Moran, et al v. City of Providence, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00504-P
District Judge Raymond J. Pettine, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Raymond J. Pettine
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Ellen Moran, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ina P. Schiff +4576 457 457 6779 +2746 274 274 6858
No Logo Leigh Ann Cyr, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ina P. Schiff +4576 457 457 6779 +2746 274 274 6858
v.
No Logo Bernard E. Gannon, Defendant

Represented by City of Providence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin F. McHugh +4217 421 421 7740 +3517 351 351 7596 kevin_mc1950@hotmail.com
No Logo City of Providence, Defendant

Represented by City of Providence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin F. McHugh +4217 421 421 7740 +3517 351 351 7596 kevin_mc1950@hotmail.com
No Logo Robert Bennett, Defendant

Represented by City of Providence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin F. McHugh +4217 421 421 7740 +3517 351 351 7596 kevin_mc1950@hotmail.com
Attributes
Office Providence
Filed 9/15/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003 Job Discrimination
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Providence
Terminated 6/27/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
Timeline
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 Court Filing
ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Dismiss. Defendant's motion is granted due to plaintiffs' failure to object. See Local rule of the Court 12(a)(2). Plaintiff has been given two opportunities to object to this motion, and has failed to object both times. See order, May 13, 1997. Plaintiffs' willful failure to litigate this matter justifies dismissal. ( signed by Judge Raymond J. Pettine ) (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997
Case closed (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997
Motion(s) referred: [32-1] motion to Dismiss referred to Judge Raymond J. Pettine (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: 5/22/1997, Terminated: 6/27/1997 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to Dismiss (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Court Filing
ORDER passing [30-1] motion to Dismiss. The defendant is ordered to re-submit their motion with a supporting memorandum of law that meets the foregoing requirements within ten days of this order. In addition, Plaintiff's have ten days from receipt of Defendant's resubmitted motion to respond. ( signed by Judge Raymond J. Pettine ) (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997
Motion(s) referred: [30-1] motion to Dismiss referred to Judge Raymond J. Pettine (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 4/18/1997, Entered: 4/18/1997, Terminated: 6/27/1997 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to Dismiss (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 4/9/1997, Entered: 4/9/1997 Court Filing
ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Compel Attendance at a Deposition ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/26/1997, Entered: 4/22/1997 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing re: [27-1] motion to Compel attendance at deposition, [26-1] motion to Compel Attendance at a Depositioni held before MJ Lovegreen (McHugh - Plaintiff not present) Court grants motion (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/20/1997
Motion(s) referred: [27-1] motion to Compel attendance at deposition referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997
Motion hearing re: [26-1] motion to Compel Attendance at a Deposition at 9:30 3/27/97 before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Ellen Moran (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997, Terminated: 5/5/1997 Motion to Compel
MOTION by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to Compel attendance at deposition (Price, R)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997
Motion(s) referred: [26-1] motion to Compel Attendance at a Deposition referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997, Terminated: 4/9/1997 Motion to Compel
MOTION by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to Compel Attendance at a Deposition (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/3/1997
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Ellen Moran (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996
TRIAL NOTICE of case being placed on the trial calendar for November 1, 1996. Counsel to be ready on or after 11/1/96. Notice sent to all counsel of record. (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996
Jury selection set at 9:30 11/1/96 Before Judge Raymond J. Pettine (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: 9/11/1996
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Ellen Moran (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 7/31/1996
2 NOTICES by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Leigh Ann Cyr and Ellen Moran(Delano, D) Modified on 07/31/1996
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 7/19/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996 Notice to Take Deposition
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Leigh Ann Cyr and Ellen Moran (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Court Filing
ORDER granting [19-1] joint motion to Enlarge Time to close discovery & file PTM, reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery deadline on 10/7/96 Pretrial Memorandum by 10/21/96 ( signed by Judge Raymond J. Pettine ) (Dube, P)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996, Terminated: 6/28/1996 Motion for Extension of Time
JOINT MOTION by Ellen Moran, Leigh Ann Cyr, City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to Enlarge Time to close discovery & file PTM (Dube, P)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Leigh Ann Cyr (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 6/27/1996
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Ellen Moran (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of John Ruggiano, M.D. (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of John J. Barry, PHD (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Frank H. Fallon, D.O. (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Ellen Moran (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996
NOTICE by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to take deposition of Leigh Ann Cyr (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/7/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER re: case assigned to the trial calendar on or after August 15, 1996; empanelment to be held in July, 1996, reset Discovery deadline to 7/5/96 , reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 7/19/96 ( signed by Judge Raymond J. Pettine ) (Patnaude, C)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996 Settlement Conference
Settlement conference held 4/26/96 before Senior Judge Pettine with Attorenys Schiff and McHugh. No settlement. (Patnaude, C)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 4/24/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996
ORDER re: [7-1] motion to Compel Production is granted by rule of Court, no objection having been timely filed. () (Patnaude, C)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 Court Filing
ORDER, set Settlement Conference for 3:30 4/26/96 ( signed by Judge Raymond J. Pettine ) (Patnaude, C)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996
NOTICE to take deposition of Ellen Moran on April 26, 1996. (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996, Terminated: 4/24/1996 Motion to Compel
MOTION by Ellen Moran, Leigh Ann Cyr to Compel Production (Price, R)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 7/5/96 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 7/5/96 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 7/19/96 ; ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996
Settlement conference set on 10:00 4/22/96 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996
Pre-trial conference held before Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996
Pre-trial conference set at 9:30 3/20/96 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 Court Filing
Stipulation re: Deft's M/Dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies is withdrawn; signed by Judge Raymond J. Pettine (Patnaude, C)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Terminated:
ANSWER to Complaint by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett (Attorney Kevin McHugh), (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995
Motion(s) referred: [2-1] motion to Dismiss verified complaint referred to Judge Raymond J. Pettine (Patnaude, C)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995, Terminated: 12/18/1995 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
OBJECTION by Ellen Moran, Leigh Ann Cyr to [2-1] motion to Dismiss verified complaint (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Terminated:
MOTION by City of Providence, Bernard E. Gannon, Robert Bennett to Dismiss verified complaint (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 32389 (Delano, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE assigned to Judge Raymond J. Pettine . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Delano, D)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 190 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?