Almeida v. Raposa, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-00413-ML
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Richard Almeida, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aram Robert Schefrin +8638 863 863 8870 +8638 863 863 8938 aschefrin@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Jeffrey R. Leyh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by David Oliveira, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Jesse Oliveira +2749 274 274 9190 doliveira@djolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by higginsandslattery.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Baglini +7513 751 751 3600 +7514 751 751 4648 john.baglini@higginsandslattery.com
No Logo Kathleen Raposa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Lloyd Manufacturing Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by higginsandslattery.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Baglini +7513 751 751 3600 +7514 751 751 4648 john.baglini@higginsandslattery.com
No Logo Raymond Ouelette, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Robert Pare, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Thomas Perrotto, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Town of Warren, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Office Providence
Filed 7/7/1997
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 1/30/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TMB
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi (McCabe, F)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: 1/30/1998
    Case closed (McCabe, F)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: 1/29/1998
      Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties have agreed to settlement. A dismissal stipulation has been filed with the court. (Brown, D)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 Terminated:
        MOTION by Jeffrey R. Leyh for Leave to Amend (Brunelle, E)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998 Notice of Appearance/
          ENTRY of appearance for Jeffrey R. Leyh by David Jesse Oliveira (Brunelle, E)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: 1/16/1998 Court Filing
            NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER scheduled before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian on 1/29/98 at 12:00. Parties shall submit a settlement conference statement and confidential addendum on or about 1/22/98. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian ) (Brown, D)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: 1/16/1998
              Settlement conference set on 12:00 1/29/98 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 6/8/98 ; Deadline for filing of all dispositive motions 6/22/98 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 6/22/98 ; ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Burgess, J)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/8/1998
                  Rule 16 Conference held. Attorney Aram Schefrin for the plaintiff and attorney John Mahoney and John Baglini for the defendants. (Burgess, J)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: 12/10/1997
                    Rule 16 Conference set 9:30 12/18/97 Before Judge Mary M. Lisi (Burgess, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997
                      ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories ( no objection having been filed) (McCabe, F)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997
                        ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Compel Production of Documents ( no objection having been filed) (McCabe, F)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997, Terminated: 11/24/1997 Terminated:
                          MOTION by Town of Warren to Compel Production of Documents (Brunelle, E)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 10/30/1997, Terminated: 11/24/1997 Terminated:
                            MOTION by Town of Warren to Compel Answers to Interrogatories (Brunelle, E)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Stipulation
                              Stipulation: Defendant, Jeffrey R. Leyth and LLoyd Manufacturing Corp. may file their answers and/or pleadins on or before Sept. 12, 1997, which shall have the same full force and effect as though they were filed within the period required by the rules of court. (Delano, D)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Terminated:
                                ANSWER to Complaint by Jeffrey R. Leyh and Lloyd Manufacturing (Attorney John A. Baglini); jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: 9/16/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                  ENTRY of appearance for Jeffrey R. Leyh, Lloyd Manufacturing by John A. Baglini (Brunelle, E)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997 Stipulation
                                    Stipulation between the parties extending the time to and including August 31, 1997 within which the defendant, Jeffrey R. Leyh, may respond to plaintiff's complaint (Brunelle, E)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/14/1997 Terminated:
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Kathleen Raposa, Robert Pare, Thomas Perrotto, Raymond Ouelette (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kathleen Raposa, Robert Pare, Thomas Perrotto, Raymond Ouelette 7/21/97 Answer due on 8/11/97 for Kathleen Raposa, for Robert Pare, for Thomas Perrotto, for Raymond Ouelette (Dube, P)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Lloyd Manufacturing 7/22/97 Answer due on 8/11/97 for Lloyd Manufacturing (Dube, P)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/7/1997
                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT #36289 (Brunelle, E)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/7/1997
                                              CASE assigned to Judge Mary M. Lisi. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy Boudewyns (Brunelle, E)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?