Broome, et al v. M-C Industries Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-00123-ML
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jonathan Broome, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacqueline Risch +1 508 993 8000 +9927 992 992 7997
Space David H. Waxler +1 508 993 8000 +1 508 992 7997 pablohamel@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hwac.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eva Marie Mancuso +4553 455 455 3800 +4553 455 455 3806 emancuso@hwac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moses & Afonso,LTD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen A. Izzi +4533 453 453 3600 +4533 453 453 3604 sizzi@mosesafonso.com
No Logo Kathleen Broome, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hwac.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eva Marie Mancuso +4553 455 455 3800 +4553 455 455 3806 emancuso@hwac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moses & Afonso,LTD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen A. Izzi +4533 453 453 3600 +4533 453 453 3604 sizzi@mosesafonso.com
v.
No Logo Baker Equipment Engineering Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter A. Lagorio, Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. Reynolds +8615 861 861 5522 +3314 331 331 4861 pvreynolds@conversent.net
No Logo Jgb Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter A. Lagorio, Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. Reynolds +8615 861 861 5522 +3314 331 331 4861 pvreynolds@conversent.net
No Logo M-c Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MACK TRUCKS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony F. Cottone +5785 578 578 5696 +8612 861 861 2922 cottonelaw@cox.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Sloane & Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis R. Diedrich +1 617 523 6010 +1 617 227 0927 cdiedrich@sloanewalsh.com
No Logo Victor Fluid Power Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Victor Fluid Power Co."
No Logo Victor Fluid Power, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mhaddenlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark C. Hadden +2740 274 274 0909 +2745 274 274 5455 mhadden@mhaddenlaw.com
No Logo Victor Fluid, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Baker Equipment Engineering Company, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter A. Lagorio, Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. Reynolds +8615 861 861 5522 +3314 331 331 4861 pvreynolds@conversent.net
No Logo York Industries, Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
Space Denise Lombardo Myers +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 dmyers@amlawllp.com
Office Providence
Filed 3/11/1999
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 355 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 11/15/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, DLM
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 74 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Court Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi (Brunelle, E)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000
    Case closed (Brunelle, E)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Settlement Conference
      Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
        LREF
        Blank 73 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 3/14/01 ; Deadline for filing of dispositive motions 3/28/01; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 3/28/01; Plaintiff shall disclose any experts not later than 1/3/01; Defendant shall disclose any experts not later than 2/2/01; (signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
          LREF
          Blank 72 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
          ENTRY of appearance for York Industries, Inc by Denise M. Lombardo (Delano, D)
            LREF
            Blank 71 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Terminated:
            ANSWER by Baker Company to the cross-claim of Mack Trucks, Inc. (Delano, D)
              LREF
              Blank 70 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [64-1] motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
                LREF
                Blank 69 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [65-1] motion to Amend [15-1] complaint answer ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
                  LREF
                  Blank 68 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER, set Settlement Conference for 2:00 10/18/00 before Mag. Judge Martin. ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
                    LREF
                    Blank 67 Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Court Filing
                    Minute entry: Clerk minutes filed regarding motion hearing held on 9/14/00 before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Delano, D)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000
                      Motion hearing re: [65-1] motion to Amend [15-1] complaint answer, [64-1] motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint held. Jacqueline Risch for the pla.; Paul Reynolds for dft. Baker Equipment; John Mahoney for deft York Industries; Anthony Cottone and John Donovan for deft. Mack Trucks; Dennis Grecco for deft. Victor Fluid. Local counsel for the plaintiff not present. Counsel argue motions. Motions granted. Attorney Donovan to prepare an order. (Delano, D)
                        LREF
                        Blank 66 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000
                        ORDER granting [63-1] motion to Compel answers to interrogatories (No objection having been filed, motion granted by rule of court) (Brunelle, E)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000
                          Motion(s) referred to Judge Lisi: [65-1] motion to Amend [15-1] complaint answer, [64-1] motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint (Brunelle, E)
                            LREF
                            Blank 65 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000, Terminated: 9/26/2000 Terminated:
                            MOTION by Mack Trucks, Inc. to Amend [15-1] complaint answer (Delano, D)
                              LREF
                              Blank 64 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000, Terminated: 9/26/2000 Terminated:
                              MOTION by Mack Trucks, Inc. for Leave to File Third Party Complaint (Delano, D)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 Remark
                                Attorney Admission Fee recieved (receipt #45603; $100.00) for attorney David H. Waxler and Jacqueline L. Risch. (Delano, D)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 63 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000, Terminated: 9/1/2000 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by Baker Company to Compel answers to interrogatories (Delano, D)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 62 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/15/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                    RE-NOTICE by Victor Fluid Power, Victor Fluid Co., Victor Fluid, Inc. to take deposition of Keeper of Records RI Hospital; Keeper of Records South County Hospital; Keeper of Records Thomas F. Morgan, M.D.. (Delano, D)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 61 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [56-1] motion for David H. Waxler to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 60 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [57-1] motion for Jacqueline Risch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (case is a Judge Martin case referred to Judge Lovegreen in error) ( signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen ) (FarrellPletcher, P)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 59 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                          NOTICE by Victor Fluid Power to take deposition of R. Appenfeller (Webb, J)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000
                                            Motion(s) referred: [57-1] motion for Jacqueline Risch to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen, [56-1] motion for David H. Waxler to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lovegreen (Brunelle, E)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 58 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                              NOTICE by Victor Fluid Power to take deposition of South County Hospital,c/o Risk Manager, (x-ray dept.) (Delano, D)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 55 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000
                                                ORDER granting [53-1] motion For Examination Pursuant to Rule 35 (No objection having been timely filed, motion granted) (Brunelle, E)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000, Terminated: 8/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by Jonathan Broome for Jacqueline Risch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000, Terminated: 8/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by Jonathan Broome for David H. Waxler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                      16 NOTICES by Victor Fluid Power, Victor Fluid Co., Victor Fluid, Inc. to take deposition of The Keeper of Records of: Dr. Leslie Landau; Dr. Fred Burgess; Dr. James J. Whalen; South County Hospital; RI Hospital; James Gilchrist; CVS Pharmacy; Shelly Johnson; Garden Treatment Center; LePre Physical Therapy; Dr. Thomas Morgan; Dr. Rex W. Appenfeller; Dr. Joseph B. Fitzgerald; Dr. Christophe Van Hemelrijck; Dr. Richard S. Limbird; Dr. Carlo Brogna. (Delano, D)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000, Terminated: 7/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by Baker Company For Examination Pursuant to Rule 35 (Delano, D)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000
                                                          Motion(s) referred: [52-1] motion for Jacqueline Risch, David H. Waxler to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Brunelle, E)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000, Terminated: 11/15/2000 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                            MOTION by Jonathan Broome for Jacqueline Risch, David H. Waxler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Delano, D)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000
                                                              ENTRY of appearance for Jonathan Broome, Kathleen Broome by Eva Marie Mancuso (Delano, D)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                ANSWER by York Industries, Inc (Attorney John R. Mahoney) to amended complaint (Delano, D)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Court Filing
                                                                  JUDGMENT for Aerialscope, Inc. against Jonathan Broome and Kathleen Broome ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint, withdrawing [42-1] motion to Compel Aerialscope Inc., to respond to production of documents and granting [18-1] motion of Aerialscope for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                      Minute entry: (Delano, D)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Motion Hearing
                                                                        Motion hearing re: [42-1] motion to Compel Aerialscope Inc., to respond to production of documents Motion hearing held, [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment Motion hearing held. Stephen Izzi for the plaintiff. Mark Hadden, C. Russell Bengtson and Anthony Cottone for the defts. Defendant's withdraw their objection to the motion for summary judgment filed by Aerialscope, Inc. Deft. Aerialscope, Inc. moves for a motion for rule 54(b). Court grants motion. Motions to compel passed. Motion to amend complaint is granted. The court will set a rule 16 conference. Mr. Bengtson is to prepare an order. (Delano, D)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999
                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [46-1] motion to Amend [1-1] complaint referred to Judge Mary M. Lisi (Brunelle, E)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999
                                                                            Motion hearing re: [42-1] motion to Compel Aerialscope Inc., to respond to production of documents at 10:30 11/2/99 and [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 10:30 11/2/99 (Brunelle, E)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999, Terminated: 11/12/1999 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                              MOTION by Jonathan Broome, Kathleen Broome to Amend [1-1] complaint (Delano, D)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: 10/5/1999
                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to York Industries, Inc 9/30/99 Answer due on 10/20/99 for York Industries, Inc (Delano, D)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: 10/1/1999
                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: [42-1] motion to Compel Aerialscope Inc., to respond to production of documents referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999
                                                                                    Motion(s) referred: [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Mary M. Lisi (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                      OBJECTION by Aerialscope, Inc. to [42-1] motion to Compel Aerialscope Inc., to respond to production of documents (Delano, D)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999
                                                                                        THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Baker Company against York Industries, Inc (Delano, D)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/27/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION by Kaydon Acquisition VIII to Compel Aerialscope Inc., to respond to production of documents (Burgess, J)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                                            SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on The Personnel Department of the Providence Fire Department (Delano, D)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/15/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [36-1] motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/15/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                NOTICES by Baker Company to take deposition of Custodian of the records of the sevretary of state of the state of Delaware, Michigan, Minnesota and the state of Pennsylvania. (Delano, D)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999
                                                                                                    Motion(s) referred: [36-1] motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Victor Fluid Power to take the deposition of the person with the most knowledgeable of this action of The Personnel Department of the Providence Fire Department (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999, Terminated: 9/15/1999 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        MOTION by Baker Company for Leave to File Third Party Complaint (Brunelle, E) Modified on 08/17/1999
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Enlarge Time in which plaintiff may object to the motion for summary judgment filed by Aerialscope, Inc. Plaintiff's response to the Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before August 31, 1999. (signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Brunelle, E) Modified on 08/17/1999
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                            Stipulation between the parties extending the time to and including August 20, 1999 within which Defendant Kaydon shall provide answers and/or objections to defendant's interrogatories. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Jonathan Broome and Kathleen Broome to [32-1] motion to Consolidate Cases (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999
                                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [29-1] motion to Enlarge Time in which plaintiff may objection motion for summary judgment filed by Aerialscope, Inc. referred to Judge Mary M. Lisi (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION by Victor Fluid Power to Consolidate Cases (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                    Stipulation between plaintiff and defendant Kaydon Acquisition extending the time to and including July 23, 1999 in which defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's interrogatories and document requests (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/26/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                      Stipulation between the parties extending the time to and including July 23, 1999 in which Kaydon Acquisition may respond to the interrogatories and request for production of Baker Equipment. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 7/14/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999, Terminated: 8/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Jonathan Broome and Kathleen Broome to Enlarge Time in which plaintiff may objection motion for summary judgment filed by Aerialscope, Inc. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999
                                                                                                                          Stipulation between the parties extending the time to and including July 3, 1999 within which plaintiff may respond to defendant's interrogatories and request for production (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting request to conduct discovery before properly responding to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Response is due August 16, 1999 ( signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi ) (Burgess, J)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999, Terminated: 11/15/2000 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Victor Fluid Power to [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999
                                                                                                                                Stipulation between plaintiff and defendants Baker Equipment and JGB Industries extending the time to and including June 19, 1999 within which to provide answers and/or objections to defendant's interrogatories (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: 6/10/1999
                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Mary M. Lisi (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                    Stipulation between defendants Mack Trucks, Inc. and Aerialscope, Inc. extending the time to and including June 21, 1999 in which defendant Mack Trucks must file its opposition to the pending motion for summary judgment. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                      Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Jonathan Broome and Kathleen Broome RE: [22-1] objection to motion for summary judgment (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION by Jonathan Broome and Kathleen Broome to [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          ENTRY of appearance for Mack Trucks, Inc. by Curtis R. Diedrich (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Aerialscope, Inc. Re: [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999
                                                                                                                                              Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Aerialscope, Inc. RE: [18-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999, Terminated: 11/12/1999 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Aerialscope, Inc. for Summary Judgment (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Victor Fluid Power (Kaydon Acquisition VII, Inc. (Attorney Mark Hadden); jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by Victor Fluid Power (Kaydon Acquisition VII, Inc.) (Attorney Mark C. Hadden) to amended complaint; jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 5/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by Mack Trucks, Inc. (Attorney Anthony F. Cottone) to amended complaint; jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation between the parties extending the time to and including April 30, 1999 in which the defendant Aerialscope, Inc. shall file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 4/30/99 for Aerialscope, Inc. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation between the plaintiffs and defendant Aerialscope, Inc., extending the time to and including April 30, 1999 in which the defendant may file an answer and/or responsive pleading (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to M-C Industries Inc. 4/10/99 Answer due on 4/30/99 for M-C Industries Inc. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Victor Fluid Co. and Victor Fluid, Inc. on 3/16/99; Answer due on 4/5/99 for Victor Fluid Co. and for Victor Fluid, Inc. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Victor Fluid Power 3/16/99 Answer due on 4/5/99 for Victor Fluid Power (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Aerialscope, Inc. 3/18/99 Answer due on 4/7/99 for Aerialscope, Inc. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Baker Company 3/16/99 Answer due on 4/5/99 for Baker Company (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Mack Trucks, Inc. 3/15/99 Answer due on 4/5/99 for Mack Trucks, Inc. (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Aerialscope, Inc. (Attorneys Joseph A. Kelly and C. Russell Bengtson); jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY of appearance for Aerialscope, Inc. by Joseph A. Kelly and C. Russell Bengtson (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Baker Company and JGB Industries, Inc. (Attorney Paul V. Reynolds); jury demand (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation between the plaintiffs and defendant Mack Trucks that the defendant may have up to and including April 30, 1999 to answer plaintiff's complaint (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jonathan Broome, Kathleen Broome , (Answer due 4/2/99 for Mack Trucks, Inc., for Baker Company, for Aerialscope, Inc., for Victor Fluid, Inc., for Victor Fluid Co., for Victor Fluid Power, for M-C Industries Inc. ) amending [1-1] complaint (Brunelle, E)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 41386 (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE assigned to Judge Mary M. Lisi . Assigned to Magistrate Judge martin (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?