Richard, et al v. City of Woonsocket
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00105-S
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Amanda Richard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Arthur, Richard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Monique Richard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
v.
No Logo City of Woonsocket, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph P. Carroll +7664 766 766 4118 +7695 769 769 5222 jpcesq49@aol.com
Office Providence
Filed 3/20/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 20 U.S.C. § 1415 Handicapped Child Act - attorneys fees
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 7/9/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal signed by Judge William E. Smith (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003
    Case closed (Mercurio, A)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Terminated:
      MOTION and Memorandum by City of Woonsocket to Dismiss (St.John, B)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003
        Stipulation extending time for City of Woonsocket to respond to Complaint to 5/5/03 (Mercurio, A)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Notice of Appearance/
          ENTRY of appearance for City of Woonsocket by Joseph P. Carroll (St.John, B)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003
            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 53679 (McCabe, F)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003
              CASE assigned to Judge William E. Smith . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (McCabe, F)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 63 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?