Joseph, et al v. INS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00349-ML
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pressler Joseph, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin E. Feder +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5017 robin.feder@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 8/15/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 460 - Deportation
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Providence
Terminated 11/26/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, DLM
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003
JUDGMENT for INS against Pressler Joseph, pursuant to 11/26/03 Memorandum & Order granting respondent's M/Dismiss -- forwarded to counsel & pro se petitioner (Duhamel, J)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 (signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/25/03 ) -- forwarded to counsel & pro se petitioner (Duhamel, J) Modified on 11/26/2003
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003
      Case closed (Duhamel, J)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003
        Motion(s) referred to Judge: [5-1] motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 (Barletta, B)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003, Terminated: 11/26/2003 Terminated:
          MOTION, with Memorandum, by INS to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 (Duhamel, J)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Court Filing
            ORDER granting [3-1] motion to Enlarge Time through 10/29/03, within which to respond to Joseph's petition - mailed to pro se plaintiff and faxed to counsel of record ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003, Terminated: 9/30/2003 Terminated:
              MOTION by INS to Enlarge Time through 10/29/03, within which to respond to Joseph's petition (Duhamel, J)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Court Filing
                ORDER directing the government to respond to petition for #2241 by 9/29/03 - mailed to counsel of record ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Barletta, B)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003
                  CASE reassigned to Judge Mary M. Lisi . Case is related to CA03-348ML (FarrellPletcher, P)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003
                    COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 5.00 RECEIPT # 54964 (Jackson, R)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003
                      CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Jackson, R)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 43 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?