Castrovillo v. U S Postal Service
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00628-SLR
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eugene F. Castrovillo, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Virginia Gibson +1 302 573 6277
Office Wilmington
Filed 11/9/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause Section 12 U.S.C. § 3410 Right to Financial Privacy Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Sussex
Terminated 3/26/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Terminated Case
Case closed (lf)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 So Ordered
    So Ordered granting [4-1] motion to Dismiss, mooting [1-1] motion for Order Pursuant to Customer Challenge Provisions of the Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978 ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (lf)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/28/1998 Terminated:
      MOTION by U S Postal Service with Proposed Order to Dismiss (lf)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998 Court Filing
        CASE assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson . Notice to all parties. (ntl)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998 Remark
          Sworn Statement of Movant (dab)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998 Terminated:
            MOTION by Eugene F. Castrovillo Jr. for Order Pursuant to Customer Challenge Provisions of the Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978 (dab)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998 Remark
              No summons issued. (dab)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 115 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?