Johnson, et al v. ACandS, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-00466-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Allen Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
No Logo Betty-Lou Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
No Logo Db Riley, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
v.
No Logo Armstrong World Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo Asbestos Claims Management Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CBS Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Db Riley, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Heffernan +3345 334 334 5600 +3345 334 334 5005 HeffernanLaw@aol.com
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
GAF Corporation GAF Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark O. Denehy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 mdenehy@apslaw.com
Space Peter Lawson Kennedy +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 pkennedy@apslaw.com
No Logo John Crane Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
No Logo Rapid American, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
No Logo The H.B. Smith Co., Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
No Logo Allen Johnson, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
No Logo Asbestos Claims Management Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670
No Logo Betty-Lou Johnson, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Early, Lucarelli, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. Early +1 203 777 7799 +1 203 785 1671 jfe@elslaw.com
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "CBS Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Heffernan +3345 334 334 5600 +3345 334 334 5005 HeffernanLaw@aol.com
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa R. Evangelista +2747 274 274 7850 +2749 274 274 9670

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Counter-Defendant
No Logo John Crane Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H. Blish +8318 831 831 8900 +4907 490 490 7640
Space Staci L. Kolb +8318 831 831 8900 +7517 751 751 7542 slk@blishcavlaw.com
No Logo Rapid American, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
No Logo Rutland Fire Clay Company, Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Rutland Fire Clay Co."
No Logo The H.B. Smith Co., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
No Logo Armstrong World Industries, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Claims Management Corporation, Cross-Defendant
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "CBS Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss, Factor Laing & Lyons

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas W. Lyons, III +4560 456 456 0700 +4214 421 421 4730 tlyons@straussfactor.com
No Logo Db Riley, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Eastern Refractories Company Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Eastern Refractories, Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M. Heffernan +3345 334 334 5600 +3345 334 334 5005 HeffernanLaw@aol.com
No Logo Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Foster Wheeler Corp"
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia Pacific Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Gross +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 bgross@cmjlaw.com
Space John B. Manning +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jmanning@cmjlaw.com
No Logo J.H. France Refractories Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo John Crane Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by stillmanlegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Stillman +1 781 829 1077 +1 781 829 2077 dhs@stillmanlegal.com
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H. Blish +8318 831 831 8900 +4907 490 490 7640
Space Staci L. Kolb +8318 831 831 8900 +7517 751 751 7542 slk@blishcavlaw.com
No Logo Rapid American, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
No Logo Rutland Fire Clay Company, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Rutland Fire Clay Co."
No Logo The H.B. Smith Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Souza +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 rsouza@shslawfirm.com
No Logo Manville Asbestos Disease Compensation Fund, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Rapid American, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Dolan & Kershaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Kershaw +2728 272 272 8800 +4217 421 421 7218 ricedolank@aol.com
Office Providence
Filed 9/14/1998
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 368 - Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Providence
Terminated 1/11/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MDL, RWL
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Notice of Appearance/
Entry of Appearance by Brian D. Gross, Esq. and John B. Manning, Esq. on behalf of Georgia Pacific Corp.(Leyva, Lucia)
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
    ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc. by David H. Stillman, Esq. WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David A. Salvatore, Esq. for John Crane, Inc. (Fernandes, D)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 1/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
      ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc. by David A. Salvatore, Esq. AND WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by David H. Stillman, Esq. (Fernandes, D)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice after bankruptcy as to Owens-Corning Corp. (Signed by Charles Weiner, E.D. of PA) (Fernandes, D)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Court Filing
          ORDER fo Dismissal, w/o prejudice, as to ACandS, Inc. (entered on 3/21/03 by Judge Charles R. Weiner) (bankruptcy declaration) (Duhamel, J) Modified on 04/07/2003
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER, to Dismiss Flexitallic, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Charles Weiner, Judge EDPA (St.John, B)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001
              ORDER (Dismissed without prejudice after bankruptcy. Signed by Charles Weiner, E.D, of PA) (Dube, P)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER of Dismissal as to defendant Armstrong World Industries, Inc. (signed by Judge Charles R. Weiner EDPA) (Saucier, M)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 Order
                  ORDER (by J. Weiner dismissing case w/o prejudice against Armstrong World Industries, Inc.) (McCabe, F)
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
                    SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by GAF Corporation as to GAF Corporation (Mercurio, A)
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to GAF CORP without prejudice (Charles Weiner, District Judge MDL) (FarrellPletcher, P) Modified on 02/07/2001
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000
                        ORDER, to Dismiss Rutland Fire Clay Co. having declared bankruptcy (USDC EDP) (Mercurio, A)
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Filing of Bankruptcy by Owens Corning Corp. and Fibreboard Corporation (Mercurio, A)
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000
                            ENTRY of appearance for J.H. France by Mark O. Denehy, Peter Lawson Kennedy (Mercurio, A)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 6/30/2000
                              File located at National Archives and Records Administration Waltham, MA. Accession no. 21-00-0069. (Delano, D) Modified on 09/19/2002
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000
                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of plaintiffs' claims against deft. Metropolitan Life Ins. Co. by Allen Johnson, Betty-Lou Johnson (Mercurio, A)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/17/1999
                                  Stipulation between the parties that complaint against Owens Corning is dismissed. (Branco, M)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Remark
                                    WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth M. Fahey for Rutland Fire (Branco, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                      ENTRY of appearance for Rutland Fire Clay by John J. Cloherty III (Branco, M)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/10/1999 Answer
                                        ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to [18-1] cross claim, [15-2] counter claim, [11-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/10/1999 Answer
                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Foster Wheeler Corp. (Attorney John R. Mahoney),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 Answer
                                            ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to crossclaims of Armstrong, Asbestos Claims, GAF, Georgia-Pacific, U.S. Gypsum (Branco, M)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 Answer
                                              ANSWER by Foster Wheeler Corp. to crossclaim by RIley Stoker (Branco, M)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/23/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999
                                                ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [18-1] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999
                                                  CROSSCLAIM by Flexitallic Co. against ACandS, Inc., CBS Corp., Eastern Refractories, Foster Wheeler Corp., J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life, Owens Corning Corp., Rapid American, Rutland Fire Clay, The H.B. Smith Co., Uniroyal, Inc. (Branco, M)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999
                                                    THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Flexitallic Co. against Manville Asbestos (Branco, M)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999
                                                      ANSWER by Flexitallic Co. to [15-2] counter claim, [11-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999
                                                        ENTRY of appearance for Flexitallic Co. by Lisa R. Evangelista (Branco, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999
                                                          ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [15-2] counter claim (Branco, M)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Answer
                                                            ANSWER by Uniroyal, Inc. to [15-2] counter claim, [11-2] cross claim (Branco, M)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999
                                                              ANSWER by D.B. Riley, Inc. to [11-2] cross claim and all other crossclaims (Branco, M)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999
                                                                ANSWER to Complaint; jury demand and COUNTERCLAIM by D.B. Riley, Inc. (Attorney Lisa R. Evangelista) against Allen Johnson, Betty-Lou Johnson, ACandS, Inc., Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, CBS Corp., Eastern Refractories, Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., GAF Corporation, Georgia Pacific, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life, Owens Corning Corp., Rapid American, Rutland Fire Clay, The H.B. Smith Co., U.S. Gypsum Co., Uniroyal, Inc. (Branco, M)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999
                                                                  ENTRY of appearance for D.B. Riley, Inc. by Lisa R. Evangelista (Branco, M)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Answer
                                                                    ANSWER by Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, GAF Corporation, Georgia Pacific, U.S. Gypsum Co. to [11-2] cross claim and all other crossclaims (Branco, M)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Answer
                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, GAF Corporation, Georgia Pacific, U.S. Gypsum Co. (Attorney Lisa R. Evangelista),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        ENTRY of appearance for Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, GAF Corporation, Georgia Pacific, U.S. Gypsum Co. by Lisa R. Evangelista (Branco, M)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane, Inc. (Attorney David H. Stillman),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999
                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for John Crane, Inc. by David H. Stillman (Branco, M)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/13/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999
                                                                              ORDER, no objection having been filed, this matter is transferred to EDPA. (signed by Patricia D. Howard, Clerk of the Panel) (Branco, M)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999
                                                                                Case closed (Webb, J)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999, Terminated: 1/11/1999 Answer
                                                                                  ANSWER by Rapid American to ALL CROSSCLAIMS (Branco, M)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999, Terminated: 1/11/1999 Answer
                                                                                    ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by Rapid American (Attorney John W. Kershaw) against ACandS, Inc., Armstrong World, Asbestos Claims, CBS Corp., D.B. Riley, Inc., Eastern Refractories, Flexitallic Co., Foster Wheeler Corp., GAF Corporation, Georgia Pacific, J.H. France, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life, Owens Corning Corp., Rutland Fire Clay, The H.B. Smith Co., U.S. Gypsum Co., Uniroyal, Inc. (Branco, M)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999
                                                                                      ENTRY of appearance for Rapid American by John W. Kershaw (Branco, M)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                        ANSWER by Metropolitan Life to CROSSCLAIMS OF OTHER DEFTS (Branco, M)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life (Attorney John H. Blish, Staci L. Sawyer), (Branco, M)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. (Attorney Randall L. Souza),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/11/1998, Terminated: 1/11/1999 Answer
                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Eastern Refractories (Attorney William M. Heffernan), (Branco, M)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998, Terminated: 1/11/1999 Answer
                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Rutland Fire Clay (Attorney Elizabeth M. Fahey),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998
                                                                                                  Letter to Atty. Fahey re: pro hac vice of co-counsel (Branco, M)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by ACandS, Inc. (Attorney Kenneth R. Neal), (Branco, M)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      ENTRY of appearance for ACandS, Inc. by Kenneth R. Neal (Branco, M)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/27/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Owens Corning Corp. (Attorney Stephen J. MacGillivray),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by CBS Corp. (Attorney Thomas W. Lyons ),; jury demand (Branco, M)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for CBS Corp. by Thomas W. Lyons III (Branco, M)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 Remark
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION by CBS Corporation (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/14/1998
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 39931 (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/14/1998
                                                                                                                  CASE assigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lovegreen (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?