Gamache v. Trek Bicycle Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00402-ML-LDA
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeannette E Gamache, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by higginsandslattery.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Baglini +7513 751 751 3600 +7514 751 751 4648 john.baglini@higginsandslattery.com
No Logo Robert O. Gamache, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by higginsandslattery.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Baglini +7513 751 751 3600 +7514 751 751 4648 john.baglini@higginsandslattery.com
v.
No Logo Trek Bicycle Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
Office Providence
Filed 9/22/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Providence
Terminated 2/9/2006
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
Stipulation of Dismissal by Trek Bicycle Corporation, Robert O. Gamache, Jeannette E Gamache. Signed by Judge Mary M Lisi on 2/9/2006. -- forwarded to counsel of record(Duhamel, John)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005
    Reset Hearings: re Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2006 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate JudgeRobert W Lovegreen. Rescheduled per request of counsel (Saucier, Martha)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
      Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/12/2006 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. (Saucier, Martha)
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/30/2006. Motions due by 7/14/2006. Pretrial Memorandum due by 7/31/2006.- Signed by Judge Mary M Lisi on 11/10/05; forwarded to counsel of record(Barletta, Barbara)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M Lisi : Rule 16 Conference held on 11/10/2005; John Baglini for plaintiff; Thomas Farrey for defendant; A PTO to enter closing discovery on 6/30/06. (Barletta, Barbara)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005
            AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE re service of Summons and Complaint, by John A. Baglini (counsel for pltfs Robert O. Gamache, Jeannette E Gamache). (Duhamel, John)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
              Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/10/2005 09:30 AM in Chambers 310 before Judeg Mary M. Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005
                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Farrey, III on behalf of Trek Bicycle Corporation (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005
                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Trek Bicycle Corporation.(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005
                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trek Bicycle Corporation, from Superior Court, case number 05-4689. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 61283), filed by Trek Bicycle Corporation.(Baldinelli, Doreen) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 80 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?