Hodgens v. General Dynamics
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-00117-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John M. Hodgens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manuel Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +3513 351 351 3914
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
v.
General Dynamics Corporation General Dynamics Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neal J. McNamara +1 860 275 6820 +1 860 275 6821 nmcnamara@nixonpeabody.com
Office Providence
Filed 3/1/1996
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Providence
Terminated 5/6/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 97-1704[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 USCA Mandate
MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) Re: [44-1] appeal by John M. Hodgens (Branco, M)
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998
    decision from USCA (Webb, J)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Appeal Record Returned
      Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [44-1] appeal by John M. Hodgens (Branco, M)
        LREF
        Blank 46 Filed: 6/24/1997, Entered: 6/24/1997
        Transmitted supplemental record on appeal: [44-1] appeal by John M. Hodgens (transcripts of 2/7/97, 2/10/97) (Branco, M)
          LREF
          Blank 45 Filed: 6/17/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997
          TRANSCRIPT OF for dates of 2/7/97, 2/10/97 (Branco, M)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997
            USCA Case Number Re: [44-1] appeal USCA Number: 97-1704 (Webb, J)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997
              receipt fro USCA re: appeal (Webb, J)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997
                Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [44-1] appeal (Branco, M)
                  LREF
                  Blank 44 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997 Terminated:
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by John M. Hodgens . Fee Status: pd Appeal record due on 6/30/97 (Branco, M)
                    LREF
                    Blank 43 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997
                    JUDGMENT for General Dynamics against John M. Hodgens () (Webb, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank 42 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997 Court Filing
                      MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997
                        Case closed (Webb, J)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/26/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                          Minute entry: granting [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997
                            Motion hearing re: [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment decision given by judge torres and will be a written decision will be forthcoming. dft motion for sum/jgm granted. (Webb, J)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997
                              Motion(s) referred: [40-1] motion to supplement record in support of Pla obj. to dft motion for sumjgm. referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                LREF
                                Blank 40 Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Terminated:
                                MOTION by John M. Hodgens to supplement record in support of Pla obj. to dft motion for sumjgm. (Webb, J)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/7/1997, Entered: 2/7/1997
                                  Motion hearing re: [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment Motion hearing held. P. Andrews for Pltf; McNamara for Deft. Counsel argue. Bench decision or order to be rendered on Monday, 2/10/97. Counsel to be notified. (Branco, M)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 39 Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997, Terminated: 5/6/1997 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    RESPONSE by General Dynamics in opposition to [33-1] motion to Compel documents (Branco, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997
                                      Motion(s) referred: [33-1] motion to Compel documents referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Webb, J)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/4/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997
                                        Motion hearing re: [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 9:15 2/7/97 (Webb, J)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 38 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/4/1997 Order
                                          ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Compel production of documents in furtherance of depo. of A. Moniz (no objection filed and time has expired) (Webb, J)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 37 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER mooting [19-2] motion to Strike certain objections denying [19-3] motion for Sanctions granting in part, denying in part [28-1] motion to Compel ans. to interr. ( signed by Judge Raymond J. Pettine ) (Price, R)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 1/28/1997
                                              Motion(s) referred: [36-1] motion for Hearing on motion for summary judgment referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 36 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997, Terminated: 2/4/1997 Motion for Hearing
                                                MOTION by John M. Hodgens for Hearing on motion for summary judgment (Branco, M)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [30-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental memo. in support of obj. to m/summary judgment ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/22/1997 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER denying [29-1] motion for Leave to File reply memo. ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997, Terminated: 2/10/1997 Motion to Compel
                                                      MOTION by John M. Hodgens to Compel documents (Branco, M)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/17/1997
                                                        Statement Of Undisputed Fact by John M. Hodgens RE: [25-1] motion response (Branco, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/17/1997, Terminated: 1/22/1997 Motion for Leave to File
                                                          MOTION by John M. Hodgens for Leave to File supplemental memo. in support of obj. to m/summary judgment (Branco, M)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/17/1997
                                                            Deadline updated; reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 1/20/97 (Webb, J)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/17/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file pre-trial memo ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/16/1997, Terminated: 1/22/1997 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                MOTION by General Dynamics for Leave to File reply memo. (Branco, M)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/16/1997, Terminated: 1/29/1997 Motion to Compel
                                                                  MOTION by General Dynamics to Compel ans. to interr. (Branco, M)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 1/13/1997, Entered: 1/13/1997, Terminated: 1/16/1997 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    MOTION by John M. Hodgens to Enlarge Time to file pre-trial memo (Branco, M)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/13/1997, Entered: 1/13/1997, Terminated: 1/16/1997 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                      MOTION by General Dynamics for Leave to File affidavit (Branco, M)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/16/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                        Minute entry: MOTION TO COMPEL/STRIKE/SANCTIONS HELD BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROBERT LOVEGREEN (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                                          OBJECTION by John M. Hodgens to [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying [17-1] motion to Enlarge Time for discovery deadline ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/16/1997 Motion Hearing
                                                                              Motion hearing re: [19-1] motion to Compel interrofatories Motion hearing held, [19-2] motion to Strike certain objections Motion hearing held, [19-3] motion for Sanctions Motion hearing held before MJ Lovegreen. (Andrews, McNamara) Attorneys argue motions. Court grants in part and denies in part motion to compel. Court passes motion to strike objections due to resolution of motion to compel and denies motion for sanctions (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/9/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by John M. Hodgens (unopposed) to Enlarge Time to reply to motion for summary judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/6/1997
                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/3/1997, Terminated: 2/3/1997 Motion to Compel
                                                                                    MOTION by John M. Hodgens to Compel production of documents in furtherance of depo. of A. Moniz (Webb, J)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/2/1997, Entered: 1/2/1997
                                                                                      Motion hearing re: [19-1] motion to Compel interrofatories at 11:30 1/10/97, [19-2] motion to Strike certain objections at 11:30 1/10/97, [19-3] motion for Sanctions at 11:30 1/10/97 before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 12/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                                        OBJECTION by General Dynamics to [19-1] motion to Compel interrofatories (Branco, M)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996
                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [19-1] motion to Compel interrofatories referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [19-2] motion to Strike certain objections referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [19-3] motion for Sanctions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Webb, J)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/24/1996, Terminated: 2/10/1997 Motion to Compel
                                                                                            MOTION by John M. Hodgens to Compel interrofatories , and to Strike certain objections , and for Sanctions (Webb, J)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/24/1996, Terminated: 5/6/1997 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                              OBJECTION by General Dynamics to [17-1] motion to Enlarge Time for discovery deadline (Webb, J)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/24/1996
                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [17-1] motion to Enlarge Time for discovery deadline referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996
                                                                                                  trial notice for 2/11/97 fax 12/19/96 (Webb, J)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996, Terminated: 1/10/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION by John M. Hodgens to Enlarge Time for discovery deadline (Branco, M)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                      Statement Of Undisputed Fact by General Dynamics RE: [15-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: 12/17/1996, Terminated: 5/6/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by General Dynamics for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 12/10/1996, Entered: 12/10/1996, Terminated: 2/4/1997 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                          MOTION by General Dynamics for Leave to File enlarged memo in support of motion for summary judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/22/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996
                                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for John M. Hodgens by Manuel Andrews (Webb, J)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/5/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to interr. and request for prod. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/1/1996
                                                                                                                NOTICE by John M. Hodgens to take deposition of Joanne Wilkinson (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/28/1996
                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERR. REFERRED TO MAG/JUDGE LOVEGREEN (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996, Terminated: 5/6/1997 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                    OBJECTION by John M. Hodgens to [9-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to interr. and request for prod. (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/17/1996, Entered: 10/17/1996, Terminated: 10/17/1996 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      MOTION by General Dynamics to Enlarge Time to respond to interr. and request for prod. (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by General Dynamics to take deposition of John M. Hodgens (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996
                                                                                                                          Settlement conference set on 2:00 9/24/96 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996
                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to General Dynamics 5/7/96 Answer due on 5/28/96 for General Dynamics (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/16/96 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 12/16/96 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 1/16/96 ; ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996
                                                                                                                                Pre-trial conference held referred for mag/judge settlement conference (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996
                                                                                                                                  forward reminder of ptc 8/1/96 10:00am (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/18/1996, Entered: 6/18/1996
                                                                                                                                    Pre-trial conference set at 10:00 8/1/96 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres corrected notice fax (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/14/1996, Terminated: 5/6/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by General Dynamics (Attorney Neal J. McNamara), (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/29/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996
                                                                                                                                        Pre-trial conference set at 9:30 7/30/96 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres notice fax to atty Andrews mailed to McNamara (Webb, J) Modified on 05/29/1996
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996
                                                                                                                                          ENTRY of appearance for General Dynamics by (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996
                                                                                                                                            Stipulation dft has till 6/14/96 to ans amended complaint (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/16/1996
                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; reset Answer TO AMENDED COMPLAINT deadline to 6/14/96 for General Dynamics (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/7/1996 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by John M. Hodgens , amending [1-1] complaint (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 33062 (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/1/1996
                                                                                                                                                    CASE to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?