The Dog Museum v. Ragosta, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:97-cv-00486-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo The Dog Museum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Richard Grimm +1 401 274 2000 +2779 277 277 9600 wgrimm@haslaw.com
v.
No Logo George T. O'Neil, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Ragosta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Duffy +1 617 951 2100 +1 617 951 2125 mduffy@peabodyarnold.com
Office Providence
Filed 8/28/1997
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 4/9/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, DLM
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000
File located at National Archives and Records Administration Waltham, MA. Accession no. 21-00-0069. (Webb, J)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999
    Case closed (Webb, J)
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999 StipulationCourt Filing
      Stipulation of facts and judgment signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Notice of Appearance/
        ENTRY of appearance for Robert A. Ragosta by John R. Mahoney (Webb, J)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999
          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM Dft Robert Ragosta and Plaintiff's pretrial memo to chambers (Webb, J)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999
            trial notice faxed for 4/6/99 (Webb, J)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
              NOTICE by The Dog Museum to take deposition of Robert A. Ragosta, George O'Neil (Branco, M)
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [26-1] motion for Reconsideration of [13-1] Scheduling order, reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 3/15/99 ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Status Conference
                  Status conference held counsel inform judge of another case declaratory judgment 99-0063 Judge Torres informed attys that he will take this case and also the present case will be on the April 6, 1999 trial calendar (Webb, J)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                    Deadline updated; reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 3/15/99 (Webb, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999, Terminated: 2/12/1999 Terminated:
                      MOTION by The Dog Museum for Reconsideration of [13-1] Scheduling order (Branco, M)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999
                        Status conference set at 4:00 2/12/99 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999
                          Status conference set at 10:30 2/4/99 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999
                            NOTICE by The Dog Museum to take deposition of Robert A. Ragosta (Branco, M)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999
                              Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Parties could not agree to settlement. Case must pass to trial. (Brown, D)
                                LREF
                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Enlarge Time to assert third-party complaint, discovery for one month ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/5/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                  NOTICE by The Dog Museum to take deposition of George T. O'Neil, Robert A. Ragosta (Branco, M)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION by Robert A. Ragosta to Enlarge Time to assert third-party complaint, discovery for one month (Branco, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998
                                      Deadline updated; reset Discovery deadline to 12/31/98 , reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 2/28/99 (Webb, J)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998
                                        CASE to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Branco, M)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by The Dog Museum to Enlarge Time for close of discovery to 12/31/98 (Branco, M)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: 9/14/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                            NOTICE by The Dog Museum to take deposition of George T. O'Neil, Robert A. Ragosta, James H. Barnett (Branco, M)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/24/1998
                                              NOTICE by The Dog Museum to take deposition of Robert A. Ragosta (Branco, M)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/23/1998 Stipulation
                                                Stipulation dft Ragosta has till 7.11.98 to respond to interr. (Webb, J)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                  SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on James Barnett, Edwards & Angell (Branco, M)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                    NOTICE by The Dog Museum to take deposition of James H. Barnett, Edwards & Angell (Branco, M)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/6/1998 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                      NOTICE by The Dog Museum to take deposition of James Barnett, Esq. on 4/27/98 at 10:00 AM; and of Edwards & Angell at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998 Affidavit
                                                        AFFIDAVIT by George T. O'Neil Re: [10-1] motion for Mark A. Sjoberg to Withdraw as Attorney (Branco, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998 Court Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 9/30/98 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 9/30/98 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 11/30/98 ; ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998
                                                            Pre-Trial Conference held mandatory settlement conference late sping 1998 (Webb, J)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/14/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998
                                                              Pre-Trial Conference set at 9:00 1/26/98 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: 12/19/1997 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: 12/19/1997
                                                                  CASE reassigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Judge Boudewyns (Webb, J)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/18/1997 Affidavit
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by Robert A. Ragosta, George T. O'Neil Re: [10-1] motion for Mark A. Sjoberg to Withdraw as Attorney (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/4/1997 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by Robert A. Ragosta, George T. O'Neil for Mark A. Sjoberg to Withdraw as Attorney (Barletta, B)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 11/26/1997
                                                                        Rule 16 Conference set 12:30 12/19/97 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                          SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on James H. Barnett (Burgess, J)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: 10/22/1997 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                            NOTICE by The Dog Museum to take deposition of James H. Barnett on 11/5/97 at 10:00am. (Burgess, J)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997 Jury Demand
                                                                              DEMAND for jury trial by The Dog Museum (Burgess, J)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 10/1/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Robert A. Ragosta (Attorney Michael P. Duffy), (Burgess, J)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/30/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997, Terminated: 4/9/1999 Answer
                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by George T. O'Neil (Attorney Mark A. Sjoberg), (Burgess, J)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/8/1997 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [2-2] motion for Preliminary Injunction ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Robert A. Ragosta, George T. O'Neil 8/27/97 Answer due on 9/16/97 for Robert A. Ragosta, for George T. O'Neil (Burgess, J)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997 Complaint
                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 36685 (Burgess, J)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by The Dog Museum for Temporary Restraining Order , and for Preliminary Injunction (Burgess, J)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 8/26/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy Boudewyns (Burgess, J)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?