Rainey v. Town of Warren, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-00040-L
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Patricia Rainey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Higgins Cavanagh & Cooney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald C. DeMaria +1 401 272 3500 +1 401 273 8780 gdemaria@hcc-law.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Primiano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by bgmalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melody A. Alger +1 401 331 1434 +1 401 351 9653 melody.alger@bgmalaw.com
Space Dennis S. Baluch +3311 331 331 1434 +3519 351 351 9653 dennis.baluch@bgmalaw.com
No Logo Kathleen Raposa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Town of Warren, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo United Steel Workers of America, AFL-CIO-CLC, Local Union 8688, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roberts, Carroll, Feldstein & Peirce, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Peirce +5217 521 521 7000 +5211 521 521 1328 rpeirce@rcfp.com
No Logo United Steelworkers of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roberts, Carroll, Feldstein & Peirce, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Peirce +5217 521 521 7000 +5211 521 521 1328 rpeirce@rcfp.com
No Logo Warren Police Department, Defendant
Office Providence
Filed 1/31/1997
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 3/31/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case none[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
  Entries (359) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 FRC Information
File located at National Archives and Records Administration Waltham, MA. Accession no. 21-01-0080 (2 volumes). (Mercurio, A)
    LREF
    Blank 270 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000 Court Filing
    STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice; no interest; no costs signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Barletta, B)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 3/31/2000
      Case closed (Barletta, B)
        LREF
        Blank 269 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/10/2000 Court Filing
        STIPULATION of dismissal of Def Louis Dutra signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
          LREF
          Blank 268 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000 Minutes-Miscellaneous
          Minute entry: Jury Impanelment. (Barletta, B)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000
            Jury impaneled. Crtrpt: J. Fontes. Gerald DeMaria and Patricia Andrews for pltf. Richard Pierce for Union defts; John Mahoney for Town of Warren; Melody Alger for Primiano. 10 jurors selected and sworn in. Jurors given a code-a-phone for Wed., 3/15/00 for anticipated trial date of 3/20/00. (Barletta, B)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000
              Calendar call held. Crtrpt: J. Fontes. Patricia Andrews and Gerald DeMaria for pltf; John Mahoney for Warren; Melody Alger for Primiano; Anthony DeMarco for Dutra. Case to be impaneled on 3/8/00 at 9:30 AM. (Barletta, B)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000
                Parties PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed in chambers (Gilfillan, B)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000
                  Def Primiano and Town of Warren PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed in chambers (Gilfillan, B)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000
                    Def Dutra's PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed in chambers (Gilfillan, B)
                      LREF
                      Blank 267 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [266-1] motion to Enlarge Time for filing pre trial memos to 3/1/00 ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                        LREF
                        Blank 266 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000, Terminated: 2/25/2000 Terminated:
                        MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time for filing pre trial memos to 3/1/00 (Gilfillan, B)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/8/2000
                          Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties could not agree to settlement. Case must pass to trial. (Brown, D)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000
                            Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge. Parties to reconvene on 2/8/00. (Brown, D)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000
                              Calendar call set at 10:00 3/7/00 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux impanelment 3/8/00 (Gilfillan, B)
                                LREF
                                Blank 265 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Court Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 2/25/00 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 264 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000 Court Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying [194-1] motion for Summary Judgment on Counts I through IV. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000
                                    Settlement conference set on 10:00 1/25/00 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000
                                      Rule 16 Conference set 12:30 1/21/00 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 263 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [260-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to M/Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/29/1999
                                          Motion(s) referred: [260-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to M/Summary Judgment. referred to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 262 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying [257-1] motion for entry of judgment without prejudice to refiling if deft. Town of Warren fails to comploy with this order as to answering interrogatory #10 on or before July 23, 1999 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 261 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                              NOTICE by Town of Warren to take deposition of Anthony Bucci on 6/23/99 at 2:00 PM. (Barletta, B)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 260 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999, Terminated: 7/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by United Steelworkers, United for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to M/Summary Judgment. (Barletta, B)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999
                                                  Motion hearing re: [257-1] motion for entry of judgment at 10:00 6/16/99 before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999
                                                    Motion(s) referred: [257-1] motion for entry of judgment referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [256-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file Motion for Entry of Default referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999
                                                      Motion(s) referred: [257-1] motion for entry of judgment referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [256-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file Motion for Entry of Default referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 259 Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER mooting [252-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999
                                                          Motion(s) referred: [252-1] motion to Dismiss referred to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 258 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                            OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [257-1] motion for entry of judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 257 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999, Terminated: 6/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by Patricia Rainey for entry of judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 256 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time to file Motion for Entry of Default (Barletta, B)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 255 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [194-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 254 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 Transcript
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF for dates of 4/12/99 & 4/13/99 (Barletta, B)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 253 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/16/1999 Court Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION of dismissal for Defs Perrotto and Barkett signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 252 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by Thomas Perrotto, Ely Barkett to Dismiss (Barletta, B)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 251 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER - affirming Mag J Order 2/3/99 ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 250 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999
                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (Barletta, B) Modified on 04/16/1999
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999
                                                                              Minute entry: Continuation of Plaintiff's Appeal of Magistrate's Order hearing (Barletta, B)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999
                                                                                Civil Hearing re: [239-1] Magistrate appeal before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux. Crtrpt: J. Fontes. Patricia Andrews for pltf; Denise Myers for Town of Warren. Continuation of 4/12/99 hearing. Court denies pltf's appeal and affirms Magistrate's Order of 2/3/99. Court to seal papers and keep in file. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 248 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                  Minute entry: re: Plaintiff's appeal of Magistrate's Order of 2/3/99 hearing. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999
                                                                                    Civil Hearing re: [239-1] Magistrate appeal Hearing held, [194-1] motion for Summary Judgment before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux. Crtrpt: J. Fontes. Gerald DeMaria and Patricia Andrews for pltf; Denise Myers for Town of Warren; Christopher Orten for T. Perrott; Richard Peirce and Adam Robitaille for Union defendants. Mr. DeMaria argues Pltf's objection to Magistrate Order of 2/3/99. Court to hear this matter at 9:30 AM on 4/13/99 at which time it will review papers to be supplied by Town of Warren and will decide this matter at that time. Mr. Peirce and Ms. Andrews argue Union Dfts' Mmotion for Summary Judgment. Court takes matter under advisement. Pltf to have 2 weeks to file brief and Union dfts to have 1 week to respond. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999
                                                                                      Civil Hearing re: [239-1] Magistrate appeal 9:30 4/8/99 before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999
                                                                                        Motion hearing re: [192-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 9:30 4/8/99, [196-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 9:30 4/8/99, [194-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 9:30 4/8/99 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 247 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                          Statement Of Disputed Fact by Patricia Rainey RE: [246-1] motion response (Barletta, B)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 246 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                            OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [194-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 245 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                              OBJECTION by Thomas Perrotto to [217-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to Defendants', United Steelworkers, Ely Barkett and Thomas Perrotto's Motions for Summary Judgment. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 244 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                OBJECTION by Ely Barkett to [240-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to summary judgment motions to 3/12/99. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 243 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/3/1999 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF for dates of 2/1/99 before Judge Lovegreen (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 241 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [240-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to summary judgment motions to 3/12/99. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 242 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                      OBJECTION by United Steelworkers, United to [240-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to summary judgment motions to 3/12/99. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 240 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999, Terminated: 3/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time to respond to summary judgment motions to 3/12/99. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 238 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: Pltf's motion for a protective order and the State of R.I.'s objection to a subpoena re: request from defts. for pltf's personnel records is granted in part and denied in part. The pltf. and/or the State is ordered to produce: application letter of 11/13/97; resume; psychological test and interview dated 3/19/98 & job description for Deputy Sheriff II. Pltf.'s motion to compel production of doc. & inspection of orig. records and tangible things is denied. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Administrator, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 239 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                            APPEAL of Magistrate Order dated 2/3/99 to District Court (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 237 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting conditionally [176-1] motion to Dismiss for failure of plaintiff to comply with Order of 7/17/98. Plaintiff shall provide all medical bills requestion on or before 2/26/99. Failure to do so shall result in the MJ recommending dismissal of Plaintiff's claims as they relate to Defendant Perrotto ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 236 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part, passing in part [202-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers by Thomas Perrotto to 2nd set of interrogatories, granting in part, passing in part [200-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 2nd set of interrogatories, granting in part, passing in part [199-1] motion to Compel ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories, granting in part, denying in part [198-1] motion to Compel production of documents, granting in part, denying in part [198-2] motion for inspection of original records and tangible things. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [191-1] motion to Compel Town of Warren to produce documents ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 235 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [210-1] motion for Protective Order, denying [214-1] motion for Protective Order for depositions of Thomas Perrotto, Ely Barkett, Michael Clancy Mary Brinkman and Michael Hartman., denying [208-1] motion for Joinder with Motion by Town of Warren for protective order, denying [206-1] motion to Quash deposition scheduled for 1/15/99, denying [206-2] motion for Protective Order preventing any further depositions., denying [204-1] motion for Protective Order, denying [187-1] motion to Quash subpoena scheduled for 1/8/99, denying [187-2] motion for Protective Order barring any further depositions, denying [141-1] motion for Protective Order with respect to subpoena issued by Town of Warren for personnel records, denying [95-2] motion for Protective Order: Alll motions for protective orders are denied. Plaintiff shall be allowed an additional three hours to question each witness at each deposition ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 229 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [175-1] motion to Amend [7-1] answer to add an affirmative defense ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 230 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Louis Dutra : amends [7-1] answer; jury demand (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 228 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [217-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to Defendants', United Steelworkers, Ely Barkett and Thomas Perrotto's Motions for Summary Judgment., Objection to Motion reset to 2/22/99 for [192-1] motion for Summary Judgment, reset to 2/21/99 for [196-1] motion for Summary Judgment, reset to 2/21/99 for [194-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 233 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER withdrawing [189-1] motion for Protective Order pertaining to deposition scheduled for 12/29/98. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 232 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER mooting [201-1] motion to Compel Thomas B. Perrotto to answer questions asked at deposition on 9/14/98. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 227 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999
                                                                                                                                Minute entry: re: Defendant, Dutra's, Motion to Amend Answer hearing (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                  Motion hearing re: [210-1] motion for Protective Order, [214-1] motion for Protective Order for depositions of Thomas Perrotto, Ely Barkett, Michael Clancy Mary Brinkman and Michael Hartman., [206-1] motion to Quash deposition scheduled for 1/15/99, [206-2] motion for Protective Order preventing any further depositions., [204-1] motion for Protective Order Motion hearing held, [187-1] motion to Quash subpoena scheduled for 1/8/99 Motion hearing held, [187-2] motion for Protective Order barring any further depositions Motion hearing held, [141-1] motion for Protective Order with respect to subpoena issued by Town of Warren for personnel records Motion hearing held before MJ Lovegreen. Court takes the State of RI Motion for protective order under advisement all other motions to quash and for protective orders are denied (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999
                                                                                                                                    Motion hearing re: [164-1] motion to Amend [7-1] answer to add affirmative defenses. Motion hearing held. Crtrpt: J. Fontes; Patricia Andrews and James Ruggieri for Pltf; Anthony DeMarco for dft, Dutra. Mr. DeMarco and Ms. Andrews argue Motion. Court grants defendant, Louis Dutra's, Motion to Amend Answer and will so endorse on papers. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 226 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Thomas Perrotto in support of [217-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to Defendants', United Steelworkers, Ely Barkett and Thomas Perrotto's Motions for Summary Judgment. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 225 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [198-1] motion to Compel production of documents (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 224 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by United Steelworkers, United in support of [217-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to Defendants', United Steelworkers, Ely Barkett and Thomas Perrotto's Motions for Summary Judgment with limitations.. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 223 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [188-1] motion to Compel plaintiff to respond to second request for production of documents. ( no objection being filed - Granted Rule of Court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 222 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [203-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories and production of documents with respect to new affirmative defenses asserted in Town of Warren's amended answer. ( No objection being filed - Granted rule of Court.) (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [219-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file post discovery motions up to 12/24/98. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999, Terminated: 1/7/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time to file post discovery motions up to 12/24/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999
                                                                                                                                                    Motion(s) referred: [202-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers by Thomas Perrotto to 2nd set of interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [201-1] motion to Compel Thomas B. Perrotto to answer questions asked at deposition on 9/14/98. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [200-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 2nd set of interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [199-1] motion to Compel ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                      Objection by Town of Warren to Plaintiff's form of Order submitted on 1/5/99. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 231 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER withdrawing [139-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony of Michael Hartman, withdrawing [139-2] motion for Discovery Releated Sanctions against Town of Warren, withdrawing [134-1] motion to Compel desposition testimony of Anthony DeSisto ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 217 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999, Terminated: 1/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time to respond to Defendants', United Steelworkers, Ely Barkett and Thomas Perrotto's Motions for Summary Judgment. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 216 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Ely Barkett to [199-1] motion to Compel ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 215 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Ely Barkett to [200-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 2nd set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 12/31/1998, Entered: 1/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [204-1] motion for Protective Order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 218 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 1/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Thomas Perrotto to [202-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers by Thomas Perrotto to 2nd set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 214 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 1/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Town of Warren for Protective Order for depositions of Thomas Perrotto, Ely Barkett, Michael Clancy Mary Brinkman and Michael Hartman. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 213 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 1/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Thomas Perrotto to [201-1] motion to Compel Thomas B. Perrotto to answer questions asked at deposition on 9/14/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 212 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 1/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION by Thomas Perrotto to [198-1] motion to Compel production of documents (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 210 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998, Terminated: 2/1/1999 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Thomas Perrotto for Protective Order (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998
                                                                                                                                                                            Motion hearing re: [164-1] motion to Amend [7-1] answer to add affirmative defenses. at 9:30 1/25/99 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion(s) referred: [210-1] motion for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 209 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [179-1] motion to Compel plaintiff to comply with request for inspection ( no objection being filed - Granted Rule of court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 208 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998, Terminated: 2/1/1999 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by United Steelworkers, United for Joinder with Motion by Town of Warren for protective order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 207 Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION by United Steelworkers, United to [198-1] motion to Compel production of documents (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion hearing re: [204-1] motion for Protective Order at 10:00 1/25/99, [191-1] motion to Compel Town of Warren to produce documents at 10:00 1/25/99, [189-1] motion for Protective Order pertaining to deposition scheduled for 12/29/98. at 10:00 1/25/99, [187-1] motion to Quash subpoena scheduled for 1/8/99 at 10:00 1/25/99, [187-2] motion for Protective Order barring any further depositions at 10:00 1/25/99, [141-1] motion for Protective Order with respect to subpoena issued by Town of Warren for personnel records at 10:00 1/25/99 before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion(s) referred: [198-1] motion to Compel production of documents referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 206 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 12/28/1998, Terminated: 2/1/1999 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Ely Barkett to Quash deposition scheduled for 1/15/99 , for Protective Order preventing any further depositions. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 12/28/1998, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [191-1] motion to Compel Town of Warren to produce documents (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 12/28/1998, Terminated: 2/1/1999 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Town of Warren for Protective Order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 12/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [204-1] motion for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [191-1] motion to Compel Town of Warren to produce documents and M/quash and/or Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 203 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/24/1998, Terminated: 1/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel answers to interrogatories and production of documents with respect to new affirmative defenses asserted in Town of Warren's amended answer. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 202 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/24/1998, Terminated: 2/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel more responsive answers by Thomas Perrotto to 2nd set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 201 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel Thomas B. Perrotto to answer questions asked at deposition on 9/14/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 200 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 2nd set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 199 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 198 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel production of documents , for inspection of original records and tangible things. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 197 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Ely Barkett RE: [192-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 196 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Ely Barkett for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 195 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement Of Undisputed Fact by United Steelworkers, United RE: [192-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 194 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998, Terminated: 1/11/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by United Steelworkers, United for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 193 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Thomas Perrotto RE: [192-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [192-2] motion and for substitution of the successor to his position as Chief of Warren Police as a party defendant. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 192 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998, Terminated: 4/16/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Thomas Perrotto for Summary Judgment , and for substitution of the successor to his position as Chief of Warren Police as a party defendant. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [176-1] motion to Dismiss for failure of plaintiff to comply with Order of 7/17/98. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion(s) referred: [189-1] motion for Protective Order pertaining to deposition scheduled for 12/29/98. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [187-2] motion for Protective Order barring any further depositions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998, Terminated: 2/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel Town of Warren to produce documents (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 190 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [187-1] motion to Quash subpoena scheduled for 1/8/99, [187-2] motion for Protective Order barring any further depositions (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 189 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Patricia Rainey for Protective Order pertaining to deposition scheduled for 12/29/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 188 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998, Terminated: 1/8/1999 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Thomas Perrotto to Compel plaintiff to respond to second request for production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: 12/16/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [156-1] motion to Compel pltf. to answer 2nd request for production of documents. ( no objection being filed - Granted Rule of court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 187 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Anthony Primiano to Quash subpoena scheduled for 1/8/99 , for Protective Order barring any further depositions (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 184 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/16/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Patricia Rainey to take deposition of Anthony DeSisto on 1/14/99 at 9:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 183 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/16/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Patricia Rainey to take deposition of Designees of Town of Warren on 1/11/99 at 9:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [176-1] motion to Dismiss for failure of plaintiff to comply with Order of 7/17/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [175-1] motion to Amend [7-1] answer to add an affirmative defense (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 181 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE by Patricia Rainey to take deposition of Anthony Primiano on 1/8/99 at 10:00 AM; and Anthony DeSisto at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 180 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED NOTICE by Patricia Rainey to take deposition of Town of Warren designees on 1/7/99 at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 179 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998, Terminated: 12/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Ely Barkett to Compel plaintiff to comply with request for inspection (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Patricia Rainey to take deposition of Anthony Primiano on 1/8/99 at 10:00 AM; and Anthony DeSisto at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 177 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Patricia Rainey to take deposition of Town of Warren designees on 1/7/99 at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 176 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998, Terminated: 2/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Thomas Perrotto to Dismiss for failure of plaintiff to comply with Order of 7/17/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 175 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998, Terminated: 1/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Louis Dutra to Amend [7-1] answer to add an affirmative defense (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 174 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of dismissal of parties T. Gordon, R Pare and V Soboleski signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 173 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting - no objection [164-1] motion to Amend [7-1] answer to add affirmative defenses. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 172 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER withdrawing without prejudice [128-1] motion for Reconsideration of [59-1] order ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER withdrawing without prejudice [139-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony of Michael Hartman, withdrawing without prejudice [139-2] motion for Discovery Releated Sanctions against Town of Warren ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 170 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER withdrawn as moot [124-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with order. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Motion hearing before Mag. Judge Lovegreen on 11/19/98. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE Assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion hearing re: [141-1] motion for Protective Order with respect to subpoena issued by Town of Warren for personnel records - WILL BE RESCHEDULED FOR HEARING, [139-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony of Michael Hartman, [139-2] motion for Discovery Releated Sanctions against Town of Warren - WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE, [134-1] motion to Compel desposition testimony of Anthony DeSisto, - GRANTED Town of Warren will provide copy of DeSisto Investigative Report to the plaintiff, [128-1] motion Reconsideration of [59-1] order - WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE, [124-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with order - WITHDRAWN AS MOOT. Hearing held before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. Patricia Andrews and James Ruggiero for plaintiff. Denise Myers for Town of Warren. Court informs counsel of recusal of Mag. Judge Martin from case. Ms. Andrews to submit order. (Zinni, C) Modified on 11/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Settlement discussions continue. Settlement conference will reset for future date. (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: [164-1] motion to Amend [7-1] answer to add affirmative defenses. referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice [140-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories a production of documents with respect to affirmative defenses asserted in Town of Warren's amended answer for failure to comply with certification requirement of Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(a)(2)(B). ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [132-1] motion in Limine to exclude all evidence relating to investigation of town solicitor Anthony DeSisto, [127-1] motion in Limine for an Order excluding any reference to "Dumkowski incident" at trial. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [131-1] motion to Compel Town of Warrent to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories, granting [130-1] motion to Compel answers by Town of Warrent to second set of interrogatories ( no objection being filed; Granted Rule of Court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [139-1] motion to Compel deposition testimony of Michael Hartman referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, [139-2] motion for Discovery Releated Sanctions against Town of Warren referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, [134-1] motion to Compel desposition testimony of Anthony DeSisto referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion(s) referred: [140-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories a production of documents with respect to affirmative defenses asserted in Town of Warren's amended answer. referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, [128-1] motion for Reconsideration of [59-1] order referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 166 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [98-1] motion to Compel production of documents. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998, Terminated: 11/19/1998 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Louis Dutra to Amend [7-1] answer to add affirmative defenses. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 163 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [136-1] motion to Compel production of documents and for inspection of original records and tangible things (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [140-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories a production of documents with respect to affirmative defenses asserted in Town of Warren's amended answer. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/10/98 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 1/15/99 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 160 Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying without prejudice [138-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 2nd set of interrogatories, denying without prejudice [137-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories, denying without prejudice[136-1] motion to Compel production of documents and for inspection of original records and tangible things, denying without prejudice[135-1] motion to Compel Thomas Perrotto to answer questions at deposition, denying without prejudice [129-1] motion to Compel answers by Thomas Pettotto to 2nd set of interrogatories ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 159 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 10/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION by United Steelworkers, United to [133-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions to compel answers by other defendants up to 10/23/98 (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 158 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 10/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by United Steelworkers, United to [127-1] motion in Limine for an Order excluding any reference to "Dumkowski incident" at trial. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 157 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [133-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions to compel answers by other defendants up to 10/23/98, granting [117-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions and ptm's., granting [116-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions and ptm's., granting [115-1] joint motion to Enlarge Time for filing motions until completion of depositions of Plaintiff and 30 days for ptm's., granting [114-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions to 11/10/98 and 30 days thereafter to file ptm's., granting [113-1] motion to Enlarge Time to 11/10/98 to file motions and 30 days thereafter to file ptm's., granting [108-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions and pretrial memos to 10/31/98 and 30 days thereafter for pretrial memos., resset Discovery deadline to 12/10/98 , reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 1/15/99 ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 156 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998, Terminated: 12/16/1998 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Thomas Perrotto to Compel pltf. to answer 2nd request for production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: [135-1] motion to Compel Thomas Perrotto to answer questions at deposition referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, [129-1] motion to Compel answers by Thomas Pettotto to 2nd set of interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 155 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION by Thomas Perrotto to [136-1] motion to Compel production of documents and for inspection of original records and tangible things (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 154 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Thomas Perrotto to [135-1] motion to Compel Thomas Perrotto to answer questions at deposition (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 153 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION by Thomas Perrotto to [129-1] motion to Compel answers by Thomas Pettotto to 2nd set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 152 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION by Thomas Perrotto to [127-1] motion in Limine for an Order excluding any reference to "Dumkowski incident" at trial. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 151 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Ely Barkett to [127-1] motion in Limine for an Order excluding any reference to "Dumkowski incident" at trial. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 150 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/26/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [120-1] motion to Compel plaintiff to answer interrogatories; no objection being filed - Granted Rule of Court. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 149 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Anthony Primiano to [127-1] motion in Limine for an Order excluding any reference to "Dumkowski incident" at trial. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: [138-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 2nd set of interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, [137-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, [136-1] motion to Compel production of documents and for inspection of original records and tangible things referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion(s) referred: [124-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with order. referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred: [127-1] motion in Limine for an Order excluding any reference to "Dumkowski incident" at trial. referred to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion(s) referred: [121-1] motion to inspect tape machine referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [136-1] motion to Compel production of documents and for inspection of original records and tangible things (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Ely Barkett to [137-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Ely Barkett to [138-1] motion to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 2nd set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [124-1] motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with order. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [117-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions and ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [114-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions to 11/10/98 and 30 days thereafter to file ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [116-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions and ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion(s) referred: [133-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions to compel answers by other defendants up to 10/23/98 referred to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, [117-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions and ptm's. referred to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, [116-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions and ptm's. referred to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [141-1] motion for Protective Order with respect to subpoena issued by Town of Warren for personnel records referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Patricia Rainey for Protective Order with respect to subpoena issued by Town of Warren for personnel records (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998, Terminated: 11/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel answers to interrogatories a production of documents with respect to affirmative defenses asserted in Town of Warren's amended answer. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel deposition testimony of Michael Hartman , for Discovery Releated Sanctions against Town of Warren (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998, Terminated: 11/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 2nd set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel Ely Barkett to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel production of documents and for inspection of original records and tangible things (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel Thomas Perrotto to answer questions at deposition (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel desposition testimony of Anthony DeSisto (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 133 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998, Terminated: 10/29/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time to file motions to compel answers by other defendants up to 10/23/98 (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Patricia Rainey in Limine to exclude all evidence relating to investigation of town solicitor Anthony DeSisto (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998, Terminated: 11/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel Town of Warrent to file more responsive answers to 1st set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel answers by Town of Warrent to second set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel answers by Thomas Pettotto to 2nd set of interrogatories (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Patricia Rainey for Reconsideration of [59-1] order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Patricia Rainey in Limine for an Order excluding any reference to "Dumkowski incident" at trial. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Motions for Default and motion for Production heard before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion hearing re: [98-1] motion to Compel production of documents. held before MJ Lovegreen (Meyers, Andrews) Attorneys argue. Court grants motion with restrictions, [94-1] motion for Entry of Default as to Town of Warren, Ely Barkett Motion hearing held, [94-2] motion and for proof of claim. Motion hearing held Motions for default and proof of claim are resolved by counsel (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by United Steelworkers, United to Dismiss for failure to comply with order. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [108-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file motions and pretrial memos to 10/31/98 and 30 days thereafter for pretrial memos. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [115-1] joint motion to Enlarge Time for filing motions until completion of depositions of Plaintiff and 30 days for ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Ely Barkett to inspect tape machine (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998, Terminated: 10/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Ely Barkett to Compel plaintiff to answer interrogatories. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection by State of Rhode Island to subpoena served upon it. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Town of Warren to Enlarge Time to file motions and ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Anthony Primiano to Enlarge Time to file motions and ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Town of Warren, Kathleen Raposa : amends [11-1] answer; jury demand (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Calendar call set at 10:00 11/2/98 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux; impanelment 11/4/98 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 10/7/1998, Entered: 10/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION by Thomas Perrotto, Ely Barkett to Enlarge Time for filing motions until completion of depositions of Plaintiff and 30 days for ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 10/7/1998, Entered: 10/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Ely Barkett to Enlarge Time to file motions to 11/10/98 and 30 days thereafter to file ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 10/7/1998, Entered: 10/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Louis Dutra to Enlarge Time to 11/10/98 to file motions and 30 days thereafter to file ptm's. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [83-1] motion to Amend [11-1] answer to add affirmative defense. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on John Fogarty Center (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [94-1] motion for Entry of Default as to Town of Warren, Ely Barkett (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute entry: re: Town of Warren's Motion to Amend Answer and add affirmative defenses. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion hearing re: [83-1] motion to Amend [11-1] answer to add affirmative defense. Motion hearing held. Crtrpt: J. Fontes. Patricia Andrews for pltf; John Mahoney for dft. Mr. Mahoney argues Town of Warren's Motion to Amend. Court grants Motion and will so endorse on papers. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998, Terminated: 10/29/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by United Steelworkers, United to Enlarge Time to file motions and pretrial memos to 10/31/98 and 30 days thereafter for pretrial memos. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Administrator, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred: [98-1] motion to Compel production of documents. referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [98-1] motion to Compel production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by United Steelworkers, United to take deposition of John Fogarty Center on 10/6/98 at 1:15 PM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on AIG Insurance Co. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Robert Dumkuski (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute entry: Motion hearing before Mag. Judge Lovegreen on 9/25/98. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [102-1] amended motion Amended for Protective Order, denying [100-1] motion for Protective Order ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion hearing re: [102-1] amended motion Amended for Protective Order held before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. Gerald DeMaria and Patricia Andrews for plaintiff. John Mahoney for deft. Motion is denied without prejudice. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred: [102-1] amended motion Amended for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [100-1] motion for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998, Terminated: 9/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Town of Warren Amended for Protective Order referring to [100-1] motion for Protective Order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Town of Warren Re: [100-1] motion for Protective Order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Town of Warren for Protective Order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by United Steelworkers, United to take deposition of AIG Insurance Co. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998, Terminated: 11/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Town of Warren to Compel production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Ely Barkett to [94-1] motion for Entry of Default as to Town of Warren, Ely Barkett (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion hearing re: [83-1] motion to Amend [11-1] answer to add affirmative defense. at 11:00 10/1/98 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion hearing re: [94-1] motion for Entry of Default as to Town of Warren, Ely Barkett at 3:00 10/15/98, [94-2] motion and for proof of claim. at 3:00 10/15/98 before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [95-1] motion to Compel ( no timely objection being filed - Granted Rule of Court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [94-1] motion for Entry of Default as to Town of Warren, Ely Barkett referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion(s) referred: [94-2] motion and for proof of claim. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion(s) referred: [95-1] motion to Compel referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [95-2] motion for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998, Terminated: 9/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Ely Barkett to Compel , for Protective Order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Patricia Rainey for Entry of Default as to Town of Warren, Ely Barkett , and for proof of claim. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 9/2/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by United Steelworkers, United to Compel production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 9/1/1998, Entered: 9/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [77-1] motion to Compel Town of Warrent to comply with Court order dated 5/27/98., [75-1] motion to Compel production of documents by Town of Warren (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [90-1] motion to Enlarge Time for discovery to 10/1/98 pre trial memos due 11/1/98. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; reset Discovery deadline to 10/1/98 , reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 11/2/98 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998, Terminated: 8/31/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ASSENTED MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time for discovery to 10/1/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ASSENTED to MOTION by Patricia Rainey to enlarge time for discovery to 10/1/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 8/20/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [82-1] motion for Protective Order, denying [81-1] motion for Protective Order ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by United Steelworkers, United to take deposition of Patricia Rainey on 8/21/98 at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [83-1] motion to Amend [11-1] answer to add affirmative defense. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [78-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers by Town of Warren. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Motion hearing before Mag. Judge Lovegreen on 8/17/98. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by United Steelworkers, United to [82-1] motion for Protective Order, [81-1] motion for Protective Order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion hearing re: [82-1] motion for Protective Order, [81-1] motion for Protective Order held before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. Patricia Andrews for plaintiff. Adam Robitaille, Kevin Bristow, Mark Fay, John Rallis, and Christopher Orton. Deposition to go forward on 8/21/98 at 10:00 a.m. and to continue on 9/2/98 at 10:00 a.m. Ms. Andrews to submit order. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998, Terminated: 10/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Town of Warren to Amend [11-1] answer to add affirmative defense. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998, Terminated: 8/20/1998 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corrected MOTION by Patricia Rainey for Protective Order (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998, Terminated: 8/20/1998 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Patricia Rainey for Protective Order (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred: [82-1] motion for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [81-1] motion for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [77-1] motion to Compel Town of Warrent to comply with Court order dated 5/27/98., granting [76-1] motion to Compel production of documents by Town of Warren relating to "Dumkuski Incident"., granting [75-1] motion to Compel production of documents by Town of Warren - granted Rule of Court - no timely objection being filed (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion hearing re: [78-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers by Town of Warren. at 2:00 8/11/98 before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [78-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers by Town of Warren. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion(s) referred: [78-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers by Town of Warren. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [57-1] motion to Compel production. Plaintiff shall have 30 days, up to and including 8/1/98 to comply with this order. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998, Terminated: 8/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel more responsive answers by Town of Warren. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998, Terminated: 7/31/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel Town of Warrent to comply with Court order dated 5/27/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel production of documents by Town of Warren relating to "Dumkuski Incident". (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel production of documents by Town of Warren (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 7/9/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part [30-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers to interrogatories., passing [28-1] motion to Compel production of documents. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 7/9/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [65-1] motion to Compel production of documents. ( no timely objection being filed, Granted Rule of court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER scheduled before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian on 8/31/98 at 10:00. Parties shall submit a settlement conference statement on or before 8/24/98. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian ) (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/7/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Settlement conference set on 10:00 8/31/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [62-1] motion to Compel answers ( no objection being filed ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [63-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to production and interrogatories to 7/31/98. ( no timely objection being filed) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [64-1] joint motion to Enlarge Time to extend discovery to 9/1/98; pre trial memos due 10/5/98. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; reset Discovery deadline to 9/1/98 , reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 10/5/98 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Town of Warren to take deposition of Monica Mazzeo on 7/8/98 at 2:00 PM; Blue Cross/Blue Shield at 3:00 PM and Gary L'Europa, MD at 3:30 PM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - response to subpoena due 7/7/98 ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties could not agree to settlement. Case must pass to trial. (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998, Terminated: 7/9/1998 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Town of Warren to Compel production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion hearing re: [57-1] motion to Compel production at 11:30 7/2/98 before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998, Terminated: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by Patricia Rainey, Town of Warren to Enlarge Time to extend discovery to 9/1/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Calendar call set at 11:00 7/7/98 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Settlement conference set on 12:00 6/25/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998, Terminated: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by United Steelworkers, United to Enlarge Time to respond to production and interrogatories to 7/31/98. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion(s) referred: [57-1] motion to Compel production referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [58-1] motion to Enlarge Time to 6/5/98 to comply with discovery requests. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998, Terminated: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel answers (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [57-1] motion to Compel production (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part, denying in part [46-1] motion to Compel production of documents from defendant, Town of Warren. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998, Terminated: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by United Steelworkers, United to Enlarge Time to 6/5/98 to comply with discovery requests. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/18/1998, Terminated: 7/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Thomas Perrotto to Compel production (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Hearing on Motion to compel documents heard before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion hearing re: [46-1] motion to Compel production of documents from defendant, Town of Warren. Motion hearing held before MJ Lovegreen (Andrews, Mahoney) Attorneys argue motion. Ruling: As to 2 investigations the motion is granted. As to the Town Solicitor's Report the motion is denied. (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [51-1] motion to Enlarge Time ( no timely objection being filed - Granted Rule of Court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion hearing re: [46-1] motion to Compel production of documents from defendant, Town of Warren. at 2:30 5/12/98 before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute entry: In chambers conference held before Mag. Judge Lovegreen on 4/28/98. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    In chambers hearing re: [28-1] motion to Compel production of documents. Motion hearing held, [30-1] motion to Compel responsive answers to interrogatories. Motion hearing held, [46-1] motion to Compel production of documents from defendant, Town of Warren. Motion hearing held before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. Patricia Andrew, Adam Robitaille and John Mahoney. Defendant's motion to compel prod. and Defendant's motion to compel more resonsive answers are resolved by counsel. Mr. Robitaille to submit order. Plaintiff's motion to compel production shall be set for hearing following in camera review of documents. Ms. Andrews to submit order. (Zinni, C) Modified on 04/28/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [49-1] motion for Protective Order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Enlarge Time to object to M/Protective Order ( no objection being filed) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [49-1] motion for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/16/1998, Terminated: 5/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by United Steelworkers to Enlarge Time (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: 4/15/1998, Terminated: 4/27/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time to object to M/Protective Order (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Town of Warren for Protective Order (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY of appearance for Patricia Rainey by Gerald C. DeMaria (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion hearing re: [46-1] motion to Compel production of documents from defendant, Town of Warren. at 2:00 4/28/98, [30-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers to interrogatories. at 2:00 4/28/98, [28-1] motion to Compel production of documents. at 2:00 4/28/98 (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Town of Warren to [46-1] motion to Compel production of documents from defendant, Town of Warren. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion(s) referred: [46-1] motion to Compel production of documents from defendant, Town of Warren. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/19/1998, Terminated: 6/2/1998 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Compel production of documents from defendant, Town of Warren. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion hearing re: [30-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers to interrogatories. at 10:00 4/8/98, [28-1] motion to Compel production of documents. at 10:00 4/8/98 (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [31-1] motion to Compel production of documents., granting [26-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to answer interrogatories propounded on 6/17/97. ( no objection being filed - Granted Rule of Court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [30-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers to interrogatories. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [28-1] motion to Compel production of documents. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [28-1] motion to Compel production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION by Patricia Rainey to [30-1] motion to Compel more responsive answers to interrogatories. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Enlarge Time to 3/2/98 to respond to defendants motion to compel. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Enlarge Time to 3/2/98 to respond to defendants motion to compel. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/24/1998, Terminated: 2/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time to 3/2/98 to respond to defendants motion to compel. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Vincent Soboleski 4/28/97 Answer due on 5/19/97 for Vincent Soboleski (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Ely Barkett 4/28/97 Answer due on 5/19/97 for Ely Barkett (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Thomas Perrotto 4/28/97 Answer due on 5/19/97 for Thomas Perrotto (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Thomas Gordon 4/28/97 Answer due on 5/19/97 for Thomas Gordon (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Louis Dutra 4/28/97 Answer due on 5/19/97 for Louis Dutra (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Anthony Primiano 4/29/97 Answer due on 5/19/97 for Anthony Primiano (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kathleen Raposa 4/28/97 Answer due on 5/19/97 for Kathleen Raposa (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to United 4/28/97 Answer due on 5/19/97 for United (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998, Terminated: 3/9/1998 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Town of Warren to Compel production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998, Terminated: 7/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by United Steelworkers, United to Compel more responsive answers to interrogatories. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: 2/13/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties could not agree to settlement. Discovery continues. Parties desire to reschedule a settlement conference in the future. (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: 2/4/1998, Terminated: 7/9/1998 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by United Steelworkers, United to Compel production of documents. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER scheduled before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian on 2/12/98 at 11:00. Parties shall submit a settlement conference statement and confidential addendum on or before 2/5/98.( signed by Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian ) (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998, Terminated: 3/9/1998 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Town of Warren to Compel Plaintiff to answer interrogatories propounded on 6/17/97. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/3/1998, Entered: 2/3/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Settlement conference set on 11:00 2/12/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Protective Order to prevent production of his personnel file as an officer of the Warren Police Department. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Pursuant to Deft. Primiano's Motion for Protective Order and by agreement of the parties it is hereby ordered defendant Primiano's personnel file will be reviewed "in camera" for purposes of identifying any documents relevant to pltf. claims ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/9/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion hearing re: [23-1] motion for Protective Order to prevent production of his personnel file as an officer of the Warren Police Department. at 2:00 1/29/98 before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [24-1] motion to Enlarge Time to file objection to Motion for protective order filed by defendant, Anthony Primiano up to and including 12/26/97. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [23-1] motion for Protective Order to prevent production of his personnel file as an officer of the Warren Police Department. referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 12/19/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Patricia Rainey to Enlarge Time to file objection to Motion for protective order filed by defendant, Anthony Primiano up to and including 12/26/97. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/4/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997, Terminated: 2/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Anthony Primiano for Protective Order to prevent production of his personnel file as an officer of the Warren Police Department. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/22/98 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 6/26/98 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 16 Conference held; Ms. Andrews for plaintiff, Mr. Fay, Flaherty, Leach, Bristow, Mahoney, Baluch, Robitaille, DeMarco; Ms. Buckley for Def Pare; discovery closes 5/22/98, pre trial memos due 6/26/98 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 16 Conference set 12:30 9/22/97 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/14/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Enlarge Time to answer interrogatories, granting [19-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to motion for production of documents (no objection filed Granted Rule of court) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE reassigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Judge (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997, Terminated: 8/14/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Thomas Perrotto to Enlarge Time to answer interrogatories (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Thomas Perrotto to Enlarge Time to respond to motion for production of documents (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 7/10/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Pare (Attorney Kevin J. Bristow),; jury demand (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY of appearance for Anthony Primiano by Melody A. Alger (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for Anthony Primiano by Dennis S. Baluch (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Anthony Primiano (Attorney Dennis S. Baluch, Melody A. Alger),; jury demand (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/20/1997 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation: The defendant Vincent Soboleski shall have up to and including June 19, 1997 in which to file their answer and/or responsive pleading. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Vincent Soboleski (Attorney C. Russell Bengtson ),; jury demand (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: 6/19/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for Vincent Soboleski by C. Russell Bengtson (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Town of Warren, Kathleen Raposa (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/17/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas Gordon (Attorney Peter D. Leach), (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation: The time within which Defendant Ely Barkett shall have to file an answer to plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended up to and including June 16, 1997. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Ely Barkett (Attorney Mark P. Dolan), (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Louis Dutra (Attorney Anthony F. DeMarco), (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 6/16/97 for Ely Barkett (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation: the defendant Thomas Perrotto may have up to an dincluding 6/15/97 in which to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 6/15/97 for Thomas Perrotto (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation: Answer due 6/19/97 for Defendants City of Warren and Kathleen Rapose, in her official capacity as Warren Town Treasurer. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; set Answer deadline to 6/19/97 for Kathleen Raposa, for Town of Warren (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas Perrotto (Attorney Francis X. Flaherty), (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: 5/27/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for Thomas Gordon by Peter P. D. Leach (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by United Steelworkers, United (Attorney Richard M. Peirce), (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 34784 (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE assigned to Judge Raymond J. Pettine . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy M. Boudewyns (Price, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 267 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?