Taguding, et al v. Ford Motor Credit Co, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-00283-L
District Judge Ronald R. Lagueux, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gabriela Guzman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by poorerosenbaum.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. Poore +8312 831 831 2600 +8312 831 831 2220 wpoore@poorerosenbaum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sammartino & Berg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine A. Sammartino +2740 274 274 0113 +2740 274 274 0175 cas@sbllp.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Vetter & White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George E. Lieberman +421 306 0ext112 +2726 272 272 6803 glieberman@vetterandwhite.com
No Logo Gregory Guzman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by poorerosenbaum.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. Poore +8312 831 831 2600 +8312 831 831 2220 wpoore@poorerosenbaum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sammartino & Berg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine A. Sammartino +2740 274 274 0113 +2740 274 274 0175 cas@sbllp.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Vetter & White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George E. Lieberman +421 306 0ext112 +2726 272 272 6803 glieberman@vetterandwhite.com
No Logo John J. Guzman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by poorerosenbaum.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. Poore +8312 831 831 2600 +8312 831 831 2220 wpoore@poorerosenbaum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sammartino & Berg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine A. Sammartino +2740 274 274 0113 +2740 274 274 0175 cas@sbllp.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Vetter & White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George E. Lieberman +421 306 0ext112 +2726 272 272 6803 glieberman@vetterandwhite.com
No Logo Mary Taguding, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by poorerosenbaum.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. Poore +8312 831 831 2600 +8312 831 831 2220 wpoore@poorerosenbaum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sammartino & Berg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine A. Sammartino +2740 274 274 0113 +2740 274 274 0175 cas@sbllp.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Vetter & White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George E. Lieberman +421 306 0ext112 +2726 272 272 6803 glieberman@vetterandwhite.com
v.
No Logo Cd Intellectual Property Holdings, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ford Motor Credit Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jerold Ruderman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Flannery +1 914 946 7200 +9467 946 946 7897

Toggle Switch Represented by Nationwide

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark H. Burnham +7320 732 732 0165 +7320 732 732 0943 burnham@nationwide.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peabody & Arnold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Charles Cain +1 617 951 2045 +1 617 951 2125 Kcain@peabodyarnold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maynard M. Kirpalani +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 maynard.kirpalani@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Robert Handfield, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nationwide

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark H. Burnham +7320 732 732 0165 +7320 732 732 0943 burnham@nationwide.com
Office Providence
Filed 6/9/1999
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Providence
Terminated 8/19/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 154 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002 Court Filing
ORDER granting [151-1] motion to Expedite hearing on #150, granting [150-1] motion to accept guardian ad litem report ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002
    Case closed (Gilfillan, B)
      LREF
      Blank 153 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Court Filing
      Minute entry: Hearing on Motion to Approve Guardian's Report held before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Jackson, R)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002
        Motion hearing re: [150-1] motion to accept guardian ad litem report held before Senior Judge Ronald R. Lagueux; Plaintiff: Catherine Sammartino, George Lieberman; Defendant: Kevin Cain, Mark Burnham; Guardian Ad Litem: William Poore; All Counsel of Record present. Plaintiff asks that the Guardian be allowed to address the Court regarding his report. Mr. Poore (Guardian Ad Litem) addresses the Court. Court approves the Report and Recommendation and the Settlement. An Order should be prepared. Mr. Poore will be dismissed as Guardian as soon as all papers are entered. (Jackson, R)
          LREF
          Blank 152 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002
          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS . of guardian ad litem (Gilfillan, B)
            LREF
            Blank 151 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Motion to Expedite
            MOTION by Mary Taguding, Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman to Expedite hearing on #150 (Gilfillan, B)
              LREF
              Blank 150 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION by Mary Taguding, Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman to accept guardian ad litem report (Gilfillan, B)
                LREF
                Blank 149 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem
                MOTION by Mary Taguding for Appointment of William Poore, Esq. as Guardian ad litem for Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman a minor (Jackson, R)
                  LREF
                  Blank 148 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Court Filing
                  ORDER denying [147-1] motion for Expidited Submission of Certification Order to the Rhode Island Supreme Court, granting [145-1] motion for Andrea L. Truppa to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Andrea L. Truppa for Ford Motor Credit Co, denying [120-1] joint motion for a Date Certain for Trial, granting [119-1] joint motion to File Deposition Transcripts, denying [118-1] joint motion to Acess Records of the Jury Panel, denying [36-1] motion to certify Vicarious Liability Issues to the Rhode Island Supreme Court ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                    LREF
                    Blank 147 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Terminated:
                    EMERGENCY MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Expidited Submission of Certification Order to the Rhode Island Supreme Court (Jackson, R)
                      LREF
                      Blank 146 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002 Remark
                      Request of Ford Motor Credit Company for Oral Hearing (Jackson, R)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001
                        In-chambers conference held; Ms. Sammartino and Mr. Lieberman for plaintiff, Mr. Cain/Burnham/Flannery for def; question to be certified to the Supreme Court; parties to submit an order (McCabe, F)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001
                          In-chambers conference set at 12:30 11/16/01 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                            LREF
                            Blank 145 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                            MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Andrea L. Truppa to Withdraw as Attorney (Saucier, M)
                              LREF
                              Blank 145 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001
                              ENTRY of appearance for Ford Motor Credit Co by Kevin C. Cain (Saucier, M)
                                LREF
                                Blank 144 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [140-1] motion for Protective Order to Stay and Reschedule Trial Testimony Videotaped Deposition of Robert Laureno, M.D. ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 143 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001
                                  Stipulation - discovery due 6/25/01 (Gilfillan, B)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 142 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001
                                    TRANSCRIPT OF Emergency Motion for a Protective Order to Stay and Reschedule Trial Testimony by Videotape Deposition of Robert Laureno, M.D. for date of 05/31/01. (Saucier, M)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 141 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 Court Filing
                                      Minute entry: Motion hearing held before Mag. Judge Martin on 5/31/01. (Zinni, C)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001
                                        Motion hearing re: [140-1] motion for Protective Order to Stay and Reschedule Trial Testimony Videotaped Deposition of Robert Laureno, M.D. before Mag. JUdge Martin. George Lieberman for plaintiff via telephone. Kevin Cain and Mark Burnham for defts. Motion is granted. Mr. Cain to submit order. (Zinni, C)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 140 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001, Terminated: 6/22/2001 Terminated:
                                          Emergency MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Protective Order to Stay and Reschedule Trial Testimony Videotaped Deposition of Robert Laureno, M.D. (Saucier, M)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 139 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001
                                            Stipulation - discovery due 6/18/01 (Gilfillan, B)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 138 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001
                                              NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Shirley Lareau on Tuesday, July 10, 2001 at 2:00 p.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 137 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001
                                                NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Dr. Emerson Coronel on Thursday, May 31, 2001 at 6:30 p.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/10/2001 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [133-1] motion to Vacate [39-1] Pre-Trial order ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (McCabe, F)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001
                                                    SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Dr. Rehana Hussain, MD (Saucier, M)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER denying [84-1] motion for Reconsideration of [79-1] order ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001, Terminated: 5/10/2001 Motion to Vacate
                                                        MOTION by Mary Taguding, Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman to Vacate [39-1] Pre-Trial order (Saucier, M)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                          NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Dr. Emerson Coronel, Bonificio (Joey) Taguding on Thursday May 31, 2001. (Saucier, M)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001
                                                            SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Robert Laureno, MD on 04/17/01. (Saucier, M)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001
                                                              SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Rehana Hussain, MD on 04/16/01. (Saucier, M)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001
                                                                SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Emerson Coronel, MD on 04/13/01. (Saucier, M)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001
                                                                  NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Dr. Rahena Hussain on Friday, June 1, 2001 at 10:00 a.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                    NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Dr. Robert Laureno on Wednesday, April 25, 2001 at 1:00 p.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                      NOTICE by Mary Taguding to take deposition of Dr. Rahena Hussain on Wednesday, April 25, 2001 at 10:00 a.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                        NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Joseph Taguding on Thursday, April 26, 2001 at 1:00 p.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                          NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Dr. Emerson Coronel on Thursday, April 26, 2001 at 10:00 a.m.` (Saucier, M)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Court Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF Plaintiff's Appeal of a Magistrate Judge's Order concerning a discovery matter for date of 03/30/01 (Saucier, M)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001
                                                                              Minute entry: Obj to Mag J order (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001
                                                                                Civil Hearing re: [0-0] hearing on Obj to Mag J Order before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux; Ms. Sammartino for plaintiff, Mr. Cain for defendant Ford; Judge reversed Order; Ms. Sammartino to draft order (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [101-1] motion to file a post hearing supplemental memorandum of law in suppoet of motion for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001
                                                                                    Civil Hearing re: [114-1] Magistrate appeal 2:00 3/30/01 before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by Mary Taguding, Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman, Ford Motor Credit Co, Robert Handfield for a Date Certain for Trial (Saucier, M)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                        JOINT MOTION by Mary Taguding, Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman, Ford Motor Credit Co, Robert Handfield to File Deposition Transcripts (Saucier, M)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                          JOINT MOTION by Mary Taguding, Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman, Ford Motor Credit Co, Robert Handfield to Acess Records of the Jury Panel (Saucier, M)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE by Ford Motor Credit Co in opposition to [114-1] Magistrate appeal of Order regarding production of Insurance Policies. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001
                                                                                              Filing fee paid for admission pro hac vice: $50.00, Receipt #47173. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001
                                                                                                Motion(s) referred: [107-1] motion to Strike [104-1] affidavit referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001
                                                                                                  Second AFFIDAVIT by Ford Motor Credit Co Re: Richard Coen (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                    OBJECTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to [107-1] motion to Strike [104-1] affidavit (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001
                                                                                                      Civil Hearing re: [114-1] Magistrate appeal 3:30 3/5/01 before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Credit Company and a Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by the plaintiffs for date of 1/24/01. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                          APPEAL of Magistrate decision to District Court from the Discovery Order of January 31, 2001 of Magistrate Judge Martin dated February 20, 2001. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [108-1] motion for Maynard M. Kirpalani to Appear Pro Hac Vice; however, the plaintiff may only serve local counsel ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying [97-1] motion for Reconsideration of [87-1] order regarding Limited Production of Insurance Policies denying [82-1] motion to Compel compliance with court order and provide discovery ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Mary Taguding to [108-1] motion for Maynard M. Kirpalani to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Ford Motor Credit Co Re: [108-1] motion for Maynard M. Kirpalani to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Maynard M. Kirpalani to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Mary Taguding to Strike [104-1] affidavit (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Mary Taguding in opposition to [104-1] affidavit (Delano, D)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [85-1] motion for Leave to Conduct a videotaped deposition of Dr. Mohammed Yaseen for Presentation at Trial ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Ford Motor Credit Co Re: Richard Coen (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF hearing to Establish a rcord for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel for date of 1/31/01 (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by Ford Motor Credit Co Re: (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Mary Taguding RE: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001, Terminated: 3/19/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to file a post hearing supplemental memorandum of law in suppoet of motion for summary judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to [97-1] motion for Reconsideration of [87-1] order regarding Limited Production of Insurance Policies (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001
                                                                                                                                        Motion(s) referred: [97-1] motion for Reconsideration of [87-1] order regarding Limited Production of Insurance Policies referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF Motion for Summary Judgment for date of 1/24/01. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to [97-1] motion for Reconsideration of [87-1] order regarding Limited Production of Insurance Policies (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                              Civil Hearing re: [0-0] hearing before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. George Lieberman and Catherine Sammartino for pltfs; Kevin Cain for deft. Mr. Lieberman and Mr. Cain argue Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents contained in Request #6. Court denies motion and affirms decision rendered on Motion for Reconsideration of 1/8/01 Order. Mr. Cain to prepare Order. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Mary Taguding for Reconsideration of [87-1] order regarding Limited Production of Insurance Policies (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001
                                                                                                                                                  Civil Hearing to establish record re: [82-1] motion to Compel compliance with court order and provide discovery 11:00 1/31/01 before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [93-1] motion for Leave to File Supplememtal Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                      Minute entry: Motion Hearing held on cross-motions for summary judgment and certification of question to RI Supreme Court. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                        Motion hearing re: [78-1] motion for Clarification of Discovery Order of December 14, 2000, [54-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [34-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Ct. Reporter: J. Fontes; George Lieberman and Cahterine Sammartino for the plaintiff; Kevin Cain and Mark Burnham for the defendant. Mr. Cain and Mr. Liberman argue cross-motions for summary judgment. Court takes matter under advisement. Court reserves ruling on certification of question to RI Supreme Court. All parties are to submit memos within 2 weeks. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Ford Motor Credit Co Re: [93-1] motion for Leave to File Supplememtal Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/24/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Leave to File Supplememtal Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                              SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Lauren Haskell on 1/13/01 (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Department of Neurology, Washington Hospital Center on 1/8/01. y (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) referred: [85-1] motion for Leave to Conduct a videotaped deposition of Dr. Mohammed Yaseen for Presentation at Trial referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Mary Taguding in support of [85-1] motion for Leave to Conduct a videotaped deposition of Dr. Mohammed Yaseen for Presentation at Trial (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript requested of proceeding held on 1/8/01. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion hearing re: [36-1] motion to certify Vicarious Liability Issues to the Rhode Island Supreme Court at 11:00 1/24/01, [34-1] motion for Summary Judgment at 11:00 1/24/01 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                          Motion hearing re: [54-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 1/24/01 11:00 am (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Lauren Haskel on Friday, January 19, 2001 at 10:00 a.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [32-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provider further Answer to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories as to Interrogatory No. 18 ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute entry: Pltf's M/Compel, Deft's M/Clarification and Motion for Reconsideration hearing. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 2/12/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Leave to Conduct a videotaped deposition of Dr. Mohammed Yaseen for Presentation at Trial (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion hearing re: [84-1] motion for Reconsideration of [79-1] order, [82-1] motion to Compel compliance with court order and provide discovery Motion hearing held, [78-1] motion for Clarification of Discovery Order of December 14, 2000 Motion hearing held before Magistrate Judge Martin. George Lieberman and Catherine Sammartino for pltfs; Kevin Cain for Ford Motor Co. and Mark Burnham for Handfield. Mr. Lieberman and Mr. Cain argue Motions. Court denies Motion for reconsideration and grants deft's Motion for Clarification and allows telephonic deposition of Ford representative. Court grants in part and denies in part Pltf's Motion to Compel. Mr. Cain to prepare Order for Motion for Clarification. Mr. Lieberman to prepare Order for Motion to Compel and Motion for Reconsideration. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                      Def's PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed in chambers (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001, Terminated: 5/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Reconsideration of [79-1] order (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Dr. Mohammed Yaseen on Wednesday, January 10, 2001 at 2:30 p.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion hearing re: [82-1] motion to Compel compliance with court order and provide discovery at 10:30 1/8/01, [78-1] motion for Clarification of Discovery Order of December 14, 2000 at 10:30 1/8/01 before Magistrate Judge Martin. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001, Terminated: 9/25/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Mary Taguding, Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman to [78-1] motion for Clarification of Discovery Order of December 14, 2000 (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Mary Taguding, Gabriela Guzman, Gregory Guzman, John J. Guzman to Compel compliance with court order and provide discovery (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation - obj to M/SJ due 12/26/00 signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part, denying in part [32-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provider further Answer to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories, granting in part, denying in part [28-1] motion to Compel Defendant/Ford to respond to discovery and appear for its depo ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Def's PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM filed in chambers (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: 1/4/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Ford Motor Credit Co Re: [75-1] motion response in opposition to the plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 10/10/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Clarification of Discovery Order of December 14, 2000 (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Ford Motor Credit Co, Attorney Andrea Truppa (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Ford Motor Credit Co RE: in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and a counter statement of Defendant in response to Local Rule 12.1. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to [54-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Dr. Mohammed Yaseen on Tuesday, December 26, 2000 at 2:00 p.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Kusol K. Pea (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Mary Hardy (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Officer Thomas J. Fitzgerald (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Officer Joseph McMahon (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Detective Frank Gallo (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Settlement conference set on 2:00 2/9/01 Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (rescheduled from 12/27/00) (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Kusol K. Pea on Friday, January 5, 2001. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICES (2) by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Lauren Haskell and Mary E. Hardy. (Administrator, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute entry: Motion hearings held before Magistrate Judge Martin. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion hearing re: [32-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provider further Answer to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories Motion hearing held, [31-1] motion to Compel Plaintii to Provide further Answer to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories Motion hearing held, [28-1] motion to Compel Defendant/Ford to respond to discovery and appear for its depo Motion hearing held before Magistrate Judge Martin. George Lieberman and Catherine Sammartino for pltf; Kevin Cain for deft. Ford; Mark Burnham for deft. Handfield. Court orders plaintiff to serve another set of concise interrogatories upon deft. within 5 days and will set M/Compel down for hearing. Mr. Lieberman and Mr. Cain argue pltf's M/for representative of Ford to appear at depo. Court grants Motion and a representative is to appear by 12/22/00. Mr. Cain waives deft's M/Compel 1st set. Court grants M/Compel 2nd set as to #5 and #8, but reserves ruling on #18 until Court hears pltf's M/Compel. Mr. Lieberman to prepare Order. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Officer Joseph McMahon on Tuesday, December 19, 2000 at 12:00 p.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Detective Frank Gallo on Tuesday, December 19, 2000 at 10:00 a.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Officer Thomas J. Fitzgerald on Tuesday, December 19, 2000 at 11:00 a.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Robert Handfield to [34-1] motion of defendant Ford Motor Credit Company for Summary Judgment. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Detective Raymond Quick on 12/1/00. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Kevin Hawkins on 12/2/00. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Detective Robert Ricci on 12/2/00. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Detective Richard Cragin on 12/2/00. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Mary Taguding RE: [54-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Mary Taguding in opposition to [35-1] affidavit (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Mary Taguding to [36-1] motion to certify Vicarious Liability Issues to the Rhode Island Supreme Court (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION by Mary Taguding to [34-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Mary Taguding for Partial Summary Judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/4/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation - obj to M/SJ due 12/6/00 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Santiago Belliard on Wednesday, December 6, 2000. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Shirley Taguding, Joseph Taguding on Tuesday, December 5, 2000. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Detective Richard Cragin, Detective Raymond Quirk, Kevin Hawkins, Detective Robert Ricci, on Monday, December 11, 2000. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Santiago Belliard; executed on 11/24/00. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Officer John Ryan; executed on 11/14/00. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUBPOENA Returned Subpoena served on Keeper of the Records Cranston Police Department; executed on 11/14/00. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Kusol K. Pea and Detective Frank Gallo on Thursday, November 30, 2000 at 10:00 a.m. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Mary E. Hardy and Santiago Belliard on Wednesday November 29,2000. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion hearing re: [32-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provider further Answer to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories at 10:00 12/14/00, [31-1] motion to Compel Plaintii to Provide further Answer to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories at 10:00 12/14/00, [28-1] motion to Compel Defendant/Ford to respond to discovery and appear for its depo at 10:00 12/14/00 before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Lauren Haskell on Wednesday, November 29, 20000. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; reset Settlement Conference for 2:00 12/27/00 before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTRY of appearance for Ford Motor Credit Co by Andrea L. Truppa (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Ford Motor Credit Co in opposition to [38-1] motion response (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion(s) referred: [32-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provider further Answer to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, [31-1] motion to Compel Plaintii to Provide further Answer to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Mary Taguding to [32-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provider further Answer to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Mary Taguding to [31-1] motion to Compel Plaintii to Provide further Answer to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Enlarge Time for Discovery to 11/30/00 and for filing PTM to 12/29/00 ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; reset Discovery deadline to 11/30/00 , reset Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 12/29/00 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion(s) referred to Judge: [29-1] motion to Enlarge Time for Discovery to 11/30/00 and for filing PTM to 12/29/00 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION by Mary Taguding to [29-1] motion to Enlarge Time for Discovery to 11/30/00 and for filing PTM to 12/29/00 (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of attorney Andrea Truppa Re: [36-1] motion to certify Vicarious Liability Issues to the Rhode Island Supreme Court, [35-1] affidavit, [34-1] motion for Summary Judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to certify Vicarious Liability Issues to the Rhode Island Supreme Court (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Of Undisputed Fact by Ford Motor Credit Co RE: [34-1] motion for Summary Judgment. (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for Summary Judgment (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Counsel for Ford Motor Re: [32-1] motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provider further Answer to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories, [31-1] motion to Compel Plaintii to Provide further Answer to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000, Terminated: 1/3/2001 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to Compel Plaintiff to Provider further Answer to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000, Terminated: 1/3/2001 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to Compel Plaintii to Provide further Answer to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion(s) referred: [28-1] motion to Compel Defendant/Ford to respond to discovery and appear for its depo referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to [28-1] motion to Compel Defendant/Ford to respond to discovery and appear for its depo (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/30/2000, Terminated: 11/13/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co to Enlarge Time for Discovery to 11/30/00 and for filing PTM to 12/29/00 (Saucier, M)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Mary Taguding to Compel Defendant/Ford to respond to discovery and appear for its depo (Saucier, M) Modified on 10/25/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - granting withdrawal of Stephen Macgfillivray signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Withdrawal of appearance of Stephen J. MacGillivray for Ford Motor Credit Company (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTRY of appearance for Ford Motor Credit Co by Kevin C. Cain (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ford Motor Credit Co to take deposition of Mary Taguding on 9/26/00 at 10:00 AM. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Enlarge Time for discovery to 10/27/00 and be assigned to trial calendar of 11/00. ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; reset Discovery deadline to 10/27/00 , ' reseet Pretrial Memorandum Deadline to 11/30/00 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000, Terminated: 7/10/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Gregory Guzman to Enlarge Time for discovery to 10/27/00 and be assigned to trial calendar of 11/00. (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/8/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Settlement conference set on 2:00 11/27/00 Before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/8/2000 Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Martin. (Zinni, C) Modified on 05/08/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER, set Mandatory Settlement Conference for 2:00 5/5/00 before Mag. Judge Martin. ( signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin ) (Zinni, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 12/20/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER withdrawing [18-1] motion to Strike [16-1] and withdrawal of amended answer ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 7/20/00 ; Pretrial Memorandum Deadline 8/31/00 ; ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 16 Conference held ; Ms Sammartino/George Lieberman for plaintiff; Mr. Burnham for Def Handfield; Ms O'Connell for Ford Motor; discovery closes 7/20/00; pre trial memos due 8/31/00; Burnham will withdraw for Ford (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/3/1999, Entered: 11/3/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation - discovery due 12/1/99 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Mary Taguding to Strike [16-1] answer (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Handfield : amends [6-1] answer; jury demand (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [12-1] motion for John M. Flannery to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/21/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [12-1] motion for John M. Flannery to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation - discovery due 10/31/99 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 16 Conference set 12:30 11/4/99 Before Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999, Terminated: 10/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Ford Motor Credit Co for John M. Flannery to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation - ans due 10/3/99 to ints and req for production (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/13/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, reset Answer deadline to 7/26/99 for Robert Handfield, for Ford Motor Credit Co ( signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux ) (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation - discovery due 9/19/99 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: 8/24/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation - discovery due 10/16/99 (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of appearance for Ford Motor Credit Co, Robert Handfield by Mark H. Burnham (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Credit Co, Robert Handfield (Attorney Mark H. Burnham),; jury demand (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999, Terminated: 8/19/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Credit Co (Attorney Deming E. Sherman, Stephen J. MacGillivray), (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation - ans to complaint due 7/14/99 signed by Judge Ronald R. Lagueux (Gilfillan, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Ford Motor Credit Co 6/10/99 Answer due on 6/30/99 for Ford Motor Credit Co (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Robert Handfield 6/10/99 Answer due on 6/30/99 for Robert Handfield (Barletta, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 42089 (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE assigned to Judge Ronald R. Lagueux . Assigned to Magistrate Judge Martin (McCabe, F)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 519 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?