Nunez v. Barnhart
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00337-T-DLM
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 1:48 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Marta Nunez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by m-n-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna M. Nesselbush +1 401 274 7400 +1 401 274 7420 jwilson@m-n-law.com
v.
No Logo Jo Anne B. Barnhart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 8/17/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 865 - Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Providence
Terminated 11/7/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of Jo Anne B. Barnhart (Michael J. Astrue, as Commissioner of Social Security) against Marta Nunez. So Ordered by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 11/6/07. (Jackson, Ryan)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER denying [6] Motion for Extension of Time ; adopting [11] Report and Recommendations; further, the case is hereby dismissed. So Ordered by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 11/06/07. (Jackson, Ryan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007
      Motion Forwarded to Chambers [11] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [6] First MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of Time to Serve Defendant filed by Marta NunezREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [6] First MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of Time to Serve Defendant filed by Marta Nunez FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007, Terminated: 11/7/2007 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Motion to Enlarge be denied [6] First MOTION for an Extension of Time to Serve Defendant filed by Marta Nunez Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2007. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 10/15/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
          NOTICE of Appearance by Ly Nguyen on behalf of Jo Anne B. Barnhart (Nguyen, Ly)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007
            Supplemental Memorandum re [6] First MOTION for an Extension of Time to Serve Defendant WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Marta Nunez. (Nesselbush, Donna) Modified on 7/30/2007 - description modified for clarification (Leyva, Lucia).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin : Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2007 re [6] First MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of Time to Serve Defendant filed by Marta Nunez. Donna Nesselbush for the plaintiff; Ly Nguyen for the defendant; Attorneys argue; Court requests a supplemental memo from the plaintiff to be filed within 10 days; Court takes matter under advisement. (Courtroom B at 10:03.) (Saucier, Martha)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Court Filing
                NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendant [6] on 7/19/07 at 10:00 am . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 7/9/07. (Saucier, Martha)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007
                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [6] First MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of Time to Serve Defendant: Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                    COMPLAINT against Jo Anne B. Barnhart, filed by Marta Nunez.(Nesselbush, Donna)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                      [6] First MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of Time to Serve Defendant REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Martin for determination. (Jackson, Ryan)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007, Terminated: 11/7/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                        First MOTION for an Extension of Time to Serve Defendant WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Marta Nunez. Responses due by 7/2/2007 (Attachments: # (1))(Nesselbush, Donna)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007, Terminated: 6/15/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                          ERROR WITH ATTACHED PDF DOCUMENT. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED. First MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of Time TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Marta Nunez. Responses due by 7/2/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Complaint)(Nesselbush, Donna) Modified on 6/15/2007 - document to be refiled. (Leyva, Lucia).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007
                            CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY re: [5] First MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of Time TO SERVE DEFENDANT ERROR: Portion of attached pdf document obstructed. CORRECTION: Document to be refiled. (Leyva, Lucia)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING: Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2007. So Ordered by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 6/6/07. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/16/05. Forwarded to counsel of record (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 8/30/2005 (Theall, Jeannine).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 8/17/2005 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marta Nunez. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005
                                    COMPLAINT against Jo Anne B. Barnhart , filed by Marta Nunez. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Barletta, Barbara)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005
                                      [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Martin. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?