USA v. Yao
Criminal Case Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:06-cr-00027-GMS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2017 at 10:21 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Edward McCann +1 302 652 5070 +1 302 652 0607 dmccann@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon Thee Hanson +1 302 573 6277 +1 302 573 6200 shannon.hanson@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Wilmington
Filed 3/28/2006
County New Castle
Terminated 3/25/2008
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 & 2 - FALSE STATEMENT ON LOAN APPLICATIONS - ( COUNTS I THRU VI, VII AND IX - 1990'S - 2002 )
Count 10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 - WIRE FRAUD - ( COUNT X - 8/14/2000 )
Count 11-12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-5800.F
Offense Level 4
181957 - MONEY LAUNDERING - ( COUNTS XI AND XII - 5/28/2002 - 6/26/2002 )
Count 13-14
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 152.F
Offense Level 4
18152 - BANKRUPTCY FRAUD - ( COUNTS XIII AND IVX - 6/5/2002 - 8/28/2002)
Count 3-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 & 2 - FALSE STATEMENT ON LOAN APPLICATIONS - ( COUNTS I THRU VI, VII AND IX - 1990'S - 2002 )
Count 7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 - MAIL FRAUD - ( COUNT VII - 5/15/2001 - 6/13/2001 )
Count 8-9
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 & 2 - FALSE STATEMENT ON LOAN APPLICATIONS - ( COUNTS I THRU VI, VII AND IX - 1990'S - 2002 )
Def Custody Status Released
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 78 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/6/2007 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
    LREF
    Blank 77 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/2/2007 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
      LREF
      Legal Document 76 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [72] Motion for Continued Release Pending Appeal as to Andrew N. Yao (1). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/16/08. (mmm)
        LREF
        Blank 75 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Court Filing
        STENO NOTES of Sentencing held on 3/17/2008 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Notes on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
          LREF
          Legal Document 74 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
          BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Andrew N. Yao re [72] MOTION Continued Release Pending Appeal (Hanson, Shannon)
            LREF
            Legal Document 73 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Transcript Request - AppealCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Andrew N. Yao for proceedings held on March 2, 2007, and March 6, 2007, before Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet. (mmm)
              LREF
              Legal Document 72 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008, Terminated: 4/16/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION Continued Release Pending Appeal by Andrew N. Yao. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit "A", # (2) Exhibit Exhibit "B", # (3) Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Cedrone, Mark)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                USCA Appeal Fees received: $ 455, receipt number 151388 as to Andrew N. Yao re [71] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (els)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008
                  Copy of [71] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment mailed to: Brian McMonagle (els)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL of [69] Judgment,. Appeal filed by Andrew N. Yao. (Cedrone, Mark)
                      LREF
                      Blank 70 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/17/2008 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
                        JUDGMENT as to Andrew N. Yao (1), Count(s) 1-2, 10, 11-12, 3-6, 7, 8-9, DISMISSED ON GOVERNMENT MOTION; Count(s) 13-14, COMMITTED TO THE U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS FOR A TERM OF TWELVE (12) MONTHS AND ONE (1) DAY. SUPERVISED RELEASE FOR A TERM OF THREE (3) YEARS. FINE IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,000 AND SPECIAL ASSESSMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $200. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/25/08. (mmm)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Sentencing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Sentencing held on 3/17/2008. SENTENCE OF THE COURT: Andrew N. Yao (1), Count(s) 1-2, 10, 11-12, 3-6, 7, 8-9, DISMISSED ON GOVERNMENT MOTION; Count(s) 13-14, COMMITTED TO THE U.S. BUREAU OF PRISONS FOR A TERM OF TWELVE (12) MONTHS AND ONE (1) DAY. SUPERVISED RELEASE FOR A TERM OF THREE (3) YEARS. FINE IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,000 AND SPECIAL ASSESSMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $200. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (mmm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
                            Letter to Hon. Gregory M. Sleet from USA regarding Response to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Variance - re [66] MOTION for Upward Departure and/or Upward Variance filed by USA, [67] Response to Motion filed by Andrew N. Yao. (Hanson, Shannon)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008
                              RESPONSE to Motion by Andrew N. Yao re [66] MOTION for Upward Departure and/or Upward Variance In Opposition (Cedrone, Mark)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion for Upward Departure
                                MOTION for Upward Departure and/or Upward Variance by USA as to Andrew N. Yao. (Hanson, Shannon)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 65 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Court Filing
                                  AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION as to Andrew N. Yao, ORDER as to Andrew N. Yao re [64] Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/25/2008. (asw)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 64 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Court Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION as to Andrew N. Yao, ORDER to appear for Sentencing as to Andrew N. Yao. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/21/2008. (asw) (asw).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008
                                      Set/Reset Hearings as to Andrew N. Yao: Sentencing set for 3/17/2008 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. (asw)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008
                                        CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf document in D.I. 64, MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER was not attached to the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Counsel may obtain a copy of D.I. 64 from the Court's docket. (asw)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Andrew N. Yao (Cedrone, Mark)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
                                            Letter to Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Shannon T. Hanson regarding Request for Sentencing Date. (Hanson, Shannon)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Andrew N. Yao (Hanson, Shannon)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007
                                                Letter to Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Mark E. Cedrone, Esq. regarding briefing schedule - re [59] Order. (mmm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007
                                                  ORAL ORDER approving the parties' briefing schedule as set out in [60] as to Andrew N. Yao. Briefs due 11/16/07. Issued by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/9/07. (mmm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER as to Andrew N. Yao. Sentencing scheduled for Tuesday, 11/6/07, is CONTINUED. The parties will submit a proposed briefing schedule as therein set forth. The sentencing hearing will be rescheduled at later date in accordance with the court's calendar. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/5/07. (mmm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                      NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING sentencing hearing as to Andrew N. Yao. Sentencing rescheduled to 11/6/2007 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. (mmm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 57 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Letter
                                                        Letter to Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Mark E. Cedrone, Esq. regarding request for continuance of the sentencing hearing. (mmm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [54] Motion to Continue re Andrew N. Yao (1). The motion for a sentencing conference is DENIED. The motion for a continuance of the sentencing hearing is GRANTED. Sentencing is RESCHEDULED to Monday, October 22, 2007, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Gregory M. Sleet, Courtroom 4A, United States Courthouse. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/24/07. (mmm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark E. Cedrone appearing for Andrew N. Yao. (mmm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007, Terminated: 9/24/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                              MOTION to Continue and Request for Setencing Conference by USA as to Andrew N. Yao. (Hanson, Shannon)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 13, 2007 before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (mmm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [51] Motion to Continue re Andrew N. Yao (1). Sentencing RESCHEDULED to Wednesday, September 26, 2007, at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/19/07. (mmm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007, Terminated: 6/19/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                    MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Andrew N. Yao. (Hanson, Shannon)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [49] Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice, Counts 1-12 of the Indictment as to Andrew N. Yao (1). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/15/07. (mmm)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007, Terminated: 5/16/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Counts 1-12 of the Indictment by USA as to Andrew N. Yao. (Hanson, Shannon)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/14/2007 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/12/2007 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Transcript on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/14/2007. (asw)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                                JURY VERDICT (delivered on 3/14/2007) as to Andrew N. Yao (1) Guilty on Counts 1-2. (asw)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                  STENO NOTES of Jury Trial (Day One) held on 3/12/2007 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Notes on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER SCHEDULING SENTENCING as to Andrew N. Yao. Sentencing set for 6/21/2007 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/15/07. (mmm)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007
                                                                                      Final Jury Instructions read in open court during the Jury Trial on 3/14/2007. (asw)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet :Jury Trial (Day Three) Completed as to Andrew N. Yao held on 3/14/2007. Defendant's case continued. Character witness testimony; Evidence entered. Defendant's case ends. Government rests its case in chief. Final Jury Instructions read in open court. Closing Arguments. Jury Deliberations. JURY VERDICT: FINDING THE DEFENDANT, ANDREW YAO, GUILTY AS TO COUNT I - BANKRUPTCY FRAUD (in connection with false oath - A. Karlsen) and AS TO COUNT II - BANKRUPTCY FRAUD (in connection with false oath - Gambling). (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet :Jury Trial (Day Two) as to Andrew N. Yao held on 3/13/2007. Government's case continued. Witness testimony; Evidence entered. Government's case ends. Defendant's case begins. Witness testimony; Evidence entered. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                            STENO NOTES of Pretrial Conference held on 3/7/2007 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Notes on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                              STENO NOTES of Teleconference held on 3/2/2007 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Notes on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                                Voir Dire Questions read in open court during the Jury Trial (Day One) on 3/12/2007. (asw)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                                  Preliminary Jury Instructions read in open court during the Jury Trial (Day One) on 3/12/2007. (asw)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet :Voir Dire begun on 3/12/2007 as to Andrew N. Yao (1) on Count 1-6,7,8-9,10,11-12,13-14. Jury Selection; Preliminary Jury Instructions Read. Opening Statements. Government's case begins. Witness testimony; Evidence entered. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet :Pretrial Conference as to Andrew N. Yao held on 3/6/2007. Discussion on the defendant's 404(b) motion. Discussion on proposed preliminary jury instructions, voir dire, exhibits, juror notebooks, verdict sheet and courtroom procedures. Counsel shall continue to discuss any revisions and/or edits to the pretrial documents. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: The pretrial conference is rescheduled to Tuesday, March 6, 2007, at 4:30 p.m., in Courtroom 4A, before the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. (mmm)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007
                                                                                                          BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Andrew N. Yao re [35] MOTION in Limine to Bar Certain Evidence (Hanson, Shannon)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            MOTION to Bar the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence Relating to Prior Bad Acts by Andrew N. Yao. (mmm)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007
                                                                                                              Letter to Clerk of Court from Brian J. McMonagle, Esq. regarding enclosed Motion to Bar the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence Relating to Prior Bad Acts. (mmm)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007
                                                                                                                Supplemental Joint Request for Special Voir Dire. (mmm)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007
                                                                                                                  Letter to Clerk of Court from Brian J. McMonagle, Esq. regarding enclosed supplemental joint request for special voir dire. (mmm)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Rescheduling Pretrial Conference as to Andrew N. Yao. Pretrial conference rescheduled to Friday, March 2, 2007, at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. (mmm)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007
                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Andrew N. Yao (Hanson, Shannon)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007
                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Andrew N. Yao (Hanson, Shannon)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [27] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Marc Agnifilo and Benjamin Brafman withdrawn from case as to Andrew N. Yao (1). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/24/07. (mmm)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007, Terminated: 1/24/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Benjamin Brafman and Marc Agnifilo to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrew N. Yao. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(mmm)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007
                                                                                                                              Letter to Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Marc Agnifilo, Esq. regarding enclosed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian McMonagle appearing for Andrew N. Yao. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                  Letter to Clerk of the Court from Brian J. McMonagle, Esq. regarding entry of appearance. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER as to Andrew N. Yao: Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2007 at 10:00 AM in Chambers (defense counsel will be permitted to participate by telephone) before Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Jury Trial (3 days) set for 3/12/2007 at 09:00 AM before Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/5/06. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      STENO NOTES of Scheduling Teleconference held on 12/1/2006 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Notes on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet :Scheduling Conference as to Andrew N. Yao held on 12/1/2006 Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2007 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Gregory M. Sleet - (Defendant's counsel may appear by telephone). 3-day Jury Trial set for 3/12/2007 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. The Court shall issue a scheduling order in a timely manner.(Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas Edward McCann appearing for USA. (McCann, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Scheduling as to Andrew N. Yao. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for Friday, December 1, 2006, at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Counsel for the government is directed to arrange the conference call. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER CHANGING TIME OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE as to Andrew N. Yao: The TIME of the Scheduling Conference set for Friday, December 1, 2006, at 10:00 a.m. HAS BEEN CHANGED to 11:15 a.m. before the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Counsel for the government is directed to arrange the conference call. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/14/06. (ctd)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                Remark: A copy of the Notice of Scheduling (D.I. 20) was sent, via U.S. mail, to counsel for the defendant on 11/14/06. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from AUSA Shannon T. Hanson regarding Request for Scheduling/Status Conference - re [17] Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Andrew N. Yao, [18] Certificate of Service filed by Andrew N. Yao, [16] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Leave to File filed by Andrew N. Yao. (Hanson, Shannon)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service by Andrew N. Yao re [17] Memorandum in Support, and[16] MOTION to Dismiss, etc. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Andrew N. Yao re [16]. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-11 of the Indictment; Motion to Dismiss Count 12 of the Indictment, MOTIONS for Miscellaneous Relief, and MOTION for Leave to File Additional Motions by Andrew N. Yao. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(mmm)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Andrew N. Yao (1). Pretrial motions due 10/13/06. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/22/06. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006, Terminated: 9/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions to and including October 13, 2006, and Proposed Order by Andrew N. Yao. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to Andrew N. Yao: Pre-Trial Motions due by 10/13/2006. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Andrew N. Yao (1). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/18/06. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin Brafman appearing for Andrew N. Yao. (mmm)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006, Terminated: 7/18/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Andrew N. Yao. (Dreyer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 7/11/2006 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Rule 12.4 Disclosure Statement by USA as to Andrew N. Yao. (Hanson, Shannon) Modified on 7/11/2006 (mmm).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice as to Andrew N. Yao. Time excluded from 6/1/06 until 7/21/06 . Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/1/06. (eew)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge :Arraignment as to Andrew N. Yao (1) Count 1-14 held; Deft. was present with counsel; Deft. entered a plea of NOT GUILTY to the Indictment; Deft. requested until 7/21/06 to file pretrial motions; Granted. (Tape #06-36.) (eew)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Andrew N. Yao; Appointment of Attorney Thomas Dreyer, Esq., for Andrew N. Yao. . Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/12/06. (kjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to Thomas Dreyer, Esq., from the Clerk of Court regarding CJA Appointment. (kjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [5] Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Andrew N. Yao. (eew)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Andrew N. Yao (1) OWN RECOGNIZANCE (Original SEALED and maintained in the Clerk's office) . Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/4/06. (eew)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge :Initial Appearance as to Andrew N. Yao held on 5/4/2006; Deft. was present without counsel (a CJA Panel member was appointed); Gov't recommended that the Deft. be released on hiw own recognizance; Granted; Deft. released on his OWN RECOGNIZANCE with special conditions. (Tape #06-24.) (eew)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [3] Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Andrew N. Yao. (eew)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Returned Unexecuted in case as to Andrew N. Yao (Original SEALED and maintained in the Clerk's office) (eew)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet, as to Andrew N. Yao. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Hearings as to Andrew N. Yao: Initial Appearance set for 5/4/2006 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Honorable Mary Pat Thynge. (kjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Hearings as to Andrew N. Yao: Initial Appearance set for 4/27/2006 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Honorable Mary Pat Thynge. (kjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of [1] Indictment by USA as to Andrew N. Yao. (kjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Andrew N. Yao (1) count(s) 1-6, 7, 8-9, 10, 11-12, 13-14 with a Notice of Forfeiture. ( Original SEALED - to be maintained in the clerk's office ). (kjk, ) Modified on 3/30/2006 (kjk, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 155 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?