United Steelworkers of America Local 12431 v. Southern Union Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00405-T-LDA
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 1:48 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo United Steelworkers of America Local 12431, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Roberts, Carroll, Feldstein & Peirce, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Peirce +5217 521 521 7000 +5211 521 521 1328 rpeirce@rcfp.com
v.
No Logo Southern Union Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Brooks +2747 274 274 7200 +7510 751 751 0604 rbrooks@apslaw.com
Office Providence
Filed 9/23/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Providence
Terminated 10/12/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Court Filing
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on October 11, 2005. Judgment entered in favor of the Plantiff, United Steelworkers of America Local Union 12431-01 and against Defendant, Southern Union Company D/B/A The New England Gas Company. Faxed to all counsel.(Leyva, Lucia)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 state court record
    STATE COURT RECORD by Southern Union Company. (Leyva, Lucia)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005, Terminated: 10/12/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION to confirm arbitration award by United Steelworkers of America Local 12431 Responses due by 10/7/2005 - Exhibits A & B not scanned as documents exceed the system capacity(Barletta, Barbara) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2005 (Barletta, Barbara).
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005
        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Union Company, Southern Union Company from Providence County Superior Court, case number 05-4792. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 61297) filed by Southern Union Company, Southern Union Company. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Barletta, Barbara)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 100 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?