B-C# (3) Exhibit D# (4) Exhibit E# (5) Exhibit F - Pt 1# (6) Exhibit F - Pt 2# (7) Exhibit G-K)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 378 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DECLARATION re [376] Reply Brief Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton in Support of SRI's Reply to its Motion for Partial Summary Judgmne of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2006 (fmt, ). Modified on 7/18/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 377 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [270] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 376 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [276] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 375 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Service of Symantec Corporation's Disclosure of Fact Witnesses by Symantec Corporation (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 374 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [279] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Combinations of References filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 373 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (THIS HAS BEEN AMENDED. SEE D.I. 428) SEALED DECLARATION re Reply Brief D.I. [377] re [270] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John) Modified on 7/10/2006 (fmt, ). Modified on 7/18/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 372 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION re Reply Brief [374] re [279] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Combinations of References by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John) Modified on 7/10/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 371 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006, Terminated: 7/20/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File CD ROM - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2006 (fmt, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 370 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY BRIEF re [273] SEALED MOTION to Strike SRI's Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimony of Daniel Teal filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John) Modified on 7/10/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 370 has been marked as SEALED; D.I. 372 has been linked to D.I. 374; D.I. 373 has been linked to D.I. 377 (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 344 has been linked to D.I. 289; D.I. 345 has been marked as a SEALED document and has been linked to D.I. Nos. 289 and 344 (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 369 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [358] Declaration, of Robert M. Galvin In Support of Defendants' Opposition to SRI's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Of No Anticipation by Combination of References by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2# (2) Part 3)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 368 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DECLARATION re [367] Answering Brief in Opposition, to SRI's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment That The Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication (Fourth Declaration of David E. Moore) by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 367 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [270] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication filed by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 366 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION re [364] MOTION to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference, [365] Opening Brief in Support, (Third Declaration of David E. Moore) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 365 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re [364] MOTION to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference filed by Internet Security Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/17/2006. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 364 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion to Preclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Preclude SRI, Based On Its Conduct in Discovery, From Disputing the Evidence Establishing That The Live Traffic Paper Is a 102(b) Invalidating Reference - filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 363 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DECLARATION re [362] Claim Construction Answering Brief signed by Geoffrey M. Godrey by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 362 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re [265] Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 361 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [357] Answering Brief in Opposition, signed by Stuart Staniford by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 360 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [357] Answering Brief in Opposition, signed by Deborah A. Frincke by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 359 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [357] Answering Brief in Opposition, signed by L. Todd Heberlein by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A part 1# (2) Exhibit A part 2# (3) Exhibit B)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 358 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION re [357] Answering Brief in Opposition, to SRI's Motion for Partial SJ of No Anticipation by Combination of References signed by Robert M. Galvin by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 357 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [279] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Combinations of References filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 356 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of Exhibits N - Y to DI 327 (redacted version of D.I. [281] by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23))(Horvath, John) Modified on 7/10/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 355 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [351] Answering Brief in Opposition to SRI's Motion to Exclude From Evidence the Expert Opinion of Daniel Teal (Volume 4 of 4) by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit R part 1# (2) Exhibit R part 2# (3) Exhibit R part 3# (4) Exhibit R part 4# (5) Exhibits S-T# (6) Exhibit U)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 354 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [351] Answering Brief in Opposition to SRI's Motion to Exclude From Evidence the Expert Opinion of Daniel Teal (Volume 3 of 4) by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit P part 1# (2) Exhibit P part 2# (3) Exhibit P part 3# (4) Exhibit Q part 1# (5) Exhibit Q part 2# (6) Exhibit Q part 3)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 353 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [351] Answering Brief in Opposition to SRI's Motion to Exclude From Evidence the Expert Opinion of Daniel Teal (Volume 2 of 4) by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit L part 1# (2) Exhibit L part 2# (3) Exhibit M part 1# (4) Exhibit M part 2# (5) Exhibit M part 3# (6) Exhibit M part 4# (7) Exhibit N# (8) Exhibit O part 1# (9) Exhibit O part 2)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 352 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [351] Answering Brief in Opposition to SRI's Motion to Exclude From Evidence the Expert Opinion of Daniel Teal (Volume 1 of 4) by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibits B-G# (3) Exhibit H# (4) Exhibits I-K)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 351 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [273] SEALED MOTION to Strike SRI's Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimony of Daniel Teal filed by Symantec Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 350 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [301] Declaration, by Symantec Corporation. Filed in paper format in the Clerk's office. Volume 2 of 2(fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 349 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [301] Declaration, by Symantec Corporation. Filed in paper format in the Clerk's office Volume 1 of 2 (fmt, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 348 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DECLARATION re [339] Answering Brief in Opposition,, [344] Answering Brief in Opposition,, [333] Answering Brief in Opposition, [335] Answering Brief in Opposition, of Dr. George Kesidis by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 347 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DECLARATION re [346] Claim Construction Answering Brief of Kyle Wagner Compton by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 346 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 345 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DECLARATION in Support of Opposition D.I. [344] to Defendants Joing Motion to Limit the Testimony of Expert Dr. George Kesidis Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 D.I. [289] by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John) Modified on 7/10/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 344 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition to D.I. [289]Defendants' Joint Motion to Limit the Testimony of Expert, Dr. George Kesidis, Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Horvath, John) Modified on 7/10/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 343 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DECLARATION re [342] Answering Brief in Opposition, to SRI's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 342 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [276] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication filed by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 341 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION re [339] Answering Brief in Opposition,, [337] Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Phillip A. Porras in support of SRI's Responses to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment that SRI's Patents are Invalid for Failure to Disclose Best Mode and Defendant's Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 USC Sections 102 and 103 by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 340 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DECLARATION re [339] Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton in support of SRI's Response to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 USC Sections 102 and 103 by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 339 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [297] Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Motion of Defendants ISS and Symantec for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sections 102 and 103 filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 338 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DECLARATION re [337] Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton in support of SRI's Response to Defendant's Joint Motion for Summary Judgment that SRI';s Patnets are Invalid for Failure to Disclose Best Mode by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 337 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [282] Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 336 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION re [335] Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration fo Kyle Wagner Crompton in Support of SRI's Respoinse to Defendnat ISS's Motion for Summary Judgmnet that the Asserted Claims of the SRI Patents in Suit are not Infringed, or, in the Alternative, are Invalid by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 335 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [291] MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 334 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION re [333] Answering Brief in Opposition Declaration of Kyle Wagner Crompton in support of SRI's Response to Symantec's Summary Judgment Motion of Non-Infringement by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 333 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [286] MOTION for Summary Judgment Symantec's Motion for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement filed by SRI International Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/10/2006. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 332 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [258] Letter To The Honorable Sue L. Robinson As Follow-Up To May 31st Evidentiary Hearing by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B# (2) Exhibit C-D# (3) Exhibit E-H)(Herrmann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 331 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [279] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Combinations of References by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 330 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of [276] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 329 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of [273] SEALED MOTION to Strike SRI's Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimony of Daniel Teal by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 328 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [270] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 327 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [281] Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton in Support of SRI's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Combinations of References by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B - pt 1# (3) Exhibit B - pt 2# (4) Exhibit B - pt 3# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Exhibit E# (8) Exhibit F# (9) Exhibit G# (10) Exhibit H# (11) Exhibit I - pt 1# (12) Exhibit I - pt 2# (13) Exhibit J# (14) Exhibit K# (15) Exhibit L# (16) Exhibit M - pt 1# (17) Exhibit M - pt 2# (18) Exhibit M - pt 3)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 326 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [280] Opening Brief in Support, of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Combinations of References by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTING ENTRY: The redacted version of D.I. 280 was docketed twice in error; the duplicate entry filed on 6/28/06 has been deleted from the docket (fmt, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 325 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in paper format: Redacted Version of Declaration of Renee Dubord Brown in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity. Original document(s) on file in Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Mary Matterer on behalf of Symantec Corporation (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 324 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [292] Declaration, Redacted Declaration of Robert M. Galvin In Support of the Joint Motion to Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Dr. George Kesidis, Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 323 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of [288] Declaration, Sealed Declaration of Paul S. Grewal In Support of Symantec Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - B (part 1)# (2) Exhibit Exhibits B (part 2) - Exhibit C# (3) Exhibit Exhibits D - S)(Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 322 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of [272] Declaration, of Kyle Wagner Compton in Support of SRI International, Inc.'s Opening Brief in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 321 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [271] Opening Brief in Support, of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 320 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [287] Opening Brief in Support of Symantec's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 319 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [299] Opening Brief in Support,, Of Joint Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C Sections 102 and 103 Of Defendants ISS and Symantec by Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 318 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [266] Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton iso Claim Construction Opening Brief by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Errata P# (17) Errata Q# (18) Exhibit R# (19) Exhibit S# (20) Exhibit T# (21) Exhibit U# (22) Exhibit V)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 317 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [265] Claim Construction Opening Brief by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 316 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [275] Declaration, of Kyle Wagner Compton iso SRI's Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimony of Daniel Teal by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-E# (2) Exhibit F-J)(Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 315 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [274] Opening Brief in Support, of SRI's Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimony of Daniel Teal by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 314 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (THIS REDACTED VERSION HAS BEEN CORRECTED - SEE D.I. 437) REDACTED VERSION of [278] Declaration of Kyle Wagner Compton in Support of Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the Emerald 97 by SRI International Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H - part 1# (9) Exhibit H - part 2# (10) Exhibit H - part 3# (11) Exhibit H - part 4# (12) Exhibit I - part 1# (13) Exhibit I - part 2# (14) Exhibit J)(Horvath, John) Modified on 7/24/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 313 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of [277] Opening Brief in Support, of SRI Motion for Partial SJ of No Anticipation by Emerald 97 by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf attached to D.I. 308 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request on June 23, 2006 (David Moore). (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 312 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [285] Declaration, [DECLARATION OF L. TODD HEBERLEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] (JOINT) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-I)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 311 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [284] Declaration, [SECOND DECLARATION OF DAVID E. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] (JOINT) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B# (2) Exhibit C-D# (3) Exhibit E-T# (4) Exhibit U-V)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 310 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [283] Opening Brief in Support, [DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] (JOINT) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 309 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [293] Declaration, [DECLARATION OF DAVID E. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ARE INVALID] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B# (2) Exhibit C-D# (3) Exhibit E-J)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 308 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of [300] Opening Brief in Support, [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ARE INVALID] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2006 (rld, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 307 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of [296] Declaration, [DECLARATION OF PAUL GRISWOLD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ARE INVALID] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 306 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of [294] Declaration, [DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS SONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ARE INVALID] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 305 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of [295] Declaration, [DECLARATION OF PAUL PALMER, JR. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ARE INVALID] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 304 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re inadvertent disclosure of the document bearing Bates stamp SYMP0086070-76; pltf. shall return or destroy the copies of said document in its possession; pltf.'s request to add claims 74 and 78 of the '615 patent is denied; see order for further details . Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/21/06. (rld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 303 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of [268] Declaration of David E. Moore in Support of Joint Opening Claim Construction Brief of Defendants ISS and Symantec by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B# (2) Exhibit C-D# (3) Exhibit E (part 1)# (4) Exhibit E (part 2)# (5) Exhibit F-K# (6) Exhibit L-O)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 302 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of [267] Claim Construction Opening Brief by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 301 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DECLARATION re [299] Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Renee Dubord Brown In Support of Defendant's Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 300 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re [291] MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] filed by Internet Security Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 299 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re [297] Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Motion of Defendants ISS and Symantec for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sections 102 and 103 filed by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Matterer, Mary) Modified on 6/19/2006 (fmt, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2006 (fmt, ). Modified on 6/22/2006 (fmt, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2006 (fmt, ). Modified on 6/22/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 298 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [291] MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] [DECLARATION OF DON HALL IN SUPPORT] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C Part 1# (4) Exhibit C Part 2# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E Part 1# (7) Exhibit E Part 2# (8) Exhibit F Part 1# (9) Exhibit F Part 2# (10) Exhibit G# (11) Exhibit H# (12) Exhibit I# (13) Exhibit J# (14) Exhibit K# (15) Exhibit L# (16) Exhibit M# (17) Exhibit N# (18) Exhibit O)(Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 297 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Joint Motion of Defendants ISS and Symantec for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Sections 102 and 103 - filed by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 296 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION re [291] MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] [DECLARATION OF PAUL GRISWOLD IN SUPPORT] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 295 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DECLARATION re [291] MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] [DECLARATION OF PAUL PALMER, JR. IN SUPPORT] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 294 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION re [291] MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] [DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS SONG IN SUPPORT] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 293 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION re [291] MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] [DECLARATION OF DAVID E. MOORE IN SUPPORT] by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 292 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DECLARATION re [289] MOTION in Limine Defendants' Joint Motion To Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Dr. George Kesidis, Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702, [290] Opening Brief in Support, by Internet Security Systems, Inc., Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 291 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANT ISS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE SRI PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INFRINGED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVRE, ARE INVALID] - filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 290 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re [289] MOTION in Limine Defendants' Joint Motion To Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Dr. George Kesidis, Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 Brief Of Defendants Symantec and ISS In Support of Joint Motion To Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Dr. George Kesidis, Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 289 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 10/18/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine Defendants' Joint Motion To Limit Testimony of SRI's Expert, Dr. George Kesidis, Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 - filed by Symantec Corporation, Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 288 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION re [287] Opening Brief in Support, [286] MOTION for Summary Judgment Symantec's Motion for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement Sealed Declaration of Paul S. Grewal In Support of Symantec Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 287 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re [286] MOTION for Summary Judgment Symantec's Motion for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement filed by Symantec Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 286 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Symantec's Motion for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement - filed by Symantec Corporation. (Matterer, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 285 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION re [282] Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] [DECLARATION OF L. TODD HEBERLEIN IN SUPPORT] (JOINT) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 284 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DECLARATION re [282] Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] [SECOND DECLARATION OF DAVID E. MOORE IN SUPPORT] (JOINT) by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 283 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re [282] Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] (JOINT) filed by Internet Security Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 282 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment [DEFENDANTS' ISS AND SYMANTEC'S JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE INVALID FOR FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE] - filed by Internet Security Systems Inc.. (Moore, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 281 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DECLARATION of Kyle Wagner Compton in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation oby Combinations of References D.I. [279] by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John) Modified on 6/16/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 280 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Anticipation by Combinations of References D.I. [279] filed by SRI International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Horvath, John) Modified on 6/16/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 279 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by Combinations of References - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 278 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION re [276] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication of Kyle Wagner Compton by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 277 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication D.I. [276] filed by SRI International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Horvath, John) Modified on 6/16/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 276 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation by the "Emerald 1997" Publication - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 275 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DECLARATION re [274] Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Kyle Wagner Crompton in support of SRI's Opening Brief in Support of its Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimony of Daniel Teal by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 274 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re [273] SEALED MOTION to Strike SRI's Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimony of Daniel Teal filed by SRI International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 273 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 10/18/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION to Strike SRI's Motion to Exclude from Evidence the Testimony of Daniel Teal - filed by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 272 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION of Kyle Wagner Compton in Suport of SRI International, Inc.s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication D.I. [270] by SRI International Inc.. (Horvath, John) Modified on 6/16/2006 (fmt, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 271 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED OPENING BRIEF in Support re [270] SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that the Live Traffic Article is Not a Section 102(b) Printed Publication filed by SRI International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2006. (Horvath, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 253 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?