Uniloc USA, Inc., et al v. Microsoft Corp., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00440-S-DLM
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags
Last Updated March 31, 2017 at 12:09 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Uniloc Singapore Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dean Graham Bostock +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 dbostock@mintz.com
Space Paul J Cronin , +1 617 348 4867 +1 617 542 2241 PCronin@mintz.com
Space Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Duane, Barton & Gilman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andria V. Coletta +1 617 654 8200 +1 401 273 2904 acoletta@taylorduane.com
Space Francis A. Connor, III +2737 273 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 fconnor@taylorduane.com
Space Sheri L. Pizzi +1 401 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 spizzi@taylorduane.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dean Graham Bostock +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 dbostock@mintz.com
Space Paul J Cronin , +1 617 348 4867 +1 617 542 2241 PCronin@mintz.com
Space Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Duane, Barton & Gilman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andria V. Coletta +1 617 654 8200 +1 401 273 2904 acoletta@taylorduane.com
Space Francis A. Connor, III +2737 273 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 fconnor@taylorduane.com
Space Sheri L. Pizzi +1 401 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 spizzi@taylorduane.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura R. Braden +1 617 542 5070 +5428 542 542 8906 braden@fr.com
Space Kurt L. Glitzenstein +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 glitzenstein@fr.com
Space Frank Everett Scherkenbach +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 scherkenbach@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Microsoft Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Isabella E. Fu +1 425 722 4846 +1 425 708 1507 isabella.fu@microsoft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Duane, Barton & Gilman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheri L. Pizzi +1 401 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 spizzi@taylorduane.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr. +8318 831 831 8900 +7517 751 751 7542 jvc@blishcavlaw.com
v.
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura R. Braden +1 617 542 5070 +5428 542 542 8906 braden@fr.com
Space Kurt L. Glitzenstein +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 glitzenstein@fr.com
Space Frank Everett Scherkenbach +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 scherkenbach@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Microsoft Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Isabella E. Fu +1 425 722 4846 +1 425 708 1507 isabella.fu@microsoft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Duane, Barton & Gilman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheri L. Pizzi +1 401 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 spizzi@taylorduane.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr. +8318 831 831 8900 +7517 751 751 7542 jvc@blishcavlaw.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc Singapore Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Duane, Barton & Gilman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis A. Connor, III +2737 273 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 fconnor@taylorduane.com
Space Sheri L. Pizzi +1 401 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 spizzi@taylorduane.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Hayes +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 phayes@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Duane, Barton & Gilman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis A. Connor, III +2737 273 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 fconnor@taylorduane.com
Space Sheri L. Pizzi +1 401 273 7171 +2732 273 273 2904 spizzi@taylorduane.com
Office Providence
Filed 9/26/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Providence
Terminated 10/19/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADR, APPEAL, DLM
  Entries (583) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Blank 603
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
          MOTION to Seal its Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Preclude Testimony of Robert H. Mnookin by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Motion in Limine
            MOTION in Limine With Supporting Memo by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Affidavit of Kurt L. Glitzenstein, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 493 Emergency MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Litigation Costs Associated with Defending Microsoft and Production of Rule 30(b)(6) Witness to Authenticate, and Admit the Business-Record Status, Documents filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 513 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF ROBERT H. MNOOKIN by All Plaintiffs. (Coletta, Andria) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                  APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 511 MOTION for Justin P. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Justin P. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Coletta, Andria) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                      APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 503 MOTION for Michael Yoder to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 509 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                        TRIAL NOTICE filed. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                          MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motions in Limine With Supporting Memo by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Affidavit of Kurt L. Glitzenstein, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 507 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                            MOTION in Limine by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Coletta, Andria) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Klausner With Supporting Memo by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Affidavit of Kurt L. Glitzenstein, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kurt L. Glitzenstein, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kurt L. Glitzenstein, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kurt L. Glitzenstein)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 505 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Extend Certain Deadlines by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Responses due by 2/16/2012 (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 504
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Blank 494
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Roger A. Denning to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 480 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM re 475 Reply Memorandum, Plaintiffs' Surreply in Opposition to Microsoft's Motion to Compel Discovery Concerning Uniloc's Exclusive License. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Coletta, Andria) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER re: 477 Sealed Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Judge William G. Young, District of MA on 11/29/11. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Microsoft's Motion to Compel Discovery Concerning Uniloc's Exclusive Licensee with supporting memo by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/15/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Coletta, Andria) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 477 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Sealed Document placed in vault, Locker #12. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/25/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Seal its Motion to Compel Discovery Concerning Uniloc's Exlusive Licensee by Microsoft Corporation. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/25/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 475 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM In Support of Microsoft's 477 Motion to Compel Discovery Concerning Uniloc's Exclusive Licensee (Sealed document). (Glitzenstein, Kurt) Modified on 11/25/2011: added link to sealed document and notation (Jackson, Ryan). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 472 MOTION for Steven R. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Microsoft Corporation. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER re: Confidential Protective Order. So Ordered by Deputy Clerk: Elizabeth Smith on 11/15/11. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Steven R. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 471 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Modified Expert Report of Philip Green by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Responses due by 11/14/2011 (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 468 Motion to Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order; Reset Deadlines: Factual Discovery due by 1/25/2012; All Expert Discovery due by 1/25/12; Daubert Motions and Motions In Limine due by 1/30/2012, responses no later than 2/20/12; Pretrial Memorandum due by 2/13/2012; Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 2/15/12 at 2:00 PM before Judge William G. Young, Courtroom #18, 5th Floor at the John Joseph Moakley U.S. Courthouse, 1 Courthouse Way, Boston, MA; Jury Trial to commence at the Federal Courthouse in RI on 2/27/12. So Ordered by Judge William G. Young, District of MA on 10/25/11. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Addendum re 468 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 454 Pretrial Scheduling Order Exhibit A Proposed Amended Scheduling Order by Microsoft Corporation, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 454 Pretrial Scheduling Order by Microsoft Corporation, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Responses due by 11/10/2011 (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 460 Motion to Strike. So Ordered by Judge William G. Young, District of MA on 10/14/11. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 464 Response in Opposition to Motion,, to Strike the September 7, 2011 Expert Report of Mr. Klausner on Infringement filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 460 MOTION to Strike 9/7/11 EXPERT REPORT OF KLAUSNER ON INFRINGEMENT, 464 Response in Opposition to Motion,, of Intent to File a Reply Memorandum (Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 460 MOTION to Strike 9/7/11 EXPERT REPORT OF KLAUSNER ON INFRINGEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - Trial Trans Day 1 excerpt, # 3 Exhibit C - Trial Trans Day 2 excerpt, # 4 Exhibit D - Verdict Form, # 5 Exhibit E - Part 1 - MS's Appeal Brief, # 6 Exhibit Part 2 - MS's Appeal Brief, # 7 Exhibit Part 1 - Uniloc's Appeal Reply Brief, # 8 Exhibit Part 2 - Uniloc's Appeal Reply Brief)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 445 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  CONCURRING ORDER assigning Judge William Young as presiding judge of this matter. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf, District of MA on 1/27/11. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF MA for assignment by designation to Judge William Young. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 1/27/11. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      USCA FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT OPINION as to 418 Notice of Appeal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc, 422 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Microsoft Corporation, 440 Notice of Appeal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc - For the foregoing reasons, this court reverses the district court's grant of JMOL of non-infringement, affirms the district court's grant of JMOL of no willfulness, affirms the district court's grant of a new trial on damages, vacates the district court's grant of an alternative motion for new trial on infringement, and affirms the district court's denial of JMOL of invalidity of claim 19 of the'216. The case is remanded for proceedings consistent with this opinion. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                        USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 2010-1326 for 440 Notice of Appeal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 440 Notice of Appeal - (Certified Docket Sheet; Documents: 430-435 and 437) (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Appeal Record due by 5/7/2010. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Redacted Transcript
                                                                                                                              Redacted Transcript of 438 Transcript. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Jury Impanelment held on March 3, 2009, before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number 401-255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2010. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings: Jury Impanelment held on 3/3/2009 before Judge William E. Smith. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 435 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 430 Motion to Stay. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 12/21/09. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 433 Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay, Pending Appeal, Defendant's Motion for an Award of Costs filed by all plaintiffs. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 430 MOTION to Stay , Pending Appeal, Defendant's Motion for an Award of Costs filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of Microsoft's Motion for an Award of Costs - REDACTED - Filed Under Seal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B2 (REDACTED))(Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Bill of Costs - REDACTED - Filed Under Seal. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay , Pending Appeal, Defendant's Motion for an Award of Costs With Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/3/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for all in-chambers proceedings that took place on Monday, March 30, 2009 for proceedings held on 03/30/2009 before Judge Smith.. (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Microsoft Corporation (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 427 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document has been placed in the vault in Lock Box #12. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal by Microsoft Corporation. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                        USCA Case Number 2010-1055 for 422 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Smith, Rana) (Smith, Rana). (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 422 Notice of Cross Appeal - Certified Docket Sheet; 1 Complaint;; 145 Decision and Order; Text Order on Motion to Strike dated 3/18/09; Test Order on Motion for Summary Judgment dated 3/19/09; 199 Opinion and Order; 322 Order on Motions in Limine; 358 Jury Verdict; 412 Decision and Order; and 422 Notice of Appeal. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                            USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 2010-1035 for 418 Notice of Appeal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 322 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Bifurcate, 412 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Strike, Order, 199 Memorandum and Order, 145 Memorandum and Order, 413 Judgment by Microsoft Corporation. (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for an Extension of Time to File MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF COSTS by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 11/9/2009 (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Chambers Conference held on March 30, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number 401-255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2010. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                    Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re: 418 Notice of Appeal - Certified Docket Sheet; 1 Complaint; 322 Order on Motions in Limine; 412 Decision and Order; 413 Judgment; and 418 Notice of Appeal. (Smith, Rana) Modified on 10/16/2009 -added correct circuit(Smith, Rana). (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 322 Order on Motions in Limine; 412 Decision and Order; 413 Judgment by Uniloc USA, Inc, and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Appeal Record due by 11/12/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for all in-chambers proceedings that took place on Monday, March 30, 2009 for proceedings held on 03/30/2009 before Judge Smith.. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                          Incorrect event used to docket notice of appeal; appeal redocketed 418 using correct event NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited OF APPEAL (Bostock, Dean) Modified on 10/16/2009 (Smith, Rana). (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 AO Form 120
                                                                                                                                                                            AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2-Judgment) (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: 10/6/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Remaining Counterclaim Without Prejudice by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/23/2009 (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 413 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT in favor of Microsoft Corporation against Uniloc USA, Inc., and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 9/29/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 412 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 9/29/2009 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECISION AND ORDER Microsoft's Motion forJudgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial or Remittitur (Doc. No. 371) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Uniloc's Motion for an Award of Enhanced Damages, for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest, and for a Permanent Injunction (Doc. No.368) is DENIED AS MOOT. Both Motions to Amend/Correct Judgment (Doc. Nos. 367, 370) and Microsoft's Motion to Strike Improper Matter from Plaintiffs' Reply (Doc. No. 392) are DENIED AS MOOT. The verdict of the jury is VACATED. JUDGMENT shall enter for the Defendant Microsoft. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 9/29/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 411 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Microsoft Corporation to Uniloc's Notice regarding recent decision on post-trial motions by Judge Leonard Davis of the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 410 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited regarding recent decision on post-trial motions by Judge Leonard Davis of the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Continuation of Post-Trial Motions held on July 13, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Post-Trial Motions held on July 8, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 407 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited re 406 Notice (Other) to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Bench Memorandum re Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Bench Memorandum re Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 07/13/09 before Judge Smith.. (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 07/13/2009 before Judge Smith.. (Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited re 401 Notice (Other) re New Material Raised by Uniloc at July 8, 2009 Hearing. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Microsoft Corporation re Uniloc's Bench Memorandum re Post-Judgment Royalties. (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re New Material Raised by Uniloc at July 8, 2009 Hearing (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by all plaintiffs in opposition to 371 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial or Remittitur (CORRECTED) - PLAINTIFFS' BENCH MEMORANDUM RE: CENTRICUT CASE. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 399 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Supplemental Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by all plaintiffs in support of 368 MOTION for an Award of Enhanced Damages, for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest, and for a Permanent Injunction - PLAINTIFFS' BENCH MEMORANDUM RE: POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTIES. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 07/08/2009 before Judge Smith.. (Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 07/08/2009 before Judge Smith.. (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 394 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John W. Thornburgh. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 7/8/09. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 394 MOTION for John W. Thornburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Microsoft Corporation. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for John W. Thornburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 392 MOTION to Strike 376 Reply to Response to Motion, to Strike "Improper" Argument from Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for a Permanent Injunction filed by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike 376 Reply to Response to Motion, by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 7/6/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum In Support)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 11 Proceedings held on April 8, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 10 Proceedings held on April 7, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 9 Proceedings held on April 2, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Chambers Charge Conference held on April 2, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 8 Proceedings held on April 1, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 7 Proceedings held on March 31, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 6 Proceedings held on March 30, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 5 Proceedings held on March 27, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 4 Proceedings held on March 26, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 3 Proceedings held on March 25, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 2 Proceedings held on March 24, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Trial Day 1 Proceedings held on March 23, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 379 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 371 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial or Remittitur (CORRECTED) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 370 MOTION to Amend/Correct 361 Judgment filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 373 Response in Opposition to Motion, in further support of plaintiff's 367 motion to amend/correct 361 Judgment; filed by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 372 Response in Opposition to Motion, in further support of 368 motion for an Award of Enhanced Damages, for Prejudgment and Post judgment Interest, and for a Permanent Injunction; filed by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Z, # 2 Exhibit AA, # 3 Exhibit BB, # 4 Exhibit CC, # 5 Exhibit DD, # 6 Exhibit EE, # 7 Exhibit FF, # 8 Exhibit GG, # 9 Exhibit HH)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 370 MOTION to Amend/Correct 361 Judgment with supporting memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 374 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 371 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial or Remittitur (CORRECTED) with supporting memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (03/23/09 Tr), # 2 Exhibit B (3/24/09 Tr), # 3 Exhibit C (3/25/09 Tr), # 4 Exhibit D (3/26/09 Tr), # 5 Exhibit E (3/27/09 Tr), # 6 Exhibit F (3/30/09 Tr), # 7 Exhibit G (3/31/09 Tr), # 8 Exhibit H (4/1/09 Tr), # 9 Exhibit I (4/2/09 Tr), # 10 Exhibit J (4/7/09 Tr), # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 367 MOTION to Amend/Correct 361 Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct 361 Judgment filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rogers Decl in support, # 2 Exhibit Ex A to Rogers Decl in support)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 368 MOTION for an Award of Enhanced Damages, for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest, and for a Permanent Injunction filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Braden decl in support, # 2 Exhibit Ex A to Braden Decl in support, # 3 Exhibit Ex B to Braden Decl in support)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial or Remittitur (CORRECTED) by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 5/22/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum CORRECTED)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 361 Judgment by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 5/22/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, for a New Trial or Remittitur by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 5/22/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for an Award of Enhanced Damages, for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest, and for a Permanent Injunction With Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/22/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 361 Judgment With Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/22/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation in Response to Uniloc's Opposition to Microsoft's Letter to Judge Smith re the Courts Entry of Judgment (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION regarding Plaintiffs' Claims for Infringement of Claim 12 and for Indirect Infringement by all plaintiffs. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited re 363 Notice (Other) Letter to Judge Smith regarding the Courts Entry of Judgment. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Letter to Judge Smith Regarding The Courts Entry of Judgment (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 AO Form 120
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2- Verdict) (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT in favor of Uniloc USA, Inc., and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, against Microsoft Corporation. So Ordered by Deputy Clerk on 4/21/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order re Briefing Schedule for Post-Trial Motions by all parties. (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit/Witness List re: Jury Trial 3/23/09-4/8/09.(Smith, Rana) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 358 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JURY VERDICT.(Smith, Rana) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 354 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Defense of Invalidity filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 349 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement with supporting memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION regarding the Location of Microsoft Clearinghouses by all parties. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Defense of Invalidity with supporting memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/20/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Strike Proceedings held on March 18, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/22/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Letter to Judge Smith Requesting Instruction be Added to Post Trial Instructions (Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited re 350 Notice (Other) regarding 30(b)(6) Instructions. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Letter to Judge Smith regarding 30(b)(6) Instructions (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 4/17/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Memo ISO MS JMOL Non-Inf)(Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 348 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Daniel Wallach to Opinions Disclosed in his Expert Reports with supporting memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/16/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Letter to Judge Smith re Pearce Notebooks (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/29/2009, Entered: 3/29/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 343 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Microsoft Is Not Liable for Willful Infringement with supporting memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/29/2009, Entered: 3/29/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited re 344 Notice (Other) re: Microsoft's Knowledge of the Uniloc Patent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 3/28/2009, Entered: 3/28/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Letter to Judge Smith re PX 465 and 466 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 03/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Microsoft Is Not Liable for Willful Infringement by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 4/13/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Microsoft Is Not Liable for Willful Infringement)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 3/22/2009, Entered: 3/22/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation in Response to Mr. Bostock's Letter to Honorable William E. Smith on 3/22/09 (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 03/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited of Objection to Microsoft's Opening Statement Exhibit I-6 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST of Plaintiff for proceedings held on 03/18/2009 before Judge Smith.. (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc re 337 Notice (Other) letter to Judge Smith in response to Microsoft's objection to two Uniloc exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Microsoft Corporation for proceedings held on 03/18/2009 before Judge Smith.. (Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Objections to Uniloc's Hashing Documents (Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Microsoft Corporation re 335 Notice (Other). (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited of Objections to Microsoft's Exhibits for their Opening Statement (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 334 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document placed in vault #12. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 326 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/18/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Microsoft Corporation.(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by all plaintiffs in support of 328 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Untimely Damages Theory - Exhibit A. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 323 MOTION to Strike Uniloc's Proffered Testimony From Other Matters with supporting memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 328 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Defendant's Untimely Damages Theory with supporting memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/3/2009 (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by all plaintiffs in opposition to 306 Supplemental Memorandum in Support, - Microsoft's Supplemental Pretrial Memorandum - REDACTED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Redacted -, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E - Redacted -, # 6 Exhibit F - Redacted -, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Their Response to Defendant's Supplemental Pretrial Memorandum Under Seal by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 4/3/2009 (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 315 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eugene A. Feher. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/13/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motions in Limine held on March 3, 2009 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2009. (Clayton, Anne) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Uniloc's Proffered Testimony From Other Matters with supporting memo by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 4/2/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER on Motions in Limine and Trial Management Issues: denying 217 Motion in Limine; denying 220 Motion ; granting in part 234 Motion in Limine; denying 235 Motion in Limine; denying 236 Motion in Limine; denying 237 Motion in Limine; granting 238 Motion in Limine; denying 239 Motion in Limine; denying 240 Motion in Limine; denying 241 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 242 Motion in Limine; denying 243 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 244 Motion in Limine; denying 245 Motion in Limine; denying 246 Motion in Limine; granting in part 247 Motion in Limine; granting in part 249 Motion in Limine; denying 298 Motion to Bifurcate. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/16/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File testimony designations under seal by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 3/30/2009 (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF Submission of Designated Deposition Transcripts by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript of Tania Clubb (4/20/05), # 2 Exhibit B - Deposition Transcript of Timothy Cooper Part 1 (4/20/05), # 3 Exhibit B - Deposition Transcript of Timothy Cooper Part 2 (4/20/05), # 4 Exhibit C- Deposition Transcript of Cary Dreelan (10/6/05), # 5 Exhibit D - Deposition Transcript of Vance X. Gledhill Part 1 (4/27/05), # 6 Exhibit D - Deposition Transcript of Vance X. Gledhill Part 2 (4/27/05), # 7 Exhibit E - Deposition Transcript of Gregory Grundy (4/28/05), # 8 Exhibit F- Deposition Transcript of Daniel Petre Part 1 (4/27/05), # 9 Exhibit F - Deposition Transcript of Daniel Petre Part 2 (4/27/05))(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Jury Instructions)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Transcripts Under Seal by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 3/30/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - The Plaintiff is directed to file its objection and memorandum in support as to the viability of this theory of infringement by Tuesday, March, 17, 2009. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/12/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 315 MOTION for Eugene A. Feher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by all plaintiffs. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Eugene A. Feher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by all plaintiffs. (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time extend deadline to file trial exhibit lists by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 3/30/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 305 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura R. Braden. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/10/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 308 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/10/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 311 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document placed in vault# 12. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 303 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/10/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 305 MOTION for Laura R. Braden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Microsoft Corporation. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 3/27/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Daubert Hearing/Motions in Limine held on 2/27/09 before Judge William E. smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra D. Lajoie, Telephone number 401-952-2731. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/31/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2009. (Lajoie, Debra) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Supplemental Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Microsoft Corporation in support of 291 Pretrial Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Glitzenstein Declaration in support, # 2 Affidavit Ex A to Glitzenstein Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Ex B to Glitzenstein Declaration)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Laura R. Braden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by all plaintiffs in opposition to 249 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE UNILOC FROM USING FOR ANY PURPOSE EVIDENCE OF OTHER DISPUTES OR PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING MICROSOFT - Letter from Paul J. Hayes to The Honorable William E. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Jury Instructions 1 - 34)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 298 MOTION to Bifurcate Presentation of Liability Issues from that of Damages and Willfulness Issues UNDER SEAL filed by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST of Plaintiff for proceedings held on 2/272009 before Judge Smith.. (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff for proceedings held on 3/3/2009 before Judge Smith.. (Pizzi, Sheri) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Motion to Bifurcate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Bifurcate Presentation of Liability Issues from that of Damages and Willfulness Issues with supporting memo by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 3/23/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 03/03/09 before Judge Smith.. (Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 02/27/09 before Judge Smith.. (Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 295 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document placed in vault #12. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 290 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/3/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List re: Daubert Hearing held on 2/27/2009.(Smith, Rana) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 292 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Jury Instructions)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 291 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 3/16/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum to Pretrial Motion Redacted)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 207 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Judgment Accompanied by Opinion from the USCA for the Federal Circuit as to [202] Notice of Appeal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. "For the foregoing reasons, we conclude that Uniloc has presented a genuine issue of material fact as to whether Microsoft uses the same algorithm on the client and server side of the Product Activation system to generate licensee unique IDs. We REVERSE and REMAND the district court's summary judgment of noninfringment. We AFFIRM the district court's denial of Uniloc's motion for recusal." (Smith, Rana) Modified on 8/14/2008 modified wording "Federal Court" to Federal Circuit (Zinni, Concetta).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 289 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document placed in vault #12. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 206 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appeal Remark re [202] Notice of Appeal : Notice of Appeal forwarded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.(Doc.#145, 198, 199, 200) (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 254 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/25/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 205 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Uniloc USA, Inc for proceedings held on 5/1/06 Markman Hearing; 11/29/06 Summary Judgment Hearing; and 5/3/07 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Recusal. (Pizzi, Sheri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 287 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document placed in vault #12.. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appeal Record Returned: [203] Appeal Record Sent to USCA in error. Notice of Appeal forwarded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 253 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/25/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 204 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Uniloc USA, Inc for proceedings held on 5/1/06; 11/29/06; 5/3/07. (Pizzi, Sheri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 252 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/25/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 203 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007, Terminated: 11/29/2007 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [202] Notice of Appeal. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 284 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document placed in vault #12. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 67354 re [202] Notice of Appeal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 233 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/25/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 202 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPPEAL by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Appeal Record due by 12/17/2007. (Pizzi, Sheri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Documents: (unredacted version of documents) 256, 257, 262, and 264; placed in Vault #12. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting [201] JOINT Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 11/13/2007. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 276 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/20/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 201 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007, Terminated: 11/13/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss Remaining Claims and Counterclaims without Prejudice by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Microsoft Corporation.Responses due by 11/29/2007 (Pizzi, Sheri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 275 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/20/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 200 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT in favor of Microsoft Corporation against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/19/2007. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 274 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/20/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 199 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECISION AND ORDER - Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Uniloc's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 10/19/2007. (Baldinelli, Doreen) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2007 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 273 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/20/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 198 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF DECISION denying [194] Motion for Recusal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on June 14, 2007. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 255 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/20/2009. (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting [196] Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 06/01/2007. (Baldinelli, Doreen) Modified on 6/5/2007 added the word "Text" (Zinni, Concetta).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Seeking Damages by all plaintiffs. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 197 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [195] Response in Opposition to Motion for Recusal - REDACTED filed by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine to Preclude Uniloc from Offering Evidence or Testimony of Alleged Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness by all plaintiffs. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 196 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007, Terminated: 6/5/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 6/18/2007 (Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine to preclude the use of the Word "Registration" by all plaintiffs. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document -- Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document placed in vault. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Preclude Testimony of Brian Napper by all plaintiffs. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Motion to Seal . So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 05/31/2007. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 247 MOTION in Limine regarding Inequitable Conduct (Uniloc MIL No. 10) with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007, Terminated: 5/31/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal by Microsoft Corporation. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 246 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Martin Hellman (Uniloc MIL No. 9) MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Martin Hellman (Uniloc MIL No. 9) with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Roman, # 2 Exhibit A)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 195 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [194] MOTION for Recusal REDACTED VERSION with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 7# (2) Exhibit 8)(Cavanagh, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 245 MOTION in Limine regarding the Prosecution History of the Patent-In-Suit (Uniloc MIL No. 8) with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 194 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007, Terminated: 6/14/2007 Motion for Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Recusal by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 5/29/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit H# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Exhibit P# (17) Exhibit Q# (18) Exhibit R# (19) Exhibit S)(Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 244 MOTION in Limine regarding Cross-Examination of Mr. David Klausner (Uniloc MIL No. 7) with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 193 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 3, 2007 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter: Anne Clayton. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 249 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE UNILOC FROM USING FOR ANY PURPOSE EVIDENCE OF OTHER DISPUTES OR PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING MICROSOFT, 248 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE UNILOC FROM USING FOR ANY PURPOSE EVIDENCE OF OTHER DISPUTES OR PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING MICROSOFT With Supporting Memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 192 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Uniloc USA, Inc for proceedings held on 5/3/07 before Judge William J. Smith.. (Pizzi, Sheri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 243 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Referring at Trial to Alternative Theories of Infringement (Uniloc MIL No. 6) REDACTED with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 191 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Microsoft Corporation for proceedings held on 5/3/2007 before Judge Smith.. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 242 MOTION in Limine regarding the "VISTA" Version of Windows (Uniloc MIL No. 5) MOTION in Limine regarding the "VISTA" Version of Windows (Uniloc MIL No. 5) with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : Civil Hearing held on 5/3/2007.Dean G Bostock and Sheri L Pizzi for the Plaintiff. Frank E. Scherkenbach, Kurt L. Glitzenstein and Mary Dunn for Defendant. All counsel of record present. Arguments heard. Attorney Bostock to file pleading with the court within one week in regards to recusal. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton in Courtroom 2 at 12:02 pm.) (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 240 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Uniloc from Offering Evidence of Willful Infringement With Supporting Memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing reset for 5/3/2007 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 234 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Uniloc from Seeking Damages for or Referring to Microsoft's Foreign Sales and from Seeking Damages for Multiple Activations on a Single Computer REDACTED VERSION With Supporting Memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: The Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiff's request that this Court's intern not be allowed to work on this case, set forth in its correspondence to the Court dated April 23, 2007. Hearing set for 5/2/2007 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 241 MOTION in Limine to Limit Defendant's Invalidity Argument to the Grundy and Hellman Patents (Uniloc MIL No. 4) MOTION in Limine to Limit Defendant's Invalidity Argument to the Grundy and Hellman Patents (Uniloc MIL No. 4) with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 In Chambers Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ernest C. Torres : In Chambers Conference held on 2/20/2007; all counsel of record present (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 236 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Uniloc from Offering Evidence or Testimony of Alleged Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness and to Preclude Untimely Expert Opinions REDACTED VERSION With Supporting Memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit F - Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H - Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J - Filed Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit K - Filed Under Seal, # 12 Exhibit L - Filed Under Seal, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N - Filed Under Seal, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P - Filed Under Seal, # 17 Exhibit Q - Filed Under Seal, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S - Filed Under Seal, # 20 Exhibit T - Filed Under Seal, # 21 Exhibit U)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference re: Mediation set for 2/20/2007 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 214 before Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 239 MOTION in Limine regarding Profit Margins of the Accused Products (Uniloc MIL No. 3) REDACTED MOTION in Limine regarding Profit Margins of the Accused Products (Uniloc MIL No. 3) REDACTED with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rebecca Rogers, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-UNDER SEAL)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY re: [188] Notice (Other), [190] Notice (Other) - Modified text of the above entries to accurately reflect documents filed. Documents should not have been filed as Notices. (Zinni, Concetta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 238 MOTION in Limine regarding Non-U.S. Activations (Uniloc MIL No. 2) REDACTED MOTION in Limine regarding Non-U.S. Activations (Uniloc MIL No. 2) REDACTED with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rebecca Rogers, # 2 Exhibit A-UNDER SEAL)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 190 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY brief by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited to [188] ) Response Re: Technical Advisors (Bostock, Dean) Modified on 1/26/2007 - modified text to accurately reflect document filed (Zinni, Concetta).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 237 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Non-Infringement Arguments (Uniloc MIL No. 1) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Non-Infringement Arguments (Uniloc MIL No. 1) with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 189 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 29, 2006 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter: Anne Clayton.. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 229 Response in Opposition to Motion,, To Preclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Joseph Gemini- REDACTED with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rebecca Rogers, # 2 Exhibit A-UNDER SEAL, # 3 Exhibit B-UNDER SEAL)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 188 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Microsoft Corporation to Plaintiffs' 1-10-07 Bench Memorandum re Technical Advisors (Braden, Laura) Modified on 1/26/2007 - modified text to accurately reflect document filed(Zinni, Concetta).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 235 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Relying on Microsoft Documents that Use the Word "Registration" to Meet Their Burden of Showing That Product Activation is a "Registration System" REDACTED VERSION With Supporting Memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit F - Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit G - Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit H - Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Status Conference held on 1/10/2007. All counsel of record present. Dean Bostoch, Sheri Pezzi for Plaintiff. Frank E. Scherkenbach, Kurt L. Glitzenstein for Defendants. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton.) (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 228 Response in Opposition to Motion to Preclude Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness, Brian W. Napper - REDACTED VERSION with supporting memo filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G - Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit H - Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit I - Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit J - Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M, # 10 Exhibit N, # 11 Exhibit O)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 187 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Uniloc USA, Inc for proceedings held on 11/29/06 before Judge William E. Smith.. (Pizzi, Sheri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 3/6/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 186 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation for proceedings held on 11/29/2006 before Judge Smith.. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Motion in Limine Regarding Profit Margins by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference set for 1/10/2007 at 9:00 AM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Motion in Limine Regarding Non-U.S. Activations by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : Motion Hearing held on 11/29/2006 re [152] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity filed by Microsoft Corporation, [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct filed by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Dean Bostoch, Paul Hayes, Sherri Pizzi for Plaintiffs, Frank E. Scherkenbak for Defendant. All counsel of record present. Arguments heard. Status conference scheduled for January 10, 2007 at 9:00 a.m.(Court Reporter Anne clayton.) (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Exhibit E of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Infringment Arguments by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 185 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [184] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration Of David Klausner Opposing Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 231 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/10/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 184 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration Of David Klausner Opposing Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Invalidity by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 12/8/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 227 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/10/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2006 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE UNILOC FROM USING FOR ANY PURPOSE EVIDENCE OF OTHER DISPUTES OR PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING MICROSOFT WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Roman, # 2 Exhibit A - UNDER SEAL, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C- UNDER SEAL)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document is duplicative of #249; Motion to be terminated MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE UNILOC FROM USING FOR ANY PURPOSE EVIDENCE OF OTHER DISPUTES OR PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING MICROSOFT WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) Modified on 3/18/2009 (Smith, Rana). (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine regarding Inequitable Conduct (Uniloc MIL No. 10) with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reset Deadlines: Reply to Oppositions to Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/7/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Martin Hellman (Uniloc MIL No. 9) with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting [181] Motion for Extension of Time [181] Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time up to and including November 7, 2006 to Reply to Oppositions to Summary Judgment Motions. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 11/3/06. (Marseglia, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine regarding the Prosecution History of the Patent-In-Suit (Uniloc MIL No. 8) with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 181 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006, Terminated: 11/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Reply to Oppositions to Summary Judgment Motions by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 11/20/2006 (Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine regarding Cross-Examination of Mr. David Klausner (Uniloc MIL No. 7) with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion Forwarded to Chambers [181] Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Reply to Oppositions to Summary Judgment Motions FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Referring at Trial to Alternative Theories of Infringement (Uniloc MIL No. 6) with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion Forwarded to Chambers [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152), [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine regarding the "VISTA" Version of Windows (Uniloc MIL No. 5) with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 180 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Bostock, Dean) Modified on 10/17/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen). Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen). Modified on 11/8/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Limit Defendant's Invalidity Argument to the Grundy and Hellman Patents (Uniloc MIL No. 4) with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 179 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS and Disputed Facts by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation re [178] Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Cavanagh, Joseph) Modified on 10/17/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Preclude Uniloc from Offering Evidence of Willful Infringement with supporting memo by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Roman, # 2 Exhibit A-UNDER SEAL)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 178 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conductwith supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Kurt L. Glitzenstein# (2) Exhibit 2- Glitzenstein Declaration# (3) Exhibit 1-Glitzenstein declaration# (4) Exhibit 7-Glitzenstein Declaration# (5) Exhibit 8-Glitzenstein declaration# (6) Exhibit 9-Glitzenstein declaration# (7) Exhibit 16-Glitzenstein declaration# (8) Exhibit 20-Glitzenstein declaration# (9) Exhibit 21-Glitzenstein declaration# (10) Exhibit 22-Glitzenstein declaration# (11) Exhibit 23-Glitzenstein declaration# (12) Exhibit 24-Glitzenstein declaration# (13) Exhibit 25-Glitzenstein declaration# (14) Exhibit 26-Glitzenstein declaration# (15) Exhibit 27-Glitzenstein declaration# (16) Exhibit 28-Glitzenstein declaration# (17) Exhibit 29-Glitzenstein declaration# (18) Exhibit 31-Glitzenstein declaration)(Cavanagh, Joseph) Modified on 10/17/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine regarding Profit Margins of the Accused Products (Uniloc MIL No. 3) REDACTED with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit D - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit E - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit F - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit G - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit H)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 177 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Documents filed by Uniloc placed in Vault 12. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine regarding Non-U.S. Activations (Uniloc MIL No. 2) REDACTED with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit C - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit D - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal))(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document filed by Defendant. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Non-Infringement Arguments (Uniloc MIL No. 1) with Supporting Memo by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E - REDACTED (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit F)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER granting [] Motion to Seal . So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 10/13/06. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Preclude Uniloc from Offering Evidence or Testimony of Alleged Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness and to Preclude Untimely Expert Opinions with supporting memo Ex A and F UNDER SEAL by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Roman, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006, Terminated: 10/13/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Microsoft Corporation. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Relying on Microsoft Documents that Use the Word "Registration" to Meet Their Burden of Showing That Product Activation is a "Registration System" with supporting memo by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Roman, # 2 Exhibit A-UNDER SEAL, # 3 Exhibit B-UNDER SEAL, # 4 Exhibit C-UNDER SEAL, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E-UNDER SEAL)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reset Deadlines as to [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152), [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct. Responses due by 10/16/2006 Replies due by 11/3/2006. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude Uniloc from Seeking Damages for or Referring to Microsoft's Foreign Sales and from Seeking Damages for Multiple Activations on a Single Computer with REDACTED supporting memo by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rebecca Rogers, # 2 Exhibit A)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER granting [175] Motion for Extension of Time to file oppositions and replies to [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152), [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct . So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 9/29/06. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented MOTION for Extension of Time for the Court to reset the dates for opposition and reply summary judgment briefs by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 10/16/2006 (Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Assented To by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/27/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion Forwarded to Chambers [175] Assented MOTION for Extension of Time for the Court to reset the dates for opposition and reply summary judgment briefs FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition of Defendant's Motion to Preclude Testimony by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY; Document #(157) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of (165) was deleted in error. ACCORDING TO ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE 4 (b) (1) (A), THIS DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED CONVENTIONALLY AND HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM THE DOCKET. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Motions In Limine by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/26/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 172 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document placed in Vault 12 (Microsoft's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity and Statement of Undisputed Facts. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 229 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 217 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Gemini REDACTED VERSION filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Redacted, # 2 Exhibit B - Redacted, # 3 Exhibit C - Redacted, # 4 Exhibit D - Redacted, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F - Redacted, # 7 Exhibit G - Redacted, # 8 Exhibit H - Redacted, # 9 Exhibit I - Redacted, # 10 Exhibit J - Redacted, # 11 Exhibit K - Redacted, # 12 Exhibit L - Redacted, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O - Redacted, # 16 Exhibit P - Redacted, # 17 Exhibit Q - Redacted)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY re: [167] Declaration,, [169] Declaration, [170] Declaration, [168] Declaration, [156] Declaration, ERROR: Documents filed in duplicate. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 228 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 220 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness, Brian W. Napper REDACTED VERSION with supporting memo filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 171 Filed: 9/23/2006, Entered: 9/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152) of Laura R. Braden (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 156) by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C part 1# (4) Exhibit C part 2# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Exhibit I# (11) Exhibit J# (12) Exhibit K# (13) Exhibit L# (14) Exhibit M# (15) Exhibit N# (16) Exhibit O# (17) Exhibit P# (18) Exhibit Q# (19) Exhibit R# (20) Exhibit S# (21) Exhibit T# (22) Exhibit U# (23) Exhibit V# (24) Exhibit W# (25) Exhibit X# (26) Exhibit Y# (27) Exhibit Z# (28) Exhibit AA# (29) Exhibit BB# (30) Exhibit CC# (31) Exhibit DD part 1# (32) Exhibit DD part 2# (33) Exhibit DD part 3# (34) Exhibit DD part 4# (35) Exhibit EE part 1# (36) Exhibit EE part 2# (37) Exhibit EE part 3# (38) Exhibit EE part 4)(Cavanagh, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Documents UNDER SEAL by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/26/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 170 Filed: 9/23/2006, Entered: 9/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERROR: Duplicate filingDECLARATION re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152) of Sunil Swami (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 160) by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cavanagh, Joseph) Modified on 9/26/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Trial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL NOTICE (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 169 Filed: 9/23/2006, Entered: 9/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERROR: Duplicate filingDECLARATION re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152) of Caglar Gunyakti (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 158) by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) Modified on 9/26/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Calendar Call set for 2/20/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 168 Filed: 9/23/2006, Entered: 9/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERROR: Duplicate filingDECLARATION re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152) of Aidan Hughes (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 159) by Microsoft Corporation. (Cavanagh, Joseph) Modified on 9/26/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 224 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document placed in vault #12. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 9/23/2006, Entered: 9/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERROR: Duplicate filingDECLARATION re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152) of Dan Wallach (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt#161) by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Cavanagh, Joseph) Modified on 9/26/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 223 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document placed in vault # 12. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 166 Filed: 9/23/2006, Entered: 9/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 162) by Microsoft Corporation re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152). (Cavanagh, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 219 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/3/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 165 Filed: 9/23/2006, Entered: 9/23/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 152) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 10/10/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment (CORRECTED FILING, please see dkt# 157))(Cavanagh, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 218 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/3/2009. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Documents placed in Vault 12 (Delcarations of Laura Braden, Dan S. Wallach, Ph.D., Aidan Hughes, Caglar Gunyakti, and Sunil Swami). (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness, Brian W. Napper by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/17/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit A-redacted, # 3 Exhibit B-redacted, # 4 Exhibit C-redacted, # 5 Exhibit D- Order dated 3/17/2008)(Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document placed in Vault 12. Microsoft's Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Testimony by all plaintiffs. (Geile, Wendy) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 164 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RETURNING DOCUMENT Returned Document MicroSoft's Motion for Summary Judgment and Declaration as to Defendant. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 9/22/06. (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 9/22/2006 (Saucier, Martha).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Memo in support of Motion to Preclude Testimony of Gemini UNDER SEAL by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/12/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 163 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RETURNING DOCUMENT Returned Document Statement of Material Undisputed Facts as to Defendant.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 9/22/06. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Gemini WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 2/12/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Memo ISO to Preclude Testimony of Gemini)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 162 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Microsoft Corporation re [152] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity. (Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Voir Dire by Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 161 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [152] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of Dan Wallach by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 160 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [152] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of Sunil Swami by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited.(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 159 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Aidan Hughes by Microsoft Corporation. (Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Withdrawal of Laura R. Braden (Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 158 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [152] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of Caglar Gunyakti by Microsoft Corporation. (Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 DeclarationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 211 Response in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Further Motion for Summary Judgement of Invalidity and Non-Infringement by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 156 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERROR: Duplicate filingDECLARATION re [152] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity by Laura R. Braden by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C part 1# (4) Exhibit C part 2# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Exhibit I# (11) Exhibit J# (12) Exhibit K# (13) Exhibit L# (14) Exhibit M# (15) Exhibit N# (16) Exhibit O# (17) Exhibit P# (18) Exhibit Q# (19) Exhibit R# (20) Exhibit S# (21) Exhibit T# (22) Exhibit U# (23) Exhibit V# (24) Exhibit W# (25) Exhibit X# (26) Exhibit Y# (27) Exhibit Z# (28) Exhibit AA# (29) Exhibit BB# (30) Exhibit CC# (31) Exhibit DD part1# (32) Exhibit DD part 2# (33) Exhibit DD part 3# (34) Exhibit DD part 4)(Braden, Laura) Modified on 9/26/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 209 MOTION for Leave to File A Further Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Glitzenstein, Kurt) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 155 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Microsoft Corporation in support of [153] Declaration of Laura Braden exhibit D. (Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 209 MOTION for Leave to File A Further Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement filed by Uniloc USA, Inc, Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 154 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Microsoft Corporation in support of [153] Declaration of Laura Braden Exhibit C part 2. (Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File A Further Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Non-Infringement by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 11/10/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Mary C. Dunn, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Cavanagh, Joseph) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 153 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [152] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of Laura R. Braden by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C part 1)(Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 202 Notice of Appeal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. - AFFIRMED-IN-PART, REVERSED-IN-PART, AND REMANDED. "For the foregoing reasons, we conclude that Uniloc has presented a genuine issue of material fact as to whether Microsoft uses the same algorithm on the client and server side of the Product Activation system to generate licensee unique IDs. We REVERSE and REMAND the district court's summary judgment of noninfringment. We AFFIRM the district court's denial of Uniloc's motion for recusal." (Smith, Rana) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 152 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006, Terminated: 9/22/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 10/10/2006 (Braden, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 151 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited re [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct. (Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 150 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct of Dean G. Bostock In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue of Inequitable Conduct by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M)(Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 149 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited in support of [148] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct. (Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 148 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2007 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On The Issue Of Inequitable Conduct by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 10/10/2006 (Bostock, Dean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 147 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [146] Motion to Seal . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 9/14/06. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [146] MOTION to Seal REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006, Terminated: 9/15/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal by Microsoft Corporation. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge David L. Martin added. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 145 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECISION AND ORDER re: disputed patent claim terms. Signed by Judge William E Smith on 8/22/06. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 144 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [143] Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge William E Smith on 7/24/06. (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 143 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006, Terminated: 7/24/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ASSENTED TO MOTION to Modify [136] Scheduling Order as follows:Deadline for filing Motions for Summary Judgment to thirty (30) days after the Court's decision regarding disputed claim, Oppositions due 14 days after the filing of any such motions; Replies to oppositions due ten (10) days thereafter. by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 8/7/2006 (Attachments: # (1) proposed revised scheduling order)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 1, 2006 before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter: Anne Clayton.. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : Civil Hearing held on 5/1/2006. Dean Bostock, Paul Hayes, Francis Connor for Uniloc, Frank Scherkenback, Kurt Glitzenstein, Mary Dunn, Laura Bracken for Microsoft. All counsel of record present; Arguments heard, Court will take the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton.) (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief (Baldinelli, Doreen) Modified on 3/29/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen). Could not be scanned - exceeds system page capacity.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 140 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Dan s. Wallach, Ph.D in support of [139]Defendant's Claim Construction Brief. (Baldinelli, Doreen) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Claim Construction Brief - Could not be scanned - Exceeds system page capacity. (Baldinelli, Doreen) Modified on 3/20/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 138 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of David Klausner re [137] Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 137 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 136 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge William E Smith on 2/1/06. (faxed to counsel of record)(Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 135 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge William E Smith on 1/26/06. (faxed to counsel of record)(Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Tutorial Hearing set for 4/5/2006 09:30 AM before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/1/2006 09:30 AM before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : Telephone Conference held on 1/26/2006. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 5, 2006 before Judge David L. Martin. Court Reporter: Joseph Fontes.. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2006 09:30 AM before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 133 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT DESIGNATION OF Patent Claim Terms in Dispute (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 132 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [129] Assented-to Motion for Leave to Exchange Additional Claim Terms . Signed by Judge William E Smith on 1/12/06. (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 131 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Microsoft Corporation for proceedings held on 1/5/06 before Magistrate Judge Martin. Forwarded to Joe Fontes (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 130 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [117] Motion to Compel Production of Patent License Agreement . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 1/10/06. Forwarded to counsel (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 129 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006, Terminated: 1/13/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ASSENTED TO MOTION for Leave to Exchange Additional Claim Terms by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 1/26/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin : Motion Hearing held on 1/5/2006 re [117] MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreement filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited,. Sheri Pizzi and Paul Cronin for the plaintiffs; Mary Dunn and Laura Braden for the defendant. All counsel of record present; Attorneys argue; Court grants the motion to compel. Plaintiff to prepare an order. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document placed in Vault 12. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 127 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [126] Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Under Seal. Signed by Judge William E Smith on 1/4/06. (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 126 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005, Terminated: 1/4/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to file Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Production of License Agreement under seal. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 1/13/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 124 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Laura R. Branden re [119] Response in Opposition to Motion. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 125 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Microsoft Corporation in support of [118] MOTION for Leave to Exchange Additional Claim Terms. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reset Deadlines as to [118] MOTION for Leave to Exchange Additional Claim Terms. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2006 02:00 PM before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines as to [118] MOTION for Leave to Exchange Additional Claim Terms. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2005 09:30 AM before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 122 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER withdrawing [116] Motion to Compel . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 12/6/05. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [118] MOTION for Leave to Exchange Additional Claim Terms REFERRED to Judge Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to [117] MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreement. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 123 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [118] MOTION for Leave to Exchange Additional Claim Terms filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 121 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Denis Ticak in support of [119] Response in Opposition to Motion. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 120 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Denis Ticak re [119] Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # (1) Microsoft PressPass# (2) Timeline of InterTrust Patent Infringement Lawsuit)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 119 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [117] MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreement filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [117] MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreement REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [116] MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreement REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 118 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exchange Additional Claim Terms WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 12/5/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Microsoft's List of Claim Terms to Exchange with Uniloc)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 1/11/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreement WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 11/30/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Windows XP Product Activation# (2) Exhibit Microsoft Settlement# (3) Exhibit Letter dated October 20, 2005# (4) Exhibit Via Facsimile dated October 24, 2005# (5) Exhibit Letter dated October 25, 2005# (6) Exhibit Letter dated October 28, 2005# (7) Exhibit Via Facsimile dated October 31, 2005# (8) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and/or things)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 116 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreement WITH ATTACHED MEMO by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 11/23/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 115 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [114] Motion for Extension of Time . Signed by Judge William E Smith on 9/22/05. (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [114] MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadlines REFERRED to Judge Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 114 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005, Terminated: 9/23/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION to Extend Remaining Expert Discovery Deadlines from October 3, 2005 to November 7, 2005 by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 10/4/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 113 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [111] Motion to Grant a Commission to Counsel to Administer Oaths . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 9/12/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 112 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Microsoft Corporation in support of [111] MOTION to Grant a Commission to Counsel to Administer Oaths to Deponents Located in Australia. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 111 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ASSENTED TO MOTION to Grant a Commission to Counsel to Administer Oaths to Deponents Located in Australia by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 9/16/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 110 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [101] Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 7/29/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 109 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [96] Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge David L. Martin on 7/26/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [101] MOTION for Application for a Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance (Mr. Cary Dreelan) REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 108 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [92] Motion for Attorney Fees . Signed by Judge David L. Martin on 7/14/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 107 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrae Judge David L. Martin : Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2005 re [92] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Microsoft Corporation,, [96] MOTION to Compel filed by Microsoft Corporation,. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 106 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [104] Motion Motion for In camera Review of the Declaration of Doris M. Fournier . Signed by Judge David L. Martin on 7/13/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 105 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [103] Motion to File Declaration of Doris Fournier Under Seal . Signed by Judge David L. Martin on 7/13/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005, Terminated: 7/13/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Request for In Camera Review of the Declaration of Doris M. Fournier by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. Responses due by 7/26/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 103 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005, Terminated: 7/13/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to file Declaration of Doris M. Fournier under Seal by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 102 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Opposition and Memorandum re [96] MOTION to Compel filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # (1))(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 101 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Application for a Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance (Mr. Cary Dreelan) by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 7/25/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motions No Longer Referred to Judge Smith: [92] MOTION for Attorney Fees (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [92] MOTION for Attorney Fees REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [92] MOTION for Attorney Fees REFERRED to Judge Judge Smith. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 100 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [92] MOTION for Application for Fees Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 37(a)(4)(A) filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 99 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [95] Motion to Seal Memo in Support of Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel Documents . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 6/30/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 6/30/2005 (Saucier, Martha). Memo placed in Magistrate Judge Vault
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [96] MOTION to Compel REFERRED to MJ Martin. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 96 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005, Terminated: 7/26/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EMERGENCY MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's to Produce Documents Improperly withheld on the Basis of Third-Party Confidentiality by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 7/13/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 95 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005, Terminated: 6/30/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to file its Memorandum in Support of its Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiff's to Produce Documents Improperly witheld on the basis of Third-Party Confidentiality and the Declaration of Denis Ticak in Support thereof Under Seal by Microsoft Corporation. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 94 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Stephen J. Reid, Jr. in support of re [92] MOTION for Application for Fees Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(4)(A). (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 93 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Denis Ticak in support of re [92] MOTION for Application for Fees Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(4)(A). (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 92 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005, Terminated: 7/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Application for Fees Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(4)(A)by Microsoft Corporation.Responses due by 7/11/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 91 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [79] Motion Emergency Motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code . Signed by Judge David L. Martin on 6/24/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 90 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER withdrawing [77] Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge David L. Martin on 6/17/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reset Hearings: re [77] Motion to Compel filed by Microsoft Corporation, Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 89 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of Microsoft Corporation's re [77] Motion to Compel responses to its interrogatories Nos. 8 and 20 filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [85] Motion Modify Court's Amended Pretrial Order . Signed by Judge William E Smith on June 10, 2005. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/1/2005. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2006; Reply Memoranda by 4/10/2006. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/27/05 before Magistrate Judge Davi Martin on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Uniloc USA, Inc. for proceedings held on 5/27/05 before Magistrate Judge Martin. Original Tape and docket forwarded to Joseph Fontes (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005, Terminated: 6/10/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ASSENTED TO MOTION and Memorandum to Modify the Court's Amended Pretrial Order for an additional one month to complete discovery and prepare the case for trial. by Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 6/20/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: re [77] Motion to Compel filed by Microsoft Corporation, Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 6/1/2005 (Saucier, Martha).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 84 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Laura R. Braden in Support re [80] Objection to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an order allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Source Code (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore to [77-1] motion to Compel responses to its Interrogatories Nos 8 and 20 (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute entry: Hearing held on Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code before Magistrate Judge David Martin (Saucier, M) Modified on 05/31/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [77-1] motion to Compel responses to its Interrogatories Nos 8 and 20 referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion hearing re: [79-1] motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code Motion hearing held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Dean Bostock for the plaintiffs; Kurt Glitzenstein for the defendant; All counsel of record present. Both sides argue. Court denies the motion for an order allowing expert witness access to defendant's computer source code. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Laura R. Braden Re: [80-1] motion response (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Microsoft Corp. to [79-1] motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion hearing re: [79-1] motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code at 2:00 5/27/05 before Magistrate Judge David Martin (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion(s) referred: [79-1] emergency motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) no longer referred to Judge Smith: [79-1] emergency motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005, Terminated: 6/24/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EMERGENCY MOTION and Memorandum by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [79-1] motion for an Order Allowing Expert Witness Access to Defendant's Computer Source Code referred to Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Denis Ticak Re: [77-1] motion to Compel responses to its Interrogatories Nos 8 and 20 (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION and Memornadum by Microsoft Corp. to Compel responses to its Interrogatories Nos 8 and 20 (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [74-1] motion for Dean Bostock, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Dean G. Bostock added to the database. ( signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (Faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [70-1] motion to modify the Court's Amended Pretrial Order for additional time to complete factual discovery will be closed by July 1, 2005; and expert discovery by September 2, 2005; rebuttal expert witness report by October 3, 2005; Disp motions by February 17, 2006; Pretrial memoranda by 45 days after a decision on disp motions or if no disp motions filed 45 days after a decision; ( signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery deadline on 7/1/05 Deadline for filing of all dispositive motions by 2/17/06 (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005, Terminated: 5/5/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore for Dean Bostock, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [72-1] motion to Grant Commissions to Counsel to Adminster Oaths to Deponents Located in Australia (signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005, Terminated: 4/13/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EMERGENCY ASSENTED to MOTION and memorandum by Microsoft Corp. to Grant Commissions to Counsel to Adminster Oaths to Deponents Located in Australia (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Referring Case to ADR ( signed by Judge William E. Smith ) (Faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **Set Alternative Dispute Resolution Flag (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [70-1] motion to modify the Court's Amended Pretrial Order for additional time to complete factual discovery will be closed by July 1, 2005; and expert discovery by September 2, 2005; rebuttal expert witness report by October 3, 2005; Disp motions by February 17, 2006; Pretrial memoranda by 45 days after a decision on disp motions or if no disp motions filed 45 days after a decision; referred to Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005, Terminated: 4/29/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ASSENTED TO MOTION and memorandum by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore to modify the Court's Amended Pretrial Order for additional time to complete factual discovery will be closed by July 1, 2005; and expert discovery by September 2, 2005; rebuttal expert witness report by October 3, 2005; Disp motions by February 17, 2006; Pretrial memoranda by 45 days after a decision on disp motions or if no disp motions filed 45 days after a decision; (Baldinelli, D) Modified on 03/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF Hearing held before Magistrate Judge David Martin on Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order Concerning Discovery of Source Code; Defendant's Motion to Compel a Supplemental Answer to Interrogatory #1; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Defendant's Source Code and Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order Concerning Discovery of Infringement Contentions held on 1/27/05 (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim held on January 27, 2005 (Mercurio, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore to the First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and [35-1] counter claim, [7-1] counter claim (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript requested; Discovery motion hearing held on 1/27/05 before Magistrate Judge David Martin. (Original Tape, transcript request and docket sent to Al Galucci/Joe Fontes) (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [37-1] motion to Dismiss Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaim alleging inequitable conduct pursuant to Fed. R. Civ.P.12(b)(6) ( signed by Judge William E. Smith ) faxed to all counsel of record. (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [49-1] motion to Compel production of Mircrosoft Corporation's Source Code, denying [49-2] motion for Protective Order concerning discovery of Plaintiff's infringement contentions at this time., granting [42-1] motion to Compel Plaintiffs' to supplement their answer to Microsoft's interrogatory No.1, denying [41-1] motion for Protective Order concerning discovery of Microsoft's source code ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) forwarded to all counsel of record (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute entry: Hearing held before Magistrate Judge David Martin on Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order Concerning Discovery of Source Code; Defendant's Motion to Compel a Supplemental Answer to Interrogatory #1; Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Source Code and Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order COncerning Discovery of Infringement Contentions. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY of appearance for Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Singapore by Andria Coletta, Esquire (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute entry: Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim held before Judge William E. Smith (Baldinelli, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion hearing re: [49-1] motion to Compel production of Mircrosoft Corporation's Source Code Motion hearing held, [49-2] motion for Protective Order concerning discovery of Plaintiff's infringement contentions at this time. Motion hearing held, [42-1] motion to Compel Plaintiffs' to supplement their answer to Microsoft's interrogatory No.1 Motion hearing held, [41-1] motion for Protective Order concerning discovery of Microsoft's source code Motion hearing held before Magistrate Judge David Martin. Andria Coletta and Paul Cronin for the plaintiffs; Joseph Cavanagh, Kurt Glitzenstein and Laura Braden for the defendant. All counsel of record present. Mr. Glitzenstein argues on behalf of the defendant. Mr. Cronin argues on behalf of the plaintiffs. Both sides give rebuttal. Court to issue a written order. Court denies defendant's motion for a protective order concerning discovery of source code. Court grants defendant's motion to compel a supplemental answer to interrogatory #1. Court grants plaintiffs' motion to compel production of source code. Court denies plaintiff's motion for a protective order concerning discovery of infringement contentions. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 357 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?