Paul Arpin v. Here & There Moving
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-00601-L
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Paul Arpin Van Lines, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Roberts, Carroll, Feldstein & Peirce, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Peirce +5217 521 521 7000 +5211 521 521 1328 rpeirce@rcfp.com
v.
No Logo Here & There Moving & Storage, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Allen Pogue +1 401 276 6491 +1 888 325 9050 mpogue@edwardswildman.com
Office Providence
Filed 10/18/1996
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Providence
Terminated 5/23/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997 Court Filing
Consent ORDER of Dismissal - attached settlement agreement ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/23/1997, Entered: 5/23/1997
    Case closed (Gilfillan, B)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/22/1997, Entered: 4/22/1997
      Bench trial set at 10:00 6/3/97 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Court Filing
        ORDER of Referral to ADR; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Court Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 4/25/97 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 5/30/97 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997
            referred to ADR (Gilfillan, B)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997
              Pre-trial conference held; Mr. Pierce for plaintiff, Mr. Pogue for def; discovery closes 4/25/97; pre trial memos due 5/30/97 (Gilfillan, B)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/16/1996, Entered: 12/16/1996
                Pre-trial conference set at 12:30 1/7/97 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 Terminated:
                  ANSWER to Complaint by Here & There Moving (Attorney Mark A. Pogue), (Burgess, J)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: 10/29/1996 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT of compliance by Timothy P. Gallogly (Burgess, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996
                      CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert Lovegreen (Burgess, J)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 34055 (Burgess, J)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 53 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?