PSW v. VISA, USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00347-T-LDA
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 30, 2017 at 6:56 PM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo P.s.w. Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Paul Steiner(Designation Pro Bono) +1 310 557 8422 +5560 556 556 0336

Toggle Switch Represented by Sinapi Formisano & Company, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space V. Edward Formisano +9449 944 944 9690 +9439 943 943 9040 edf@sfclaw.com
Space Richard A. Sinapi +9449 944 944 9690 +9439 943 943 9040 dicks@sfclaw.com
No Logo First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo First Financial Bank, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Edward Moll, Esq. +1 202 383 6966 +1 202 383 6610 mollp@howrey.com
Space Brian D. Wallach +1 202 383 7005 +1 202 383 6610 wallachb@howrey.com
No Logo First Financial Bank, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Edward Moll, Esq. +1 202 383 6966 +1 202 383 6610 mollp@howrey.com
Space Brian D. Wallach +1 202 383 7005 +1 202 383 6610 wallachb@howrey.com
MasterCard International, Inc. MasterCard International, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mastercard International Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce A. Colbath +1 212 310 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay N. Fastow +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 fastowj@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr. +8318 831 831 8900 +7517 751 751 7542 jvc@blishcavlaw.com
Space Staci L. Kolb +8318 831 831 8900 +7517 751 751 7542 slk@blishcavlaw.com
Visa, Inc. Visa, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "VISA, USA, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia A. Sullivan +1 401 276 6437 +1 888 325 9067 psullivan@edwardsangell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel H. Bookin(Designation Pro Bono) +1 415 984 8786 +9848 984 984 8701
Space Randall W. Edwards +1 415 984 8700 +1 415 984 8701 REdwards@omm.com
Space Jonathan D. Hacker(Designation Pro Bono) +1 415 984 8786 +9848 984 984 8701
No Logo John Lombardi, Counter-Defendant
No Logo P.s.w. Inc., Counter-Defendant
MasterCard International, Inc. MasterCard International, Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Mastercard International Incorporated"
Office Providence
Filed 8/16/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 810 - Selective Service
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Providence
Terminated 9/19/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (140) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 108 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Court Filing
Stipulation of Dismissal by PSW, Inc., VISA, USA, Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated, First Financial Bank, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, First Financial Bank, First Data Merchant Services Corporation, Mastercard International Incorporated, John Lombardi, PSW, Inc. of all claims, counterclaims, and cross-claims asserted in this litigation with prejudice without any award of costs to any party. Entered by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 9/19/06. (Jackson, Ryan)
    LREF
    Legal Document 107 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
    STIPULATION (Joint) and Order of Dismssal with Prejudice of all Claims, Counterclaims and Cross-claims Asserted in this Litigation by PSW, Inc., VISA, USA, Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated, First Financial Bank, First Data Merchant Services Corporation. (Sullivan, Patricia)
      LREF
      Legal Document 106 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [104] Motion for Extension of Time ; no further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 6/20/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
        LREF
        Legal Document 105 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER granting [103] Motion for Extension of Time ; no further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 6/20/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006
          Motion Forwarded to Chambers [104] MOTION for Extension of Time, [103] MOTION for Extension of Time FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
            LREF
            Legal Document 104 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006, Terminated: 6/20/2006 Terminated:
            Assented-To Motion for an Extension of Time Within Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaim by PSW, Inc. Responses due by 6/29/2006 (Leyva, Lucia)
              LREF
              Legal Document 103 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 6/20/2006 Terminated:
              Assented-To MOTION for an Extension of Time in which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Cross-Claim of First Financial Bank by Mastercard International Incorporated. Responses due by 6/23/2006 (Leyva, Lucia)
                LREF
                Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [100] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim; PSW, Inc. answer due 6/12/2006. Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 5/23/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 101 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [99] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Crossclaim; Mastercard International Incorporated answer due 6/12/2006. Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 5/23/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006
                    Motion Forwarded to Chambers [100] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, [99] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 100 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006, Terminated: 5/23/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Assented-To MOTION for an Extension of Time Within Which to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaim by PSW, Inc. Responses due by 5/30/2006. (Leyva, Lucia)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 99 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006, Terminated: 5/23/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                        Assented-To MOTION for an Extension of Time Within Which to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Crossclaims by Mastercard International Incorporated. Responses due by 5/30/2006. (Leyva, Lucia)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 98 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [97] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mastercard International Incorporated answer to cross-claim of First Financial Bank due 5/11/2006 . Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 5/4/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006
                            Motion Forwarded to Chambers [97] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [88] Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006, Terminated: 5/4/2006 Terminated:
                              ASSENTED-TO MOTION for an Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to [88] Crossclaim by Mastercard International Incorporated. Responses due by 5/8/2006 (Leyva, Lucia)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 96 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [95] Motion for Extension of Time . Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 4/11/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006, Terminated: 4/11/2006 Terminated:
                                  Assented-To MOTION for an Extension of Time within which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Counterclaim of First Financial Bank and First Data Merchant Services Corporation by PSW, Inc. Responses due by 4/28/2006 (Leyva, Lucia)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 94 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/15/2006; Motions due by 9/15/2006 as to Phase I of the matter; the matter is referred to Magistrate Jugde Lovegreen for a Settlement Confernece in early-May 2006. Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 4/10/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006
                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2006 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. (Saucier, Martha)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [92] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Randall W. Edwards . Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 4/6/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Rule 16 Conference
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ernest C. Torres : Rule 16 Conference held on 4/6/2006; all counsel of record present (Jackson, Ryan)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 92 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006, Terminated: 4/6/2006 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                            MOTION for Randall W. Edwards, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by VISA, USA, Inc. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: VISA, USA, Inc. answer due 3/22/2006; Mastercard International Incorporated answer due 3/22/2006; First Financial Bank answer due 3/22/2006; First Data Merchant Services Corporation answer due 3/22/2006. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 90 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 StipulationCourt Filing
                                                STIPULATION by PSW, Inc., VISA, USA, Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated, First Financial Bank, First Data Merchant Services Corporation entered by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 3/24/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
                                                  SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to John Lombardi filed by First Financial Bank and First Data Merchant Services Corporation. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 89 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Mastercard International Incorporated.(Leyva, Lucia)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 88 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Mastercard International Incorporated, COUNTERCLAIM against John Lombardi and PSW, Inc. by First Financial Bank and First Data Merchant Services Corporation.(Leyva, Lucia)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 87 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by VISA, USA, Inc.(Leyva, Lucia)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 86 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006
                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Petition for Appointment of a Receiver by PSW, Inc. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006
                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 4/6/2006 09:30 AM in Chief Judge Torres Chambers - Room 211 before Judge Ernest C. Torres; notice faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 85 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [59] Motion to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part [61] Motion to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part [62] Motion to Dismiss; Defendants' motions to dismiss Counts 1,2,3,4,6,9,10 and 11 are hereby GRANTED and these counts are dismissed as to all defendants; defendants' motion to dismiss Counts 5,7 and 8 are hereby DENIED as to all defendants. Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 2/28/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS . Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 2/28/06; faxed to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 83 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                  LIMITED OBJECTION to [80] Report and Recommendations WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by VISA, USA, Inc. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 82 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                    OBJECTION to [80] Report and Recommendations WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Mastercard International Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 81 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                      OBJECTION to [80] Report and Recommendations WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by PSW, Inc. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006
                                                                        Motion Forwarded to Chambers [80] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [59] Motion to Dismiss filed by Mastercard International Incorporated,, [62] Motion to Dismiss filed by First Financial Bank,, First Data Merchant Services Corporation,, [61] Motion to Dismiss filed by VISA, USA, Inc., FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006, Terminated: 2/28/2006 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Counts 1,2,3,4,6,9,10 and 11 be GRANTED and that these counts be dismissed as to all Defendants. Recommending that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Counts 5,7 and 8 be DENIED as to all Defendants. [59] Motion to Dismiss filed by Mastercard International Incorporated,, [62] Motion to Dismiss filed by First Financial Bank,, First Data Merchant Services Corporation,, [61] Motion to Dismiss filed by VISA, USA, Inc., Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/3/06. Sent to counsel.(Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on November 2, 2005 before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Court Reporter: Maryann V. Young. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Patricia Rocha for proceedings held on 11/2/05 before Magistrate Judge Almond. Sent to Maryann Young. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Staci Kolb for proceedings held on 11/2/05 before MJ Almond. Sent to Maryann Young. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Robert Iaciofano for proceedings held on 11/2/05 before Magistrate Judge Almond. Transcript Request, docket and tapes sent to Maryann Young. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond : Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2005 re [59] Motion to Dismiss filed by Mastercard International Incorporated,, [62] Motion to Dismiss filed by First Financial Bank,, First Data Merchant Services Corporation,, [61] Motion to Dismiss filed by VISA, USA, Inc.,. (Sinapi, Formisano, Rocha, Wallach, Hacker, Edwards, Colbath, Kolb) Attys argue; Court takes under advisement; R&R to follow (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by PSW, Inc. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Mastercard International Incorporated. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 73 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER . Signed by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/28/05. Forwarded to counsel.(Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [62] Motion to Dismiss, [61] Motion to Dismiss, [59] Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Forwarded to all counsel of record. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005
                                                                                              [12] Motion to Dismiss, [11] Motion to Dismiss, [14] Motion to Dismiss, [59] Motion to Dismiss, [62] Motion to Dismiss, [61] Motion to Dismiss REFERRED to Judge Magistrate Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/18/05. Forwarded to all counsel of record(Saucier, Martha) Modified on 8/30/2005 (Theall, Jeannine).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005
                                                                                                  [12] Motion to Dismiss, [11] Motion to Dismiss, [14] Motion to Dismiss, [59] Motion to Dismiss, [62] Motion to Dismiss, [61] Motion to Dismiss REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Martin. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Mastercard International Incorporated in support of [59] Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 69 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by VISA, USA, Inc. in support of [61] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT by First Financial Bank, First Data Merchant Services Corporation in support of [62] Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 67 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [62] First Financial, First Data Services' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by PSW, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum)(Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 66 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [59] MASTERCARD INTL.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by PSW, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum)(Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [61] VISA U.S.A., INC.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by PSW, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum)(Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying [63] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages . Signed by Judge Ernest C Torres on 06/14/05. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                                                [59] Motion to Dismiss, [62] Motion to Dismiss, [61] Motion to Dismiss REFERRED to Judge Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005
                                                                                                                  [63] MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages REFERRED to Judge Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005, Terminated: 6/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by PSW, Inc.. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by First Financial, First Data Services to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by VISA, USA to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Remark
                                                                                                                          Defendant Mastercard Internationals Inc.'s Amended Disclosure Statement (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005, Terminated: 2/28/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by Mastercard Intl. to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [57-1] motion to Exceed Page Limit Memo in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005
                                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [57-1] motion to Exceed Page Limit Memo in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005, Terminated: 5/17/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by VISA, USA to Exceed Page Limit Memo in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Jackson, R) Modified on 05/12/2005
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Exceed Page Limit Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005
                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [55-1] motion to Exceed Page Limit Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005, Terminated: 5/10/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Mastercard Intl. to Exceed Page Limit Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Stipulation Establishing Briefing Schedule with Respect to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint: Defendants' Memoranda in Support of their Motions to Dismiss due by 5/20/05; Plaintiff's Oppositions to Motions due by 6/30/05; Defendants' Reply Memoranda due by 7/15/05 (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PSW, Inc. of First Amended Complaint on Patrick Lynch of the Attorney General's Office on 4/6/05 (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by PSW, Inc. , (Answer due 4/25/05 for First Data Services, for First Financial, for Mastercard Intl., for VISA, USA ) amending [1-1] complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 51 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for Mastercard Intl. by Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr., Esq. and Staci L. Kolb, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                  In-chambers conference held before Judge Ernest C. Torres; Plaintiff: Richard Sinapi; Defendants: Patricia Sullivan, Joseph Cavanagh, Victoria Almieda, Daniel Bookin, Jonathan Hacker, Bruce Colbath, Jay Fastow, Brian Wallach; Court addresses parties re: the Complaint and the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by First Financial, First Data Services in opposition to [40-1] motion response (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by Mastercard Intl. in further support of [12-1] motion to Dismiss The Complaint (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 48 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for First Financial, First Data Services by Victoria Almeida (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM by VISA, USA in support of [11-1] motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [42-1] motion for Bruce A.Colbath to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bruce A. Colbath added to the database. (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to counsel of record] (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [43-1] motion for Denise Plunkett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to counsel of record] (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [41-1] motion for Jay N. Fasow to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jay N. Fastow added to the database. (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to counsel of record] (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [43-1] motion for Denise Plunkett to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [42-1] motion for Bruce A.Colbath to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [41-1] motion for Jay N. Fasow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005, Terminated: 2/8/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Mastercard Intl. for Denise Plunkett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005, Terminated: 2/8/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Mastercard Intl. for Bruce A.Colbath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005, Terminated: 2/8/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Mastercard Intl. for Jay N. Fasow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                          In-chambers conference set at 9:30 2/14/05 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION and Memorandum by PSW, Inc. to [12-1] motion to Dismiss The Complaint (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION and Memorandum by PSW, Inc. to [11-1] motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION and Memorandum by PSW, Inc. to [14-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [14-1] motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Objection (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [11-1] motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Objection (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [12-1] motion to Dismiss The Complaint with Objection (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [29-1] motion to File Combined Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Visa USA, Inc.'s and Mastercard International Incorporated's Motions to Dismiss (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Peter E. Moll to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter E. Moll added to the database (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [27-1] motion for Brian Wallach to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian Wallach added to the database (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Jonathan D. Hacker to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Hacker added to the database (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [25-1] motion for Daniel H. Bookin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel H. Bookin added to the database. (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [28-1] motion for Peter E. Moll to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [27-1] motion for Brian Wallach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [25-1] motion for Daniel H. Bookin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [24-1] motion for Jonathan D. Hacker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [15-1] motion for JAY N. FASTOW to Appear Pro Hac Vice (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [17-1] motion for BRUCE A. COLBATH to Appear Pro Hac Vice (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [16-1] motion for DENISE PLUNKETT to Appear Pro Hac Vice (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [29-1] motion to File Combined Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Visa USA, Inc.'s and Mastercard International Incorporated's Motions to Dismiss (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005, Terminated: 1/25/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by PSW, Inc. to File Combined Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Visa USA, Inc.'s and Mastercard International Incorporated's Motions to Dismiss (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005, Terminated: 1/20/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by First Financial, First Data Services for Peter E. Moll to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005, Terminated: 1/20/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by First Financial, First Data Services for Brian Wallach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS FIRST FINANCIAL BANK AND FIRST DATA MERCHANT SERVICES. [filed 12/10/04] (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005, Terminated: 1/20/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by VISA, USA for Daniel H. Bookin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005, Terminated: 1/20/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by VISA, USA for Jonathan D. Hacker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANT VISA U.S.A. INC.'S RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Enlarge Time up to and including 1/28/05 within which to respond to motions to dismiss filed by each of the defendants; no further continuances will be granted (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [17-1] motion for BRUCE A. COLBATH to Appear Pro Hac Vice., [16-1] motion for DENISE PLUNKETT to Appear Pro Hac Vice., [15-1] motion for JAY N. FASTOW to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [21-1] motion to Enlarge Time up to and including 1/28/05 within wich to respond to motions to dismiss filed by each of the defendants (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004, Terminated: 12/10/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by PSW, Inc. to Enlarge Time up to and including 1/28/05 within wich to respond to motions to dismiss filed by each of the defendants (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed as to VISA, USA 9/15/04 (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed as to Mastercard Intl. 9/15/04 (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFDAVIT OF SERVICE executed as to First Financial 9/15/04 (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by First Financial, First Data Services to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRPC 7.1 (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by Mastercard Intl. to Dismiss The Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by VISA, USA to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004, Terminated: 1/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Mastercard Intl. for BRUCE A. COLBATH to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004, Terminated: 1/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Mastercard Intl. for DENISE PLUNKETT to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004, Terminated: 1/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Mastercard Intl. for JAY N. FASTOW to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Enlarge Time up to and including 11/24/04 to Respond to Complaint ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 11/24/04 for First Data Services, for First Financial, for Mastercard Intl., for VISA, USA (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [9-1] motion to Enlarge Time up to and including 11/24/04 to Respond to Complaint (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004, Terminated: 11/9/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by VISA, USA, Mastercard Intl., First Financial, First Data Services to Enlarge Time up to and including 11/24/04 to Respond to Complaint (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation allowing Defendant Visa U.S.A., Inc. to and through 11/9/04 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation allowing Defendants First Financial Bank and First Data Merchant Services Corp have to and including 11/9/04 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R) Modified on 11/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 11/9/04 for First Data Services, for First Financial, for Mastercard Intl., for VISA, USA (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation allowing Defendant MasterCard International to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 11/9/04 (signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for First Financial, First Data Services by John A. Tarantino,Esq, and Patricia K. Rocha, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [2-1] motion for David Paul Steiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Paul Steiner added to the database. ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) [faxed to all counsel of record] (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion(s) referred to Judge Torres: [2-1] motion for David Paul Steiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to First Data Services 9/17/04 Answer due on 10/7/04 for First Data Services (Fernandes, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004, Terminated: 10/5/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by PSW, Inc. for David Paul Steiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Jackson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 57930 (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Martin (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      4 SUMMONS(ES) issued (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 257 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?