Silva v. Enos, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:92-cv-00178-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert M. Silva, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity CR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. McAndrew +4550 455 455 0882 tmcandrew@tjmcandrewlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wistow & Barylick Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur Peter Loveley +8312 831 831 2700 +2729 272 272 9752 apl@wistbar.com
Space Max Wistow +1 401 831 2700 +1 401 272 9752 mwistow@wistbar.com
v.
No Logo Bruce Kidman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeSisto Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc DeSisto +2724 272 272 4442 +2729 272 272 9937 marc@desistolaw.com
No Logo City of East Providence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeSisto Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc DeSisto +2724 272 272 4442 +2729 272 272 9937 marc@desistolaw.com
No Logo David L. Cookson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DeSisto Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc DeSisto +2724 272 272 4442 +2729 272 272 9937 marc@desistolaw.com
No Logo Kevin J. Fitzgerald, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeSisto Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc DeSisto +2724 272 272 4442 +2729 272 272 9937 marc@desistolaw.com
No Logo Michael J. Bodell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DeSisto Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc DeSisto +2724 272 272 4442 +2729 272 272 9937 marc@desistolaw.com
No Logo Stephen Enos, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeSisto Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc DeSisto +2724 272 272 4442 +2729 272 272 9937 marc@desistolaw.com
No Logo Steven Durfee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeSisto Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc DeSisto +2724 272 272 4442 +2729 272 272 9937 marc@desistolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenney, Quigley, Izzo & Clarkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Quigley, Jr. +4544 454 454 4550 +4544 454 454 4563 rquigley@mqiclaw.com
No Logo W. Sgt. W. Barlow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeSisto Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc DeSisto +2724 272 272 4442 +2729 272 272 9937 marc@desistolaw.com
Office Providence
Filed 3/31/1992
Jury Demand Both
Demand $9999000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Providence
Terminated 6/7/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TMB
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: 6/7/1993
Case closed (Webb, J)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 6/3/1993, Entered: 6/7/1993 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION of dismissal signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1993, Entered: 6/1/1993
      CASE to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge (Kapstein, L)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1993, Entered: 6/1/1993
        CASE . Assigned to Magistrate Judge (Kapstein, L)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1993, Entered: 6/1/1993
          CASE to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge (Webb, J)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: 3/19/1993
            CASE assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy M. Boudewyns (Dias, J)
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 1/22/1993 Remark
              SUBPOENA returned. (Pesaturo, K)
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 12/30/1992 Notice to Take Deposition
                NOTICE by Stephen Enos, Michael J. Bodell, Steven Durfee, David L. Cookson, Bruce Kidman, W. Barlow, City of East Prov., Kevin J. Fitzgerald to take deposition of ROBERT M. SILVA (FarrellPletcher, P)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/2/1992, Entered: 12/3/1992 Notice to Take Deposition
                  NOTICE by Stephen Enos, Michael J. Bodell, Steven Durfee, David L. Cookson, Bruce Kidman, W. Barlow, City of East Prov., Kevin J. Fitzgerald to take deposition of ROBERT SILVA (FarrellPletcher, P)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1992, Entered: 11/30/1992
                    CASE assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge (Webb, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 11/25/1992, Entered: 11/25/1992 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 2/1/93 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 2/1/93 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 3/1/93 ; ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian ) (Webb, J)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/23/1992, Entered: 11/25/1992 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                        Pre-trial conference held (Webb, J)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 11/9/1992, Entered: 5/5/1993 Remark
                          DEPO SUBPOENA (1) RETURNED (Dube, P)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 11/2/1992, Entered: 11/3/1992 Notice to Take Deposition
                            NOTICE by Robert M. Silva to take deposition of Lt. Wm. Sloyer, Chief Winquist, Major G. Dias, Officer A. Goro (Webb, J)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/13/1992, Entered: 10/15/1992 Remark
                              1 DEPOSITION SUBPOENA returned (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/18/1992, Entered: 9/18/1992
                                Pre-trial conference set at 9:30 11/23/92 (Webb, J)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 9/17/1992, Entered: 9/18/1992 Remark
                                  SUBPOENA returned as to officer Armando Goro. (Burgess, J)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 9/11/1992, Entered: 9/14/1992 Notice to Take Deposition
                                    NOTICE by Robert M. Silva to take deposition of CPT. CARL WINQUEST, MJR. GARY DAIZ AND OFFCR. ARMAND GORO (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/1992, Entered: 9/2/1992 Notice of Appearance/
                                      ENTRY of appearance for Michael J. Bodell, David L. Cookson by John R. Mahoney (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/1992, Entered: 9/2/1992 Notice of Appearance/
                                        ENTRY of appearance for Steven Durfee by Robert J. Quigley Jr. (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/10/1992, Entered: 8/11/1992 Remark
                                          2 DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS RETURNED (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1992, Entered: 8/4/1992
                                            notice sent Pre-trial conference set at 9:30 10/6/92 (Webb, J)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/31/1992, Entered: 7/31/1992
                                              NOTICE by Robert M. Silva to take deposition of STEVEN DURFEE, MICHAEL BODELL, SGT. W. BARLOW, BRUCE KIDMAN, STEPHEN ENOS, DAVID COOKSON (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/2/1992, Entered: 7/2/1992 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Compel production of documents granting [8-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories ( signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy M. Boudewyns ) (Dias, J)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/2/1992, Entered: 7/2/1992
                                                  NOTICE by Robert M. Silva to take deposition of Sergeants Bennet & Sarandria (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1992, Entered: 6/24/1992
                                                    Status conference set at 11:00 7/7/92 before Mag. Judge Boudewyns on Pltf's motions to compel. (Dias, J)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/19/1992, Entered: 6/19/1992
                                                      Motion(s) referred: [9-1] motion to Compel production of documents referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy M. Boudewyns, [8-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy M. Boudewyns (Webb, J)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/19/1992, Entered: 6/19/1992
                                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Timothy M. Boudewyns (Webb, J)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/10/1992, Entered: 6/15/1992 Terminated:
                                                          OBJECTION by Stephen Enos, Michael J. Bodell, Steven Durfee, David L. Cookson, Bruce Kidman, W. Barlow, City of East Prov., Kevin J. Fitzgerald to [9-1] motion to Compel production of documents (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/10/1992, Entered: 6/15/1992 Terminated:
                                                            OBJECTION by Stephen Enos, Michael J. Bodell, Steven Durfee, David L. Cookson, Bruce Kidman, W. Barlow, City of East Prov., Kevin J. Fitzgerald to [8-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 6/4/1992, Entered: 6/9/1992, Terminated: 7/2/1992 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by Robert M. Silva to Compel production of documents (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/4/1992, Entered: 6/9/1992 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by Robert M. Silva to Compel answers to interrogatories (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/29/1992, Entered: 6/10/1992 Stipulation
                                                                  Stipulation: the time within which pltf. is to respond to deft. interrogs and request for production is enlarged until May 20, 1992 (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/6/1992, Entered: 5/11/1992 Remark
                                                                    DEPOSITION SUBPOENA RETURNED (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/5/1992, Entered: 5/11/1992 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                      NOTICE by Robert M. Silva to take deposition of KOR OF PROV. POLICE DEPT. (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Steven Durfee 4/4/92 Answer due on 4/24/92 for Steven Durfee (Zinni, C)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Michael J. Bodell, David L. Cookson 4/3/92 Answer due on 4/23/92 for David L. Cookson, for Michael J. Bodell (Zinni, C)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/23/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to City of East Prov., Kevin J. Fitzgerald, W. Barlow, Bruce Kidman, Stephen Enos 4/2/92 Answer due on 4/22/92 for Kevin J. Fitzgerald, for City of East Prov., for W. Barlow, for Bruce Kidman, for Stephen Enos (Zinni, C)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/15/1992, Entered: 4/23/1992 Terminated:
                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen Enos, Michael J. Bodell, Steven Durfee, David L. Cookson, Bruce Kidman, W. Barlow, City of East Prov., Kevin J. Fitzgerald (Attorney Marc DeSisto),; jury demand (Daniels, G)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/31/1992, Entered: 4/6/1992 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 215412 (Daniels, G)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1992, Entered: 4/6/1992 Summons Issued
                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued (Daniels, G)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 1/6/1992, Entered: 1/7/1993 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                    NOTICE by City of East Prov. to take deposition of ROBERT M. SILVA (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 334 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?