USA v. Richard
Criminal Case Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00024-SLR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Hall +1 302 573 6277 david.l.hall@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Wilmington
Filed 2/11/2008
County New Castle
Terminated 8/6/2008
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) - WILLFULLY FILE A FALSE TAX RETURN - ( COUNT I - 4/15/2005 )
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Jerrold Richard (1), Count(s) 1, 6 MONTHS IMPRISONMENT; 1 YEAR SUPERVISED RELEASE; $100.00 SPECIAL ASSESSMENT; FINE WAIVED. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/6/2008. (rpg)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Sentencing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Sentencing held on 8/1/2008. Defendant appeared with counsel. SENTENCE OF THE COURT: Jerrold Richard (1), Count(s) 1, 6 MONTHS IMPRISONMENT; 1 YEAR SUPERVISED RELEASE; $100.00 SPECIAL ASSESSMENT; FINE WAIVED.. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lid)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Redacted Document
      REDACTED VERSION of [9] Order Setting Conditions of Release by Jerrold Richard (ljj)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jerrold Richard (1) Bail set at Own Recognizance (Original SEALED - maintained in the Clerk's office). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/29/2008. (ljj)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Order Scheduling SentencingCourt Filing
          ORDER SCHEDULING SENTENCING as to Jerrold Richard; Sentencing reset for 8/1/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/18/08. (kjk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Order Scheduling SentencingCourt Filing
            ORDER SCHEDULING SENTENCING as to Jerrold Richard; Sentencing set for 7/31/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (kjk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Plea Agreement
              MEMORANDUM OF PLEA AGREEMENT as to Jerrold Richard. (kjk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Waiver of Indictment
                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jerrold Richard. (kjk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Plea Hearing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Deft. was present with counsel; Deft. filed an executed a Waiver of Indictment; Govt. filed an executed Memorandum of Plea Agreement; Accepted; Deft. sworn and questioned by the court;Plea entered by Jerrold Richard (1) Guilty Count 1. Plea accepted. Sentencing set for 7/31/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) (kjk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER as to Jerrold Richard re [3] GRANTING MOTION to Continue the Change of Plea Hearing filed by USA, ORDER SCHEDULING RULE 11 HEARING as to Jerrold Richard.( Change of Plea Hearing reset for 4/7/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/7/08. (kjk)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 3/7/2008 Motion to Continue
                      MOTION to Continue Change of Plea Hearing by USA as to Jerrold Richard. (Hall, David)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Order Scheduling Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                        ORDER SCHEDULING RULE 11 HEARING as to Jerrold Richard.( Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/25/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.), ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice as to Jerrold Richard. Time excluded from 2/29/08 until 3/25/08. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/29/08. (kjk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008
                          Case assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson, as to Jerrold Richard.Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Information - Felony
                            FELONY INFORMATION as to Jerrold Richard (1) count 1. (kjk)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 123 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?