Almeida, et al v. R.I. Retirement Bd., et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00383-L
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo August Almeida, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Bernard George, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Bruce Vittner, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Charles Caley, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Charles Casey, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Dennis Avila, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Dennis Morgan, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Eugene Wiggington, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Gary Mazzie, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo George H. Truman, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Howard Indell, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo JAMES DUNN, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo John Baxter, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo John O. Mancini, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo John Recupero, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo John Ricci, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Joseph Almonte, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Lawrence McDonald, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Paul Desrochers, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Peter, Todd, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Philip Sheridan, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Phillip Lucca, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Russell Molloy, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Russell Spaight, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Theodore Stolaz, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Thomas Marcello, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Tobias, Martin, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo Vernon Stromberg, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
No Logo William Cambio, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Gerard P. Cobleigh +9415 941 941 5900 +4614 461 461 4107 gcobleigh@aol.com
v.
No Logo Joanne E. Flaminio, Defendant

Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David D. Barricelli +4575 457 457 5400 +4575 457 457 5401 dbarricelli@haslaw.com
No Logo SmithKline Beecham Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nancy Mayer"

Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David D. Barricelli +4575 457 457 5400 +4575 457 457 5401 dbarricelli@haslaw.com
No Logo Retirement Board of the Rhode Island Employees' Retirement System, Defendant

Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David D. Barricelli +4575 457 457 5400 +4575 457 457 5401 dbarricelli@haslaw.com
Attributes
Office Providence
Filed 7/24/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Providence
Terminated 12/19/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RWL
Timeline
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 FRC Information
File located at National Archives and Records Administration Waltham, MA. Accession no. 21-01-0080. (Mercurio, A)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000
Case closed (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
JUDGMENT for August Almeida against R.I. Retirement Bd., Nancy Mayer, Joanne E. Flaminio, Joseph Almonte, Dennis Avila, John Baxter, Bernard George, Charles Caley, William Cambio, Paul Desrochers, James Dunn, Howard Indell, Phillip Lucca, John O. Mancini, Thomas Marcello, Tobias Martin, Gary Mazzie, Russell Molloy, Dennis Morgan, Lawrence McDonald, John Recupero, John Ricci, Philip Sheridan, Russell Spaight, Theodore Stolaz, Vernon Stromberg, Peter Todd, George H. Truman, Bruce Vittner, Eugene Wiggington, Charles Casey ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Court Filing
ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Attorney Fees - $19,681.50 plus costs $233.23 ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 11/24/2000
Motion(s) referred to Judge: [12-1] motion for Attorney Fees (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000
AFFIDAVIT Re: [12-1] motion for Attorney Fees by Patricia E. Andrews. (Saucier, M)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000
AFFIDAVIT Re: [12-1] motion for Attorney Fees by John A. Leidecker Jr. (Saucier, M)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000
AFFIDAVIT Re: [12-1] motion for Attorney Fees by Gerard P. Cobleigh. (Saucier, M)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000, Terminated: 11/30/2000 Motion for Attorney Fees
MOTION by August Almeida, Joseph Almonte, Dennis Avila, John Baxter, Bernard George, William Cambio, Paul Desrochers, James Dunn, Howard Indell, Phillip Lucca, John O. Mancini, Thomas Marcello, Tobias Martin, Gary Mazzie, Russell Molloy, Dennis Morgan, Lawrence McDonald, John Recupero, John Ricci, Philip Sheridan, Russell Spaight, Theodore Stolaz, Vernon Stromberg, Peter Todd, George H. Truman, Bruce Vittner, Eugene Wiggington, Charles Casey for Attorney Fees (Saucier, M)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Court Filing
MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part, denying in part [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment of the plaintiffs, granting in part, denying in part [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment of the defendants ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) no judgment shall enter until the issue of costs and counsel fees is resolved (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/24/2000 Motion Hearing
Motion hearing re: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment Motion hearing held, [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment Motion hearing held. Crtrpt: J. Fontes. Gerard Cobleigh for Pltfs; David Barricelli for deft. Mr. Cobleigh aruges pltt's M/SJ; Mr. Barricelli argues deft's M/SJ. Court takes matter under advisement. (Barletta, B)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: 1/7/2000
Motion hearing re: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 10:00 1/21/00, [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 10:00 1/21/00 (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000
Motion hearing re: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 2:00 1/13/00, [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 2:00 1/13/00 (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Statement of Undisputed Facts
Statement Of Undisputed Fact by plaintiffs RE: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999, Terminated: 10/5/2000 Terminated:
MOTION by August Almeida and all other plaintiffs for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
MOTION by R.I. Retirement Bd., Nancy Mayer, Joanne E. Flaminio for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999 Court Filing
ORDER granting [6-1] joint motion for Leave to File Cross Motions for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999, Terminated: 7/6/1999 Motion for Leave to File
JOINT MOTION for Leave to File Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999
Settlement conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Hagopian. Case did not settle. Parties filing cross-motions for summary judgment. (Brown, D)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Court Filing
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER scheduled before U.S. Magisrrate Judge Hagopian on 6/22/99 at 10:00. Parties shall submit a settlement conference statement and confidential addendum on or before 6/15/99.( signed by Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian ) (Brown, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999
Settlement conference set on 10:00 6/22/99 Before Magistrate Judge Jacob Hagopian (Brown, D)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999
Case referred to Mag J Hagopian for settlement conf (Gilfillan, B)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Set Scheduling Order DeadlinesCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 4/30/99 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 4/30/99 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 6/30/99 ; ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Pretrial Conference - Initial
Pre-Trial Conference held before MJ Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998
Pre-Trial Conference set at 10:30 12/18/98 Before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (FarrellPletcher, P)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998 Terminated:
ANSWER to Complaint by R.I. Retirement Bd., Nancy Mayer, Joanne E. Flaminio (Attorney David D. Barricelli), (Barletta, B)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to R.I. Retirement Bd., Nancy Mayer 8/20/98 Answer due on 9/9/98 for Joanne E. Flaminio, for R.I. Retirement Bd. (Barletta, B)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 39582 (McCabe, F)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998
CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (McCabe, F)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 109 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?