USA v. Sequeira
Criminal Case Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:98-cr-00002-T

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth P. Madden +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5001 kenneth.madden@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Providence
Filed 1/7/1998
County Providence
Terminated 8/14/1998
Reopened
Magistrate Case
197-mj-00248
Citation
Offense Level
18371,2113,924(c) CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT BANK ROBBERY, ARMED BANK ROBERY, AND USING AND CARRYING A FIREARM DURING AND IN RELATION TO A CRIME OF VIOLENCE [ 197-m -248 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Conspiracy to Commit Armed Bank Robbery in Violation of 18371
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113D.F
Offense Level 4
ARMED BANK ROBBERY, ASSAULT WITH A DEADLY WEAPON IN VIOLATION OF 182113(a) and 182113(d)
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
ARMED BANK ROBBERY BY FORCE OR VIOLENCE IN VIOLATION OF 182113(a)
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 924C.F
Offense Level 4
Use and Carry of a Firearm in Relation to a Crime of Violence in Violation of 18924(c)
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 922G.F
Offense Level 4
Felon in Possession, in and affecting Commerce of Firearms and Ammunition in Violation of 18922(g)(1)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, PRIOR, RWL
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 60 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/3/1999 Court Filing
CJA 20 as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. Authorization to Pay Scott Lutes ( Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT as to Donald R. Lafond (2) count(s) 1, 2 , 4 . 322 mons. imp. as follows: Count 1: 60 mons. imp., 3 yrs. sup. rel., restitution in amt. of $2,963, jointly w/codefts, $100 special assessment; assignment to facility providing substance abuse program and med. treatment. Count 2: 262 mons. imp., concurrent, 5 yrs. sup. rel., concurrent; $100 special assessment. Count 4: 60 mons. imp. consecutive, 3 yrs. sup. rel., concurrent, $100 special assessment. ( Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Branco, M)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998
      Minute entry as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. re: sentencing hearing (Branco, M)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Court Filing
        ORDER as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. granting [37-1] motion to Dismiss Counts 3 and 5 as to Donald R. Lafond (2) ( Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Branco, M)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998, Terminated: 8/14/1998 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION by USA as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. to Dismiss Counts 3 and 5 (Branco, M)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998
            DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Donald R. Lafond (2) count(s) 3, 5 (Branco, M)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998
              Sentencing held Donald R. Lafond (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4. Madden for Govt. Lutes for Deft. Deft. & counsel reviewed and discussed PSR. Character letters to be made part of PSR. No obj. to PSR by Govt. or Deft. The Court finds Probation Officer correctly calculated TOL = 34; CHC = VI; range = 262-327 mons. for Counts 1 & 2; 60 mons. consecutive on Count 4. Deft. allocutes. Atty. Lutes requests low end of range. Govt. recommends 300 mons. imp. on Count 2; 60 mons. imp. on Count 1, concurrent; 60 mons. imp. on Count 4 consecutive; restitution to be paid jointly by all Defts. Sentence: Count 1: 60 mons. imp., concurrent; 3 yrs. sup. rel. concurrent; restitution in amt. of $2,963 jointly w/codefts; no fine; $100 special assessment. Count 2: 262 mons. imp., concurrent; 5 yrs. sup. rel. concurrent w/pmt. of restitution; no fine; $100 special assessment. Count 4: 60 mons. imp., consecutive; 3 yrs. sup. rel., concurrent; restitution; no fine; $100 special assessment. Deft. advised of right to appeal. (Branco, M)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998
                PRISONER REQUESTED as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. for 8/14/98 (Branco, M)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998
                  Sentencing set for 10:00 8/14/98 for William Sequeira, 11:30 for Donald R. Lafond Jr. Before Judge Ernest C. Torres William Sequeira (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Donald R. Lafond (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 (Branco, M)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998
                    PRISONER REQUESTED as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. for 7/10/98 (Branco, M)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998
                      Minute entry as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr. re: change of plea hearing (Branco, M)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998
                        CERTIFICATION OF DEFT'S MEDICATION by Donald R. Lafond Jr. as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. (Branco, M)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998
                          Sentencing set for 11:00 7/10/98 for Donald R. Lafond Jr. Before Judge Ernest C. Torres , Donald R. Lafond (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4 (Branco, M)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998
                            PLEA entered by William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr.. Court accepts plea. Guilty: William Sequeira (1) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Donald R. Lafond (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4 (Terminated motions: ) (Branco, M)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998
                              Plea Agreement Accepted as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr. ( by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Branco, M)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998
                                Plea Agreement Hearing as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr. held. Browne for Govt. Mann for Sequeira. Lutes for Lafond. Govt. summarizes charges, elements, penalties, terms of plea agmt. Counsel agree. Defts. sworn & questioned by the Court. Govt. summarizes facts. Defts. agree, wish to plead guilty to Counts 1, 2 & 4. The Court finds Defts. competent to plead. Plea knowing & voluntary; supported by fact. The Court accepts plea provisionally upon review of PSR. Sentencing on 7/10/98 at 9:30 for Sequeira; 11:00 for LR. right to review & object to PS (Branco, M)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998
                                  PRISONER REQUESTS as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr. for 3/12/98 (Branco, M)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998
                                    Plea Agreement Hearing as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr. set for 9:00 3/12/98 for William Sequeira, for Donald R. Lafond Jr. Before Judge Ernest C. Torres (Branco, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998
                                      copy of medication cert. by Donald R. Lafond Jr. (Webb, J)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Plea Agreement
                                        Plea Agreement as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. (Branco, M)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998
                                          Pre-trial conference as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr., Phillip A. Lafond held before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. Kenneth Madden for Govt. William Murphy, Robert Mann and Scott Lutes for defendants. (Zinni, C)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998
                                            Motion(s) referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr., Phillip A. Lafond : [9-1] motion to Amend [1-1] indictment in (Webb, J)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by USA as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr., Phillip A. Lafond to Amend [1-1] indictment in (Branco, M)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Court Filing
                                                ORDER as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr., Phillip A. Lafond, for Pre-trial memo due 2/27/98 and electronic recordings and trial estimates due 2/20/98 ( Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998
                                                  trial notice mailed for 3/4/98 (Webb, J)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER OF DETENTION as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr., Phillip A. Lafond ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Arraignment OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ARRAIGNMENT ORDER as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr., Phillip A. Lafond setting Motion Filing deadline on 2/9/98 for William Sequeira, for Donald R. Lafond Jr., for Phillip A. Lafond ; Pretrial Conference for 9:30 2/18/98 for William Sequeira, for Donald R. Lafond Jr., for Phillip A. Lafond before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen . Placed on Continuous Trial Calendar for February 20, 1998. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (Zinni, C)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                        ENTRY of Appearance for Donald R. Lafond Jr. by Attorney Scott Lutes (Zinni, C)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Detention Hearing
                                                          Detention hearing as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr., Phillip A. Lafond held before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. Kenneth Madden for Govt. Robert Mann for deft. Sequeira. Scott Lutes for deft. Donald Lafond. William Murphy for deft. Phillip Lafond. All defendants are ordered detained. (Zinni, C)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Arraignment
                                                            Arraignment as to William Sequeira, Donald R. Lafond Jr., Phillip A. Lafond held before Mag. Judge Lovegreen. Kenneth Madden for Govt. Robert Mann for deft. Sequeira. Scott Lutes for deft. Donald Lafond. William Murphy for deft. Phillip Lafond. Defendants plead not guilty. (Zinni, C)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/7/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Indictment
                                                              INDICTMENT as to William Sequeira (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Donald R. Lafond (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Phillip A. Lafond (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 (Preliminary Examination cancelled.) (Zinni, C)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/7/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                CASE Assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Zinni, C)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997 Court Filing
                                                                  CJA 20 as to Donald R. Lafond Jr.: Appointment of Attorney Scott A. Lutes Voucher # 0619416 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) [ 1:97-m -248 ] (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997
                                                                    CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Donald R. Lafond Jr. approved by MJ Lovegreen [ 1:97-m -248 ] (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997
                                                                      Detention hearing as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. held before MJ Lovegreen Court detains defendant [ 1:97-m -248 ] (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997
                                                                        Initial Appearance as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. held before MJ Lovegreen (Leavey, Lutes); Preliminary Examination set for 11:30 1/7/98 for Donald R. Lafond Jr. (Defendant informed of rights.) [ 1:97-m -248 ] (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/29/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997
                                                                          Initial Appearance as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. set for 2:00 12/29/97 for Donald R. Lafond Jr. Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen [ 1:97-m -248 ] (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/26/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997 Arrest
                                                                            ARREST of Donald R. Lafond Jr. [ 1:97-m -248 ] (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997 Warrant Issued
                                                                              Arrest WARRANT issued as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. [ 1:97-m -248 ] (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 12/29/1997 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT as to Donald R. Lafond Jr. [ 1:97-m -248 ] (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 2,497 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?