Labutti v. Town of Coventry, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00012-L
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald J. Labutti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
v.
No Logo Coventry School Committee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon, Tobin & Read

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick G. Tobin +7392 739 739 2020 +7349 734 734 9889 fgt@gtrlaw.com
No Logo John Deasy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon, Tobin & Read

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick G. Tobin +7392 739 739 2020 +7349 734 734 9889 fgt@gtrlaw.com
No Logo Stanley Thompson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon, Tobin & Read

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick G. Tobin +7392 739 739 2020 +7349 734 734 9889 fgt@gtrlaw.com
No Logo Town of Coventry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Town of Coventry, Rhode Island

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Kevin Sprague +8285 828 828 5407 +8229 822 822 9139 psprague@town.coventry.ri.us
Office Providence
Filed 1/8/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Providence
Terminated 7/17/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, DLM
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal - forwarded to attorneys - signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003
    Case closed (Gilfillan, B)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Notice of Appearance/
      ENTRY of appearance for Ronald J. Labutti by Patricia E. Andrews, Esquire. (Baldinelli, D)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003
        Rule 16 Conference set 12:30 6/16/03 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003, Terminated: 7/17/2003 Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint by Coventry School Comm, John Deasy, Stanley Thompson (Attorney ), Frederick G. Tobin (Baldinelli, D)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003
            ENTRY of appearance for Coventry School Comm, John Deasy, Stanley Thompson by Attorney Frederick G. Tobin (Baldinelli, D)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003, Terminated: 7/17/2003 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint by Town of Coventry (Attorney Paul Kevin Sprague), (Baldinelli, D)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003
                COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 53073 (McCabe, F)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003
                  CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Martin (McCabe, F)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 165 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?