Nisenfeld, et al v. Roger Williams Univ., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00061-ML
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Marianne C. Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES & JARRETT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN J. JAMES +1 215 751 9865 +1 215 751 0658 jjames@civilrightspa.com
Space ARTHUR B. JARRETT +1 215 751 9865 +1 215 751 0658 ajarrett@jjslawfirm.com
Space MICHAEL C. SCHWARTZ +1 215 751 9865 +5686 568 568 6511 mschwartz@civilrightspa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Noel, Thomas R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Noel +2727 272 272 7400 +6215 621 621 5688 tnoel@lawnoel.com
No Logo Steven Nisenfeld, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES & JARRETT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN J. JAMES +1 215 751 9865 +1 215 751 0658 jjames@civilrightspa.com
Space ARTHUR B. JARRETT +1 215 751 9865 +1 215 751 0658 ajarrett@jjslawfirm.com
Space MICHAEL C. SCHWARTZ +1 215 751 9865 +5686 568 568 6511 mschwartz@civilrightspa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Noel, Thomas R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Noel +2727 272 272 7400 +6215 621 621 5688 tnoel@lawnoel.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Santoro, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Carinha, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Dorothy Doar, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Josh A. Cohen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Mike Treeman, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Richard Stegman, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Roger Williams Board of Trustee, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Roger Williams University, Alumnae Association and Board of Trustees, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Scott Weiner, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Seth Grue, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
No Logo Tony Monefusco, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by ckmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Russell Bengtson +3317 331 331 7272 +3314 331 331 4404 rbengtson@ckmlaw.com
Office Providence
Filed 2/11/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 4/25/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (142) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 109 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi (Barletta, B)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003
    Case closed (Barletta, B)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003
      Motion hearing re: [108-1] motion for Thomas R. Noel to Withdraw as Attorney for the pltfs at 10:00 4/9/03 (Barletta, B)
        LREF
        Blank 108 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003, Terminated: 4/25/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
        MOTION by Thomas R. Noel, associate local counsel for Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown for Thomas R. Noel to Withdraw as Attorney for the pltfs (Duhamel, J)
          LREF
          Blank 107 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [102-1] motion to Set Aside Default - sent to counsel of record ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
            LREF
            Blank 106 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002, Terminated: 4/25/2003 Answer
            ANSWER by Josh A. Cohen (Attorney John R. Mahoney) to pltf's second amended complaint (Duhamel, J)
              LREF
              Blank 105 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Court Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 4/4/03 ; Deadline for filing of dispositive motions and/or Pretrial Memoranda 4/18/03 ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Duhamel, J)
                LREF
                Blank 104 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Court Filing
                Minute entry: Clerk's Minutes filed as to hearing on deft Cohen's M/Vacate Default, held before Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/4/02. (Duhamel, J)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002
                  Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 12/24/02 for Josh A. Cohen (Duhamel, J)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002
                    Motion hearing held re: [102-1] motion to Set Aside Default -- John R. Mahoney, Esq., for deft Josh Cohen; Thomas R. Noel, Esq. & Jonathan J. James, Esq., for pltfs Nisenfeld & Brown; Karen Bettencourt (Court Rptr) -- Atty Mahoney argues his motion and Atty James responds. Court GRANTS the motion. The default will be vacated. Atty Mahoney to prepare Order. (Chambers conference held immediately after this hearing. Atty Mahoney has 20 days within which to file an answer to the complaint as to deft Cohen. Scheduling Order to issue setting closing of discovery on Friday, April 4, 2003; and filing of dispositive motions and/or pretrial memos by Friday April 18, 2003. (Duhamel, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank 103 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002, Terminated: 4/25/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                      OBJECTION, with Memorandum, by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown to [102-1] motion to Set Aside Default (Duhamel, J)
                        LREF
                        Blank 102 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002, Terminated: 12/18/2002 Terminated:
                        MOTION, with Memorandum, and AFFIDAVIT by Josh A. Cohen to Set Aside Default (Duhamel, J) Modified on 10/29/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002
                          Motion hearing re: [101-1] motion for Default Judgment against Josh A. Cohen at 10:00 10/30/02, [101-2] motion for Assessment of Damages Hearing at 10:00 10/30/02 - notice mailed to defendant; faxed to counsel for pltf. (Barletta, B)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                            Motion(s) referred to Judge: [101-1] motion for Default Judgment against Josh A. Cohen, [101-2] motion for Assessment of Damages Hearing (Barletta, B)
                              LREF
                              Blank 101 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002, Terminated: 4/25/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                              MOTION, with Memorandum, by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown for Default Judgment against Josh A. Cohen , and for Assessment of Damages Hearing (Duhamel, J)
                                LREF
                                Blank 100 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002
                                Plaintiffs' Response to 9/12/02 Order (Show Cause) (Duhamel, J)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 99 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002
                                  CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Josh A. Cohen granting [98-1] motion for Entry of Default as to Josh A. Cohen (Duhamel, J)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 98 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Terminated:
                                    MOTION (with attached Affidavit) by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown for Entry of Default as to Josh A. Cohen (Duhamel, J)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 97 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Court Filing
                                      ORDER that case will be dismissed against Josh Cohen within 15 days for lack of prosecution unless good cause can be shown ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 96 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Court Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court hereby accepts the R and R of Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen dated 11/29/01 pursuant to 28 686(b)(1) granting [84-1] motion to Dismiss Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint as to all defendants except Josh Cohen , signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi . (Barletta, B)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002
                                          Motion(s) referred to Judge: Plaintiff's Appeal of Magistrate Decision w/objection forwarded to chambers (Barletta, B)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 93 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001
                                            TRANSCRIPT OF hearing held before USMJ Robert W. Lovegreen for date of 11/7/01 (William Rogers, Court Rptr) (Duhamel, J)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 95 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Terminated:
                                              RESPONSE by Roger Williams Univ., Anthony Santoro, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman, Tony Monefusco, Seth Grue, Scott Weiner, Dorothy Doar, Carinha, Roger Williams Board in opposition to [94-1] Magistrate appeal (Duhamel, J)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 94 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                APPEAL of Magistrate decision (of 11/29/01) to District Court (Duhamel, J)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [91-1] motion to Enlarge Time up to & including 12/21/01 in which to file an objection to Magistrate's Report & Recommendation ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown to Enlarge Time up to & including 12/21/01 in which to file an objection to Magistrate's Report & Recommendation (Duhamel, J)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Response/Reply - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen Recommending the University defendants' motion t dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(6) be granted: [84-1] motion to Dismiss Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint ; Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 12/17/01 (Theall, J)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001
                                                        Minute entry: Defendant Motion to Dismiss (Theall, J)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Josh A. Cohen 8/11/01 Answer due on 8/31/01 for Josh A. Cohen (Duhamel, J)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001
                                                            Motion hearing re: [84-1] motion to Dismiss Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint Motion hearing held before MJ Lovegreen (James, Noel, Bengtson, Tarantino) attys argue; Court takes under advisement; R&R to follow (Theall, J)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001
                                                              Motion hearing re: [84-1] motion to Dismiss Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint at 10:00 11/7/01 before MJ Lovegreen (Theall, J)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001
                                                                Motion(s) referred: [84-1] motion to Dismiss Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Barletta, B)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001, Terminated: 4/25/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                  OBJECTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown to [84-1] motion to Dismiss Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint (Duhamel, J)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001
                                                                    Motion(s) referred to Judge: [84-1] motion to Dismiss Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint (Barletta, B)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 Court Filing
                                                                      Stipulation extending time for pltf's to file objection to Deft's M/Dismiss signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi (Barletta, B)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [83-1] motion to Extend Time by one day (up to & including 8/24/01) in which to respond to Second Amended Complaint ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001, Terminated: 6/17/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION by all defendants except defendant Josh Cohen to Dismiss Pltfs' Second Amended Complaint (Duhamel, J)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001, Terminated: 8/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            MOTION by all defendants except defendant Josh Cohen to Extend Time by one day (up to & including 8/24/01) in which to respond to Second Amended Complaint (Duhamel, J)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown , (Answer due 8/27/01 for Roger Williams Board, for Josh A. Cohen, for Carinha, for Poole, for Dorothy Doar, for Diane Robinson, for Jim Azar, for Scott Weiner, for Happy Almogela, for Jennifer Cope, for Seth Grue, for Tony Monefusco, for Richard Stegman, for Mike Treeman, for Karen Haskell, for Anthony Santoro, for Roger Williams Univ. ) amending [1-1] complaint (Duhamel, J)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [77-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Theall, J)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001
                                                                                  Minute entry: Plaintiff Motion to Amend Complaint (Theall, J)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001
                                                                                    Motion hearing re: [77-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint Motion hearing held before MJ Lovegreen (James, Noel, Wollin, Bengtson) attys argue; court grants motion; order to follow by counsel; deft not named in amended complaint are out of the case for good (Theall, J)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001
                                                                                      Motion hearing re: [77-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint at 10:00 8/1/01 before MJ Lovegreen (Theall, J)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
                                                                                        Motion(s) referred: [77-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Barletta, B)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001, Terminated: 4/25/2003 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                          OBJECTION by Roger Williams Univ., Anthony Santoro, Karen Haskell, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman, Tony Monefusco, Seth Grue, Jennifer Cope, Happy Almogela, Scott Weiner, Jim Azar, Diane Robinson, Dorothy Doar, Poole, Carinha, Josh A. Cohen, Roger Williams Board to [77-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (Duhamel, J)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001
                                                                                            Motion(s) referred to Judge: [77-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (Barletta, B)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Josh A. Cohen 6/21/01 Answer due on 7/11/01 for Josh A. Cohen (Duhamel, J)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001, Terminated: 8/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown to Amend [1-1] complaint (Duhamel, J)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying [74-1] Magistrate appeal and allow plaintiffs to 6/22/01 to file amended complaint( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Roger Williams Univ., Anthony Santoro, Karen Haskell, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman, Tony Monefusco, Seth Grue, Jennifer Cope, Happy Almogela, Scott Weiner, Jim Azar, Diane Robinson, Dorothy Doar, Poole, Carinha, Josh A. Cohen, Roger Williams Board in opposition to [74-1] Pltfs' Appeal of the Magistrate's Denial of the Pltfs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Duhamel, J)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001, Terminated: 6/5/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                      APPEAL of Magistrate decision to District Court (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: 2/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER denying [68-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Theall, J)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001
                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [70-1] motion for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF Hearing before USMJ Lovegreen for date of 04/19/01 (Duhamel, J)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001
                                                                                                              Minute entry: Plaintiff Motion to Amend Complaint before MJ Lovegreen (Wollin, Bengtson, Noel); all parties present; attys argue; motion denied by the court w/o prejudice; order to be filed by counsel (Theall, J)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001
                                                                                                                Motion hearing re: [68-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint Motion hearing held before MJ Lovegreen (Wollin, Bengtson, Noel); all parties present; attys argue; motion denied by the court w/o prejudice; order to be filed by counsel (Theall, J)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Duhamel, J)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001
                                                                                                                    Motion hearing re: [68-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint at 9:30 4/19/01 - before MJ Lovegreen (Theall, J)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001
                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred: [68-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        OBJECTION by Roger Williams Univ., Anthony Santoro, Karen Haskell, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman, Tony Monefusco, Seth Grue, Jennifer Cope, Happy Almogela, Scott Weiner, Jim Azar, Diane Robinson, Dorothy Doar, Poole, Carinha, Josh A. Cohen, Roger Williams Board to [68-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 5/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown to Amend [1-1] complaint (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                            Rule 16 Conference held. Jonathan James, Thomas Noel, John Tarantino and C. Russell Bengtson for the parties. No pre-trial order will enter today. The plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 2/26/01. Another conference shall be scheduled after all parties have filed their answers to the amended complaint. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001
                                                                                                                              Rule 16 Conference set 10:00 2/12/01 Before Judge Mary M. Lisi. Notices mailed to all parties (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Remark
                                                                                                                                Attorney Admission fee received ($50.00; receipt #45838) for attorney Jonathan J. James. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [61-1] motion for Arthur B. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [62-1] motion for Michael C. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/5/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [60-1] motion for Jonathan J. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000
                                                                                                                                        Motion(s) referred: [62-1] motion for Michael C. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [61-1] motion for Arthur B. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [60-1] motion for Jonathan J. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [43-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs are required to be deposed in RI at the offices of Carroll, Kelly & Murphy, the depositions are to commence prior to 7/31/2000 should those depositions not commence prior to 7/31/2000 the defendants may reapply to this Court for further relief ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Roger Williams Univ., Anthony Santoro, Karen Haskell, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman, Tony Monefusco, Seth Grue, Jennifer Cope, Happy Almogela, Scott Weiner, Jim Azar, Diane Robinson, Dorothy Doar, Poole, Carinha, Josh A. Cohen, Roger Williams Board to take deposition of Marianne C. Brown and Steven Nisenfeld. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000, Terminated: 9/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown for Michael C. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000, Terminated: 9/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown for Arthur B. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000, Terminated: 9/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown for Jonathan J. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                    Minute entry: Motion to Dismiss hearing held before Magistrate Lovegreen (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000
                                                                                                                                                      Motion hearing re: [43-1] motion to Dismiss Motion hearing held before J. Lovegreen. Thomas Noel for Ptf. and Russel Bengston and John Tarantino for Defts. Counsel address motion. Defts. request motion be conditionally granted contingent upon depositions of plaintiffs being completed by end of July, 2000. Court states that counsel can select a date and time for depositions to be taken, however, depositions shall commence by July 31, 2000. Recommendation of dismissal will be made if depositions are not commenced by the above date. Deft. will prepare Order to that effect. (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying without prejudice [51-1] motion for Arthur B. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice, denying [50-1] motion for Jonathan J. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice, denying [49-1] motion for Michael C. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 5(c) ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000
                                                                                                                                                          Motion hearing re: [43-1] motion to Dismiss at 10:00 6/27/00 (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Compel production of documents (No objection having been filed, motion granted by Rule of Court) (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories as to the plaintiff Steven Nisenfeld (no objection having been filed, motion granted by Rule of Court) (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [45-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories as to the plaintiff Marianne C. Brown (signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: [51-1] motion for Arthur B. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [50-1] motion for Jonathan J. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [49-1] motion for Michael C. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation: Deft.'s Motion to Compel Interrogatories against Steven Nisenfeld; Deft.'s Motion to Compel Interrogatories against Marianne C. Brown; and Deft.'s Motion to Compel Production are withdrawn. Interrogatories and Request for production shall be deemed to have been served on May 18, 2000, the date counsel entered appearance on behalf of the plaintiffs. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/25/2000
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred: [43-1] motion to Dismiss referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/25/2000
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion(s) no longer referred: [43-1] motion to Dismiss (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Anthony Santoro to take deposition of Timothy F. Fitzgerald, Jr. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                            Motion(s) referred to Judge Lisi: [43-1] motion to Dismiss (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                              ENTRY of appearance for Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown by Thomas R. Noel (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000, Terminated: 6/14/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld for Arthur B. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld for Jonathan J. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Steven Nisenfeld for Michael C. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown to [43-1] motion to Dismiss (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000, Terminated: 6/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Anthony Santoro to Compel production of documents (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000, Terminated: 6/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Anthony Santoro to Compel answers to interrogatories as to the plaintiff Steven Nisenfeld (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000, Terminated: 6/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Anthony Santoro to Compel answers to interrogatories as to the plaintiff Marianne C. Brown (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTRY of appearance for Anthony Santoro, Karen Haskell, Seth Grue, Tony Monefusco, Jennifer Cope, Scott Weiner, Poole, Carinha, Dorothy Doar, Happy Almogela, Jim Azar, Diane Robinson, Roger Williams Univ., Roger Williams Board, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman by John A. Tarantino (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: 5/9/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                Pre-Trial Conference set at 9:30 5/23/00 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000, Terminated: 7/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Roger Williams Univ., Anthony Santoro, Karen Haskell, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman, Tony Monefusco, Seth Grue, Jennifer Cope, Happy Almogela, Scott Weiner, Jim Azar, Diane Robinson, Dorothy Doar, Poole, Carinha, Josh A. Cohen, Roger Williams Board to Dismiss (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Referred to Judge Lovegreen for Rule 16 conference. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE by Anthony Santoro to take deposition of Timothy F. Fitzgerald, Jr. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Anthony Santoro to take deposition of Timothy F. Fitzgerald, Jr. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Dorothy Doar (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson); jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for Dorothy Doar by C. Russell Bengtson (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Seth Grue (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/22/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for Seth Grue by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to Josh A. Cohen 3/14/00 Answer due on 4/3/00 for Roger Williams Board, for Josh A. Cohen, for Carinha, for Poole, for Dorothy Doar, for Diane Robinson, for Jim Azar, for Scott Weiner, for Happy Almogela, for Jennifer Cope, for Seth Grue, for Tony Monefusco, for Richard Stegman, for Mike Treeman, for Karen Haskell, for Anthony Santoro, for Roger Williams Univ. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown to take deposition of Anthony Santoro (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to Anthony Santoro, Karen Haskell, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman, Tony Monefusco, Scott Weiner, Jennifer Cope, Seth Grue, Poole, Carinha, Happy Almogela, Dorothy Doar, Roger Williams Univ., Roger Williams Board, Diane Robinson, Jim Azar 3/11/00 Answer due on 3/31/00 for Roger Williams Board, for Josh A. Cohen, for Carinha, for Poole, for Dorothy Doar, for Diane Robinson, for Jim Azar, for Scott Weiner, for Happy Almogela, for Jennifer Cope, for Seth Grue, for Tony Monefusco, for Richard Stegman, for Mike Treeman, for Karen Haskell, for Anthony Santoro, for Roger Williams Univ. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Steven Nisenfeld, Marianne C. Brown to take deposition of Anthony Santoro and Josh Cohen. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Jim Azar (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for Jim Azar by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Karen Haskell (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for Karen Haskell by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Richard Stegman (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for Richard Stegman by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Happy Almogela (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for Happy Almogela by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Jennifer Cope (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for Jennifer Cope by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Scott Weiner (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for Scott Weiner by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Tony Monefusco (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for Tony Monefusco by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Diane Robinson (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for Diane Robinson by C. Russell Bengtson (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Mike Treeman (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Roger Williams Univ. (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Carinha (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for Carinha by C. Russell Bengtson. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Poole (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson ),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for Poole by C. Russell Bengtson. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Roger Williams Board (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for Roger Williams Board by C. Russell Bengtson. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Anthony Santoro (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for Anthony Santoro by C. Russell Bengtson. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICES (4) by Anthony Santoro to take deposition of Steven Nisenfeld; Marianne C. Brown; RI State Police; and Bristol Police Department (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for Anthony Santoro, Mike Treeman, Poole, Carinha, Roger Williams Board of Trustees by C. Russell Bengtson (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY of appearance for Roger Williams Univ. by C. Russell Bengtson (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to Roger Williams Univ., Anthony Santoro, Karen Haskell, Mike Treeman, Richard Stegman, Tony Monefusco, Seth Grue, Jennifer Cope, Happy Almogela, Scott Weiner, Jim Azar, Diane Robinson, Dorothy Doar, Poole, Carinha, Josh A. Cohen 2/22/00 Answer due on 3/13/00 for Josh A. Cohen, for Carinha, for Poole, for Dorothy Doar, for Diane Robinson, for Jim Azar, for Scott Weiner, for Happy Almogela, for Jennifer Cope, for Seth Grue, for Tony Monefusco, for Richard Stegman, for Mike Treeman, for Karen Haskell, for Anthony Santoro, for Roger Williams Univ. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF RECUSAL ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE reassigned to Judge Mary M. Lisi . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 44070 (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 185 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?