D'Amario v. Alfrey, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00228-S
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Arthur D'Amario, 3rd, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Steven Alfrey, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adi Goldstein +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5001 adi.goldstein@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adi Goldstein +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5001 adi.goldstein@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 6/9/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Providence
Terminated 11/19/2003
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 03-cv-2321[USDC-N.J. (Camden)]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Court Filing
ORDER: The Court hereby accepts the R and R of Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen dated October 27, 2003 pursuant to 28 USC 686(b)(1) [7-1] motion for application for release pending decision., mooting [6-1] motion for writ of habeas corpus , signed by Judge William E. Smith . (mailed to ptf. and faxed to deft.) (Mercurio, A)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003
    Case closed (Mercurio, A)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Terminated:
      RESPONSE by Steven Alfrey in opposition to [9-1] report and recommendations (Baldinelli, D)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
        RESPONSE by USA in opposition to [10-1] objection (Baldinelli, D)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003
          OBJECTION and memorandum by Arthur D'Amario 3rd to [9-1] report and recommendations (Baldinelli, D)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003
            D'Amario's Objection to R&R forwarded to chambers (Mercurio, A)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Court Filing
              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen Recommending the Petition be denied as moot: [7-1] motion for application for release pending decision., [6-1] motion for writ of habeas corpus ; Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 11/13/03; mailed to parties (Theall, J)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003
                Motion(s) referred: [7-1] motion for application for release pending decision. referred to Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Memorandum in Support
                  MEMORANDUM by Arthur D'Amario 3rd in support of [7-1] motion for application for release pending decision. (Fernandes, D)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Terminated:
                    MOTION by Arthur D'Amario 3rd for application for release pending decision. (Baldinelli, D)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                      Amended Petition by Arthur D'Amario 3rd for writ of habeas corpus (St.John, B)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Motions Referred
                        Motion(s) referred: Referred Petition for Writ of Habeas pursuant to 28 USC 2241 to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (Mercurio, A)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Terminated:
                          RESPONSE by US Probation Office in opposition to [1-1] transfer (Mercurio, A)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Court Filing
                            ORDER directing Government to respond to plaintiff's motion for habeas corpus on or before August 13, 2003. ( signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (mailed to parties of record) (Mercurio, A)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Court Filing
                              ORDER ( signed by Judge William E. Smith ) ordering Government to file its response to plaintiff's Motion Under 28 USC 2242 Writh of Habeas Corpus before July 16, 2003. Mailed to counsel of record. (St.John, B) Modified on 07/29/2003
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                CASE reassigned to Judge William E. Smith by direct assign per Chief Judge Torres. . (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Court Filing
                                  ORDER OF RECUSAL - forwarded to party ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003
                                    Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of New Jersey (Camden) (McCabe, F)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003
                                      CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (McCabe, F)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?