Castrovillo v. US Postal Service
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-00014-SLR
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eugene F. Castrovillo, Jr., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Schmittinger & Rodriguez, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Emory Chambers +1 302 674 0140 +1 302 674 1830 schambers@schmittrod.com
v.
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Respondent
Office Wilmington
Filed 1/15/1999
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause Section 12 U.S.C. § 3410 Right to Financial Privacy Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Sussex
Terminated 9/27/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CA98-628 SLR[USDC/DE]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Terminated Case
Case closed (lf)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 So Ordered
    So Ordered granting [5-1] motion to enforce administrative subpoena ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (lf)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999
      CLERK'S NOTE: Record from 99-15 (lf)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Set/Clear Flags
        Consolidated Lead Case; 99-14 and 99-15 consolidated per granting of DI 4 (lf)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 So Ordered
          So Ordered granting [4-1] motion to Consolidate Cases 99-14 and 99-15 ( signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson ) Notice to all parties. (lf)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of attorney appearance for Eugene F. Castrovillo Jr. by Scott E. Chambers (lf)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Letter
              Letter dated 5/5/99 from Kim Vaske to court; Re: filing notice of entry of appearance (lf)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 Opening Brief in Support
                Opening Brief Filed by US Postal Service [5-1] motion to enforce administrative subpoena - Answer Brief due 4/27/99 (lf)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 Terminated:
                  MOTION by US Postal Service with Proposed Order to enforce administrative subpoena Answer Brief due 4/27/99 re: [5-1] motion (lf)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 Terminated:
                    MOTION by US Postal Service with Proposed Order to Consolidate Cases 99-14 and 99-15 Answer Brief due 4/27/99 re: [4-1] motion (lf)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Court Filing
                      CASE assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson . Notice to all parties. (rjb)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999
                        Sworn State of Movant (dab)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999, Terminated: 9/27/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION by Eugene F. Castrovillo Jr. for Order Pursuant to Customer Challenge Provisions of the Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978 Fee paid $150.00 Receipt No. 124294 (dab)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999
                            No Summons issued. (dab)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 201 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?