Eastridge v. Rhode Island College, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-00458-L
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Timothy I. Eastridge, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julius C. Michaelson +2954 295 295 4330 +2955 295 295 5220 jcm12522@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliverio & Marcaccio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel D. Zurier +861 290 0ext105 +8612 861 861 2922 sdz@om-rilaw.com
v.
No Logo Dix Coons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay S. Goodman +2736 273 273 6444 +2736 273 273 6444

Toggle Switch Represented by ntlong.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Trott Long +3515 351 351 5070 +4548 454 454 8755 nicholas@ntlong.com
No Logo John Nazarian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay S. Goodman +2736 273 273 6444 +2736 273 273 6444

Toggle Switch Represented by ntlong.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Trott Long +3515 351 351 5070 +4548 454 454 8755 nicholas@ntlong.com
Rhode Island College Rhode Island College, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay S. Goodman +2736 273 273 6444 +2736 273 273 6444
No Logo Pollock, Vande Sande & Priddy LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard Weiner"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay S. Goodman +2736 273 273 6444 +2736 273 273 6444

Toggle Switch Represented by ntlong.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Trott Long +3515 351 351 5070 +4548 454 454 8755 nicholas@ntlong.com
No Logo The Board of Governors for Higher Education, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay S. Goodman +2736 273 273 6444 +2736 273 273 6444

Toggle Switch Represented by ntlong.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Trott Long +3515 351 351 5070 +4548 454 454 8755 nicholas@ntlong.com
Office Providence
Filed 8/9/1996
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Providence
Terminated 9/28/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TMB
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 Court Filing
JUDGMENT for Rhode Island College, Board of Governors, Dix Coons, Richard Weiner, John Nazarian against Timothy I. Eastridge ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
    LREF
    Blank 53 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 Court Filing
    STIPULATION of dismissal signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998
      Case closed (Gilfillan, B)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998
        Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties could not agree to settlement. Case must pass to trial. (Brown, D)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/14/1998
          Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties are considering settlement. A final decision will be made by 9/15/98. (Brown, D)
            LREF
            Blank 52 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/8/1998 Transcript
            TRANSCRIPT OF for dates of 8/27/98 (Barletta, B)
              LREF
              Blank 51 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998, Terminated: 9/28/1998 Answer
              ANSWER by Rhode Island College, Board of Governors, Dix Coons, Richard Weiner, John Nazarian (Attorney Jay Goodman ) to Second amended complaint; jury demand (Barletta, B)
                LREF
                Blank 50 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998
                Minute entry: denying [45-1] motion to Dismiss Counts I, IV and VI of Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint; Mr. Michaelson for plaintiff, Mr. Goodman for defendant; case on Sept calendar. (Gilfillan, B)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998
                  Motion hearing re: [45-1] motion to Dismiss Counts I, IV and VI of Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint. Motion hearing held (Gilfillan, B)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998
                    Settlement conference set on 12:00 9/14/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998
                      Settlement conference set on 12:00 9/10/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                        LREF
                        Blank 49 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [44-1] motion for Leave to File response to amended complaint by moving to dismiss Counts I, IV and VI. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998
                          Calendar call set at 10:00 9/23/98 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux; impanelment 9/24/98 at 9: 30 am (Gilfillan, B)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998
                            Motion hearing re: [45-1] motion to Dismiss Counts I, IV and VI of Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint. at 2:00 8/27/98 (Gilfillan, B)
                              LREF
                              Blank 48 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Terminated:
                              OBJECTION by Timothy I. Eastridge to [45-1] motion to Dismiss Counts I, IV and VI of Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint. (Barletta, B)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998
                                Plaintiff's PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed in chambers (Gilfillan, B)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998
                                  Def's PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed in chambers (Gilfillan, B)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 47 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/14/1998 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting in part, denying in part [40-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint; denying paragraphs 19,21,25,26,and 28 of the proposed amended complaint and granting with respect to the other proposed amendments. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 46 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                      ANSWER by Rhode Island College, Board of Governors, Dix Coons, Richard Weiner, John Nazarian (Attorney Jay Goodman ) to amended complaint (Barletta, B)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 45 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by Rhode Island College, et als to Dismiss Counts I, IV and VI of Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint. (Barletta, B)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 44 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/13/1998, Terminated: 8/18/1998 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by Rhode Island College, et als for Leave to File response to amended complaint by moving to dismiss Counts I, IV and VI. (Barletta, B)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 43 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 Amended Complaint
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by Timothy I. Eastridge , (Answer due 7/13/98 for John Nazarian, for Richard Weiner, for Dix Coons, for Board of Governors, for Rhode Island College ) amending [2-1] amended complaint, [1-1] complaint (Barletta, B)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 42 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                              Minute entry: re: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. (Barletta, B)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Motion Hearing
                                                Motion hearing re: [40-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint Motion hearing held. Crtrpt: J. Fontes. Samuel D. Zurier for plaintiff; Jay Goodman for the defendant. Plaintiff's motion to Amend Complaint is granted in part; denied in part as to factual allegations. Mr. Zurier to draft Order. (Barletta, B)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/19/1998
                                                  Settlement conference set on 10:00 9/8/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998
                                                    Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties to reconvene in September. (Brown, D)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998
                                                      Settlement conference set on 10:00 6/17/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998
                                                        Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties will reconvene on 6/17/98 at 10:00 (Brown, D)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998
                                                          Motion hearing re: [40-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint at 9:30 6/19/98 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                            OBJECTION by Rhode Island College, Board of Governors, Dix Coons, Richard Weiner, John Nazarian to [40-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint (Barletta, B)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998, Terminated: 7/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by Timothy I. Eastridge to Amend [1-1] complaint (Barletta, B)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998
                                                                Settlement conference set on 11:00 6/9/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998
                                                                  Settlement conference held. Parties could not agree to settlement. Shall reconvene on 6/9/98 at 11:00 (Brown, D)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998
                                                                    NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of John Nazarian on 5/29/98 at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                      SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Richard Castellucci (Barletta, B)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998
                                                                        NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Prof. Richard Castellucci on 5/20/98 at 2:00 PM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 5/17/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                          NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Dr. John Salesses on 5/29/98 at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                            NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Patricia Giammarco on 5/20/98 at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 3/26/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER scheduled before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian on 4/23/98 at 10:00. Parties shall submit a settlement conference statement and confidential addendum on or before 4/16/98.( signed by Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian ) (Brown, D)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/26/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998
                                                                                Settlement conference set on 10:00 4/23/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/17/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [32-1] joint motion to Enlarge Time for discovery to 6/15/98. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/17/1998
                                                                                    Deadline updated; reset Discovery deadline to 6/16/98 , reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 7/17/98 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/17/1998, Terminated: 3/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by Timothy I. Eastridge, Rhode Island College, Board of Governors, Dix Coons, Richard Weiner, John Nazarian to Enlarge Time for discovery to 6/15/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 4/6/98 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998
                                                                                          Settlement conference set on 11:00 3/30/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting dismisssal of Counts III and VI for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and denying as to Counts I, II, IV and V [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 12/5/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997
                                                                                              NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Julius C. Michaelson 1/9/98 at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: 8/4/1997
                                                                                                SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Paul Chasse (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [25-1] joint motion to Amend [5-1] Scheduling order; discovery stayed until M/SJ is decided except for depo of Richard Weiner ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/25/1997, Entered: 7/25/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF hearing held before Chief Judge Ronald R. Lagueux for dates of 7/22/97 (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997, Terminated: 8/1/1997 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by Timothy I. Eastridge, Rhode Island College to Amend [5-1] Scheduling order (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997
                                                                                                        Motion hearing re: [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment Motion hearing held. Attorney Zurier for the plaintiff, and attorney Goodman for the defendant. crtrpt-Fontes. Court opens. Arguments heard. Court takes matter under advisement. Court stays discovery until motion for summary judgment is decided. (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Olga Juzyn-Amestoy on 7/17/97 at 10:00am. (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/7/1997
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Professor Paul Chasse on 7/15/97 at 10:00am. (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997
                                                                                                              Settlement conference set on 11:30 9/4/97 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER scheduling settlement conference before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian on 9/16/97 at 10:00. Parties shall file a settlement conference statement and confidential addendum on or before 9/9/97. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian ) (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997
                                                                                                                  Settlement conference set on 10:00 9/16/97 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/24/1997 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Ghislaine A. Geloin on 6/24/97 at 10:00am. (Burgess, J) Modified on 06/24/1997
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997
                                                                                                                      Motion hearing re: [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 9:30 7/22/97 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        CONDITIONAL MOTION by Timothy I. Eastridge to permit additional discovery prior to ruling on motion for summary judgment. (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                          Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Timothy I. Eastridge RE: [18-1] motion response (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Timothy I. Eastridge to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: 6/10/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Stipulation extending time for filing obj to M/SJ to 6/12/97 signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Dr. Dix Coons 6/6/97 at 10:30am. (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: 5/30/1997
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Timothy I. Eastridge to take deposition of Dr. Dix Coons on 6/9/97 at 10:00am., Dr. John Salesses on 6/10/97 at 2:00pm., John Nazarian on 6/10/97 at 10:00am., Ghislaine A. Geloin on 6/11/97 at 10:00am., Olga Juzyn-Amestoy on 6/12/97 at 10:00am. (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Enlarge Time in which to object to summary judgment motion to 6/5/97 ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997
                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Objection to Motion reset to 6/5/97 for [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997, Terminated: 5/20/1997 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Timothy I. Eastridge to Enlarge Time in which to object to summary judgment motion to 6/5/97 (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Dix S. Coons Re: [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Richard R. Weiner Re: [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Dr. John J. Salesses Re: [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                                Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Rhode Island College, et al RE: [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997, Terminated: 3/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Rhode Island College for Summary Judgment (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/10/1996 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for Rhode Island College, Board of Governors, Dix Coons, Richard Weiner, John Nazarian by Jay S. Goodman (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/4/1996, Entered: 12/4/1996 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Referring case to ADR ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 8/29/97 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 9/30/97 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996
                                                                                                                                                          Pre-trial conference held; Mr. Michaelson/Zurier for plaintiff, Mr. Long for def; discovery closes 8/29/96; pre trial memos due 9/30/97 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: 11/8/1996
                                                                                                                                                            Pre-trial conference set at 12:30 11/20/96 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996, Terminated: 9/28/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Board of Governors, Dix Coons, Richard Weiner, John Nazarian (Attorney Nicholas Trott Long), (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996
                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Rhode Island College, Board of Governors, Dix Coons, Richard Weiner, John Nazarian 10/2/96 Answer due on 10/22/96 for Rhode Island College, for Board of Governors, for Dix Coons, for Richard Weiner, for John Nazarian (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/3/1996
                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Timothy I. Eastridge , (Answer due 10/21/96 for John Nazarian, for Richard Weiner, for Dix Coons, for Board of Governors, for Rhode Island College ) amending [1-1] complaint. jury demand (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 33670 (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/14/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Judge Robert Lovegreen (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 296 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?