Berrios v. Barnhart
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00493-DLM-DLM
Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Benito Berrios, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Gannon +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 jjgannon@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Jo Anne B. Barnhart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony C. DiGioia +7095 709 709 5029 +7095 709 709 5017 anthony.digioia@usdoj.gov
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 11/28/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Providence
Terminated 2/5/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Court Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of Jo Anne B. Barnhart against Benito Berrios. So Ordered by Judge Deputy Clerk: on 2/5/08. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Benito Berrios, [11] MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner filed by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. Court denies plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and grants defendant's motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 2/5/08. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007
      NOTICE of Appearance by Ly Nguyen on behalf of Jo Anne B. Barnhart (Nguyen, Ly)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006, Terminated: 2/5/2008 Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner
        MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(DiGioia, Anthony)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006, Terminated: 2/5/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
          MOTION for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memo by Benito Berrios. Responses due by 9/14/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Fact Sheet)(Gannon, James)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006, Terminated: 8/15/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. Responses due by 8/28/2006 (Matos, Luis)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
              NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony C. DiGioia on behalf of Jo Anne B. Barnhart (DiGioia, Anthony)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 6/8/06. Forwarded to all counsel (Saucier, Martha)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 6/8/2006 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Modify, Reverse or Remand the Decision of the Commissioner up to and including 8/28/06 by Benito Berrios. Responses due by 6/22/2006 (Saucier, Martha)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment and/or a motion to modify, reverse, or remand is due by 6/5/2006. Defendant shall have up to and including 7/5/06 to file a motion for summary judgment and/or a motion to affirm the decision. Reply memo due by 7/19/06. Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 4/5/06. Forwarded to counsel(Saucier, Martha)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. Signed by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 4/4/06; faxed to all counsel of record(Jackson, Ryan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006
                        Faxed Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction forms to all counsel of record (Jackson, Ryan)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint by Jo Anne B. Barnhart.(Leyva, Lucia)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Administrative Record
                            ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. (Leyva, Lucia)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Affidavit of Service
                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Alberto Gonzalez; Robert Clark Corrente; Jo Anne B. Barnhart; General Counsel on November 30, 2005, filed by Benito Berrios. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005
                                COMPLAINT against Jo Anne B. Barnhart filed by Benito Berrios. Filing fee of $250.00 paid. Receipt #61843. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Leyva, Lucia)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005
                                  4 Summons Issued. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?