Majkut, et al v. AC&S, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00317-L
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo John Majkut, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
No Logo Nora Majkut, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
v.
No Logo A.P. Green, Inc., Defendant
No Logo American Standard, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler, Cohen, Harvey, Wakeman & Guekguezian LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George E. Wakeman, Jr. +1 617 423 6674 +1 617 423 7152 gew@achwg.com
No Logo C.E. Thurston & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cleaver-brooks Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cleaver-Brooks Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by bgmalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter F. Mathieu +3311 331 331 1434 +3519 351 351 9653
No Logo Flexitallic Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Flexitallic Co."
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark O. Denehy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 mdenehy@apslaw.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric"
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis J. McCarten +4212 421 421 2154 +5217 521 521 7040
No Logo General Refractories, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Angelone +1 401 274 0200 +1 401 274 7538 angelonelaw@aol.com
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
Halliburton Company Halliburton Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gidley, Sarli & Marusak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Marusak +2746 274 274 6644 +3319 331 331 9304 jpm@gsm-law.com
No Logo Hopeman Brothers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Bart Totten +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 btotten@apslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victoria M. Almeida +1 401 274 7200 +1 401 351 4607 valmeida@apslaw.com
Space Mark O. Denehy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 mdenehy@apslaw.com
Space Peter Lawson Kennedy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 pkennedy@apslaw.com
Space James R. Oswald +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 joswald@apslaw.com
Space R. Bart Totten +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 btotten@apslaw.com
No Logo John Crane Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
No Logo Kaiser Aluminum And Chemical Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of America"
Owens-Illinois, Inc. Owens-Illinois, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis J. McCarten +4212 421 421 2154 +5217 521 521 7040

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER J. RUBIN +1 207 774 1200 +1 207 774 1127 prubin@bssn.com
No Logo Porter-hayden Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Porter-Hayden Co."
No Logo Selby Battersby & Co, Defendant
No Logo Turner & Newall Plc, Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
No Logo Isolatek International, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Mineral Products Company"
No Logo United States Gypsum Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "US Gypsum Company"
Viacom, Inc. Viacom, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Blockbuster, Inc.
Officer/Director, New Viacom Corp.
Officer/Director, Redstone Sumner M
CBS Outdoor Americas Inc. Officer/Director, CBS Outdoor Americas Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Weil-mclain, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keegan Werlin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard B. Kirby +1 617 951 1400 +1 617 951 1323 rkirby@keeganwerlin.com
No Logo A.P. Green, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo American Standard, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler, Cohen, Harvey, Wakeman & Guekguezian LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George E. Wakeman, Jr. +1 617 423 6674 +1 617 423 7152 gew@achwg.com
No Logo C.E. Thurston & Sons, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Cleaver-brooks Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Cleaver-Brooks Co."
No Logo Flexitallic Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Flexitallic Co."
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark O. Denehy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 mdenehy@apslaw.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric"
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.
No Logo General Refractories, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Angelone +1 401 274 0200 +1 401 274 7538 angelonelaw@aol.com
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
Halliburton Company Halliburton Company, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gidley, Sarli & Marusak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Marusak +2746 274 274 6644 +3319 331 331 9304 jpm@gsm-law.com
No Logo Hopeman Brothers, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Bart Totten +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 btotten@apslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victoria M. Almeida +1 401 274 7200 +1 401 351 4607 valmeida@apslaw.com
Space Mark O. Denehy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 mdenehy@apslaw.com
Space Peter Lawson Kennedy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 pkennedy@apslaw.com
Space James R. Oswald +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 joswald@apslaw.com
Space R. Bart Totten +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 btotten@apslaw.com
No Logo John Crane Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
No Logo Kaiser Aluminum And Chemical Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Manville Asbestos Disease Compensation Fund, Cross-Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Staci L. Kolb +8318 831 831 8900 +7517 751 751 7542 slk@blishcavlaw.com
Owens-Illinois, Inc. Owens-Illinois, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis J. McCarten +4212 421 421 2154 +5217 521 521 7040

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER J. RUBIN +1 207 774 1200 +1 207 774 1127 prubin@bssn.com
No Logo Porter-hayden Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Porter-Hayden Co."
No Logo Selby Battersby & Co, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Turner & Newall Plc, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
No Logo Isolatek International, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Mineral Products Company"
No Logo United States Gypsum Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "US Gypsum Company"
Viacom, Inc. Viacom, Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officer/Director, Blockbuster, Inc.
Officer/Director, New Viacom Corp.
Officer/Director, Redstone Sumner M
CBS Outdoor Americas Inc. Officer/Director, CBS Outdoor Americas Inc.
No Logo Weil-mclain, Cross-Defendant
No Logo American Standard, Inc., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler, Cohen, Harvey, Wakeman & Guekguezian LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George E. Wakeman, Jr. +1 617 423 6674 +1 617 423 7152 gew@achwg.com
No Logo General Refractories, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Angelone +1 401 274 0200 +1 401 274 7538 angelonelaw@aol.com
Halliburton Company Halliburton Company, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gidley, Sarli & Marusak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Marusak +2746 274 274 6644 +3319 331 331 9304 jpm@gsm-law.com
Owens-Illinois, Inc. Owens-Illinois, Inc., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis J. McCarten +4212 421 421 2154 +5217 521 521 7040

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER J. RUBIN +1 207 774 1200 +1 207 774 1127 prubin@bssn.com
No Logo Manville Asbestos Disease Compensation Fund, Third Party Defendant
Owens-Illinois, Inc. Owens-Illinois, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis J. McCarten +4212 421 421 2154 +5217 521 521 7040

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER J. RUBIN +1 207 774 1200 +1 207 774 1127 prubin@bssn.com
Office Providence
Filed 6/27/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 368 - Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Providence
Terminated 10/31/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MDL, RWL
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006
NOTICE of Appearance by R. Bart Totten on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Hopeman Brothers, Hopeman Brothers, Hopeman Brothers, Hopeman Brothers (Totten, R.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Notice of Appearance/
    Entry of Appearance by Brian D. Gross, Esq. and John B. Manning, Esq. on behalf of Georgia Pacific Corp.(Leyva, Lucia)
      LREF
      Blank 46 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
      ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc. by David H. Stillman, Esq. WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David A. Salvatore, Esq. for John Crane, Inc (Fernandes, D)
        LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 1/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
        ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc. by David A. Salvatore, Esq. AND WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David H. Stillman, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
          LREF
          Blank 43 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Court Filing
          STIPULATION of dismissal as to defendant Lincoln Electric signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (FarrellPletcher, P)
            LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Defendant Lincoln Electric. The Complaint and claims of Plaintiffs against Defendant LINCOLN ELECTRIC, are here by dismissed with prejudice; no cost or interest. (signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner on 11/20/03) (Fernandes, D)
              LREF
              Blank 42 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Court Filing
              ORDER (dismissing defendant CE Thurston & sons - signed by Judge Weiner) (Gilfillan, B)
                LREF
                Blank 41 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Defendant ACandS, Inc. having declared bankruptcy (signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner) (Fernandes, D)
                  LREF
                  Blank 40 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                  ENTRY of appearance for General Electric by Dennis J. McCarten (Jackson, R)
                    LREF
                    Blank 39 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Terminated:
                    MOTION by General Electric for Thomas Holt to Withdraw as Attorney (Jackson, R)
                      LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Court Filing
                      STIPULATION of dismissal of American Standard Inc. signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                        LREF
                        Blank 37 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
                        STIPULATION of dismissal of Defendant American Standard (signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner) (Jackson, R)
                          LREF
                          Blank 36 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002 Court Filing
                          STIPULATION of dismissal of WeilMcLain signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                            LREF
                            Blank 35 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Defendant A.P. Green Industries, Inc. due to Bankruptcy (signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner); cc'd all parties (Jackson, R)
                              LREF
                              Blank 34 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Defendant Porter-Hayden Co. due to Bankruptcy (signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner); cc'd all parties (Jackson, R)
                                LREF
                                Blank 33 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Defendant A.P. Green Services, Inc. Having declared bankruptcy (signed by USDC Judge Charles R. Weiner) (Jackson, R)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 32 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  MDL ORDER of DISMISSAL of Defendant United States Gypsum Co. (signed by Charles R. Weiner, USDC Judge) (Jackson, R)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 31 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
                                    SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Kaiser Aluminum as to John Majkut, Nora Majkut, AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, General Refractories, Georgia Pacific, Halliburton Company, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Lincoln Electric, Metropolitan Life, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain, Owens-Illinois, Inc., AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, General Refractories, Georgia Pacific, Halliburton Company, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Lincoln Electric, Metropolitan Life, Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Manville Asbestos, American Standard, General Refractories, AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, Georgia Pacific, Halliburton Company, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Lincoln Electric, Metropolitan Life, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain, Manville Asbestos, Halliburton Company, AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, General Refractories, Georgia Pacific, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Lincoln Electric, Metropolitan Life, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain, Manville Asbestos, Lincoln Electric, AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, General Refractories, Georgia Pacific, Halliburton Company, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Metropolitan Life, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain, Manville Asbestos (Jackson, R)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Order
                                      CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (signed by USDC Charles R. Weiner) transferring the matter to the Eastern District of PA (Jackson, R)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001
                                        ORDER, TRANSFERRING CASE TO mdl () (McCabe, F)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001
                                          Case closed (McCabe, F)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 28 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001, Terminated: 10/31/2001 Answer
                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Kaiser Aluminum (Attorney Randall L. Souza), (Jackson, R)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Terminated:
                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Cleaver-Brooks Co. (Attorney Peter F. Mathieu),; jury demand (Jackson, R)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 26 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/31/2001 Answer
                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Weil-McLain (Attorney Richard B. Kirby),; jury demand (Saucier, M)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001, Terminated: 10/31/2001 Answer
                                                  ANSWER by Hopeman Brothers to [21-2] cross claim (Saucier, M)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of David A. Reif Re: [23-1] motion for David A. Reif to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Saucier, M)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001, Terminated: 10/31/2001 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                      MOTION by Lincoln Electric for David A. Reif to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Saucier, M)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001, Terminated: 10/31/2001 Answer
                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Viacom, Inc. (Attorney Thomas W. Lyons III),; jury demand (Saucier, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                          ANSWER to complaint and CROSSCLAIM by Lincoln Electric (Attorney Robert J. Quigley Jr.) against AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, General Refractories, Georgia Pacific, Halliburton Company, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Metropolitan Life, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain, Manville Asbestos and ANSWERS TO CROSSCLAIMS of Defendants by Lincoln Electric Company (Jackson, R) Modified on 09/06/2001
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. (Randall L. Souza),; jury demand (Jackson, R)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                              ANSWER by Halliburton Company to [18-2] cross claim, [14-2] cross claim, [5-2] cross claim (Jackson, R)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Halliburton Company (Attorney James P. Marusak) against AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, General Refractories, Georgia Pacific, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Lincoln Electric, Metropolitan Life, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain, Manville Asbestos (Jackson, R)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                  ANSWER by General Refractories to [14-2] cross claim, [5-2] cross claim (Jackson, R)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                    ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by General Refractories (Attorney Thomas C. Angelone) against AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, Georgia Pacific, Halliburton Company, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Lincoln Electric, Metropolitan Life, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain, Manville Asbestos (Jackson, R)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Porter-Hayden Co. 8/13/01 Answer due on 9/4/01 for Porter-Hayden Co. (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co. 8/17/01 Answer due on 9/6/01 for C.E. Thurston & Sons, for Cleaver-Brooks Co. (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001
                                                                          received $50.00 for PHV admision of Peter Rubin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                            (2) ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS OF SERVICE as to Halliburton Company, Kaiser Aluminum 8/8/01 Answer due on 8/28/01 for Kaiser Aluminum, for Halliburton Company (Mercurio, A)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001, Terminated: 10/31/2001 Answer
                                                                              ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by American Standard (Attorney George Wakeman) (Saucier, M)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Hopeman Brothers (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (Saucier, M)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  ENTRY of appearance for Lincoln Electric by Robert J. Quigley Jr. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion for Peter J. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Theall, J)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane, Inc. (Attorney David H. Stillman),; jury demand (Saucier, M)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Foster Wheeler Corp. (Attorney Mark O. Denehy), (Saucier, M)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                          ANSWER by Metropolitan Life to [5-2] cross claim of any and all other defendants and third-party defendants with Jury demand (Saucier, M)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life (Attorney Staci L. Sawyer),; jury demand (Saucier, M)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001
                                                                                              Motion(s) referred: [4-1] motion for Peter J. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001
                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for Foster Wheeler Corp. by Mark O. Denehy (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by J.H. France (Attorney Mark O. Denehy ), (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                    THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Owens-Illinois, Inc. against Manville Asbestos (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                      ANSWER to All Pending and Future Third-Party Complaints (Attorney Peter Rubin, Dennis McCarten) (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                        ANSWER by Owens-Illinois, Inc. to all Pending and Future Cross-Claims (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                          ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Owens-Illinois, Inc. (Attorney Dennis J. McCarten) against AC&S, Inc., A.P. Green, Inc., American Standard, C.E. Thurston & Sons, Cleaver-Brooks Co., Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, General Refractories, Georgia Pacific, Halliburton Company, Hopeman Brothers, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Kaiser Aluminum, Lincoln Electric, Metropolitan Life, Porter-Hayden Co., Selby Battersby & Co, Turner & Newall, PLC, Uniroyal, Inc., US Gypsum Company, US Mineral Products, Viacom, Inc., Weil-McLain (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001, Terminated: 8/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by Owens-Illinois, Inc. for Peter J. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001
                                                                                                              ENTRY of appearance for J.H. France by Mark O. Denehy, Peter Lawson Kennedy, Victoria Almeida, R. Bart Totten, James R. Oswald (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001
                                                                                                                CASE reassigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Administrator, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER OF RECUSAL ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 48057 (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001
                                                                                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?