Graff, et al v. Providence School D
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00269-S
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Eliza Graff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy R. Tabor +7271 727 727 1616 +7266 726 726 6340 htcamy@yahoo.com
No Logo Joan Graff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy R. Tabor +7271 727 727 1616 +7266 726 726 6340 htcamy@yahoo.com
No Logo Steven Graff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy R. Tabor +7271 727 727 1616 +7266 726 726 6340 htcamy@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Providence School Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Office Providence
Filed 7/1/2003
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $22000000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 20 U.S.C. § 1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Providence
Terminated 9/12/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal signed by Judge William E. Smith (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003
    In-chambers conference set at 2:00 12/12/03 Before Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003
      Status conference set at 10:30 12/2/03 Before Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Court Filing
        CONSENT JUDGMENT 1. Deft. shall pay ptf.'s attorney the sum of $22,865.00, which sum shall represent reimbursement for legal fees and costs incurred in connection with both the within pending case and the Impartial Due Process Hearing No.: LL2-35 before the Rhode Island Department of Education; 2) said payment shall be made to the ptfs. attorney on or before October 10, 2003; and 3) upon such payment being made, the parties shall submit a Stipulation dismissing the within case. ( signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003
          Case closed (Mercurio, A)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003
            Rule 16 Conference held before J. Smith (Mercurio, A)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003
              Rule 16 statement of case by Ptfs. forwarded to chambers (Mercurio, A)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003
                Rule 16 Conference set 11:30 9/12/03 Before Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003, Terminated: 9/12/2003 Answer
                  ANSWER to Complaint by Providence School D (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (St.John, B)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Summons Returned Executed
                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Providence School D 7/9/03 Answer due on 7/29/03 for Providence School D (St.John, B)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT #54502 (Fernandes, D) Modified on 07/02/2003
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Summons Issued
                        SUMMONS(ES) issued (McCabe, F)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                          CASE assigned to Judge William E. Smith . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Fernandes, D) Modified on 07/02/2003
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 126 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?