Silva v. Mortgage Amenities, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00333-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Elaine . Silva, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Christopher M. Lefebvre

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Lefebvre +1 401 728 6060 +1 401 728 6534 court@lefebvrelaw.com
v.
No Logo Capital Mortgage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Mortgage Amenities Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Dolan, III +2762 276 276 2600 +2762 276 276 2601 wdolan@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ctpllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angel Taveras +8612 861 861 2100 +8612 861 861 2139 ataveras@ctpllp.com
Office Providence
Filed 7/11/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601 Truth in Lending
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Providence
Terminated 3/7/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, DLM
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres (mailed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (Mercurio, A) Modified on 03/11/2002
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001
      Rule 16 Conference set 9:30 1/9/02 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres (FarrellPletcher, P)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Court Filing
        ORDER mooting [6-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motion for class certification ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Saucier, M)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Court Filing
          ORDER mooting [9-1] motion to Strike allegations in [1-1] complaint, granting in part, to the extent that the class allegations contained in Count II, and count III are hereby stricken and simissed for the following reasons: 1)Plaintiff failed to file a motion to certify the purported class within 60 days as required by Local Rule 30(c). 2) the Plaintiff has withdrawn the class allegations [8-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Class Action ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001
            Motion hearing re: [6-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motion for class certification at 2:00 11/1/01 before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Saucier, M)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001
              Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [8-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Class Action (FarrellPletcher, P)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001
                Motion(s) referred: [6-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motion for class certification referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (FarrellPletcher, P)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Terminated:
                  OBJECTION by Elaine . Silva to [8-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Class Action (Mercurio, A)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001, Terminated: 11/5/2001 Terminated:
                    MOTION by Elaine . Silva to Strike allegations in [1-1] complaint (Mercurio, A)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 11/5/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION by Mortgage Amenities to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as Class Action (Mercurio, A)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 3/7/2002 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                        OBJECTION by Mortgage Amenities to [6-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motion for class certification (Mercurio, A)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001, Terminated: 11/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                          MOTION by Elaine . Silva to Enlarge Time to file motion for class certification (Mercurio, A)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 3/7/2002 Answer
                            ANSWER to Complaint by Mortgage Amenities (Attorney William M. Dolan III), (Mercurio, A)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
                              Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 8/30/01 for Mortgage Amenities (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Stipulation
                                Stipulation extending time to answer complaint by Mortgage Amenities up to and including 8/30/01 (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001, Terminated: 3/7/2002 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Capital Mortgage (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (Mercurio, A)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001
                                    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to Mortgage Amenities, Capital Mortgage 7/16/01 Answer due on 8/7/01 for Capital Mortgage, for Mortgage Amenities (Mercurio, A)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001
                                      COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 48165 (McCabe, F)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001
                                        CASE assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (McCabe, F)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001
                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued (McCabe, F)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?