Brennan v. ACandS, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00149-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dennis Brennan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
v.
No Logo A.w. Chesterton, Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "A.W. Chesterton Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank A. Marinelli +1 781 848 0400 +1 781 848 9927 fmarinellilaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
No Logo Armstrong World Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo Asbestos Claims Management Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CBS Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Clifton Associates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Cloherty, III +1 617 350 0950 +1 617 350 7760 jcloherty@piercedavis.com
No Logo Db Riley, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Heffernan +3345 334 334 5600 +3345 334 334 5005 HeffernanLaw@aol.com
No Logo Flintkote Company,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William T. Purdue +5285 528 528 5862 +1 888 325 9635 wpurdue@eapdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M. Fahey +1 617 350 0950 +3507 350 350 7760
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark O. Denehy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 mdenehy@apslaw.com
Space R. Bart Totten +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 btotten@apslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by bgmalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter F. Mathieu +3311 331 331 1434 +3519 351 351 9653
No Logo John Crane Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
No Logo Rapid American, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
No Logo The H.b. Smith Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner & Newall Plc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo U.S. Gypsum, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
W. R. Grace & Company W. R. Grace & Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "W.R. Grace & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. McCormick +8312 831 831 2970 +7511 751 751 1797 mclaw@choiceonemail.com
No Logo A.w. Chesterton, Company, Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "A.W. Chesterton Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank A. Marinelli +1 781 848 0400 +1 781 848 9927 fmarinellilaw@aol.com
No Logo Db Riley, Inc., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo Rapid American, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
No Logo A.w. Chesterton, Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "A.W. Chesterton Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank A. Marinelli +1 781 848 0400 +1 781 848 9927 fmarinellilaw@aol.com
No Logo Armstrong World Industries, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Claims Management Corporation, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "CBS Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Clifton Associates, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Cloherty, III +1 617 350 0950 +1 617 350 7760 jcloherty@piercedavis.com
No Logo Db Riley, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Heffernan +3345 334 334 5600 +3345 334 334 5005 HeffernanLaw@aol.com
No Logo Flintkote Company,, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William T. Purdue +5285 528 528 5862 +1 888 325 9635 wpurdue@eapdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M. Fahey +1 617 350 0950 +3507 350 350 7760
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo John Crane Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of America"
No Logo Pittsburgh Corning Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Rapid American, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
No Logo Rutland Fire Clay Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Rutland Fire Clay Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Cloherty, III +1 617 350 0950 +1 617 350 7760 jcloherty@piercedavis.com
No Logo The H.b. Smith Company, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Turner & Newall Plc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo U.S. Gypsum, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
W. R. Grace & Company W. R. Grace & Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "W.R. Grace & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Claudia Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. McCormick +8312 831 831 2970 +7511 751 751 1797 mclaw@choiceonemail.com
Office Providence
Filed 3/20/1998
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 368 - Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Providence
Terminated 7/21/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MDL, RWL
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/4/1998 Terminated:
ANSWER to Complaint by ACandS, Inc. (Attorney Kenneth R. Neal),; jury demand (Branco, M)
    LREF
    Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Gross, John B. Manning on behalf of Georgia Pacific Corp.(Duhamel, John)
      LREF
      Blank 56 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
      Withdraw Attorney Lawrence Cetrulo. (Saucier, Martha)
        LREF
        Blank 55 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
        ENTRY of appearance for A.W. Chesterton Co. by Brian D. Gross (Gilfillan, B)
          LREF
          Blank 54 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
          NOTICE of withdrawal by McKinnon & Harwood by A.W. Chesterton Co. (Gilfillan, B)
            LREF
            Blank 53 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Notice of Appearance/
            ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc., by David H. Stillman, Esq. WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David Salvatore, Esq. for John Crane, Inc. (Fernandes, D)
              LREF
              Blank 52 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 1/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
              ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc. by David A. Salvatore, Esq. AND WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David H. Stillman, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
                LREF
                Blank 51 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to ACands, Inc.; signed by Judge Charles Weiner (Bankruptcy Declaration) (Saucier, M)
                  LREF
                  Blank 50 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Order
                  ORDER, to Dismiss Flexitallic without prejudice. Signed by Charles Weiner EDPA. (St.John, B)
                    LREF
                    Blank 49 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Order
                    ORDER (of J. Weiner dismissing case against US Gypsum w/o prejudice) (McCabe, F)
                      LREF
                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001
                      ORDER of J. Weiner dated 6/13/01 dismissing case against Pittsburgh Corning w/o prejudice) (McCabe, F)
                        LREF
                        Blank 47 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER of Dismissal as to defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc. (signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner EDPA) (Saucier, M)
                          LREF
                          Blank 46 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 Order
                          ORDER (of J. Weiner dismissing case w/o prejudice against Armstrong World) (McCabe, F)
                            LREF
                            Blank 45 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay by GAF Corporation (Delano, D)
                              LREF
                              Blank 44 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER dismissing GAF Corp. without prejudice (signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner) (Barletta, B)
                                LREF
                                Blank 43 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Order
                                ORDER, to Dismiss Pittsburgh Corning (EDPA) (Mercurio, A)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 42 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000
                                  ORDER, to Dismiss Rutland Fire Clay Co. having declared bankruptcy (USDC EDP) (Mercurio, A)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 41 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000
                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of plaintiff's claims against deft. Metropolitan Life Ins. Co. by Dennis Brennan (Mercurio, A)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 40 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                      ENTRY of appearance for J.H. France by Mark O. Denehy, R. Bart Totten (Mercurio, A)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 39 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                        ENTRY of appearance for Rutland Fire Clay by John J. Cloherty III (Delano, D)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 38 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Remark
                                          Withdrawal of appearance of Elizabeth M. Fahey for deft. Rutland Fire Clay Company (Delano, D)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 37 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                            ENTRY of appearance for Clifton Associates by John J. Cloherty III (Delano, D)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 36 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Remark
                                              Withdrawal of appearance of Elizabeth M. Fahey for deft. Clifton Associates, Inc. (Delano, D)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 9/19/2002 FRC Information
                                                File located at National Archives and Records Administration Waltham, MA. Accession no. 21-99-0072. (Mercurio, A)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999
                                                  STIPULATION of dismissal as to dft Garlock (Webb, J)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 12/9/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998
                                                    ENTRY of appearance for Metropolitan Life by Staci L. Sawyer (Branco, M)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/4/1998
                                                      ENTRY of appearance for Flintkote Company, Flintkote Company by William T. Purdue (Webb, J)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 Answer
                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Pittsburgh Corning (Attorney Catherine A. Mohan), (Branco, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/28/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          ENTRY of appearance for Pittsburgh Corning by Catherine A. Mohan (Branco, M)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998
                                                            Case closed (Webb, J)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                              ANSWER by Metropolitan Life to [22-2] cross claim, [15-2] cross claim, [17-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life (Attorney John H. Blish), (Branco, M)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: 6/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Clifton Associates (Attorney Elizabeth M. Fahey),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by J.H. France (Attorney Peter F. Mathieu),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                      ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [15-2] cross claim, [17-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998 Terminated:
                                                                        ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [22-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 Remark
                                                                          order from MDL transferring case (Webb, J)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                            ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [22-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                                              ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Co. to [22-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/4/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [22-2] cross claim, [15-2] cross claim, [17-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                  ANSWER by D.B. Riley, Inc. to [15-2] cross claim, [17-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                    ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by D.B. Riley, Inc. (Attorney Lisa R. Evangelista) against ACandS, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Co., Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, CBS Corp., Clifton Associates, Eastern Refractories, Flexitallic Co., Flintkote Company, Foster Wheeler Corp., GAF Corporation, Garlock, Inc., Georgia Pacific, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life, Pittsburgh Corning, Rapid American, Rutland Fire Clay, H.B. Smith Company, Turner & Newall, PLC, U.S. Gypsum, Uniroyal, Inc., W.R. Grace & Co. (Branco, M)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                      ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [17-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                        ANSWER by Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, Flexitallic Co., GAF Corporation, Georgia Pacific, Turner & Newall, PLC, U.S. Gypsum to [15-2] cross claim, [17-2] cross claim and any and all future crossclaims and third-party claims (Branco, M)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, Flexitallic Co., GAF Corporation, Georgia Pacific, Turner & Newall, PLC, U.S. Gypsum (Attorney Lisa R. Evangelista),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998
                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, Flexitallic Co., GAF Corporation, Georgia Pacific, Turner & Newall, PLC, U.S. Gypsum by Lisa R. Evangelista (Branco, M)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                              ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [17-2] cross claim (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Co. to [17-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                  ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by A.W. Chesterton Co. (Attorney Frank A. Marinelli) against ACandS, Inc., Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, CBS Corp., Clifton Associates, D.B. Riley, Inc., Eastern Refractories, Flexitallic Co., Flintkote Company, Foster Wheeler Corp., GAF Corporation, Garlock, Inc., Georgia Pacific, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life, Pittsburgh Corning, Rapid American, Rutland Fire Clay, H.B. Smith Company, Turner & Newall, PLC, U.S. Gypsum, Uniroyal, Inc., W.R. Grace & Co. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998
                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for Rapid American by John W. Kershaw (Branco, M)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/14/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                                      ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Rapid American (Attorney John W. Kershaw) against ACandS, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Co., Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, CBS Corp., Clifton Associates, D.B. Riley, Inc., Eastern Refractories, Flexitallic Co., Flintkote Company, Foster Wheeler Corp., GAF Corporation, Garlock, Inc., Georgia Pacific, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life, Pittsburgh Corning, Rutland Fire Clay, H.B. Smith Company, Turner & Newall, PLC, U.S. Gypsum, Uniroyal, Inc., W.R. Grace & Co. (Branco, M)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/11/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Foster Wheeler Corp. (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/8/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                                          ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Co. to crossclaim of John Crane, Inc. (Branco, M)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                            ANSWER by W.R. Grace & Co. to crossclaim of Uniroyal, Inc. (Branco, M)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane, Inc. (Attorney David H. Stillman),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc. by David H. Stillman (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998
                                                                                                                  Letters w/mtn to appear PHV mailed to Atty. William Heffernan, Randall Souza (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for ACandS, Inc. by Kenneth R. Neal (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Rutland Fire Clay (Attorney Elizabeth M. Fahey),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Flintkote Company (Attorney Elizabeth M. Fahey),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Eastern Refractories (Attorney William M. Heffernan), (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. (Attorney Randall L. Souza),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by CBS Corp. (Attorney Thomas W. Lyons ),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998
                                                                                                                                ENTRY of appearance for CBS Corp. by Thomas W. Lyons III (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998, Terminated: 7/21/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by W.R. Grace & Co. (Attorney James J. McKenna); jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998
                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for W.R. Grace & Co. by James J. McKenna (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998
                                                                                                                                      CASE reassigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/26/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 38522 (Administrator, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/20/1998
                                                                                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Mary M. Lisi . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Administrator, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?