USA v. Hirst
Criminal Case Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cr-00056-S

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adi Goldstein +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5001 adi.goldstein@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Providence
Filed 6/30/2003
County Providence
Terminated 10/3/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
103-mj-00001
Citation
Offense Level
KNOWINGLY AND WILLFULLY MAKING A THREAT TO KILL THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, GEORGE W. BUSH in Violation of 18 USC 871(a) [ 103-m -1 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DLM, PRIOR
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Judgment Returned Executed
Judgment Returned Executed as to Robert Hirst on 6/28/2005. (Revocation) (Duhamel, John)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 50 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Court Filing
    JUDGMENT (Sentencing on probation violation of supervised release) as to Robert Hirst 11 mos' imprisonment; no supervised release to follow. ( Signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (Baldinelli, D)
      LREF
      Blank 49 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Court Filing
      Minute entry as to Robert Hirst: Supervised Release Violation held before Judge William E. Smith. (Baldinelli, D)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005
        Final probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Judge William E. Smith. Adi Goldstein for Government; Edward Roy for Defendant; Barry Weiner for Probation; CR: Anne Clayton; All counsel of record present; Defendant present; Court accepts the R&R of Magistrate Judge Martin dated 4/15/05; Gov't recommends 11 months of incarceration; No further period of Supervised Release; Defendant request that the defendant be placed in a assisting living facility; Defendant has no statements to address to the Court; Court imposes 11 months of incarceration; no period of S/R thereafter; The Court recommends to BOP that the defendant be placed in a facility that provides a mental health treatment program; Defendant remanded into custody. (Baldinelli, D) Modified on 05/12/2005
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005
          Deadline updated as to Robert Hirst, reset Final Probation Revocation Hearing for 11:00 5/12/05 for Robert Hirst (Mercurio, A)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005
            Final probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 2:00 5/13/05 for Robert Hirst Before Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
              LREF
              Blank 48 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Court Filing
              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge David L. Martin as to Robert Hirst Re: Probation Violation; I recommend that Defendant be sentenced to eleven months imprisonment. I further recommend that there by no further period of supervised release. Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 4/25/05 faxed to counsel (Saucier, M)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Preliminary Revocation Hearing
                Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Adi Goldstein for the government; Edward Roy for the defendant; Maureen Legault for probation. Government moves to dismiss one violation; Court dismisses the one violation; Court informs defendant of the two pending violations; Court informs defendant of his rights; Court questions defendant; Defendant admits to the two pending violations; Defendant waives right of allocution; Attorneys argue sentencing; Court takes matter under advisement; Court to issue Report and Recommendation; Court orders defendant detained. (Saucier, M)
                  LREF
                  Blank 47 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Court Filing
                  ORDER as to Robert Hirst; RE: Finding of Competency ( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) forwarded to counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005
                    Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 2:30 4/6/05 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Saucier, M)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005
                      Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Adi Goldstein for the government; Edward Roy for the defendant; Maureen Legault for probation. Court gives travel of case; Both sides concur defendant is competent; Court reads partial competency report into the record and finds the defendant competent. Defendant requests preliminary probation hearing in one week. Government has no objection. Court schedules preliminary probation violation for 4/6/05 at 2:30 p.m.; Defendant remanded to custody pending violation hearing. (Saucier, M)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005
                        Psychiatric Report received as to Robert Hirst (under seal in Magistrate Judges vault) (Saucier, M)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005
                          Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 10:00 3/30/05 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Saucier, M)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005
                            Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Adi Goldstein for government; Edward Roy for the defendant; Maureen Legault for probation. Court gives travel of case and addresses medical report regarding competency. Mr. Roy requests a continuance of the competency hearing; Government has no objection. Court grants the request and continues competency hearing to 3/30/05 at 10:00 am. Defendant remanded into custody. (Saucier, M)
                              LREF
                              Blank 46 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Court Filing
                              ORDER MODIFYING TERM OF COMMITMENT AND ESTABLISHING NEW HEARING DATE of 3/18/05 at 2:00 pm before Magistrate Judge David Martin-Commitment to last no longer than 3/18/05 as to Robert Hirst (Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin) forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                                LREF
                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting Amended Petition for Warrart as to Robert Hirst ( Signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004
                                  Tele-conference as to Robert Hirst set at 11:30 12/20/04 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Saucier, M)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Docket Annotation
                                    Return of Service Executed RE: Memo and Commitment Order for psychiatric examination as to Robert Hirst (Saucier, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 43 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Court Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM AND COMMITMENT ORDER as to Robert Hirst; defendant shall be commteed to the custody of the Attorney General for hospitalization for a time not to exceed fourt months; the term of commitment under this order will last no longer than 2/19/04; Court schedules hearing for 2/19/05 at 10:00 a.m. for Competency Hearing ( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Psychiatric Report +
                                        Psychiatric Report received as to Robert Hirst; placed under seal (Saucier, M)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004
                                          Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 10:00 2/22/04 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Saucier, M) Modified on 10/20/2004
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004
                                            Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Gerard Sullivan for the government; Edward Roy for the defendant; Barry Weiner for probation. Government has no objection to competency report; Defendant addresses Court. Defendant objects to the appointment of FPD; Court orders Mr. Roy to continue to represent the defendant. Court finds defendant incompetent and orders the defendant committed to the custody of the Attorney General for hospitalization. Court enters 1 exhibit as full to be filed under seal. (Saucier, M)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004
                                              Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 11:00 10/20/04 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Saucier, M)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004
                                                Tele-conference as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Gerard Sullivan for the government; Edward Roy for the defendant. Court schedules a competency hearing for 10/20/04 at 11:00 a.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
                                                  arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to Robert Hirst on 8/30/04 (Baldinelli, D)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Docket Annotation
                                                    Memorandum and Committment Order returned executed - Defendant delivered on 9/13/04 to FMC Devens as to Robert Hirst (Mercurio, A) Modified on 09/28/2004
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER as to Robert Hirst denying [38-1] motion to Vacate [31-1] order regarding Competency Evaluation as to Robert Hirst (1) ( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Court Filing
                                                        AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND COMMITMENT ORDER as to Robert Hirst granting [37-1] order as to Robert Hirst (1) ( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004, Terminated: 9/14/2004 Motion to Vacate
                                                          MOTION by Robert Hirst to Vacate [31-1] order regarding Competency Evaluation (Baldinelli, D) Modified on 09/08/2004
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004, Terminated: 9/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM AND COMMITMENT ORDER as to Robert Hirst granting [0-0] oral motion for Psychiatric Exam as to Robert Hirst (1) ( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) mailed to counsel and U.S. Marshal (Theall, J)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Court Filing
                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued as to Robert Hirst - oral warrant issued by Judge William E. Smith on August 30, 2004` (Mercurio, A)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER for Issuance of Arrest Warrant as to Robert Hirst ( Signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION in open court by Robert Hirst for Psychiatric Exam (Theall, J)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                    Detention hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Court orders defendant detained and held for a competency examination. (Saucier, M)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                      Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Adi Goldstein for the government; Edward Roy for the defendant; Kate Hopkins for probation. Court informs defendant of the violations; Mr. Roy requests competency examination; Government has no objection; Court orders defendant detained and held for a competency examination; Mr. Roy to prepare an order. (Saucier, M)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER as to Robert Hirst - Court imposes 8 months incarceration; 28 months S/R; While on S/R the defendant shall participate in a mental health treatment program approved by the U.S. Probation Office and shall follow the medication regimen as prescribed; U.S. Probation Office shall contact the mental health provider to insure that the defendant is following his medication regimen; Deft shall participate in an inpatient/outpatient program approved by the U.S. Probation Office for treatment of narcotic addiction or drug or alcohol which program will include testing; $100.00 S/A ( Signed by Judge William E. Smith) ) (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          Minute entry as to Robert Hirst : Sentencing Supervised Release Violation held before Judge William E. Smith (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004
                                                                            Final probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Judge William E. Smith. Government - Adi Goldstein; Counsel for Defendant - Olin W. Thompson; Probation - Kate Hopkins; Court Reporter - Anne Clayton; All counsel of record present; Defendant present; Probation present; Arguments heard; Gov't recommends that the Court adopt the R&R dated 1/6/04 by Magistrate Judge; Government recommends the middle end of the guideline range; Attorney Thompson recommends the low-end of the guideline range; Defendant addresses his statements to the Court; Court adopts the entire Report and recommendation dated January 6, 2004 by Magistrate Judge Martin; Court imposes 8 months of incarceration; 3 months have already been served; 28 months for S/R; While on S/R the defendant shall participate in a mental health treatment program approved by the U.S. Probation Office and shall follow the medication regimen as prescribed; The defendant shall also participate in a inpatient/outpatient substance abuse program for drug or alcohol which program may include testing; Defendant remanded back into custody; (Baldinelli, D) Modified on 03/08/2004
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004
                                                                              Sentencing reset for 2:00 3/5/04 for Robert Hirst Before Judge William E. Smith Robert Hirst (1) count(s) cmp, 1 (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004
                                                                                Deadline updated as to Robert Hirst, reset Final Probation Revocation Hearing for 3:00 3/5/04 for Robert Hirst (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004
                                                                                  Final probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 10:30 3/5/04 for Robert Hirst Before Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004
                                                                                    arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to Robert Hirst on 12/24/03 (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER directing the Government to notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this Order of any information that would lead the Court to believe that the psychological evaluation conducted by Dr. Patenaude to determine the competency of defendant to enter into a plea agreement is suspect as to Robert Hirst ( Signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004
                                                                                        In-chambers conference as to Robert Hirst held before J. Smith. Goldstein, AUSA and DeCaporale present. (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge David L. Martin as to Robert Hirst Re: Probation Violation; I recommend that Defendant be sentenced to a term of imprisonment for 5 months to be followed by a term of supervised release of 31 months; I also recommend that the following condition be added to Defendant's supervised release: Defendant shall follow the medication regimen as prescribed; shall participate in a program of mental health treatment which may include residential placement; shall participate in and satisfactorily complete an inpatient or out patient program for the treatment of substance abuse which may include drug testing; ordered to pay the unpaid special assessment of $100.00 Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 1/16/04 forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003
                                                                                            ENTRY of Appearance for Robert Hirst by Attorney Olin Thompson (Theall, J)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003
                                                                                              Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst held before MJ Martin (Goldstein, Thompson) PTS Weiner; Court reviews history of case; Deft admits violations of medication regiment; Court questions deft; Court finds deft violated sup rel; Attys recommend sentence; Deft addresses Court; Court reviews guidelines; Court will recommend 5 mos incarceration; Deft remanded to custody; R&R to follow (Theall, J)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003
                                                                                                In-chambers conference as to Robert Hirst set at 10:00 1/8/04 for Robert Hirst Before Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003
                                                                                                  ENTRY of Appearance for Robert Hirst by Attorney Edward C. Roy Jr. (Theall, J)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003
                                                                                                    Detention hearing as to Robert Hirst held before MJ Martin (Leavey, Roy) USPO Hopkins; Govt presents evidence through testimony; Govt rests; Deft proffers Court; Court remands deft to custody pending Preliminary Probation Violation hearing (Theall, J)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003
                                                                                                      Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 10:00 12/31/03 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Theall, J)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003
                                                                                                        Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst held before MJ Martin (Leavey, Roy) USPO Hopkins; Court reviews history of case; Attys argue; Hearing continued to 12/31/03 at 10:00 a.m. Deft requests preliminary hearing to determine detention (Theall, J)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003
                                                                                                          ARREST of Robert Hirst (Theall, J)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                            Arrest WARRANT issued as to Robert Hirst per request of the Probation Office (Theall, J) Modified on 12/24/2003
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003
                                                                                                              Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Adi Goldstein for the government; Olin Thompson for the defendant; Kathleen Hopkins for probation. Government dismisses count 1 of the violations; Court informs defendant of the violation; Court informs defendant of his rights; Court questions the defendant; Defendant admits to the violation Court orders defendant released to a residental treatment program with additional conditions; Court continues the matter for 60 days. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to Robert Hirst on 12/1/03 (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003
                                                                                                                  ENTRY of Appearance for Robert Hirst by Attorney Olin W. Thompson (Theall, J)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003
                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Robert Hirst, for Appointment of Federal Public Defender (signed by Jeannine Theall, Deputy Clerk) (Theall, J)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003
                                                                                                                      CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Robert Hirst approved by MJ Martin (Theall, J)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003
                                                                                                                        Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 10:00 12/15/03 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Theall, J)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003
                                                                                                                          Preliminary probation violation hearing as to Robert Hirst held before MJ Martin (Goldstein, Thompson) USPO Hopkins; Court informs Deft of violations; Govt requests detention; Deft agrees with detention; Violation hearing set for 12/15/03 at 10:00 a.m.; Court directs USPO to have mental evaluation ordered; Deft remanded to custody (Theall, J)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003
                                                                                                                            arrest WARRANT issued as to Robert Hirst (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER for Issuance of arrest Warrant as to Robert Hirst ( Signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                CJA 20 as to Robert Hirst Authorization to Pay Joseph L. DeCaporale, Jr. $1,341.00 ( Signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT as to Robert Hirst (1) count(s) cmp, 1 . Court imposes 8 months incarceration; 3 years S/R; While on S/R deft shall particpate in a program approved by the U.S. Probation Office for treatment of narcotic addiction or drug or alcohol dependency which may include testing ; The deft shall participate as directed in a program of mental health treatment approved by the U.S. Probation Office; S/A $100.00; ( Signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute entry as to Robert Hirst : Sentencing held before Judge William E. Smith. (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003
                                                                                                                                      Sentencing held Robert Hirst (1) count(s) 1 before Judge William E. Smith. Counsel for Defendant - Joseph L. DeCaporale; Government - Adi Goldstein; Probation - Michael Perry; Court Reporter - Anne Clayton; All counsel of record present; Defendant present; Probation present; no objections to the PSR; Deft's counsel asked the Court for the low-end of the guideline range; Gov't has no objections to the low-end of the guideline range; Court imposes 8 months of incarceration; 3 years S/R; while on S/R defendant shall participate in a program of Mental/Health treatment program and substance abuse approved by the U.S. Probation Office which program may include testing; S/A $100.00; Court advises the deft's of his right to file an appeal; Defendant remanded into custody. (Baldinelli, D) Modified on 10/03/2003
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003
                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated as to Robert Hirst, reset Sentencing for 8:30 10/3/03 for Robert Hirst (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003
                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated as to Robert Hirst, se reset Sentencing for 9:30 10/3/03 for Robert Hirst (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003
                                                                                                                                            Certification of Defendant's Medication by Joseph DeCaporale for Robert Hirst (St.John, B)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Minute entry as to Robert Hirst : Change of Plea hearing held before Judge William E. Smith. (St.John, B)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                Sentencing set for 9:30 9/26/03 for Robert Hirst Before Judge William E. Smith , Robert Hirst (1) count(s) 1 (St.John, B)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                  PLEA entered by Robert Hirst . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Robert Hirst (1) count(s) 1 (St.John, B)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                    Change of Plea Hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Judge Smith. Court Reporter: Karen Zinni; Courtroom Deputy: Barbara St. John; Plaintiff: Adi Goldstein; Defendant: Joseph L. CeCarporale, Jr.; Probation present. Defendant sworn. Court questions Defendant's understanding of his appearance in Court and of the Plea Agreement. Defendant fully understands. Government states maximum penalties of Plea Agreement. Waiver is read; court advises of rights. Government states elements of offense, facts it could prove if case went to trial, terms of Plea Agreement. Defendant agrees to facts; wishes to plead guilty. Court finds Defendant fully competent and plea is knowing and voluntary and supported by fact. Plea accepted; Defendant adjusted guilty. Defendant will remain detained pending sentencing on September 26, 2003 at 9:30 a.m. (St.John, B)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Robert Hirst; signed by Magistrate Judge David Martin (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER Finding Defendant Competent as to Robert Hirst (Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin) sent to all counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                          Detention hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Adi Goldstein for the government; Joseph DeCaporale for the defendant; Charlene Tryhubczak for probation. Court orders detention to continue (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                            Arraignment as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Adi Goldstein for the government; Joseph DeCaporale for the defendant; Charlene Tryhubczak for probation. Court questions defendant; Court informs defendant of charge; Court informs defendant of his rights. Defendant waives indictiment and Court accepts the waiver. Court orders detention to continue. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003
                                                                                                                                                              Change of Plea Hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 9:30 7/14/03 for Robert Hirst Before Judge William E. Smith; notice sent; pris. req. forwarded (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003
                                                                                                                                                                Change of Plea Hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 2:00 7/10/03 for Robert Hirst Before Judge William E. Smith; notice sent (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003
                                                                                                                                                                  Original Plea Agreement as to Robert Hirst (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Information - Felony
                                                                                                                                                                    INFORMATION as to Robert Hirst (1) count(s) 1 (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                      CASE Assigned to Judge William E. Smith . Assigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Martn (Administrator, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                        Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Robert Hirst [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                          Detention hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Lee Vilker for the government; Joseph DeCaporale for the defendant; Heather McLoughlin for probation. Government requests detention; Defendant does not object to detention at this time but requests to file a motion for reconsideration at a later date. Court grants the request to file a motion for reconsideration at a later date. Court orders defendant detained pending further proceedings. [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Competency Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                            Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Lee Vilker for the government; Joseph DeCaporale for the defendant; Heather McLoughlin for probation. Both sides have no objection to the finding of competency. Court orders the forensic report entered as a full exhibit and orders the report sealed. Court informs defendant of his rights and informs the defendant of charge. Court questions the defendant. Defendant waives preliminary exam and the court accepts the waiver. Government requests detention. Defendant requests to file a motion for reconsideration of bail at a later date and the court grants the request. Court orders defendant detained pending further proceedings. [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                              Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 2:00 6/9/03 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                Psychiatric Report received as to Robert Hirst; Court orders report filed under seal [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M) Modified on 06/04/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE; MEMORANDUM AND COMMITMENT ORDER executed as to Robert Hirst 3/10/03 [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND COMMITMENT ORDER as to Robert Hirst; the defendant shall be committed to the custody of the Attorney General for hospitalization for a reasonable amount of time not to exceed four months; this order shall be deemed to apply as of 02/17/03 and will last no longer than 06/17/03 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) sent to all counsel of record [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                      Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 10:00 6/17/03 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                        Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Adi Goldstein for the government; Joseph DeCaporale for the defendant; Charlene Tryhubczak for probation. All counsel of record present. Defendant present. Probation present. Defendant present via videoconference from Ft. Devens also present with the defendant is Dr. Thomas Patenaude. Court states travel of case. Both sides have no objection to the forensic report and requests the court to accept the report. Court accepts the forensic report and orders it filed under seal. Court orders the defendant hospitalized and schedules a competency hearing for 06/17/03. Government to prepare an order [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                          Psychiatric Report received as to Robert Hirst. Court orders report filed under seal [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                            Competency Hearing as to Robert Hirst set for 10:00 3/7/03 for Robert Hirst Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RETURNING DEFENDANT TO FMC DEVENS as to Robert Hirst ( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) sent to all counsel of record [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to Robert Hirst on 1/3/03 [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Robert Hirst granting [0-0] oral motion for Psychiatric Exam as to Robert Hirst (1) ( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of Appearance for Robert Hirst by Attorney Joseph L. DeCaporale Jr. [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Robert Hirst signed by Magistrate Judge David Martin [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest WARRANT issued as to Robert Hirst [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT as to Robert Hirst [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in open court by USA and Defendant as to Robert Hirst for Psychiatric Exam [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M) Modified on 07/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Detention hearing as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Lee Vilker for the government; Joseph DeCaporale for the defendant; Charlene Tryhubczak for probation. Court orders the defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshal' for a psychiatric exam. [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Initial Appearance as to Robert Hirst held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Lee Vilker for the government; Joseph DeCaporale Jr. for the defendant; Charlene Tryhubczak for probation. All counsel of record present. Defendant present. Probation present. Court informs defendant of charge. Government requests a mental health evaluation. Counsel for defendant agrees to evaluation. Court orders defendant to undergo a mental health evaluation at Ft. Devens. Court to continue preliminary exam until the evaluation is completed. (Defendant informed of rights.) [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M) Modified on 07/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/9/2003 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 20 as to Robert Hirst : Appointment of Attorney Joseph DeCaporale( Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) [ 1:03-m -1 ] (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?