USA v. Glover
Criminal Case Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00033-GMS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edmond Falgowski +1 302 573 6154 +1 302 573 6220 edmond.falgowski@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Wendell Glover, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene J. Maurer, Jr. +1 302 652 7900 +1 302 652 2173 emaurer1@verizon.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Wilmington
Filed 3/3/2008
County New Castle
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) - FALSE STATEMENT ON A TAX RETURN - ( COUNT I - 4/15/2007 )
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
Letter to Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Edmond Falgowski regarding Government's Response - re [19] Sentencing Memorandum filed by Wendell Glover. (Falgowski, Edmond)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008
    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Wendell Glover (Maurer, Eugene)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008
      ORAL ORDER as to Wendell Glover. The sentencing hearing is RESCHEDULED to Tuesday, September 9, 2008, at 4:30 PM, rather than 2:15 PM, before Judge Gregory M. Sleet in Courtroom 4A. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/30/08. (mmm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER RESCHEDULING SENTENCING as to Wendell Glover. Sentencing RESCHEDULED to 9/9/2008 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/15/08. (mmm)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Court Filing
          Letter to Chief Judge Sleet from Eugene J. Maurer, Jr., Esq. regarding Continuance Request. (Maurer, Eugene)
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Court Filing
            ORDER SCHEDULING SENTENCING as to Wendell Glover. Sentencing set for 7/29/2008 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/16/08. (mmm)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008
              PLEA AGREEMENT as to Wendell Glover. (mmm)
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008
                REDACTED VERSION of [13] Order (Second) Setting Conditions of Release by Wendell Glover. (mmm)
                  LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER (Second) Setting Conditions of Release as to Wendell Glover (1) Personal Recognizance (SEALED). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/16/08. (mmm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008
                    WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Wendell Glover. (mmm)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Waiver of Indictment filed. Initial Appearance started on 4/9/08 was finalized. Plea entered by Wendell Glover (1) Guilty Count 1. Plea accepted. Defendant released on personal recognizance. Sentencing set for 7/29/2008 04:15 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (mmm)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER RESCHEDULING RULE 11 HEARING as to Wendell Glover. Plea Hearing RESCHEDULED to 5/16/2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/22/08. (mmm)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008, Terminated: 4/22/2008 Motion to Continue
                          LETTER MOTION to Continue by Wendell Glover. (Maurer, Eugene) Modified on 4/22/2008 (rbe).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008
                            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Entry of appearance of attorney Edmond Falgowski. Attorney Douglas Edward McCann terminated in case as to Wendell Glover. (Falgowski, Edmond)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Court Filing
                              STENO NOTES of Initial Appearance held on 4/9/2008 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer. (Notes on file in Clerk's Office) (asw)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Court Filing
                                ORDER SCHEDULING RULE 11 HEARING as to Wendell Glover. Plea Hearing set for 4/23/2008 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/15/08. (mmm) Modified on 4/15/2008 (ctd).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                                  CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text has been corrected to indicate that the Plea Hearing is scheduled for Wednesday, April 23, 2008, at 2:30 p.m. and NOT April 15, 2008. (ctd)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                    ORAL ORDER. Having received a letter of conciliation from Joseph Hurley, Esq., the court will withdraw the Order to Show Cause and rescind its verbal order barring Mr. Hurley from practicing before this court. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/11/2008. (asw)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008
                                      REDACTED VERSION of [5] Order Setting Conditions of Release by Wendell Glover (mmm)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Court Filing
                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Wendell Glover (1) Personal Recognizance (SEALED). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/9/08. (mmm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Initial Appearance as to Wendell Glover held on 4/9/2008. Eugene Maurer, Esq., orally entered his appearance on behalf of the defendant. Joseph Hurley, Esq. orally withdrew his appearance on behalf of the defendant. Defendant ordered released on personal recognizance. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (mmm)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Court Filing
                                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Wendell Glover. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/9/2008 at 10:00 AM (immediately following the plea hearing scheduled for 4/9/08 at 9:30 AM) in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/3/08. (mmm)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Court Filing
                                              ORDER RESCHEDULING RULE 11 HEARING as to Wendell Glover. Initial Appearance/Plea Hearing RESCHEDULED to 4/9/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/2/08. (mmm)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Court Filing
                                                ORDER SCHEDULING RULE 11 HEARING as to Wendell Glover. Initial Appearance/Plea Hearing set for 4/1/2008 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/27/08. (mmm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                                                  Case assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet, as to Wendell Glover. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Information - Felony
                                                    FELONY INFORMATION as to Wendell Glover (1) count 1. (kjk)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 240 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?