National Casualty v. Ragosta, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-00063-T
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo National Casualty Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Sheiffer +1 212 490 3000 +4903 490 490 3038

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruggiero Orton & Brochu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis X. Flaherty +7378 737 737 8700 +7370 737 737 0735

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark K. Anesh +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 mark.anesh@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Robert A. Ragosta, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Robert A. Ragosta, Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo The American Kennel Club Museum of the Dog, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Richard Grimm +1 401 274 2000 +2779 277 277 9600 wgrimm@haslaw.com
v.
No Logo Robert A. Ragosta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Robert A. Ragosta, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo The American Kennel Club Museum of the Dog, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brent R. Canning +1 401 274 2000 +1 401 277 9600 bcanning@haslaw.com
Space William Richard Grimm +1 401 274 2000 +2779 277 277 9600 wgrimm@haslaw.com
No Logo National Casualty Company, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Sheiffer +1 212 490 3000 +4903 490 490 3038

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruggiero Orton & Brochu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis X. Flaherty +7378 737 737 8700 +7370 737 737 0735

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark K. Anesh +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 mark.anesh@wilsonelser.com
Office Providence
Filed 2/5/1999
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 3/17/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, DLM
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: 3/17/2000
Case closed (Webb, J)
    LREF
    Blank 67 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/17/2000 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION of dismissal signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
      LREF
      Blank 66 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying [53-2] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
        LREF
        Blank 65 Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000 Terminated:
        MOTION by National Casualty to Withdraw [52-1] motion for Leave to File motion for s/j after closure date (Webb, J)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: 1/11/2000
          Motion hearing re: [50-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment at 10:00 1/27/00, [34-1] motion to disqualify the Law firm of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP. at 10:00 1/27/00 (Webb, J)
            LREF
            Blank 62 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/5/2000
            DFT. THE DOG MUSEUM STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS (Webb, J)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: 1/5/2000
              Motion(s) referred: [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres, [53-2] motion to Dismiss referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                LREF
                Blank 61 Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: 1/5/2000 Terminated:
                OBJECTION by Museum of the Dog to [50-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Webb, J)
                  LREF
                  Blank 64 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: 1/5/2000 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                  Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. RE: [63-1] motion response (Webb, J)
                    LREF
                    Blank 63 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: 1/5/2000 Terminated:
                    OBJECTION by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. to [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [53-2] motion to Dismiss (Webb, J)
                      LREF
                      Blank 60 Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999 Terminated:
                      OBJECTION by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. to [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                        LREF
                        Blank 59 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 Transcript
                        TRANSCRIPT OF for dates of 11/15/99 (Branco, M)
                          LREF
                          Blank 58 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Terminated:
                          MOTION by National Casualty to Withdraw motion to extend discovery (Branco, M)
                            LREF
                            Blank 57 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999 Terminated:
                            MOTION by Museum of the Dog for Hearing (Branco, M)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999
                              Motion(s) referred: [50-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                LREF
                                Blank 56 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                Statement Of Disputed Fact by Museum of the Dog RE: [55-1] motion response (Branco, M)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 55 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Terminated:
                                  OBJECTION by Museum of the Dog to [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999
                                    Statement Of Undisputed Fact by National Casualty RE: [53-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 53 Filed: 12/15/1999, Entered: 12/15/1999, Terminated: 1/18/2000 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION by National Casualty for Partial Summary Judgment , to Dismiss (Branco, M)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 52 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999, Terminated: 1/13/2000 Motion for Leave to File
                                        MOTION by National Casualty for Leave to File motion for s/j after closure date (Branco, M)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 50 Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: 12/7/1999 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by National Casualty for Partial Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 51 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                            NOTICE by Museum of the Dog to take deposition of National Casualty Co. (Branco, M)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 49 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999
                                              SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on James H. Barnett (Branco, M)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 48 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999, Terminated: 3/17/2000 Answer
                                                ANSWER by National Casualty to [42-2] counter claim (Branco, M)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/18/1999 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                    NOTICE by Museum of the Dog to take deposition of National Casualty Co. (Branco, M)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                      NOTICE by National Casualty to take deposition of James H. Barnett, Robert Ragosta (Branco, M)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999
                                                        Minute entry re: motion hearing (Branco, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999
                                                          Motion hearing re: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment Motion hearing held. Flaherty, Sheiffer for Pltf. Mahoney, Grimm for Defts. Counsel argue. Motion is DENIED. (Branco, M)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                            ANSWER by National Casualty to [42-2] counter claim, [38-2] counter claim, [4-2] counter claim (Branco, M)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999
                                                              Motion hearing re: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 10:00 11/15/99 (Webb, J)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by Museum of the Dog (Attorney William R. Grimm ) against National Casualty (Branco, M)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                  OBJECTION by National Casualty to [34-1] motion to disqualify the Law firm of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP. (Webb, J)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999
                                                                    Stipulation extending time to file memo in respond to deft mtn to disqualify (Webb, J)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999
                                                                      Motion(s) referred: [34-1] motion to disqualify the Law firm of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP. referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by National Casualty , (Answer due 11/15/99 for Museum of the Dog, for Ragosta, Ltd., for Robert A. Ragosta ) amending [1-1] complaint (Webb, J)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999, Terminated: 3/17/2000 Answer
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint; jury demand and COUNTERCLAIM by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. (Attorney John R. Mahoney) against National Casualty (Branco, M)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999
                                                                            NOTICE by National Casualty to take deposition of Robert Ragosta (Branco, M)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by National Casualty to Enlarge Time in which to respond to Deft's motion to disqualify (Branco, M)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: 10/5/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint no objection filed ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. to disqualify the Law firm of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP. (Burgess, J)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                    NOTICE by National Casualty to take deposition of Robert Rogosta on 11/5/99 at 10:00am (Burgess, J)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999
                                                                                      Deadline updated; reset Settlement Conference for 2:00 10/28/99 before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999
                                                                                        Deadline updated; reset Settlement Conference for 2:00 10/4/99 before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                          Statement Of Disputed Fact by Museum of the Dog RE: [31-1] motion response (Barletta, B)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                            OBJECTION by Museum of the Dog to [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Barletta, B)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/30/1999
                                                                                              Statement Of Disputed Fact by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. RE: [29-1] motion response (Branco, M)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/30/1999, Terminated: 3/17/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                OBJECTION by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. to [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999, Terminated: 10/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by National Casualty to Amend [1-1] complaint (Branco, M)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                                                    SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Andrew A. Biggio (Branco, M)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Museum of the Dog to take deposition of Andrew A. Biggio, National Casualty Company (Branco, M)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadline to file opposition to pla. mtn for summary judgment until 8/30/99 and pla. has till 9/10/99 to file a reply. If dft's wish to file motion to disqualify it must be filed no later than 9/30/99 ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Museum of the Dog to take deposition of National Casualty Co., Plus Excess, Inc. (Branco, M)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER, set Settlement Conference for 10:00 9/17/99 before Mag. Judge Martin. ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: 7/16/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/15/99 ; Deadline for filing of all motions 12/15/99 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 2/15/00 ; ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: 7/16/1999
                                                                                                                Pre-Trial Conference held matter referred for mandatory settlement conf. in September 99 (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999
                                                                                                                  Pre-Trial Conference set at 9:30 7/16/99 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres req. by Mr. Grimm. will notify counsel (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                    FEE PAID TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Mark K. Anesh (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Mark K. Anesh to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/21/1999 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                                                                        SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Michael P. Duffy (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Museum of the Dog to take deposition of Michael P. Duffy (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999, Terminated: 6/6/1999 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                            MOTION by National Casualty for Mark K. Anesh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Enlarge Time memo and affidavits in support of obj. to motion s/j until 6/30/99 no further extensions will be considered ( signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres ) (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999
                                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [15-1] motion to Enlarge Time memo and affidavits in support of obj. to motion s/j referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres, [12-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to motion for s/j referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999
                                                                                                                                  Pre-Trial Conference set at 9:30 6/28/99 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION by National Casualty to [15-1] motion to Enlarge Time memo and affidavits in support of obj. to motion s/j, [12-1] motion to Enlarge Time to respond to motion for s/j (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 Motions Referred
                                                                                                                                      Motion(s) referred: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Ernest C. Torres (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999, Terminated: 4/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Museum of the Dog to Enlarge Time memo and affidavits in support of obj. to motion s/j (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION by Museum of the Dog to [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. to [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. to Enlarge Time to respond to motion for s/j (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by National Casualty Re: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                                  Statement Of Undisputed Fact by National Casualty RE: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999, Terminated: 11/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by National Casualty for Summary Judgment (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999
                                                                                                                                                      Pre-Trial Conference set at 9:30 5/26/99 Before Judge Ernest C. Torres mailed (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by National Casualty to [4-2] counter claim (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999
                                                                                                                                                          fax copy of our phv form to atty Sheiffer (Webb, J)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by National Casualty for David S. Sheiffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Museum of the Dog (Attorney William Richard Grimm), (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Museum of the Dog 2/22/99 Answer due on 3/15/99 for Museum of the Dog (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint; jury demand and COUNTERCLAIM by Robert A. Ragosta, Ragosta, Ltd. (Attorney John R. Mahoney) against National Casualty (Branco, M)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999
                                                                                                                                                                    CASE reassigned to Judge Ernest C. Torres . Assigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Administrator, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Robert A. Ragosta 2/8/99 Answer due on 3/1/99 for Robert A. Ragosta (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Ragosta, Ltd. 2/8/99 Answer due on 3/1/99 for Ragosta, Ltd. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 41099 (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/5/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999
                                                                                                                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Martin (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?