Valente v. ACandS, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-00171-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 3:49 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Richard Valente, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
v.
No Logo ACandS, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Danaher, Lagnese & Sacco, P.C.-Hfd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth R. Neal +1 203 247 3666 +1 860 547 1321 kneal@dtln.com
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Heffernan +3345 334 334 5600 +3345 334 334 5005 HeffernanLaw@aol.com
No Logo Flintkote Company,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M. Fahey +1 617 350 0950 +3507 350 350 7760
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric"
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo Grant Wilson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter A. Lagorio, Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. Reynolds +8615 861 861 5522 +3314 331 331 4861 pvreynolds@conversent.net
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark O. Denehy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 mdenehy@apslaw.com
Space Peter Lawson Kennedy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 pkennedy@apslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by bgmalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter F. Mathieu +3311 331 331 1434 +3519 351 351 9653
No Logo John Crane Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Hazen +6352 635 635 2633

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
No Logo Rapid American, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
No Logo Reily Stoker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Stone & Webster Engineering Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Durant, Nichols, Houston, Mitchell & Sheahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert B. Mitchell +1 203 366 3438

Toggle Switch Represented by Partridge, Snow & Hahn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Purcell +8618 861 861 8200 +8618 861 861 8210
No Logo The H.B. Smith Co., Defendant
No Logo The Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred A. Kelly, Jr. +1 617 345 1319 +1 866 947 1649 fkelly@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
No Logo Isolatek International, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Mineral Products Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Danaher, Lagnese & Sacco, P.C.-Hfd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth R. Neal +1 203 247 3666 +1 860 547 1321 kneal@dtln.com
No Logo ACandS, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."
No Logo Flintkote Company,, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric"
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.
No Logo Grant Wilson, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter A. Lagorio, Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. Reynolds +8615 861 861 5522 +3314 331 331 4861 pvreynolds@conversent.net
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo John Crane Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Hazen +6352 635 635 2633

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
No Logo Rapid American, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Stone & Webster Engineering Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Durant, Nichols, Houston, Mitchell & Sheahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert B. Mitchell +1 203 366 3438

Toggle Switch Represented by Partridge, Snow & Hahn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Purcell +8618 861 861 8200 +8618 861 861 8210
No Logo The H.B. Smith Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo The Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred A. Kelly, Jr. +1 617 345 1319 +1 866 947 1649 fkelly@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
No Logo Isolatek International, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Mineral Products Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Danaher, Lagnese & Sacco, P.C.-Hfd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth R. Neal +1 203 247 3666 +1 860 547 1321 kneal@dtln.com
W. R. Grace & Company W. R. Grace & Company, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. McCormick +8312 831 831 2970 +7511 751 751 1797 mclaw@choiceonemail.com
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo Reily Stoker, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
Office Providence
Filed 4/2/1997
Jury Demand Both
Demand $2000000
Nature of Suit 368 - Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Providence
Terminated 8/25/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case none[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TMB
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Notice of Appearance/
Entry of Appearance by Brian D. Gross, Esq. and John B. Manning, Esq. on behalf of Georgia Pacific Corp. (Leyva, Lucia)
    LREF
    Blank 52 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Withdraw Attorney
    Withdraw Attorney Lawrence Cetrulo. (Saucier, Martha)
      LREF
      Blank 51 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Notice of Appearance/
      ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc. by David H. Stillman, Esq. WITHDRAWL OF APPEARANCE by David A. Salvatore, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE OF FILING OF VOLUNTARY PETITION UNDER CHAPTER 11 by Flintkote Company (Fernandes, D)
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 1/6/2004 Notice of Appearance/
          ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc. by David A. Salvatore, Esq. AND WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David Stillman, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Order
            ORDER, to Dismiss (USDC EDPA, J. Charles R. Weiner) (Mercurio, A)
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Order
              ORDER of Dismissal as to WR Grace & Co. (Saucier, M)
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000
                ENTRY of appearance for J.H. France by Mark O. Denehy, Peter Lawson Kennedy (Mercurio, A)
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998
                  ORDER granting [43-1] motion to Dismiss () (Webb, J)
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998
                    ORDER, to Dismiss as to stone webster () (Webb, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998, Terminated: 6/2/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by Grant Wilson to Dismiss (Branco, M)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by ACandS, Inc. (Attorney Kenneth R. Neal), (Branco, M)
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                          ENTRY of appearance for ACandS, Inc. by Kenneth R. Neal (Branco, M)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997
                            FEE PAID to appear pro hac vice by Robert B. Mitchell (Branco, M)
                              LREF
                              Blank 41 Filed: 9/25/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997
                              ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to crossclaim of Rapid American (Branco, M)
                                LREF
                                Blank 40 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997 Answer
                                ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to crossclaim of Rapid American (Branco, M)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Answer
                                  ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [16-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Answer
                                    ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [20-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 37 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Flintkote Company (Attorney Elizabeth M. Fahey),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 36 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997
                                        ANSWER by Grant Wilson to crossclaim of Rapid American (Branco, M)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997
                                          ANSWER by Stone & Webster to crossclaim of Rapid American (Branco, M)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 9/16/1997, Entered: 9/17/1997 Answer
                                            ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Company to crossclaim of Rapid American (Branco, M)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997
                                              ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [20-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: 9/11/1997 Answer
                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Flintkote Company (Attorney ),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Foster Wheeler Corp. (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 9/5/1997, Entered: 9/5/1997
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Rapid American (Attorney ),; jury demand (Webb, J)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 9/5/1997, Entered: 9/5/1997
                                                      ENTRY of appearance for Rapid American by John W. Kershaw (Webb, J)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 9/5/1997, Entered: 9/5/1997
                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Eastern Refractories (Attorney William M. Heffernan),; jury demand (Webb, J)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 9/5/1997, Entered: 9/5/1997
                                                          ANSWER by J.H. France to [16-2] cross claim (Webb, J)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 9/5/1997, Entered: 9/5/1997
                                                            ANSWER by J.H. France to crossclaim of Stoker (Webb, J)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/2/1997
                                                              ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Company to [20-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/2/1997
                                                                ANSWER by Grant Wilson to [20-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997
                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by J.H. France (Attorney Peter F. Mathieu),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997
                                                                    ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Company to crossclaim of Uniroyal (Branco, M)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/27/1997, Entered: 8/28/1997 Answer
                                                                      ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [16-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997
                                                                        ANSWER by Reily Stoker to pending and future crossclaims. (Branco, M)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997
                                                                          ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Reily Stoker (Attorney Lisa R. Evangelista) against ACandS, Inc., Eastern Refractories, Flintkote Company, Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, Grant Wilson, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Rapid American, Stone & Webster, United States Minera, The H.B. Smith Co., Uniroyal, Inc., Westinghouse Elect, W.R. Grace & Company (Branco, M)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997 Order
                                                                            ORDER: No objection having been timely filed, the order to transfer this case to the Eastern District of PA for MDL is now effective. (signed by Patricia Howard, Clerk of MDL Panel) (Branco, M)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997 Terminated Case
                                                                              Case closed (Branco, M)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. (Attorney Fred A. Kelly Jr., Randall L. Souza),; jury demand (Delano, D)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: 8/21/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                  ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Company to [16-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                    ANSWER by Grant Wilson to Crossclaim of John Crane, Inc. (Branco, M)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                      ANSWER by Grant Wilson to Crossclaim of Georgia-Pacific (Branco, M)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Robert B. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                          ANSWER by Georgia Pacific to pending and future crossclaims (Branco, M)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                            ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Georgia Pacific (Attorney Lisa R. Evangelista) against ACandS, Inc., Eastern Refractories, Flintkote Company, Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, Grant Wilson, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Rapid American, Stone & Webster, United States Minera, The H.B. Smith Co., Uniroyal, Inc., Westinghouse Elect, W.R. Grace & Company (Branco, M)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [10-1] motion for David H. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by United States Minera (Attorney Kenneth R. Neal),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
                                                                                                  ENTRY of appearance for United States Minera by Kenneth R. Neal (Branco, M)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: 8/6/1997, Terminated: 8/13/1997 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                    MOTION by John Crane, Inc. for David H. Stillman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Branco, M)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: 8/6/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane, Inc. (Attorney Anthony Hazen),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: 8/6/1997
                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc. by Anthony Hazen (Branco, M)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997
                                                                                                          CASE reassigned. to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Judge (Webb, J)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Grant Wilson (Attorney Paul V. Reynolds),; jury demand (Price, R)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997, Terminated: 8/14/1997 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                              MOTION by Stone & Webster for Robert B. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Price, R)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Stone & Webster (Attorney James E. Purcell, Robert B. Mitchell), (Price, R)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/11/1997
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Tag-Along Action by Westinghouse Elect (Price, R)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/11/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Answer
                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint and Entry of Appearance by Westinghouse Elect (Attorney Thomas W. Lyons III),; jury demand (Price, R)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by W.R. Grace & Company (Attorney James McKenna),; jury demand (Price, R)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for W.R. Grace & Company by James J. McKenna (Price, R)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 35250 (Price, R)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997
                                                                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Raymond J. Pettine . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy M. Boudewyns (Price, R)
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?