Renaud v. ACandS, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-00186-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lionel Renaud, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
v.
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Heffernan +3345 334 334 5600 +3345 334 334 5005 HeffernanLaw@aol.com
No Logo Flintkote Company,, Defendant
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric"
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelia High King +9414 941 941 4033 +4672 467 467 2187

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo Grant Wilson, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter A. Lagorio, Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. Reynolds +8615 861 861 5522 +3314 331 331 4861 pvreynolds@conversent.net
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark O. Denehy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 mdenehy@apslaw.com
Space Peter Lawson Kennedy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 pkennedy@apslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by bgmalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter F. Mathieu +3311 331 331 1434 +3519 351 351 9653
No Logo John Crane Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
No Logo Rapid American, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
No Logo Reily Stoker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelia High King +9414 941 941 4033 +4672 467 467 2187
No Logo Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Stone & Webster Engineering Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Durant, Nichols, Houston, Mitchell & Sheahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert B. Mitchell +1 203 366 3438

Toggle Switch Represented by Partridge, Snow & Hahn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Purcell +8618 861 861 8200 +8618 861 861 8210
No Logo The H.b. Smith Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis M. Duggan, Jr. +1 617 345 1000 +3451 345 345 1300

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred A. Kelly, Jr. +1 617 345 1319 +1 866 947 1649 fkelly@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Isolatek International, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Mineral Products Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Danaher, Lagnese & Sacco, P.C.-Hfd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth R. Neal +1 203 247 3666 +1 860 547 1321 kneal@dtln.com
Westinghouse Electric Corporation Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Westinghouse Electric Corp.-Penn."

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."
No Logo Flintkote Company,, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric"
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelia High King +9414 941 941 4033 +4672 467 467 2187

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo Grant Wilson, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter A. Lagorio, Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. Reynolds +8615 861 861 5522 +3314 331 331 4861 pvreynolds@conversent.net
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo John Crane Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
No Logo Rapid American, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Reily Stoker, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelia High King +9414 941 941 4033 +4672 467 467 2187
No Logo Stone & Webster Engineering Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Stone & Webster Engineering Corp."
No Logo The H.b. Smith Company, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Isolatek International, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Mineral Products Co."
W. R. Grace & Company W. R. Grace & Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "W.R. Grace & Co."
Westinghouse Electric Corporation Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Westinghouse Electric Corp.-Penn."

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelia High King +9414 941 941 4033 +4672 467 467 2187

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo Reily Stoker, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelia High King +9414 941 941 4033 +4672 467 467 2187
Westinghouse Electric Corporation Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "Westinghouse Electric Corp.-Penn."

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
Office Providence
Filed 4/2/1997
Jury Demand Both
Demand $2000000
Nature of Suit 368 - Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Providence
Terminated 6/24/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MDL, TMB
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Notice of Appearance/
Entry of Appearance by Brian D. Gross, Esq. and John B. Manning, Esq. on behalf of Georgia Pacific Corp.(Leyva, Lucia)
    LREF
    Blank 41 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
    ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc. by David H. Stillman, Esq. WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David A. Salvatore, Esq. for John Crane, Inc. (Fernandes, D)
      LREF
      Blank 40 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 1/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
      ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc. by David A. Salvatore, Esq. AND WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David H. Stillman, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
        LREF
        Blank 39 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to ACands, Inc.; signed by Judge Charles Weiner (bankruptcy Declaration) (Saucier, M)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 FRC Information
          File located at National Archives and Records Administration Waltham, MA. Accession no. 21-01-0080. (Mercurio, A)
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Order
            ORDER of Dismissal as to WR Grace & Co. (Saucier, M)
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Notice of Appearance/
              ENTRY of appearance for J.H. France by Mark O. Denehy, Peter Lawson Kennedy (Mercurio, A)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998
                ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Dismiss () (Webb, J)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998
                  ORDER, to Dismiss as to Dft Stone () (Webb, J)
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Court Filing
                    ORDER ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998, Terminated: 6/2/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by Grant Wilson, Inc. to Dismiss (Branco, M)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by ACandS, Inc. (Attorney Kenneth R. Neal), (Branco, M)
                          LREF
                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                          ENTRY of appearance for ACandS, Inc. by Kenneth R. Neal (Branco, M)
                            LREF
                            Blank 31 Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997
                            ANSWER to Complaint by J.H. France (Attorney Peter F. Mathieu),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                              LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
                              ANSWER to Complaint by United States Minera (Attorney Kenneth R. Neal),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                LREF
                                Blank 30 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
                                ENTRY of appearance for United States Minera by Kenneth R. Neal (Branco, M)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 29 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
                                  ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [6-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997
                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Eastern Refractories (Attorney William M. Heffernan), (Branco, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                      ENTRY of appearance for Stone & Webster by James E. Purcell (Branco, M)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/11/1997
                                        ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Co. to Crossclaim of Rapid American (Branco, M)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997
                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Rapid American (Attorney John W. Kershaw),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: 7/1/1997
                                            ENTRY of appearance for Rapid American by John W. Kershaw (Branco, M)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 6/25/1997, Entered: 6/26/1997 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. : amends; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 22 Filed: 6/24/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997 Answer
                                                ANSWER by Stone & Webster to [5-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/24/1997, Entered: 6/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by Stone & Webster for Robert B. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Branco, M)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/24/1997 Answer
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. (Attorney Fred A. Kelly Jr., Dennis M. Duggan Jr.),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997
                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane, Inc. (Attorney David H. Stillman),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997
                                                        ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc. by David H. Stillman (Branco, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: There having been no obj. to conditional order of transfer, matter is transferred to U.S. District Judge Charles Weiner of EDPA for MDL (signed by Patricia Howard, Clerk of the Panel) (Branco, M)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997
                                                            ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [5-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: 6/18/1997
                                                              ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [6-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 6/17/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997
                                                                ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [5-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997
                                                                  ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [6-2] cross claim (Webb, J)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Stone & Webster (Attorney Robert B. Mitchell), (Branco, M)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997
                                                                      ENTRY of appearance for Stone & Webster by Robert B. Mitchell (Branco, M)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/9/1997
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Foster Wheeler Corp. (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by W.R. Grace & Co. (Attorney James J. McKenna),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/5/1997
                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for W.R. Grace & Co. by James J. McKenna (Branco, M)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997
                                                                              CROSSCLAIM by Westinghouse Pa. against Reily Stoker (Branco, M)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997
                                                                                ANSWER by Westinghouse Pa. to [5-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997
                                                                                  CROSSCLAIM by Westinghouse Pa. against Georgia Pacific (Branco, M)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/4/1997, Entered: 6/4/1997
                                                                                    ANSWER by Westinghouse Pa. to [6-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Answer
                                                                                      ANSWER by Georgia Pacific to [6-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Answer
                                                                                        ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Georgia Pacific (Attorney Shelia High King) against ACandS, Inc., Eastern Refractories, Flintkote Company, Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, Grant Wilson, Inc., J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Rapid American, Stone & Webster, United States Minera, H.B. Smith Company, Uniroyal, Inc., Westinghouse Pa., W.R. Grace & Co. (Branco, M)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Answer
                                                                                          ANSWER by Reily Stoker to [5-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 Answer
                                                                                            ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Reily Stoker (Attorney Shelia High King) against ACandS, Inc., Eastern Refractories, Flintkote Company, Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric, Grant Wilson, Inc., J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Rapid American, Stone & Webster, United States Minera, H.B. Smith Company, Uniroyal, Inc., Westinghouse Pa., W.R. Grace & Co. (Branco, M)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/16/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997
                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Grant Wilson, Inc. (Attorney Paul V. Reynolds),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997
                                                                                                NOTICE of TAG-ALONG ACTION by Westinghouse Pa. (Branco, M)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997
                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Westinghouse Pa. (Attorney Thomas Lyons),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997
                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for Westinghouse Pa. by Thomas W. Lyons III (Branco, M)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 35265 (Branco, M)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/2/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                        CASE to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy M. Boudewyns (Branco, M)
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?