Bourque, et al v. Pawtucket S.C., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00441-S
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Steven Bourque, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy R. Tabor +7271 727 727 1616 +7266 726 726 6340 htcamy@yahoo.com
No Logo Vidabeth Bourque, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy R. Tabor +7271 727 727 1616 +7266 726 726 6340 htcamy@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo City of Pawtucket, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Pawtucket School Committe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Pawtucket School Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Office Providence
Filed 9/26/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 20 U.S.C. § 1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 12/22/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice signed by Judge William E. Smith (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, A) Modified on 12/22/2003
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003
    Case closed (Mercurio, A)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003
      Ptf.'s Rule 16 Statement forwarded to chambers (Mercurio, A)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003
        Rule 16 Conference set 8:30 11/20/03 Before Judge William E. Smith (Mercurio, A)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003
          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Pawtucket S.C. 10/21/03 Answer due on 11/10/03 for Pawtucket S.C. (Baldinelli, D)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003
            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to City of Pawtucket 10/8/03 Answer due on 10/28/03 for City of Pawtucket (Baldinelli, D)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 Summons Returned Executed
              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Pawt. School Dept. 10/8/03 Answer due on 10/28/03 for Pawt. School Dept. (Baldinelli, D)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003, Terminated: 12/22/2003 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint by Pawtucket S.C., Pawt. School Dept., City of Pawtucket (Attorney John R. Mahoney), (Baldinelli, D)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003
                  AMENDED COMPLAINT preliminary statement by Steven Bourque, Vidabeth Bourque , (Answer due 10/20/03 for City of Pawtucket, for Pawt. School Dept., for Pawtucket S.C. ) amending [1-1] complaint (Baldinelli, D)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003
                    COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 55291 (McCabe, F)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003
                      CASE assigned to Judge William E. Smith . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (McCabe, F)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 80 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?