Rave, et al v. U.S. Shoe Corp., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:92-cv-00693-L
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Arthur Rave, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil P. Philbin +7821 782 782 1190 +7821 782 782 1240 nphilbin5305@yahoo.com
No Logo Giacondina Rave, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil P. Philbin +7821 782 782 1190 +7821 782 782 1240 nphilbin5305@yahoo.com
v.
Lowes Lowes, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lowenstein, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by amica.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. Lee Boatright +8612 861 861 2840 +2721 272 272 1736

Toggle Switch Represented by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M. Cain +8210 821 821 0188 +8217 821 821 7410 kmcain@metlife.com
No Logo U.S. SHOE Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Lowes Lowes, Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "Lowenstein, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by amica.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. Lee Boatright +8612 861 861 2840 +2721 272 272 1736
No Logo U.S. SHOE Corporation, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Lowes Lowes, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Lowenstein, Inc."
No Logo U.S. SHOE Corporation, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Office Providence
Filed 12/22/1992
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 7/14/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 7/14/1994, Entered: 7/14/1994 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice, no interest, no costs signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux on 7/11/94 (Kizior, L)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/14/1994, Entered: 7/14/1994
    Case closed (Kizior, L)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 7/22/1994 Remark
      WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by L. Lee Boatright. (Burgess, J)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 7/22/1994 Notice of Appearance/
        ENTRY of appearance for Lowenstein, Inc. by Kevin M. Cain (Burgess, J)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 2/10/1994, Entered: 2/10/1994 Court Filing
          ORDER granting M/Extension of Time filed 2/8/94 ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Smith, M)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 2/10/1994, Entered: 2/10/1994 Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/20/94 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 6/24/94 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Smith, M)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 2/8/1994, Entered: 2/14/1994 Terminated:
              MOTION by U.S. Shoe Corp. to Enlarge Time for additional time before discovery closes in this case. (Burgess, J)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 2/8/1994, Entered: 2/14/1994 Notice of Appearance/
                ENTRY of appearance for U.S. Shoe Corp. by Attorney John R. Mahoney. (Burgess, J)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/23/1993, Entered: 6/29/1993 Terminated:
                  ANSWER by Lowenstein, Inc. to [2-2] cross claim. Lowenstein claims a trial by jury on all claims. (Kapstein, L)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/15/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993 Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 2/25/94 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 4/1/94 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Smith, M)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/14/1993 Terminated:
                      ANSWER by U.S. Shoe Corp. to [6-2] cross claim. Deft Shoe Corp claims a trial by jury. (Kapstein, L)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/8/1993, Entered: 6/10/1993 Stipulation
                        Stipulation signed by Plaintiffs' attorney, Philbin, allowing Defendant Lowenstein to file answer by June 5, 1993. (Smith, M)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/8/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993 Terminated:
                          ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Lowenstein, Inc. (Attorney L. Lee Boatright) against U.S. Shoe Corp. (Kapstein, L)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                            ENTRY of appearance for Deft Lowenstein, Inc. by Lyndal Lee Boatright (Kapstein, L)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/27/1993, Entered: 5/27/1993
                              Scheduling conference set on 12:30 6/15/93 (Smith, M)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/4/1993, Entered: 5/7/1993 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Lowenstein, Inc. 4/16/93 Answer due on 5/6/93 for Lowenstein, Inc. (Kapstein, L)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1993, Entered: 2/25/1993
                                  CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (Daniels, G)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 1/29/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                    ENTRY of appearance for U.S. Shoe Corp. by Edward W. Moses, Esq. (Kapstein, L)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 1/29/1993 Terminated:
                                      ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by U.S. Shoe Corp. (Attorney Edward W. Moses) against Lowenstein, Inc. (Kapstein, L)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 1/29/1993 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 151660 (Kapstein, L)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 1/29/1993 Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued (Kapstein, L)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 12/29/1992 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                            CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge (Smith, M)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?