USA v. Matusiewicz
Criminal Case Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00069-UNA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 10:49 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Burke +1 302 573 6277 +1 302 573 6220 Christopher.J.Burke@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo David Matusiewicz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heriberto Medrano

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009 Heriberto Medrano

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Wilmington
Filed 4/22/2008
County New Castle
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344 - BANK FRAUD (COUNT I - 8/2007)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 - MAKING A FALSE STATEMENT ON A LOAN APPLICATION (COUNT II - 8/15/2007)
Def Custody Status
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Redacted Document
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 81 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Notice of Hearing.
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 79 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 77 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Warrant Returned Executed
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 75 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Redacted Document
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Order of Temporary Detention
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Motion to Detain Pending Trial
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Order Appointing Public Defender
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 70 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Letter
                              LREF
                              Blank 69 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 67 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 66 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 65 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Reply Brief/Memorandum
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 63 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 Order on Motion to Seal
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 Motion to Seal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/28/2011 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Order Setting Response Deadline
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 AEDPA Election Form
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Order (AEDPA)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Transcript
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Sealed Document +
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Letter
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 USCA Mandate
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                              OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Hearing held on 12.10.09 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kevin Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2010. (kjm) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                                                NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re 40 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by David Matusiewicz. USCA Case Number 09-4675. USCA Case Manager: Aina Laws. (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (al, ) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                  JUDGMENT as to David Matusiewicz (1), Count(s) 1s, 4s, IMPRISONMENT: 48 MONTHS ON COUNT I AND 36 MONTHS ON COUNT IV, TO RUN CONCURRENTLY; SUPERVISED RELEASE: 5 YEARS ON COUNT I AND ONE YEAR ON COUNT IV, TO RUN CONCURRENTLY; FINE: WAIVED; RESTITUTION: $9,674; SPECIAL ASSESSMENT: $200; Count(s) 2s, 3s, DISMISSED UPON GOVERNMENT MOTION. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/17/09. (mmm) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III of the First Superseding Indictment as to David Matusiewicz (1). Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/17/09. (mmm) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two and Three of the First Superseding Indictment by USA as to David Matusiewicz. (mmm) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by David Matusiewicz. Filing fee $ 455 TBD. (rpg) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                          [REDACTED] SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to David Matusiewicz (Burke, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to David Matusiewicz (SEALED - Original to be maintained in the Clerk's Office) (mmm) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by David Matusiewicz (SEALED - Original to be maintained in the Clerk's Office) (mmm) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Letter
                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Christopher Burke regarding Sentencing Hearing. (Burke, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING re 31 SEALED MOTION filed by David Matusiewicz (SEALED - Original to be maintained in the Clerk's Office). Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/2/09. (mmm) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SO ORDERED granting 32 Motion to Seal as to David Matusiewicz (1). Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/1/09. (mmm) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to David Matusiewicz re 31 MOTION for Psychiatric Exam. (rpg) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document by USA as to David Matusiewicz. (rpg) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009, Terminated: 12/2/2009 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION for Psychological Evaluation by David Matusiewicz. (rpg) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Order Scheduling SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER SCHEDULING SENTENCING as to David Matusiewicz. Sentencing set for 12/10/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/3/09. (mmm) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to David Matusiewicz (mmm) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Order Scheduling Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER SCHEDULING RULE 11 HEARING as to David Matusiewicz. Change of Plea Hearing set for 9/3/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/28/09. (mmm) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to David Matusiewicz re 15 MOTION For Jenck's Act Material, 23 MOTION Pre-Trial Sentence Investigation Report, 22 MOTION to Produce, 17 MOTION To List Witnesses, 12 MOTION Defendant's 404b Motion, 13 MOTION to Produce Exculpatory, Mitigating and Impeachment Evidence, 14 MOTION Discovery With Incorporated Authorities, 16 MOTION To Discover Criminal Records of Witnesses, 18 MOTION To Reveal Any Deals And/Or Compensation Between Government and Witnesses (Burke, Christopher) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 25 Indictment by USA as to David Matusiewicz (ksr) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Indictment
                                                                                                                      SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT with a Notice of Forfeiture as to David Matusiewicz (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s. (Original SEALED - to be maintained in the Clerk's office). (ksr) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE as to David Matusiewicz: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2009 at 03:15 PM before Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet. (mmm) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                          MOTION Requesting Pre-Trial Sentence Investigation Report by David Matusiewicz. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rpg) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Court Ordered Production of Documents and Accounting by David Matusiewicz. (mmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2009: # 1 Exhibit) (rpg). (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                              Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to David Matusiewicz (mmm) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Additional Pretrial Motions as to David Matusiewicz (1). Additional pretrial motions due 6/26/09. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/26/09. (mmm) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Additional Motions by David Matusiewicz. (mmm) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                    MOTION To Reveal Any Deals And/Or Compensation Between Government and Witnesses by David Matusiewicz. (rpg) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                      MOTION To List Witnesses by David Matusiewicz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rpg) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                        MOTION To Discover Criminal Records of Witnesses by David Matusiewicz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rpg) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          MOTION For Jenck's Act Material by David Matusiewicz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rpg) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                            MOTION Discovery With Incorporated Authorities by David Matusiewicz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rpg) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Produce Exculpatory, Mitigating and Impeachment Evidence by David Matusiewicz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rpg) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                MOTION Pursuant to Rule 404b of Federal Rules of Evidence by David Matusiewicz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rpg) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to David Matusiewicz. ( Original to be maintained in the Clerk's Office ). (rpg) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DETENTION as to David Matusiewicz. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/2009. (rpg) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice as to David Matusiewicz. Time excluded from 4/21/2009 until 5/21/2009, ( Pre-Trial Motions due by 5/21/2009 ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/2009. (rpg) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008, Terminated: 5/1/2008 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION AND ORDER to Unseal Case by USA as to Sealed Defendant. (rpg)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION AND ORDER for Leave to Appear as Retained Counsel re Attorney Heriberto Medrano, Esq., on behalf of David Matusiewicz. (rpg) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008
                                                                                                                                                            SO ORDERED granting [5] Motion to Unseal Case as to Sealed Defendant (1). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/1/2008. (rpg)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Order of Temporary DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to David Matusiewicz, ( Arraignment set for 4/21/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Leonard P. Stark, Detention Hearing set for 4/21/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Leonard P. Stark ). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/9/2009. (rpg) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008
                                                                                                                                                                Case unsealed as to Sealed Defendant. (rpg)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Motion to Detain Pending Trial
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Detain Pending Trial by USA as to David Matusiewicz. (rpg) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION & ORDER for Bench Warrant by USA as to Sealed Defendant. (ljj) (rpg).
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [2] Indictment (Sealed) by USA as to Sealed Defendant (ljj) (rpg).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Original SEALED -to be maintained in the Clerk's office) (ljj)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION & ORDER to Seal Case by USA as to Sealed Defendant. (ljj) (rpg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2008: # (1) Motion to Unseal) (rpg).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 So Ordered
                                                                                                                                                                            SO ORDERED re [4] MOTION for Bench Warrant filed by USA (ljj)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Order on Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                              SO ORDERED granting [1] Motion to Seal Case as to Sealed Defendant (1). Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/22/2008. (ljj)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 277 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?